Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 1500 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14906 Week
» 67922 Month
» 187449 Year
» 3214302 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
MSLR/LNER Parker "F1" Class 2-4-2T
Date |
Event |
Number |
From |
Depot From |
To |
Depot To |
Usage |
07/1930 |
Condemned |
5595 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
07/1931 |
Condemned |
5588 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
07/1931 |
Condemned |
5585 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
09/1931 |
Condemned |
5734 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
12/1931 |
Condemned |
5580 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
12/1931 |
Condemned |
5597 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
02/1932 |
Condemned |
5590 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
05/1932 |
Condemned |
5592 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
06/1932 |
Condemned |
5587 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
08/1932 |
Condemned |
5600 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
10/1932 |
Condemned |
5578 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
03/1933 |
Condemned |
5737 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
05/1933 |
Condemned |
5726 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
06/1933 |
Condemned |
5728 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
07/1933 |
Condemned |
5735 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
03/1934 |
Condemned |
5591 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
08/1936 |
Condemned |
5583 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
05/1937 |
Condemned |
5576 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
05/1937 |
Condemned |
5731 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
05/1937 |
Condemned |
5733 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
05/1937 |
Condemned |
5736 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
11/1937 |
Condemned |
5599 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
07/1938 |
Condemned |
5596 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
07/1939 |
Condemned |
5593 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
10/1939 |
Condemned |
5727 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
06/1943 |
Condemned |
5579 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
06/1943 |
Condemned |
5586 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
06/1943 |
Condemned |
5589 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
06/1943 |
Condemned |
5594 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
06/1943 |
Condemned |
5729 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
11/1944 |
Condemned |
5730 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
04/1945 |
Condemned |
5732 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
07/1945 |
Condemned |
5581 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
10/1945 |
Condemned |
5575 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
09/1946 |
Condemned |
7095 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
06/12/1947 |
Condemned |
7101 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
23/03/1948 |
Condemned |
67097 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
01/1949 |
Condemned |
67099 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
01/1949 |
Condemned |
67100 |
|
|
|
COND |
|
04/06/1949 |
Reallocation |
5589 |
98W |
|
CAM |
Cambridge |
|
13/08/1949 |
Reallocation |
5583 |
98W |
|
MAR |
March |
|
24/12/1949 |
Reallocation |
5600 |
98W |
|
MAL |
Malton |
|
31/01/1951 |
Reallocation |
5588 |
98W |
|
31A |
Cambridge |
|