Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 24 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 2950 Week
» 4688 Month
» 132131 Year
» 1797507 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

GER/LNER Holden "F4" Class 2-4-2T


Class GER LNER (1924) LNER (1946) BR Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
F4 Stephenson 650 7650     07/1884 W Withdrawn 06/1927 06/1927
F4 Stephenson 651       07/1884 W Withdrawn 12/1914 12/1914
F4 Stephenson 652       08/1884 W Withdrawn 10/1913 10/1913
F4 Stephenson 653 7653     09/1884 W
GHD
Withdrawn
Gateshead
08/1923
09/04/1949
08/1923
F4 Stephenson 654 7654     09/1884 W Withdrawn 11/1927 11/1927
F4 Stephenson 655 7655     09/1884 W Withdrawn 10/1926 10/1926
F4 Stephenson 656       11/1884 W Withdrawn 12/1922 12/1922
F4 Stephenson 657 7657     11/1884 W
BLA
Withdrawn
Blaydon
05/1926
05/06/1948
05/1926
F4 Stephenson 658       11/1884 W Withdrawn 06/1914 06/1914
F4 Stephenson 659 7659     11/1884 W Withdrawn 09/1925 09/1925
F4 Stephenson 660 7660     12/1884 W Withdrawn 01/1926 01/1926
F4 Stephenson 661       01/1885 W Withdrawn 09/1913 09/1913
F4 Stephenson 662 7662     03/1885 W Withdrawn 11/1926 11/1926
F4 Joy 663 7663     03/1885 W Withdrawn 09/1925 09/1925
F4 Stephenson 664       04/1885 W Withdrawn 09/1915 09/1915
F4 Stephenson 665 7665     05/1885 W Withdrawn 08/1926 08/1926
F4 Stephenson 666 7666     06/1885 W Withdrawn 03/1926 03/1926
F4 Stephenson 667       07/1885 W Withdrawn 12/1922 12/1922
F4 Stephenson 668 7668     07/1885 W Withdrawn 03/1926 03/1926
F4 Stephenson 669 7669     07/1885 W
DFU
Withdrawn
Dunfermline Upper
09/1926
20/11/1948
09/1926
F4 Stephenson 670 7670     08/1885 W Withdrawn 09/1927 09/1927
F4 Stephenson 671       09/1885 W Withdrawn 12/1922 12/1922
F4 Stephenson 672       10/1885 W Withdrawn 09/1913 09/1913
F4 Stephenson 673       12/1885 W Withdrawn 12/1914 12/1914
F4 Stephenson 674 7674     10/1885 W
KPS
Withdrawn
Kipps
02/1926
12/02/1949
02/1926
F4 Stephenson 675 7675     12/1885 W
PKS
STG
Withdrawn
Parkeston Quay
Stirling
08/1927
25/01/1948
25/12/1948
08/1927
F4 Stephenson 676 7676     01/1886 W
PKS
STR
EFD
EFD
Withdrawn
Parkeston Quay
Stratford
Eastfield
Eastfield
02/1926
14/08/1948
12/12/1948
16/12/1948
18/12/1948
02/1926
F4 Stephenson 677 7677     02/1886 W Withdrawn 04/1925 04/1925
F4 Stephenson 678 7678     03/1886 W Withdrawn 11/1929 11/1929
F4 Stephenson 679 7679     02/1886 W
PKS
STR
NOR
Withdrawn
Parkeston Quay
Stratford
Norwich Thorpe
07/1925
14/08/1948
25/12/1948
22/01/1949
07/1925
F4 Stephenson 800 7800     09/1886 W Withdrawn 02/1927 02/1927
F4 Stephenson 791 7791     09/1886 W Withdrawn 11/1924 11/1924
F4 Stephenson 792 7792     10/1886 W Withdrawn 10/1926 10/1926
F4 Stephenson 793 7793     10/1886 W Withdrawn 08/1923 08/1923
F4 Stephenson 794 7794     11/1886 W Withdrawn 06/1925 06/1925
F4 Stephenson 795 7795     11/1886 W Withdrawn 06/1927 06/1927
F4 Stephenson 796 7796     12/1886 W Withdrawn 10/1924 10/1924
F4 Stephenson 797 7797     01/1887 W Withdrawn 05/1927 05/1927
F4 Stephenson 798 7798     01/1887 W Withdrawn 03/1927 03/1927
F4 Stephenson 799 7799     01/1887 W Withdrawn 03/1926 03/1926
F4 Stephenson 140 7140     06/1903 W Withdrawn 03/1932 03/1932
F4 Stephenson 141 7141 7188 67188 06/1903 COL
30A
30E
30A
30E
W
Colchester
Stratford
Colchester
Stratford
Colchester
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
17/11/1951
16/05/1953
21/11/1953
17/12/1955
29/12/1955
29/12/1955
F4 Stephenson 142 7142 7189 67189 06/1903 COL
W
Colchester
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
20/12/1956
20/12/1956
F4 Stephenson 143 7143 7190 67190 06/1903 COL
32C
32C
W
Colchester
Lowestoft
Lowestoft
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
20/09/1952
04/10/1952
23/11/1955
23/11/1955
F4 Stephenson 144 7144 7191 67191 06/1903 STR
COL
W
Stratford
Colchester
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/01/1948
21/11/1955
21/11/1955
F4 Stephenson 145 7145 7192 67192 07/1903 STR
30E
W
Stratford
Colchester
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
17/12/1955
21/04/1958
21/04/1958
F4 Stephenson 146 7146     07/1903 W Withdrawn 01/1930 01/1930
F4 Stephenson 147 7147 7193 67193 07/1903 STR
W
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/11/1957
04/11/1957
F4 Stephenson 148 7148     08/1903 W Withdrawn 08/1931 08/1931
F4 Stephenson 149 7149     08/1903 W Withdrawn 05/1931 05/1931
F4 Stephenson 781 7781 7194 67194 10/1904 STR
COL
30A
30E
30A
W
Stratford
Colchester
Stratford
Colchester
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/01/1948
16/05/1953
23/04/1955
24/03/1956
10/1956
10/1956
F4 Stephenson 782 7782 7195 67195 11/1904 STR
COL
30A
32C
32C
32D
32C
30A
W
Stratford
Colchester
Stratford
Lowestoft
Lowestoft
Yarmouth South Town
Lowestoft
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/01/1948
22/03/1952
18/10/1952
01/11/1952
25/09/1954
25/12/1954
15/12/1956
06/05/1958
06/05/1958
F4 Stephenson 783 7783 7196 67196 11/1904 STR
COL
W
Stratford
Colchester
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/01/1948
07/03/1955
07/03/1955
F4 Stephenson 784 7784 7197 67197 11/1904 91E
STR
W
To Eastern Region
Stratford
Withdrawn
07/1940
07/1943
01/01/1948
14/03/1955
14/03/1955
F4 Stephenson 785 7785 7198 67198 11/1904 STR
W
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
15/08/1955
15/08/1955
F4 Stephenson 786 7786 7199 67199 11/1904 STR
YAR
30A
32D
32C
32D
30A
W
Stratford
Yarmouth South Town
Stratford
Yarmouth South Town
Lowestoft
Yarmouth South Town
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/11/1949
25/09/1954
13/11/1954
23/07/1955
22/10/1955
19/01/1957
05/02/1957
05/02/1957
F4 Stephenson 787 7787 7200 67200 11/1904 STR
W
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
20/12/1957
20/12/1957
F4 Stephenson 788 7788 7201 67201 11/1904 STR
W
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
17/12/1956
17/12/1956
F4 Stephenson 789 7789 7218 67218 12/1904 STR
LOW
YAR
30A
32D
30A
W
Stratford
Lowestoft
Yarmouth South Town
Stratford
Yarmouth South Town
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/04/1948
12/11/1949
23/10/1954
13/11/1954
23/04/1955
10/03/1958
10/03/1958
F4 Stephenson 790 7790 7219 67219 12/1904 STR
COL
30A
W
Stratford
Colchester
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/01/1950
22/03/1952
06/11/1956
06/11/1956
F4 Stephenson 91 7091 7202 67202 07/1905 STR
W
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
16/12/1957
16/12/1957
F4 Stephenson 92 7092     07/1905 W Withdrawn 04/1933 04/1933
F4 Stephenson 93 7093     07/1905 W Withdrawn 05/1932 05/1932
F4 Stephenson 94 7094 7203 67203 07/1905 STR
W
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
16/12/1957
16/12/1957
F4 Stephenson 95 7095 7204 67204 08/1905 PKS
STR
COL
30A
32C
W
Parkeston Quay
Stratford
Colchester
Stratford
Lowestoft
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/02/1948
22/05/1948
17/11/1951
16/05/1953
27/09/1955
27/09/1955
F4 Stephenson 96 7096 7205 67205 09/1905 STR
W
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/11/1955
23/11/1955
F4 Stephenson 97 7097     09/1905 W Withdrawn 12/1929 12/1929
F4 Stephenson 98 7098     09/1905 W Withdrawn 11/1929 11/1929
F4 Stephenson 99 7099     10/1905 W Withdrawn 05/1932 05/1932
F4 Stephenson 100 7100 7206 67206 10/1905 PKS
STR
32C
W
Parkeston Quay
Stratford
Lowestoft
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/02/1948
14/02/1953
27/09/1955
27/09/1955
F4 Stephenson 101 7101     11/1905 W Withdrawn 11/1929 11/1929
F4 Stephenson 102 7102     11/1905 W Withdrawn 02/1931 02/1931
F4 Stephenson 103 7103 7207 67207 11/1905 COL
32C
W
Colchester
Lowestoft
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/02/1953
06/12/1955
06/12/1955
F4 Stephenson 104 7104 7208 67208 11/1905 STR
W
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/01/1957
10/01/1957
F4 Stephenson 105 7105     11/1905 W Withdrawn 03/1935 03/1935
F4 Stephenson 106 7106     11/1905 W Withdrawn 02/1933 02/1933
F4 Stephenson 107 7107     02/1906 W Withdrawn 12/1929 12/1929
F4 Stephenson 108 7108 7209 67209 01/1906 STR
W
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
18/02/1957
18/02/1957
F4 Stephenson 109 7109 7210 67210 02/1906 STR
W
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/07/1955
04/07/1955
F4 Stephenson 110 7110 7211 67211 01/1906 STR
W
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/1956
10/1956
F4 Stephenson 780 7780 7212 67212 07/1906 STR
W
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
05/05/1958
05/05/1958
F4 Stephenson 236 7236 7151 67151 07/1906 KIT
W
Kittybrewster
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
28/08/1951
28/08/1951
F4 Stephenson 237 7237     07/1906 W
KL
Withdrawn
Kings Lynn
09/1929
09/07/1949
09/1929
F4 Stephenson 238 7238     07/1906 W
STR
CAM
Withdrawn
Stratford
Cambridge
07/1929
27/08/1949
17/12/1949
24/12/1949
07/1929
F4 Stephenson 239 7239     08/1906 W
SL
STR
IPS
Withdrawn
South Lynn
Stratford
Ipswich
11/1929
01/05/1948
27/08/1949
10/12/1949
11/1929
F4 Stephenson 240 7240     08/1906 W Withdrawn 06/1937 06/1937
F4 Stephenson 241 7241     08/1906 W Withdrawn 10/1933 10/1933
F4 Stephenson 242 7242     09/1906 W Withdrawn 10/1937 10/1937
F4 Stephenson 243 7243     09/1906 W Withdrawn 12/1934 12/1934
F4 Stephenson 244 7244 7152 67152 09/1906 91E
MC
32E
32E
W
To Eastern Region
Melton Constable
Yarmouth Vauxhall
Yarmouth Vauxhall
Withdrawn
06/1940
07/1943
01/01/1948
21/07/1951
28/07/1951
04/02/1952
04/02/1952
F4 Stephenson 572 7572     02/1907 W Withdrawn 03/1933 03/1933
F4 Stephenson 573 7573 7153 67153 03/1907 91E
MC
STR
MAR
W
To Eastern Region
Melton Constable
Stratford
March
Withdrawn
07/1940
01/1945
01/01/1948
24/09/1949
31/12/1949
07/1951
07/1951
F4 Stephenson 574 7574 7154 67154 03/1907 YAR
W
Yarmouth South Town
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
03/09/1951
03/09/1951
F4 Stephenson 575 7575     03/1907 W Withdrawn 01/1931 01/1931
F4 Stephenson 576 7576     03/1907 W Withdrawn 05/1937 05/1937
F4 Stephenson 577 7577     04/1907 W Withdrawn 01/1931 01/1931
F4 Stephenson 578 7578 7155 67155 04/1907 MAL
W
Malton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/08/1951
14/08/1951
F4 Stephenson 579 7579 7156 67156 04/1907 NOR
LOW
W
Norwich Thorpe
Lowestoft
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/01/1948
11/1950
11/1950
F4 Stephenson 580 7580     04/1907 W Withdrawn 07/1937 07/1937
F4 Stephenson 581 7581 7157 67157 05/1907 YB
NOR
KIT
W
Yarmouth Beach
Norwich Thorpe
Kittybrewster
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/01/1948
25/01/1948
08/06/1956
08/06/1956
F4 Stephenson 582 7582     05/1907 W Withdrawn 03/1936 03/1936
F4 Stephenson 583 7583     05/1907 W Withdrawn 05/1937 05/1937
F4 Stephenson 584 7584 7158 67158 05/1907 LOW
NOR
LOW
W
Lowestoft
Norwich Thorpe
Lowestoft
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
03/01/1948
06/03/1948
13/01/1953
13/01/1953
F4 Stephenson 585 7585     05/1907 W Withdrawn 03/1933 03/1933
F4 Stephenson 586 7586 7159 67159 06/1907 91E
STR
W
To Eastern Region
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/1941
06/1943
01/01/1948
24/04/1948
24/04/1948
F4 Stephenson 587 7587     06/1907 W Withdrawn 10/1933 10/1933
F4 Stephenson 588 7588 7160 67160 06/1907 BSE
CAM
STR
W
Bury St Edmunds
Cambridge
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
21/02/1948
17/09/1949
04/1950
04/1950
F4 Stephenson 589 7589 7213 67213 06/1907 COL
STR
W
Colchester
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/06/1948
05/1955
05/1955
F4 Stephenson 590 7590 7214 67214 07/1907 STR
32C
32C
32D
32C
30A
W
Stratford
Lowestoft
Lowestoft
Yarmouth South Town
Lowestoft
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
27/12/1952
17/01/1953
25/09/1954
13/11/1954
15/12/1956
05/05/1958
05/05/1958
F4 Stephenson 591 7591     07/1907 W Withdrawn 03/1933 03/1933
F4 Stephenson 211 7211     08/1907 W Withdrawn 08/1934 08/1934
F4 Stephenson 212 7212     08/1907 W Withdrawn 12/1933 12/1933
F4 Stephenson 213 7213     09/1907 W Withdrawn 12/1933 12/1933
F4 Stephenson 214 7214 7162 67162 09/1907 91E
YB

32E
W
To Eastern Region
Yarmouth Beach

Yarmouth Vauxhall
Withdrawn
06/1940
07/1943
01/01/1948
25/01/1948
20/10/1951
15/08/1955
15/08/1955
F4 Stephenson 215 7215     09/1907 W Withdrawn 05/1935 05/1935
F4 Stephenson 216 7216     09/1907 W
COL
STR
LOW
Withdrawn
Colchester
Stratford
Lowestoft
03/1934
22/05/1948
04/12/1949
09/12/1949
03/1934
F4 Stephenson 217 7217     09/1907 W
COL
Withdrawn
Colchester
04/1935
22/05/1948
04/1935
F4 Stephenson 218 7218     10/1907 W Withdrawn 03/1933 03/1933
F4 Stephenson 219 7219 7163 67163 10/1907 LOW
W
Lowestoft
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/12/1951
12/12/1951
F4 Stephenson 220 7220     10/1907 W
PKS
STR
IPS
Withdrawn
Parkeston Quay
Stratford
Ipswich
05/1934
22/05/1948
27/11/1948
10/12/1949
05/1934
F4 Stephenson 111 7111 7161 67161 11/1907 91E
STR
W
To Eastern Region
Stratford
Withdrawn
02/1941
06/1943
01/01/1948
24/04/1948
24/04/1948
F4 Stephenson 221 7221     11/1907 W
CAM
Withdrawn
Cambridge
06/1934
22/05/1948
03/07/1948
06/1934
F4 Stephenson 222 7222 7164 67164 11/1907 KIT
W
Kittybrewster
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
27/08/1951
27/08/1951
F4 Stephenson 223 7223     11/1907 W Withdrawn 02/1935 02/1935
F4 Stephenson 224 7224     11/1907 W
COL
STR

NOR
YAR
NOR
LOW
Withdrawn
Colchester
Stratford

Norwich Thorpe
Yarmouth South Town
Norwich Thorpe
Lowestoft
02/1935
24/01/1948
22/05/1948
26/06/1948
25/12/1948
09/07/1949
08/10/1949
26/11/1949
02/1935
F4 Stephenson 225 7225     11/1907 W
Withdrawn
05/1935
17/12/1949
05/1935
F4 Stephenson 232 7232 7165 67165 11/1907 LOW
W
Lowestoft
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
15/01/1951
15/01/1951
F4 Stephenson 233 7233 7166 67166 12/1907 LOW
W
Lowestoft
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/04/1951
09/04/1951
F4 Stephenson 234 7234     12/1907 W Withdrawn 04/1933 04/1933
F4 Stephenson 235 7235     12/1907 W Withdrawn 06/1935 06/1935
F4 Stephenson 170 7170 7215 67215 08/1908 STR
COL
COL
30A
W
Stratford
Colchester
Colchester
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
30/11/1949
10/12/1949
17/11/1951
19/09/1955
19/09/1955
F4 Stephenson 171 7171 7167 67167 09/1908 LOW
W
Lowestoft
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/1948
04/1948
F4 Stephenson 172 7172 7168 67168 09/1908 91E
STR
W
To Eastern Region
Stratford
Withdrawn
06/1940
05/1943
01/01/1948
24/04/1948
24/04/1948
F4 Stephenson 173 7173 7169 67169 09/1908 91E
STR
W
To Eastern Region
Stratford
Withdrawn
07/1940
01/1945
01/01/1948
24/04/1948
24/04/1948
F4 Stephenson 174 7174 7170 67170 09/1908 91E
STR
W
To Eastern Region
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/1941
01/1945
01/01/1948
24/04/1948
24/04/1948
F4 Stephenson 175 7175 7171 67171 10/1908 HLD
W
Hull Dairycoates
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
01/08/1951
01/08/1951
F4 Stephenson 176 7176     10/1908 W
NOR
Withdrawn
Norwich Thorpe
04/1943
19/11/1949
04/1943
F4 Stephenson 177 7177 7172 67172 10/1908 91E
STR
W
To Eastern Region
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/1941
06/1943
01/01/1948
24/04/1948
24/04/1948
F4 Stephenson 178 7178 7173 67173 10/1908 91E
STR
W
To Eastern Region
Stratford
Withdrawn
06/1940
07/1943
01/01/1948
24/04/1948
24/04/1948
F4 Stephenson 179 7179 7216 67216 11/1908 91E
STR
LOW
W
To Eastern Region
Stratford
Lowestoft
Withdrawn
07/1940
01/1945
01/01/1948
30/11/1949
17/12/1956
17/12/1956
F4 Stephenson 180 7180 7174 67174 11/1908 NOR
LOW
NOR
YAR
LOW
YAR
YAR
32C
32C
W
Norwich Thorpe
Lowestoft
Norwich Thorpe
Yarmouth South Town
Lowestoft
Yarmouth South Town
Yarmouth South Town
Lowestoft
Lowestoft
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/07/1948
25/12/1948
03/09/1949
01/10/1949
30/11/1949
17/12/1949
31/05/1950
30/06/1950
13/12/1954
13/12/1954
F4 Stephenson 181 7181     11/1908 W Withdrawn 11/1935 11/1935
F4 Stephenson 182 7182     12/1908 W
LOW
Withdrawn
Lowestoft
01/1931
17/01/1948
01/1931
F4 Stephenson 183 7183     12/1908 W
LOW
Withdrawn
Lowestoft
10/1934
19/06/1948
10/1934
F4 Stephenson 184 7184 7175 67175 12/1908 HLD
W
Hull Dairycoates
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
01/08/1951
01/08/1951
F4 Stephenson 185 7185 7176 67176 01/1909 NOR
YAR
NOR
32C
32C
W
Norwich Thorpe
Yarmouth South Town
Norwich Thorpe
Lowestoft
Lowestoft
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/06/1949
30/11/1949
30/06/1951
21/07/1951
22/07/1953
22/07/1953
F4 Stephenson 186 7186 7177 67177 01/1909 LOW
NOR
LOW
W
Lowestoft
Norwich Thorpe
Lowestoft
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
03/01/1948
15/05/1948
12/03/1951
12/03/1951
F4 Stephenson 187 7187 7178 67178 02/1909 NOR
32C
32C
W
Norwich Thorpe
Lowestoft
Lowestoft
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
30/06/1951
21/07/1951
18/08/1952
18/08/1952
F4 Stephenson 188 7188 7217 67217 02/1909 STR
30A
30E
30E
W
Stratford
Stratford
Colchester
Colchester
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
17/11/1951
20/09/1952
04/10/1952
21/11/1955
21/11/1955
F4 Stephenson 189 7189 7179 67179 02/1909 91E
STR
W
To Eastern Region
Stratford
Withdrawn
06/1940
05/1943
01/01/1948
24/04/1948
24/04/1948
F4 Stephenson 71 7071 7180 67180 03/1909 91E
STR
W
To Eastern Region
Stratford
Withdrawn
07/1940
07/1943
01/01/1948
24/04/1948
24/04/1948
F4 Stephenson 72 7072 7181 67181 03/1909 91E
STR
W
To Eastern Region
Stratford
Withdrawn
06/1940
05/1943
01/01/1948
24/04/1948
24/04/1948
F4 Stephenson 73 7073     03/1909 W Withdrawn 03/1935 03/1935
F4 Stephenson 74 7074 7182 67182 03/1909 IPS
32B
W
Ipswich
Ipswich
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/04/1952
12/01/1953
12/01/1953
F4 Stephenson 75 7075 7183 67183 04/1909 STR
W
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/1950
04/1950
F4 Stephenson 76 7076 7184 67184 04/1909 NOR
LOW
W
Norwich Thorpe
Lowestoft
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
15/05/1948
08/12/1952
08/12/1952
F4 Stephenson 77 7077 7185 67185 04/1909 91E
STR
W
To Eastern Region
Stratford
Withdrawn
06/1940
03/1943
01/01/1948
24/04/1948
24/04/1948
F4 Stephenson 78 7078 7186 67186 04/1909 NOR
NOR
LOW
W
Norwich Thorpe
Norwich Thorpe
Lowestoft
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
03/01/1948
20/08/1949
22/07/1953
22/07/1953
F4 Stephenson 79 7079 7187 67187 05/1909 BSE
CAM
SL
CAM
STR
MAR
32C
32C
W
Bury St Edmunds
Cambridge
South Lynn
Cambridge
Stratford
March
Lowestoft
Lowestoft
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
23/04/1949
03/09/1949
07/09/1949
09/09/1949
31/12/1949
19/01/1952
26/01/1952
18/08/1955
18/08/1955
F4 Stephenson 80 7080     05/1909 W Withdrawn 02/1936 02/1936