GER/LNER Holden "E4" Class 2-4-0
Class | GER | LNER (1924) | LNER (1942) | LNER (1946) | BR | Built | Depot Name | From | Date Withdrawn | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
E4 | 417 | 7417 | 02/1891 | W | Withdrawn | 01/1930 | 01/1930 | |||
E4 | 418 | 7418 | 03/1891 | W | Withdrawn | 09/1934 | 09/1934 | |||
E4 | 419 | 7419 | 03/1891 | W | Withdrawn | 05/1926 | 05/1926 | |||
E4 | 420 | 7420 | 04/1891 | W | Withdrawn | 03/1927 | 03/1927 | |||
E4 | 421 | 7421 | 04/1891 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1938 | 11/1938 | |||
E4 | 422 | 7422 | 04/1891 | W | Withdrawn | 09/1929 | 09/1929 | |||
E4 | 423 | 7423 | 03/1891 | W | Withdrawn | 07/1926 | 07/1926 | |||
E4 | 424 | 7424 | 03/1891 | W | Withdrawn | 01/1929 | 01/1929 | |||
E4 | 425 | 7425 | 03/1891 | W | Withdrawn | 02/1927 | 02/1927 | |||
E4 | 426 | 7426 | 03/1891 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1926 | 10/1926 | |||
E4 | 427 | 7427 | 7797 | 2780 | 62780 | 04/1891 | CAM NOR 31A 31A W |
Cambridge Norwich Thorpe Cambridge Cambridge Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 26/03/1949 29/09/1951 20/10/1951 26/09/1955 |
26/09/1955 |
E4 | 428 | 7428 | 04/1891 | W | Withdrawn | 05/1929 | 05/1929 | |||
E4 | 429 | 7429 | 04/1891 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1929 | 10/1929 | |||
E4 | 430 | 7430 | 04/1891 | W | Withdrawn | 04/1926 | 04/1926 | |||
E4 | 431 | 7431 | 04/1891 | W | Withdrawn | 06/1926 | 06/1926 | |||
E4 | 432 | 7432 | 04/1891 | W | Withdrawn | 07/1929 | 07/1929 | |||
E4 | 433 | 7433 | 05/1891 | W | Withdrawn | 04/1927 | 04/1927 | |||
E4 | 434 | 7434 | 04/1891 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1933 | 12/1933 | |||
E4 | 435 | 7435 | 04/1891 | W | Withdrawn | 03/1928 | 03/1928 | |||
E4 | 436 | 7436 | 05/1891 | W | Withdrawn | 06/1929 | 06/1929 | |||
E4 | 437 | 7437 | 05/1891 | W | Withdrawn | 02/1927 | 02/1927 | |||
E4 | 438 | 7438 | 05/1891 | W | Withdrawn | 05/1926 | 05/1926 | |||
E4 | 439 | 7439 | 06/1891 | W | Withdrawn | 08/1927 | 08/1927 | |||
E4 | 440 | 7440 | 05/1891 | W | Withdrawn | 06/1929 | 06/1929 | |||
E4 | 441 | 7441 | 05/1891 | W | Withdrawn | 06/1937 | 06/1937 | |||
E4 | 442 | 7442 | 06/1891 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1927 | 12/1927 | |||
E4 | 443 | 7443 | 06/1891 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1931 | 10/1931 | |||
E4 | 444 | 7444 | 06/1891 | W | Withdrawn | 06/1934 | 06/1934 | |||
E4 | 445 | 7445 | 06/1891 | W | Withdrawn | 01/1927 | 01/1927 | |||
E4 | 446 | 7446 | 06/1891 | W | Withdrawn | 04/1926 | 04/1926 | |||
E4 | 447 | 7447 | 09/1892 | W | Withdrawn | 09/1926 | 09/1926 | |||
E4 | 448 | 7448 | 09/1892 | W | Withdrawn | 01/1930 | 01/1930 | |||
E4 | 449 | 7449 | 09/1892 | W | Withdrawn | 02/1930 | 02/1930 | |||
E4 | 450 | 7450 | 09/1892 | W | Withdrawn | 05/1927 | 05/1927 | |||
E4 | 451 | 7451 | 09/1892 | W | Withdrawn | 02/1929 | 02/1929 | |||
E4 | 452 | 7452 | 10/1892 | W | Withdrawn | 09/1929 | 09/1929 | |||
E4 | 453 | 7453 | 10/1892 | W | Withdrawn | 03/1935 | 03/1935 | |||
E4 | 454 | 7454 | 10/1892 | W | Withdrawn | 06/1928 | 06/1928 | |||
E4 | 455 | 7455 | 10/1892 | W | Withdrawn | 03/1934 | 03/1934 | |||
E4 | 456 | 7456 | 11/1892 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1928 | 12/1928 | |||
E4 | 457 | 7457 | 11/1892 | W | Withdrawn | 06/1931 | 06/1931 | |||
E4 | 458 | 7458 | 11/1892 | W | Withdrawn | 08/1937 | 08/1937 | |||
E4 | 459 | 7459 | 11/1892 | W | Withdrawn | 03/1935 | 03/1935 | |||
E4 | 460 | 7460 | 11/1892 | W | Withdrawn | 04/1929 | 04/1929 | |||
E4 | 461 | 7461 | 11/1892 | W | Withdrawn | 09/1931 | 09/1931 | |||
E4 | 462 | 7462 | 11/1892 | W | Withdrawn | 05/1937 | 05/1937 | |||
E4 | 463 | 7463 | 7798 | 2781 | 62781 | 11/1892 | Dar CAM CAM CAM W |
Barnard Castle Cambridge Cambridge Cambridge Withdrawn |
01/1936 01/01/1948 30/11/1949 17/12/1949 02/01/1956 |
02/01/1956 |
E4 | 464 | 7464 | 11/1892 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1933 | 12/1933 | |||
E4 | 465 | 7465 | 12/1892 | W | Withdrawn | 07/1928 | 07/1928 | |||
E4 | 466 | 7466 | 7799 | 2782 | 62782 | 12/1892 | NOR W |
Norwich Thorpe Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 29/11/1954 |
29/11/1954 |
E4 | 467 | 7467 | 12/1892 | W | Withdrawn | 04/1937 | 04/1937 | |||
E4 | 468 | 7468 | 12/1892 | W | Withdrawn | 08/1929 | 08/1929 | |||
E4 | 469 | 7469 | 12/1892 | W | Withdrawn | 06/1929 | 06/1929 | |||
E4 | 470 | 7470 | 12/1892 | W | Withdrawn | 05/1934 | 05/1934 | |||
E4 | 471 | 7471 | 12/1892 | W | Withdrawn | 09/1929 | 09/1929 | |||
E4 | 472 | 7472 | 12/1892 | W | Withdrawn | 05/1938 | 05/1938 | |||
E4 | 473 | 7473 | 01/1893 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1935 | 12/1935 | |||
E4 | 474 | 7474 | 01/1893 | W | Withdrawn | 04/1929 | 04/1929 | |||
E4 | 475 | 7475 | 01/1893 | W | Withdrawn | 05/1931 | 05/1931 | |||
E4 | 476 | 7476 | 01/1893 | W | Withdrawn | 03/1937 | 03/1937 | |||
E4 | 477 | 7477 | 7800 | 2783 | 62783 | 10/1894 | CAM 31E 31E 31A W |
Cambridge Bury St Edmunds Bury St Edmunds Cambridge Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/07/1952 19/07/1952 20/06/1953 13/12/1954 |
13/12/1954 |
E4 | 478 | 7478 | 7801 | 2784 | 62784 | 10/1894 | DAR CAM W |
Darlington Cambridge Withdrawn |
01/1936 01/01/1948 30/05/1955 |
30/05/1955 |
E4 | 479 | 7479 | 10/1894 | W | Withdrawn | 03/1938 | 03/1938 | |||
E4 | 480 | 7480 | 10/1894 | W | Withdrawn | 01/1935 | 01/1935 | |||
E4 | 481 | 7481 | 10/1894 | W | Withdrawn | 06/1935 | 06/1935 | |||
E4 | 482 | 7482 | 11/1894 | W | Withdrawn | 09/1929 | 09/1929 | |||
E4 | 483 | 7483 | 11/1894 | W | Withdrawn | 06/1929 | 06/1929 | |||
E4 | 484 | 7484 | 11/1894 | W | Withdrawn | 03/1936 | 03/1936 | |||
E4 | 485 | 7485 | 11/1894 | W | Withdrawn | 01/1940 | 01/1940 | |||
E4 | 486 | 7486 | 11/1894 | W | Withdrawn | 06/1931 | 06/1931 | |||
E4 | 487 | 7487 | 12/1894 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1929 | 12/1929 | |||
E4 | 488 | 7488 | 12/1894 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1928 | 12/1928 | |||
E4 | 489 | 7489 | 12/1894 | W | Withdrawn | 03/1936 | 03/1936 | |||
E4 | 490 | 7490 | 7802 | 2785 | 62785 | 01/1895 | BSE CAM 34D 31A W |
Bury St Edmunds Cambridge Hitchin (GNR) Cambridge Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 26/03/1949 25/12/1954 18/05/1957 07/12/1959 |
07/12/1959 |
E4 | 491 | 7491 | 01/1895 | W | Withdrawn | 01/1935 | 01/1935 | |||
E4 | 492 | 7492 | 7803 | 2786 | 62786 | 01/1895 | CAM BSE 31A W |
Cambridge Bury St Edmunds Cambridge Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/1949 22/03/1952 30/07/1956 |
30/07/1956 |
E4 | 493 | 7493 | 01/1895 | W | Withdrawn | 07/1929 | 07/1929 | |||
E4 | 494 | 7494 | 7804 | 2787 | 62787 | 01/1895 | NOR 31A W |
Norwich Thorpe Cambridge Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 25/08/1956 20/11/1956 |
20/11/1956 |
E4 | 495 | 7495 | 01/1895 | W | Withdrawn | 05/1928 | 05/1928 | |||
E4 | 496 | 7496 | 7805 | 2788 | 62788 | 01/1895 | DAR CAM 32A 32A 31A W |
Darlington Cambridge Norwich Thorpe Norwich Thorpe Cambridge Withdrawn |
01/1936 01/01/1948 29/09/1951 20/10/1951 21/07/1956 04/03/1958 |
04/03/1958 |
E4 | 497 | 7497 | 7806 | 2789 | 62789 | 07/1896 | NOR 31A W |
Norwich Thorpe Cambridge Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 25/08/1956 02/12/1957 |
02/12/1957 |
E4 | 498 | 7498 | 08/1896 | W | Withdrawn | 01/1935 | 01/1935 | |||
E4 | 499 | 7499 | 08/1896 | W | Withdrawn | 03/1935 | 03/1935 | |||
E4 | 500 | 7500 | 08/1896 | W | Withdrawn | 06/1936 | 06/1936 | |||
E4 | 501 | 7501 | 09/1896 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1938 | 10/1938 | |||
E4 | 502 | 7502 | 09/1896 | W | Withdrawn | 01/1939 | 01/1939 | |||
E4 | 503 | 7503 | 7807 | 2790 | 62790 | 09/1896 | CAM 31C 31C 31A 31A W |
Cambridge Kings Lynn Kings Lynn Cambridge Cambridge Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 25/11/1950 30/11/1950 21/06/1952 12/07/1952 02/01/1956 |
02/01/1956 |
E4 | 504 | 7504 | 10/1896 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1938 | 11/1938 | |||
E4 | 505 | 7505 | 10/1896 | W | Withdrawn | 02/1931 | 02/1931 | |||
E4 | 506 | 7506 | 7808 | 2791 | 62791 | 10/1896 | CAM 30A 30E 30E 31A 31A 31E 31A W |
Cambridge Stratford Colchester Colchester Cambridge Cambridge Bury St Edmunds Cambridge Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 30/07/1950 24/03/1951 31/03/1951 15/11/1952 29/11/1952 20/06/1953 22/08/1953 04/04/1955 |
04/04/1955 |
E4 | 1250 | 7407 | 7791 | 2792 | 62792 | 06/1902 | NOR 31A W |
Norwich Thorpe Cambridge Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 20/08/1955 18/06/1956 |
18/06/1956 |
E4 | 1251 | 7408 | 7792 | 2793 | 62793 | 06/1902 | NOR W |
Norwich Thorpe Withdrawn |
01/1936 01/01/1948 28/02/1955 |
28/02/1955 |
E4 | 1252 | 7409 | 7793 | 2794 | 62794 | 06/1902 | CAM 31E 31A W |
Cambridge Bury St Edmunds Cambridge Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 22/03/1952 17/05/1952 22/08/1955 |
22/08/1955 |
E4 | 1253 | 7410 | 06/1902 | W | Withdrawn | 01/1935 | 01/1935 | |||
E4 | 1254 | 7411 | 7794 | 2796 | 62795 | 06/1902 | KBY CAM NOR 31A W |
Kirkby Stephen Cambridge Norwich Thorpe Cambridge Withdrawn |
01/1936 01/01/1948 18/06/1949 22/09/1951 07/03/1955 |
07/03/1955 |
E4 | 1255 | 7412 | 07/1902 | W | Withdrawn | 08/1935 | 08/1935 | |||
E4 | 1256 | 7413 | 07/1902 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1931 | 10/1931 | |||
E4 | 1257 | 7414 | 7795 | 2796 | 62796 | 07/1902 | CAM 31A W |
Cambridge Cambridge Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 20/08/1955 13/05/1957 |
13/05/1957 |
E4 | 1258 | 7415 | 08/1902 | W | Withdrawn | 06/1937 | 06/1937 | |||
E4 | 1259 | 7416 | 7796 | 2797 | 62797 | 08/1902 | MID NOR 32C 31A W |
Middlesbrough Norwich Thorpe Lowestoft Cambridge Withdrawn |
01/1936 01/01/1948 24/07/1954 20/07/1957 17/03/1958 |
17/03/1958 |