Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 422 Today
» 1112 Yesterday
» 3840 Week
» 28674 Month
» 63006 Year
» 1728382 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

GCR/LNER Pollitt "F2" Class 2-4-2T


Class GCR LNER (1924) LNER (1946) BR Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
F2 776 5776 7104 67104 03/1900 ARD
ANN
W
Ardsley
Annesley
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/02/1949
05/1949
05/1949
F2 777 5777 7105 67105 03/1900 ANN
W
Annesley
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
27/08/1948
27/08/1948
F2 778 5778 7106 67106 03/1900 KX
ANN
W
Kings Cross
Annesley
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/06/1948
31/12/1948
31/12/1948
F2 779 5779 7107 67107 03/1900 ANN
W
Annesley
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/1949
02/1949
F2 780 5780 7108 67108 04/1900 KX
W
Kings Cross
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/1950
07/1950
F2 781 5781 7109 67109 04/1900 YAR
W
Yarmouth South Town
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/1949
11/1949
F2 782 5782 7110   04/1898 W Withdrawn 10/1947 10/1947
F2 783 5783 7111 67111 04/1900 KX
W
Kings Cross
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/1950
12/1950
F2 784 5784 7112 67112 05/1900 YB
W
Yarmouth Beach
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
05/1949
05/1949
F2 785 5785 7113 67113 06/1900 KX
W
Kings Cross
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/1949
04/1949