GNSR/LNER Johnson "D41" Class 4-4-0
GNSR | LNER (1924) | LNER (1946) | BR | Date To Service | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
93 | 6893 | 2237 | 12/1895 | 12/1946 | 51 | |||||||
94 | 6894 | 2238 | 62238 | 12/1895 | 27/08/1948 | 52.67 | ||||||
95 | 6895 | 2239 | 12/1895 | 31/12/1947 | Keith | 52 | ||||||
96 | 6896 | 2240 | 62240 | 12/1895 | 29/10/1949 | 53.83 | ||||||
97 | 6897 | 2241 | 62241 | 12/1895 | 23/02/1953 | 57.17 | 57.37 | |||||
98 | 6898 | 2242 | 62242 | 12/1895 | 23/02/1953 | 57.17 | ||||||
99 | 6899 | 2243 | 62243 | 12/1895 | 16/01/1951 | 55.08 | ||||||
100 | 6900 | 2244 | 02/1896 | 07/1947 | 51.42 | |||||||
19 | 6819 | 2231 | 62231 | 02/1896 | 21/11/1952 | 56.75 | ||||||
20 | 6820 | 2232 | 62232 | 02/1896 | 16/10/1951 | 55.67 | ||||||
21 | 6821 | 2233 | 02/1896 | 09/1946 | 50.58 | |||||||
22 | 6822 | 2234 | 62234 | 02/1896 | 10/11/1949 | 53.75 | ||||||
23 | 6823 | 2235 | 62235 | 03/1896 | 27/05/1950 | Keith | 54.17 | |||||
24 | 6824 | 2236 | 03/1896 | 12/1947 | 51.75 | |||||||
101 | 6901 | 2245 | 09/1897 | 12/1947 | 50.25 | |||||||
102 | 6902 | 2246 | 62246 | 09/1897 | 22/08/1951 | 53.92 | ||||||
103 | 6903 | 2247 | 62247 | 09/1897 | 20/10/1950 | 53.08 | ||||||
104 | 6904 | 2248 | 62248 | 09/1897 | 13/10/1952 | 55.08 | ||||||
105 | 6905 | 2249 | 62249 | 09/1897 | 10/10/1950 | 53.08 | ||||||
106 | 6906 | 2250 | 09/1897 | 12/1947 | 50.25 | |||||||
107 | 6907 | 2251 | 62251 | 02/1898 | 18/06/1951 | 53.33 | ||||||
108 | 6908 | 2252 | 62252 | 02/1898 | 09/11/1951 | 53.75 | ||||||
109 | 6909 | 2253 | 02/1898 | 01/1947 | 48.92 | |||||||
110 | 6910 | 2254 | 02/1898 | 01/1947 | 48.92 | |||||||
111 | 6911 | 2255 | 62255 | 02/1898 | 27/05/1952 | 54.25 | ||||||
112 | 6912 | 2256 | 62256 | 02/1898 | 02/12/1952 | 54.83 |