GER/LNER Holden "E4" Class 2-4-0
Date | Event | Number | From | Depot From | To | Depot To | Usage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
04/1926 | Condemned | 7430 | COND | ||||
04/1926 | Condemned | 7446 | COND | ||||
05/1926 | Condemned | 7419 | COND | ||||
05/1926 | Condemned | 7438 | COND | ||||
06/1926 | Condemned | 7431 | COND | ||||
07/1926 | Condemned | 7423 | COND | ||||
09/1926 | Condemned | 7447 | COND | ||||
10/1926 | Condemned | 7426 | COND | ||||
01/1927 | Condemned | 7445 | COND | ||||
02/1927 | Condemned | 7425 | COND | ||||
02/1927 | Condemned | 7437 | COND | ||||
03/1927 | Condemned | 7420 | COND | ||||
04/1927 | Condemned | 7433 | COND | ||||
05/1927 | Condemned | 7450 | COND | ||||
08/1927 | Condemned | 7439 | COND | ||||
12/1927 | Condemned | 7442 | COND | ||||
03/1928 | Condemned | 7435 | COND | ||||
05/1928 | Condemned | 7495 | COND | ||||
06/1928 | Condemned | 7454 | COND | ||||
07/1928 | Condemned | 7465 | COND | ||||
12/1928 | Condemned | 7456 | COND | ||||
12/1928 | Condemned | 7488 | COND | ||||
01/1929 | Condemned | 7424 | COND | ||||
02/1929 | Condemned | 7451 | COND | ||||
04/1929 | Condemned | 7460 | COND | ||||
04/1929 | Condemned | 7474 | COND | ||||
05/1929 | Condemned | 7428 | COND | ||||
06/1929 | Condemned | 7436 | COND | ||||
06/1929 | Condemned | 7440 | COND | ||||
06/1929 | Condemned | 7469 | COND | ||||
06/1929 | Condemned | 7483 | COND | ||||
07/1929 | Condemned | 7432 | COND | ||||
07/1929 | Condemned | 7493 | COND | ||||
08/1929 | Condemned | 7468 | COND | ||||
09/1929 | Condemned | 7422 | COND | ||||
09/1929 | Condemned | 7452 | COND | ||||
09/1929 | Condemned | 7471 | COND | ||||
09/1929 | Condemned | 7482 | COND | ||||
10/1929 | Condemned | 7429 | COND | ||||
12/1929 | Condemned | 7487 | COND | ||||
01/1930 | Condemned | 7417 | COND | ||||
01/1930 | Condemned | 7448 | COND | ||||
02/1930 | Condemned | 7449 | COND | ||||
02/1931 | Condemned | 7505 | COND | ||||
05/1931 | Condemned | 7475 | COND | ||||
06/1931 | Condemned | 7457 | COND | ||||
06/1931 | Condemned | 7486 | COND | ||||
09/1931 | Condemned | 7461 | COND | ||||
10/1931 | Condemned | 7443 | COND | ||||
10/1931 | Condemned | 7413 | COND | ||||
12/1933 | Condemned | 7434 | COND | ||||
12/1933 | Condemned | 7464 | COND | ||||
03/1934 | Condemned | 7455 | COND | ||||
05/1934 | Condemned | 7470 | COND | ||||
06/1934 | Condemned | 7444 | COND | ||||
09/1934 | Condemned | 7418 | COND | ||||
01/1935 | Condemned | 7480 | COND | ||||
01/1935 | Condemned | 7491 | COND | ||||
01/1935 | Condemned | 7498 | COND | ||||
01/1935 | Condemned | 7410 | COND | ||||
03/1935 | Condemned | 7453 | COND | ||||
03/1935 | Condemned | 7459 | COND | ||||
03/1935 | Condemned | 7499 | COND | ||||
06/1935 | Condemned | 7481 | COND | ||||
08/1935 | Condemned | 7412 | COND | ||||
12/1935 | Condemned | 7473 | COND | ||||
01/1936 | Reallocation | 7463 | DAR.2 | Barnard Castle | |||
01/1936 | Reallocation | 7478 | DAR | Darlington | |||
01/1936 | Reallocation | 7496 | DAR | Darlington | |||
01/1936 | Reallocation | 7411 | KBY | Kirkby Stephen | |||
01/1936 | Reallocation | 7416 | MID | Middlesbrough | |||
03/1936 | Condemned | 7484 | COND | ||||
03/1936 | Condemned | 7489 | COND | ||||
06/1936 | Condemned | 7500 | COND | ||||
03/1937 | Condemned | 7476 | COND | ||||
04/1937 | Condemned | 7467 | COND | ||||
05/1937 | Condemned | 7462 | COND | ||||
06/1937 | Condemned | 7441 | COND | ||||
06/1937 | Condemned | 7415 | COND | ||||
08/1937 | Condemned | 7458 | COND | ||||
03/1938 | Condemned | 7479 | COND | ||||
05/1938 | Condemned | 7472 | COND | ||||
10/1938 | Condemned | 7501 | COND | ||||
11/1938 | Condemned | 7421 | COND | ||||
11/1938 | Condemned | 7504 | COND | ||||
01/1939 | Condemned | 7502 | COND | ||||
01/1940 | Condemned | 7485 | COND | ||||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2780 | CAM | Cambridge | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2781 | DAR.2 | Barnard Castle | CAM | Cambridge | |
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2782 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2783 | CAM | Cambridge | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2784 | DAR | Darlington | CAM | Cambridge | |
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2785 | BSE | Bury St Edmunds | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2786 | CAM | Cambridge | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2787 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2788 | DAR | Darlington | CAM | Cambridge | |
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2789 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2790 | CAM | Cambridge | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2791 | CAM | Cambridge | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2792 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2793 | PEN | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2794 | CAM | Cambridge | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2796 | KBY | Kirkby Stephen | CAM | Cambridge | |
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2796 | CAM | Cambridge | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 2797 | MID | Middlesbrough | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | |
26/03/1949 | Reallocation | 2780 | CAM | Cambridge | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | |
26/03/1949 | Reallocation | 2785 | BSE | Bury St Edmunds | CAM | Cambridge | |
18/06/1949 | Reallocation | 2796 | CAM | Cambridge | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | |
07/1949 | Reallocation | 62786 | CAM | Cambridge | BSE | Bury St Edmunds | |
30/11/1949 | Reallocation | 62781 | CAM | Cambridge | CAM | Cambridge | |
17/12/1949 | Reallocation | 62781 | CAM | Cambridge | CAM | Cambridge | |
30/07/1950 | Reallocation | 62791 | CAM | Cambridge | 30A | Stratford | |
25/11/1950 | Reallocation | 62790 | CAM | Cambridge | 31C | Kings Lynn | |
30/11/1950 | Reallocation | 62790 | 31C | Kings Lynn | 31C | Kings Lynn | |
24/03/1951 | Reallocation | 62791 | 30A | Stratford | 30E | Colchester | |
31/03/1951 | Reallocation | 62791 | 30E | Colchester | 30E | Colchester | |
22/09/1951 | Reallocation | 2796 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | 31A | Cambridge | |
29/09/1951 | Reallocation | 62780 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | 31A | Cambridge | |
29/09/1951 | Reallocation | 62788 | CAM | Cambridge | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | |
20/10/1951 | Reallocation | 62780 | 31A | Cambridge | 31A | Cambridge | |
20/10/1951 | Reallocation | 62788 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | |
22/03/1952 | Reallocation | 62786 | BSE | Bury St Edmunds | 31A | Cambridge | |
22/03/1952 | Reallocation | 62794 | CAM | Cambridge | 31E | Bury St Edmunds | |
17/05/1952 | Reallocation | 62794 | 31E | Bury St Edmunds | 31A | Cambridge | |
21/06/1952 | Reallocation | 62790 | 31C | Kings Lynn | 31A | Cambridge | |
12/07/1952 | Reallocation | 62783 | CAM | Cambridge | 31E | Bury St Edmunds | |
12/07/1952 | Reallocation | 62790 | 31A | Cambridge | 31A | Cambridge | |
19/07/1952 | Reallocation | 62783 | 31E | Bury St Edmunds | 31E | Bury St Edmunds | |
15/11/1952 | Reallocation | 62791 | 30E | Colchester | 31A | Cambridge | |
29/11/1952 | Reallocation | 62791 | 31A | Cambridge | 31A | Cambridge | |
20/06/1953 | Reallocation | 62783 | 31E | Bury St Edmunds | 31A | Cambridge | |
20/06/1953 | Reallocation | 62791 | 31A | Cambridge | 31E | Bury St Edmunds | |
22/08/1953 | Reallocation | 62791 | 31E | Bury St Edmunds | 31A | Cambridge | |
24/07/1954 | Reallocation | 62797 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | 32C | Lowestoft | |
29/11/1954 | Condemned | 62782 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | COND | ||
13/12/1954 | Condemned | 62783 | 31A | Cambridge | COND | ||
25/12/1954 | Reallocation | 62785 | CAM | Cambridge | 34D | Hitchin (GNR) | |
28/02/1955 | Condemned | 62793 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | COND | ||
07/03/1955 | Condemned | 62795 | 31A | Cambridge | COND | ||
04/04/1955 | Condemned | 62791 | 31A | Cambridge | COND | ||
30/05/1955 | Condemned | 62784 | CAM | Cambridge | COND | ||
20/08/1955 | Reallocation | 62792 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | 31A | Cambridge | |
20/08/1955 | Reallocation | 62796 | CAM | Cambridge | 31A | Cambridge | |
22/08/1955 | Condemned | 62794 | 31A | Cambridge | COND | ||
26/09/1955 | Condemned | 62780 | 31A | Cambridge | COND | ||
02/01/1956 | Condemned | 62781 | CAM | Cambridge | COND | ||
02/01/1956 | Condemned | 62790 | 31A | Cambridge | COND | ||
18/06/1956 | Condemned | 62792 | 31A | Cambridge | COND | ||
21/07/1956 | Reallocation | 62788 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | 31A | Cambridge | |
30/07/1956 | Condemned | 62786 | 31A | Cambridge | COND | ||
25/08/1956 | Reallocation | 62787 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | 31A | Cambridge | |
25/08/1956 | Reallocation | 62789 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | 31A | Cambridge | |
20/11/1956 | Condemned | 62787 | 31A | Cambridge | COND | ||
13/05/1957 | Condemned | 62796 | 31A | Cambridge | COND | ||
18/05/1957 | Reallocation | 62785 | 34D | Hitchin (GNR) | 31A | Cambridge | |
20/07/1957 | Reallocation | 62797 | 32C | Lowestoft | 31A | Cambridge | |
02/12/1957 | Condemned | 62789 | 31A | Cambridge | COND | ||
04/03/1958 | Condemned | 62788 | 31A | Cambridge | COND | ||
17/03/1958 | Condemned | 62797 | 31A | Cambridge | COND | ||
07/12/1959 | Condemned | 62785 | 31A | Cambridge | COND |