Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 108 Today
» 1096 Yesterday
» 2273 Week
» 2273 Month
» 69135 Year
» 1734511 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

GER/LNER Holden "F5" Class 2-4-2T


GER LNER (1924) LNER (1946) BR Date To Service Rebuilt From Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Rebuilt To Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
141 7141 7188 67188 06/1903 09/1915
from F4
29/12/1955 52.5
142 7142 7189 67189 06/1903 11/1911
from F4
20/12/1956 53.5
143 7143 7190 67190 06/1903 10/1911
from F4
23/11/1955 52.42
144 7144 7191 67191 06/1903 06/1916
from F4
21/11/1955 52.42
145 7145 7192 67192 07/1903 09/1913
from F4
21/04/1958 54.75
147 7147 7193 67193 07/1903 04/1914
from F4
04/11/1957 54.33
781 7781 7194 67194 10/1904 11/1911
from F4
10/1956 52
782 7782 7195 67195 11/1904 12/1911
from F4
06/05/1958 53.5 53.70
783 7783 7196 67196 11/1904 12/1911
from F4
07/03/1955 50.33
784 7784 7197 67197 11/1904 12/1911
from F4
14/03/1955 50.33
785 7785 7198 67198 11/1904 01/1912
from F4
15/08/1955 50.75
786 7786 7199 67199 11/1904 03/1912
from F4
05/02/1957 52.25 46.28
787 7787 7200 67200 11/1904 12/1911
from F4
20/12/1957 53.08 50.78
788 7788 7201 67201 11/1904 12/1911
from F4
17/12/1956 52.08 52.29
789 7789 7218 67218 12/1904 12/1948
from F6
10/03/1958 53.25
790 7790 7219 67219 12/1904 12/1948
from F6
06/11/1956 51.92 52.21
91 7091 7202 67202 07/1905 10/1913
from F4
16/12/1957 52.42
94 7094 7203 67203 07/1905 04/1913
from F4
16/12/1957 52.42
95 7095 7204 67204 08/1905 06/1913
from F4
27/09/1955 50.08
96 7096 7205 67205 09/1905 09/1911
from F4
23/11/1955 50.17
100 7100 7206 67206 10/1905 01/1912
from F4
27/09/1955 49.92
103 7103 7207 67207 11/1905 09/1911
from F4
06/12/1955 50.08
104 7104 7208 67208 11/1905 09/1911
from F4
10/01/1957 51.17
108 7108 7209 67209 01/1906 09/1911
from F4
18/02/1957 51.08 51.12
109 7109 7210 67210 02/1906 09/1911
from F4
04/07/1955 49.42 49.53
110 7110 7211 67211 01/1906 07/1913
from F4
10/1956 50.75
780 7780 7212 67212 07/1906 10/1914
from F4
05/05/1958 51.83 52.04
589 7589 7213 67213 06/1907 06/1915
from F4
05/1955 47.92 48.03
590 7590 7214 67214 07/1907 07/1915
from F4
05/05/1958 50.83 50.87
170 7170 7215 67215 08/1908 01/1915
from F4
19/09/1955 47.08
179 7179 7216 67216 11/1908 12/1914
from F4
17/12/1956 48.08
188 7188 7217 67217 02/1909 06/1920
from F4
21/11/1955 46.75