Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 923 Today
» 1021 Yesterday
» 5269 Week
» 5269 Month
» 72131 Year
» 1737507 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

GER/LNER Holden "F4" Class 2-4-2T


Date Event Number From Depot From To Depot To Usage
09/1913 Condemned 661       COND  
09/1913 Condemned 672       COND  
10/1913 Condemned 652       COND  
06/1914 Condemned 658       COND  
12/1914 Condemned 651       COND  
12/1914 Condemned 673       COND  
09/1915 Condemned 664       COND  
12/1922 Condemned 656       COND  
12/1922 Condemned 667       COND  
12/1922 Condemned 671       COND  
08/1923 Condemned 653       COND  
08/1923 Condemned 793       COND  
10/1924 Condemned 7796       COND  
11/1924 Condemned 7791       COND  
04/1925 Condemned 7677       COND  
06/1925 Condemned 7794       COND  
07/1925 Condemned 7679       COND  
09/1925 Condemned 7659       COND  
09/1925 Condemned 7663       COND  
01/1926 Condemned 7660       COND  
02/1926 Condemned 7674       COND  
02/1926 Condemned 7676       COND  
03/1926 Condemned 7666       COND  
03/1926 Condemned 7668       COND  
03/1926 Condemned 7799       COND  
05/1926 Condemned 7657       COND  
08/1926 Condemned 7665       COND  
09/1926 Condemned 7669       COND  
10/1926 Condemned 7655       COND  
10/1926 Condemned 7792       COND  
11/1926 Condemned 7662       COND  
02/1927 Condemned 7800       COND  
03/1927 Condemned 7798       COND  
05/1927 Condemned 7797       COND  
06/1927 Condemned 7650       COND  
06/1927 Condemned 7795       COND  
08/1927 Condemned 7675       COND  
09/1927 Condemned 7670       COND  
11/1927 Condemned 7654       COND  
07/1929 Condemned 7238       COND  
09/1929 Condemned 7237       COND  
11/1929 Condemned 7678       COND  
11/1929 Condemned 7098       COND  
11/1929 Condemned 7101       COND  
11/1929 Condemned 7239       COND  
12/1929 Condemned 7097       COND  
12/1929 Condemned 7107       COND  
01/1930 Condemned 7146       COND  
01/1931 Condemned 7575       COND  
01/1931 Condemned 7577       COND  
01/1931 Condemned 7182       COND  
02/1931 Condemned 7102       COND  
05/1931 Condemned 7149       COND  
08/1931 Condemned 7148       COND  
03/1932 Condemned 7140       COND  
05/1932 Condemned 7093       COND  
05/1932 Condemned 7099       COND  
02/1933 Condemned 7106       COND  
03/1933 Condemned 7572       COND  
03/1933 Condemned 7585       COND  
03/1933 Condemned 7591       COND  
03/1933 Condemned 7218       COND  
04/1933 Condemned 7092       COND  
04/1933 Condemned 7234       COND  
10/1933 Condemned 7241       COND  
10/1933 Condemned 7587       COND  
12/1933 Condemned 7212       COND  
12/1933 Condemned 7213       COND  
03/1934 Condemned 7216       COND  
05/1934 Condemned 7220       COND  
06/1934 Condemned 7221       COND  
08/1934 Condemned 7211       COND  
10/1934 Condemned 7183       COND  
12/1934 Condemned 7243       COND  
02/1935 Condemned 7223       COND  
02/1935 Condemned 7224       COND  
03/1935 Condemned 7105       COND  
03/1935 Condemned 7073       COND  
04/1935 Condemned 7217       COND  
05/1935 Condemned 7215       COND  
05/1935 Condemned 7225       COND  
06/1935 Condemned 7235       COND  
11/1935 Condemned 7181       COND  
02/1936 Condemned 7080       COND  
03/1936 Condemned 7582       COND  
05/1937 Condemned 7576       COND  
05/1937 Condemned 7583       COND  
06/1937 Condemned 7240       COND  
07/1937 Condemned 7580       COND  
10/1937 Condemned 7242       COND  
03/1943 Reallocation 7077 WD   91E To Eastern Region  
04/1943 Condemned 7176       COND  
05/1943 Reallocation 7172 WD   91E To Eastern Region  
05/1943 Reallocation 7189 WD   91E To Eastern Region  
05/1943 Reallocation 7072 WD   91E To Eastern Region  
06/1943 Reallocation 7586 WD   91E To Eastern Region  
06/1943 Reallocation 7111 WD   91E To Eastern Region  
06/1943 Reallocation 7177 WD   91E To Eastern Region  
07/1943 Reallocation 7244 WD   91E To Eastern Region  
07/1943 Reallocation 7214 WD   91E To Eastern Region  
07/1943 Reallocation 7178 WD   91E To Eastern Region  
07/1943 Reallocation 7071 WD   91E To Eastern Region  
01/1945 Reallocation 7573 WD   91E To Eastern Region  
01/1945 Reallocation 7173 WD   91E To Eastern Region  
01/1945 Reallocation 7174 WD   91E To Eastern Region  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 7151     KIT Kittybrewster  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 7152 91E To Eastern Region MC Melton Constable  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 7153 91E To Eastern Region MC Melton Constable  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 7154     YAR Yarmouth South Town  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 7155     MAL Malton  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 7156     NOR Norwich Thorpe  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 7157     YB Yarmouth Beach  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 7158     LOW Lowestoft  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 7159 91E To Eastern Region STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 7160     BSE Bury St Edmunds  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 7162 91E To Eastern Region YB Yarmouth Beach  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 7163     LOW Lowestoft  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 7161 91E To Eastern Region STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 7164     KIT Kittybrewster  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 7165     LOW Lowestoft  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 7166     LOW Lowestoft  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 7167     LOW Lowestoft  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 7168 91E To Eastern Region STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 7169 91E To Eastern Region STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 7170 91E To Eastern Region STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 7171     HLD Hull Dairycoates  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 7172 91E To Eastern Region STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 7173 91E To Eastern Region STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 7174     NOR Norwich Thorpe  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 7175     HLD Hull Dairycoates  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 7176     NOR Norwich Thorpe  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 7177     LOW Lowestoft  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 7178     NOR Norwich Thorpe  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 7179 91E To Eastern Region STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 7180 91E To Eastern Region STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 7181 91E To Eastern Region STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 7182     IPS Ipswich  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 7183     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 7184     NOR Norwich Thorpe  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 7185 91E To Eastern Region STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 7186     NOR Norwich Thorpe  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 7187     BSE Bury St Edmunds  
03/01/1948 Reallocation 7158 LOW Lowestoft NOR Norwich Thorpe  
03/01/1948 Reallocation 7177 LOW Lowestoft NOR Norwich Thorpe  
03/01/1948 Reallocation 7186 NOR Norwich Thorpe NOR Norwich Thorpe  
10/01/1948 Reallocation 7156 NOR Norwich Thorpe LOW Lowestoft  
17/01/1948 Reallocation 7182 98W   LOW Lowestoft  
24/01/1948 Reallocation 7157 YB Yarmouth Beach NOR Norwich Thorpe  
24/01/1948 Reallocation 7224 98W   COL Colchester  
25/01/1948 Reallocation 7675 98W   PKS Parkeston Quay  
25/01/1948 Reallocation 7157 NOR Norwich Thorpe KIT Kittybrewster  
21/02/1948 Reallocation 7160 BSE Bury St Edmunds CAM Cambridge  
06/03/1948 Reallocation 7158 NOR Norwich Thorpe LOW Lowestoft  
04/1948 Condemned 7167 LOW Lowestoft   COND  
24/04/1948 Condemned 7159 STR Stratford   COND  
24/04/1948 Condemned 7161 STR Stratford   COND  
24/04/1948 Condemned 7168 STR Stratford   COND  
24/04/1948 Condemned 7169 STR Stratford   COND  
24/04/1948 Condemned 7170 STR Stratford   COND  
24/04/1948 Condemned 7172 STR Stratford   COND  
24/04/1948 Condemned 7173 STR Stratford   COND  
24/04/1948 Condemned 7179 STR Stratford   COND  
24/04/1948 Condemned 7180 STR Stratford   COND  
24/04/1948 Condemned 7181 STR Stratford   COND  
24/04/1948 Condemned 7185 STR Stratford   COND  
01/05/1948 Reallocation 7239 98W   SL South Lynn  
15/05/1948 Reallocation 7177 NOR Norwich Thorpe LOW Lowestoft  
15/05/1948 Reallocation 7184 NOR Norwich Thorpe LOW Lowestoft  
22/05/1948 Reallocation 7216 98W   COL Colchester  
22/05/1948 Reallocation 7217 98W   COL Colchester  
22/05/1948 Reallocation 7220 98W   PKS Parkeston Quay  
22/05/1948 Reallocation 7221 98W   CAM Cambridge  
22/05/1948 Reallocation 7224 COL Colchester STR Stratford  
05/06/1948 Reallocation 7657 98W   BLA Blaydon  
19/06/1948 Reallocation 7183 98W   LOW Lowestoft  
24/07/1948 Reallocation 7174 NOR Norwich Thorpe LOW Lowestoft  
14/08/1948 Reallocation 7676 98W   PKS Parkeston Quay  
14/08/1948 Reallocation 7679 98W   PKS Parkeston Quay  
20/11/1948 Reallocation 7669 98W   DFU Dunfermline Upper  
27/11/1948 Reallocation 7220 PKS Parkeston Quay STR Stratford  
12/12/1948 Reallocation 7676 PKS Parkeston Quay STR Stratford  
16/12/1948 Reallocation 7676 STR Stratford EFD Eastfield  
18/12/1948 Reallocation 7676 EFD Eastfield EFD Eastfield  
25/12/1948 Reallocation 7675 PKS Parkeston Quay STG Stirling  
25/12/1948 Reallocation 7679 PKS Parkeston Quay STR Stratford  
25/12/1948 Reallocation 7224 MEL   NOR Norwich Thorpe  
25/12/1948 Reallocation 7174 LOW Lowestoft NOR Norwich Thorpe  
22/01/1949 Reallocation 7679 STR Stratford NOR Norwich Thorpe  
12/02/1949 Reallocation 7674 98W   KPS Kipps  
09/04/1949 Reallocation 7653 98W   GHD Gateshead  
23/04/1949 Reallocation 7187 BSE Bury St Edmunds CAM Cambridge  
11/06/1949 Reallocation 67176 NOR Norwich Thorpe YAR Yarmouth South Town  
09/07/1949 Reallocation 7237 98W   KL Kings Lynn  
09/07/1949 Reallocation 7224 NOR Norwich Thorpe YAR Yarmouth South Town  
20/08/1949 Reallocation 67186 NOR Norwich Thorpe LOW Lowestoft  
27/08/1949 Reallocation 7238 98W   STR Stratford  
27/08/1949 Reallocation 7239 SL South Lynn STR Stratford  
03/09/1949 Reallocation 7174 NOR Norwich Thorpe YAR Yarmouth South Town  
03/09/1949 Reallocation 7187 CAM Cambridge SL South Lynn  
07/09/1949 Reallocation 7187 SL South Lynn CAM Cambridge  
09/09/1949 Reallocation 7187 CAM Cambridge STR Stratford  
17/09/1949 Reallocation 67160 CAM Cambridge STR Stratford  
24/09/1949 Reallocation 67153 MC Melton Constable STR Stratford  
01/10/1949 Reallocation 7174 YAR Yarmouth South Town LOW Lowestoft  
08/10/1949 Reallocation 7224 YAR Yarmouth South Town NOR Norwich Thorpe  
19/11/1949 Reallocation 7176 98W   NOR Norwich Thorpe  
26/11/1949 Reallocation 7224 NOR Norwich Thorpe LOW Lowestoft  
30/11/1949 Reallocation 67174 LOW Lowestoft YAR Yarmouth South Town  
30/11/1949 Reallocation 67176 YAR Yarmouth South Town NOR Norwich Thorpe  
04/12/1949 Reallocation 7216 COL Colchester STR Stratford  
09/12/1949 Reallocation 7216 STR Stratford LOW Lowestoft  
10/12/1949 Reallocation 7239 STR Stratford IPS Ipswich  
10/12/1949 Reallocation 7220 STR Stratford IPS Ipswich  
17/12/1949 Reallocation 7238 STR Stratford CAM Cambridge  
17/12/1949 Reallocation 67174 YAR Yarmouth South Town YAR Yarmouth South Town  
31/12/1949 Reallocation 67153 STR Stratford MAR March  
31/12/1949 Reallocation 7187 STR Stratford MAR March  
04/1950 Condemned 67160 STR Stratford   COND  
04/1950 Condemned 67183 STR Stratford   COND  
31/05/1950 Reallocation 67174 YAR Yarmouth South Town 32C Lowestoft  
30/06/1950 Reallocation 67174 32C Lowestoft 32C Lowestoft  
11/1950 Condemned 67156 LOW Lowestoft   COND  
15/01/1951 Condemned 67165 LOW Lowestoft   COND  
12/03/1951 Condemned 67177 LOW Lowestoft   COND  
09/04/1951 Condemned 67166 LOW Lowestoft   COND  
30/06/1951 Reallocation 67176 NOR Norwich Thorpe 32C Lowestoft  
30/06/1951 Reallocation 67178 NOR Norwich Thorpe 32C Lowestoft  
07/1951 Condemned 67153 MAR March   COND  
21/07/1951 Reallocation 67152 MC Melton Constable 32E Yarmouth Vauxhall  
21/07/1951 Reallocation 67176 32C Lowestoft 32C Lowestoft  
21/07/1951 Reallocation 67178 32C Lowestoft 32C Lowestoft  
28/07/1951 Reallocation 67152 32E Yarmouth Vauxhall 32E Yarmouth Vauxhall  
01/08/1951 Condemned 67171 HLD Hull Dairycoates   COND  
01/08/1951 Condemned 67175 HLD Hull Dairycoates   COND  
14/08/1951 Condemned 67155 MAL Malton   COND  
27/08/1951 Condemned 67164 KIT Kittybrewster   COND  
28/08/1951 Condemned 67151 KIT Kittybrewster   COND  
03/09/1951 Condemned 67154 YAR Yarmouth South Town   COND  
20/10/1951 Reallocation 67162 MEL   32E Yarmouth Vauxhall  
12/12/1951 Condemned 67163 LOW Lowestoft   COND  
19/01/1952 Reallocation 67187 MAR March 32C Lowestoft  
26/01/1952 Reallocation 67187 32C Lowestoft 32C Lowestoft  
04/02/1952 Condemned 67152 32E Yarmouth Vauxhall   COND  
19/04/1952 Reallocation 67182 IPS Ipswich 32B Ipswich  
18/08/1952 Condemned 67178 32C Lowestoft   COND  
08/12/1952 Condemned 67184 LOW Lowestoft   COND  
12/01/1953 Condemned 67182 32B Ipswich   COND  
13/01/1953 Condemned 67158 LOW Lowestoft   COND  
22/07/1953 Condemned 67176 32C Lowestoft   COND  
22/07/1953 Condemned 67186 LOW Lowestoft   COND  
13/12/1954 Condemned 67174 32C Lowestoft   COND  
15/08/1955 Condemned 67162 32E Yarmouth Vauxhall   COND  
18/08/1955 Condemned 67187 32C Lowestoft   COND  
08/06/1956 Condemned 67157 KIT Kittybrewster   COND