GER/LNER Holden "F5" Class 2-4-2T
Class | GER | LNER (1924) | LNER (1946) | BR | Built | Depot Name | From | Date Withdrawn | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
F5 | 141 | 7141 | 7188 | 67188 | 06/1903 | COL 30A 30E 30A 30E W |
Colchester Stratford Colchester Stratford Colchester Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/11/1951 16/05/1953 21/11/1953 17/12/1955 29/12/1955 |
29/12/1955 |
F5 | 142 | 7142 | 7189 | 67189 | 06/1903 | COL W |
Colchester Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 20/12/1956 |
20/12/1956 |
F5 | 143 | 7143 | 7190 | 67190 | 06/1903 | COL 32C 32C W |
Colchester Lowestoft Lowestoft Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 20/09/1952 04/10/1952 23/11/1955 |
23/11/1955 |
F5 | 144 | 7144 | 7191 | 67191 | 06/1903 | STR COL W |
Stratford Colchester Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/01/1948 21/11/1955 |
21/11/1955 |
F5 | 145 | 7145 | 7192 | 67192 | 07/1903 | STR 30E W |
Stratford Colchester Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/12/1955 21/04/1958 |
21/04/1958 |
F5 | 147 | 7147 | 7193 | 67193 | 07/1903 | STR W |
Stratford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/11/1957 |
04/11/1957 |
F5 | 781 | 7781 | 7194 | 67194 | 10/1904 | STR COL 30A 30E 30A W |
Stratford Colchester Stratford Colchester Stratford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/01/1948 16/05/1953 23/04/1955 24/03/1956 10/1956 |
10/1956 |
F5 | 782 | 7782 | 7195 | 67195 | 11/1904 | STR COL 30A 32C 32C 32D 32C 30A W |
Stratford Colchester Stratford Lowestoft Lowestoft Yarmouth South Town Lowestoft Stratford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/01/1948 22/03/1952 18/10/1952 01/11/1952 25/09/1954 25/12/1954 15/12/1956 06/05/1958 |
06/05/1958 |
F5 | 783 | 7783 | 7196 | 67196 | 11/1904 | STR COL W |
Stratford Colchester Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/01/1948 07/03/1955 |
07/03/1955 |
F5 | 784 | 7784 | 7197 | 67197 | 11/1904 | 91E STR W |
To Eastern Region Stratford Withdrawn |
07/1940 07/1943 01/01/1948 14/03/1955 |
14/03/1955 |
F5 | 785 | 7785 | 7198 | 67198 | 11/1904 | STR W |
Stratford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 15/08/1955 |
15/08/1955 |
F5 | 786 | 7786 | 7199 | 67199 | 11/1904 | STR YAR 30A 32D 32C 32D 30A W |
Stratford Yarmouth South Town Stratford Yarmouth South Town Lowestoft Yarmouth South Town Stratford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/11/1949 25/09/1954 13/11/1954 23/07/1955 22/10/1955 19/01/1957 05/02/1957 |
05/02/1957 |
F5 | 787 | 7787 | 7200 | 67200 | 11/1904 | STR W |
Stratford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 20/12/1957 |
20/12/1957 |
F5 | 788 | 7788 | 7201 | 67201 | 11/1904 | STR W |
Stratford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/12/1956 |
17/12/1956 |
F5 | 789 | 7789 | 7218 | 67218 | 12/1904 | STR LOW YAR 30A 32D 30A W |
Stratford Lowestoft Yarmouth South Town Stratford Yarmouth South Town Stratford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/04/1948 12/11/1949 23/10/1954 13/11/1954 23/04/1955 10/03/1958 |
10/03/1958 |
F5 | 790 | 7790 | 7219 | 67219 | 12/1904 | STR COL 30A W |
Stratford Colchester Stratford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/01/1950 22/03/1952 06/11/1956 |
06/11/1956 |
F5 | 91 | 7091 | 7202 | 67202 | 07/1905 | STR W |
Stratford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 16/12/1957 |
16/12/1957 |
F5 | 94 | 7094 | 7203 | 67203 | 07/1905 | STR W |
Stratford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 16/12/1957 |
16/12/1957 |
F5 | 95 | 7095 | 7204 | 67204 | 08/1905 | PKS STR COL 30A 32C W |
Parkeston Quay Stratford Colchester Stratford Lowestoft Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/02/1948 22/05/1948 17/11/1951 16/05/1953 27/09/1955 |
27/09/1955 |
F5 | 96 | 7096 | 7205 | 67205 | 09/1905 | STR W |
Stratford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 23/11/1955 |
23/11/1955 |
F5 | 100 | 7100 | 7206 | 67206 | 10/1905 | PKS STR 32C W |
Parkeston Quay Stratford Lowestoft Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/02/1948 14/02/1953 27/09/1955 |
27/09/1955 |
F5 | 103 | 7103 | 7207 | 67207 | 11/1905 | COL 32C W |
Colchester Lowestoft Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/02/1953 06/12/1955 |
06/12/1955 |
F5 | 104 | 7104 | 7208 | 67208 | 11/1905 | STR W |
Stratford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/01/1957 |
10/01/1957 |
F5 | 108 | 7108 | 7209 | 67209 | 01/1906 | STR W |
Stratford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 18/02/1957 |
18/02/1957 |
F5 | 109 | 7109 | 7210 | 67210 | 02/1906 | STR W |
Stratford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/07/1955 |
04/07/1955 |
F5 | 110 | 7110 | 7211 | 67211 | 01/1906 | STR W |
Stratford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/1956 |
10/1956 |
F5 | 780 | 7780 | 7212 | 67212 | 07/1906 | STR W |
Stratford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/05/1958 |
05/05/1958 |
F5 | 589 | 7589 | 7213 | 67213 | 06/1907 | COL STR W |
Colchester Stratford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 19/06/1948 05/1955 |
05/1955 |
F5 | 590 | 7590 | 7214 | 67214 | 07/1907 | STR 32C 32C 32D 32C 30A W |
Stratford Lowestoft Lowestoft Yarmouth South Town Lowestoft Stratford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 27/12/1952 17/01/1953 25/09/1954 13/11/1954 15/12/1956 05/05/1958 |
05/05/1958 |
F5 | 170 | 7170 | 7215 | 67215 | 08/1908 | STR COL COL 30A W |
Stratford Colchester Colchester Stratford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 30/11/1949 10/12/1949 17/11/1951 19/09/1955 |
19/09/1955 |
F5 | 179 | 7179 | 7216 | 67216 | 11/1908 | 91E STR LOW W |
To Eastern Region Stratford Lowestoft Withdrawn |
07/1940 01/1945 01/01/1948 30/11/1949 17/12/1956 |
17/12/1956 |
F5 | 188 | 7188 | 7217 | 67217 | 02/1909 | STR 30A 30E 30E W |
Stratford Stratford Colchester Colchester Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/11/1951 20/09/1952 04/10/1952 21/11/1955 |
21/11/1955 |