Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 442 Today
» 1112 Yesterday
» 3860 Week
» 28694 Month
» 63026 Year
» 1728402 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

GCR/LNER Pollitt "F2" Class 2-4-2T


Date Event Number From Depot From To Depot To Usage
10/1947 Condemned 7110       COND  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 7104     ARD Ardsley  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 7105     ANN Annesley  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 7106     KX Kings Cross  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 7107     ANN Annesley  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 7108     KX Kings Cross  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 7109     YAR Yarmouth South Town  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 7111     KX Kings Cross  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 7112     YB Yarmouth Beach  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 7113     KX Kings Cross  
19/06/1948 Reallocation 7106 KX Kings Cross ANN Annesley  
27/08/1948 Condemned 7105 ANN Annesley   COND  
31/12/1948 Condemned 67106 ANN Annesley   COND  
02/1949 Condemned 67107 ANN Annesley   COND  
12/02/1949 Reallocation 67104 ARD Ardsley ANN Annesley  
04/1949 Condemned 67113 KX Kings Cross   COND  
05/1949 Condemned 67104 ANN Annesley   COND  
05/1949 Condemned 67112 YB Yarmouth Beach   COND  
11/1949 Condemned 67109 YAR Yarmouth South Town   COND  
07/1950 Condemned 67108 KX Kings Cross   COND  
12/1950 Condemned 67111 KX Kings Cross   COND