Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 98 Today
» 1112 Yesterday
» 3516 Week
» 28350 Month
» 62682 Year
» 1728058 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

GER/LNER Holden "F5" Class 2-4-2T


Date Event Number From Depot From To Depot To Usage
07/1943 Reallocation 7784 WD   91E To Eastern Region  
01/1945 Reallocation 7179 WD   91E To Eastern Region  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 7188     COL Colchester  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 7189     COL Colchester  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 7190     COL Colchester  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 7191     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 7192     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 7193     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 7194     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 7195     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 7196     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 7197 91E To Eastern Region STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 7198     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 7199     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 7200     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 7201     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 7202     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 7203     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 7204     PKS Parkeston Quay  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 7205     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 7206     PKS Parkeston Quay  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 7207     COL Colchester  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 7208     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 7209     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 7210     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 7211     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 7212     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 7213     COL Colchester  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 7214     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 7215     STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 7216 91E To Eastern Region STR Stratford  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 7217     STR Stratford  
24/01/1948 Reallocation 7191 STR Stratford COL Colchester  
24/01/1948 Reallocation 7194 STR Stratford COL Colchester  
24/01/1948 Reallocation 7195 STR Stratford COL Colchester  
24/01/1948 Reallocation 7196 STR Stratford COL Colchester  
14/02/1948 Reallocation 7204 PKS Parkeston Quay STR Stratford  
14/02/1948 Reallocation 7206 PKS Parkeston Quay STR Stratford  
22/05/1948 Reallocation 7204 STR Stratford COL Colchester  
19/06/1948 Reallocation 7213 COL Colchester STR Stratford  
12/11/1949 Reallocation 67199 STR Stratford YAR Yarmouth South Town  
12/11/1949 Reallocation 67218 LOW Lowestoft YAR Yarmouth South Town  
30/11/1949 Reallocation 67215 STR Stratford COL Colchester  
30/11/1949 Reallocation 7216 STR Stratford LOW Lowestoft  
10/12/1949 Reallocation 67215 COL Colchester COL Colchester  
14/01/1950 Reallocation 67219 STR Stratford COL Colchester  
17/11/1951 Reallocation 67188 COL Colchester 30A Stratford  
17/11/1951 Reallocation 67204 COL Colchester 30A Stratford  
17/11/1951 Reallocation 67215 COL Colchester 30A Stratford  
17/11/1951 Reallocation 67217 STR Stratford 30A Stratford  
22/03/1952 Reallocation 67195 COL Colchester 30A Stratford  
22/03/1952 Reallocation 67219 COL Colchester 30A Stratford  
20/09/1952 Reallocation 67190 COL Colchester 32C Lowestoft  
20/09/1952 Reallocation 67217 30A Stratford 30E Colchester  
04/10/1952 Reallocation 67190 32C Lowestoft 32C Lowestoft  
04/10/1952 Reallocation 67217 30E Colchester 30E Colchester  
18/10/1952 Reallocation 67195 30A Stratford 32C Lowestoft  
01/11/1952 Reallocation 67195 32C Lowestoft 32C Lowestoft  
27/12/1952 Reallocation 67214 STR Stratford 32C Lowestoft  
17/01/1953 Reallocation 67214 32C Lowestoft 32C Lowestoft  
14/02/1953 Reallocation 67206 STR Stratford 32C Lowestoft  
14/02/1953 Reallocation 67207 COL Colchester 32C Lowestoft  
16/05/1953 Reallocation 67188 30A Stratford 30E Colchester  
16/05/1953 Reallocation 67194 COL Colchester 30A Stratford  
16/05/1953 Reallocation 67204 30A Stratford 32C Lowestoft  
21/11/1953 Reallocation 67188 30E Colchester 30A Stratford  
25/09/1954 Reallocation 67195 32C Lowestoft 32D Yarmouth South Town  
25/09/1954 Reallocation 67199 YAR Yarmouth South Town 30A Stratford  
25/09/1954 Reallocation 67214 32C Lowestoft 32D Yarmouth South Town  
23/10/1954 Reallocation 67218 YAR Yarmouth South Town 30A Stratford  
13/11/1954 Reallocation 67199 30A Stratford 32D Yarmouth South Town  
13/11/1954 Reallocation 67218 30A Stratford 32D Yarmouth South Town  
13/11/1954 Reallocation 67214 32D Yarmouth South Town 32C Lowestoft  
25/12/1954 Reallocation 67195 32D Yarmouth South Town 32C Lowestoft  
07/03/1955 Condemned 67196 COL Colchester   COND  
14/03/1955 Condemned 67197 STR Stratford   COND  
23/04/1955 Reallocation 67194 30A Stratford 30E Colchester  
23/04/1955 Reallocation 67218 32D Yarmouth South Town 30A Stratford  
05/1955 Condemned 67213 STR Stratford   COND  
04/07/1955 Condemned 67210 STR Stratford   COND  
23/07/1955 Reallocation 67199 32D Yarmouth South Town 32C Lowestoft  
15/08/1955 Condemned 67198 STR Stratford   COND  
19/09/1955 Condemned 67215 30A Stratford   COND  
27/09/1955 Condemned 67204 32C Lowestoft   COND  
27/09/1955 Condemned 67206 32C Lowestoft   COND  
22/10/1955 Reallocation 67199 32C Lowestoft 32D Yarmouth South Town  
21/11/1955 Condemned 67191 COL Colchester   COND  
21/11/1955 Condemned 67217 30E Colchester   COND  
23/11/1955 Condemned 67190 32C Lowestoft   COND  
23/11/1955 Condemned 67205 STR Stratford   COND  
06/12/1955 Condemned 67207 32C Lowestoft   COND  
17/12/1955 Reallocation 67188 30A Stratford 30E Colchester  
17/12/1955 Reallocation 67192 STR Stratford 30E Colchester  
29/12/1955 Condemned 67188 30E Colchester   COND  
24/03/1956 Reallocation 67194 30E Colchester 30A Stratford  
10/1956 Condemned 67194 30A Stratford   COND  
10/1956 Condemned 67211 STR Stratford   COND  
06/11/1956 Condemned 67219 30A Stratford   COND  
15/12/1956 Reallocation 67195 32C Lowestoft 30A Stratford  
15/12/1956 Reallocation 67214 32C Lowestoft 30A Stratford  
17/12/1956 Condemned 67201 STR Stratford   COND  
17/12/1956 Condemned 67216 LOW Lowestoft   COND  
20/12/1956 Condemned 67189 COL Colchester   COND  
10/01/1957 Condemned 67208 STR Stratford   COND  
19/01/1957 Reallocation 67199 32D Yarmouth South Town 30A Stratford  
05/02/1957 Condemned 67199 30A Stratford   COND  
18/02/1957 Condemned 67209 STR Stratford   COND  
04/11/1957 Condemned 67193 STR Stratford   COND  
16/12/1957 Condemned 67202 STR Stratford   COND  
16/12/1957 Condemned 67203 STR Stratford   COND  
20/12/1957 Condemned 67200 STR Stratford   COND  
10/03/1958 Condemned 67218 30A Stratford   COND  
21/04/1958 Condemned 67192 30E Colchester   COND  
05/05/1958 Condemned 67212 STR Stratford   COND  
05/05/1958 Condemned 67214 30A Stratford   COND  
06/05/1958 Condemned 67195 30A Stratford   COND