GER/LNER Holden "F6" Class 2-4-2T
Date | Event | Number | From | Depot From | To | Depot To | Usage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7218 | STR | Stratford | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7219 | STR | Stratford | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7220 | STR | Stratford | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7221 | STR | Stratford | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7222 | STR | Stratford | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7223 | YB | Yarmouth Beach | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7224 | STR | Stratford | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7225 | STR | Stratford | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7226 | YB | Yarmouth Beach | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7227 | STR | Stratford | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7228 | STR | Stratford | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7229 | PKS | Parkeston Quay | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7230 | STR | Stratford | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7231 | STR | Stratford | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7232 | STR | Stratford | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7233 | YB | Yarmouth Beach | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7234 | YB | Yarmouth Beach | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7235 | YB | Yarmouth Beach | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7236 | KL | Kings Lynn | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7237 | BSE | Bury St Edmunds | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7238 | BSE | Bury St Edmunds | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7239 | KL | Kings Lynn | |||
24/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7230 | STR | Stratford | COL | Colchester | |
07/02/1948 | Reallocation | 7230 | COL | Colchester | LOW | Lowestoft | |
07/02/1948 | Reallocation | 7231 | STR | Stratford | LOW | Lowestoft | |
07/02/1948 | Reallocation | 7232 | STR | Stratford | COL | Colchester | |
21/02/1948 | Reallocation | 7232 | COL | Colchester | LOW | Lowestoft | |
24/04/1948 | Reallocation | 67218 | STR | Stratford | LOW | Lowestoft | |
27/11/1948 | Reallocation | 67222 | STR | Stratford | KL | Kings Lynn | |
27/11/1948 | Reallocation | 67227 | STR | Stratford | KL | Kings Lynn | |
25/12/1948 | Reallocation | 7229 | MEL | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
07/1949 | Reallocation | 7224 | STR | Stratford | YAR | Yarmouth South Town | |
07/1949 | Reallocation | 67232 | LOW | Lowestoft | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | |
07/1949 | Reallocation | 67237 | BSE | Bury St Edmunds | KL | Kings Lynn | |
07/1949 | Reallocation | 7238 | BSE | Bury St Edmunds | CAM | Cambridge | |
16/07/1949 | Reallocation | 67232 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | |
08/10/1949 | Reallocation | 7233 | YB | Yarmouth Beach | LOW | Lowestoft | |
30/11/1949 | Reallocation | 7220 | STR | Stratford | IPS | Ipswich | |
30/11/1949 | Reallocation | 7224 | YAR | Yarmouth South Town | LOW | Lowestoft | |
30/11/1949 | Reallocation | 67225 | STR | Stratford | MC | Melton Constable | |
30/11/1949 | Reallocation | 7228 | STR | Stratford | MC | Melton Constable | |
30/11/1949 | Reallocation | 67231 | LOW | Lowestoft | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | |
30/11/1949 | Reallocation | 67237 | KL | Kings Lynn | BSE | Bury St Edmunds | |
30/11/1949 | Reallocation | 7238 | CAM | Cambridge | CAM | Cambridge | |
30/11/1949 | Reallocation | 7239 | KL | Kings Lynn | IPS | Ipswich | |
10/12/1949 | Reallocation | 67231 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | |
07/01/1950 | Reallocation | 67221 | STR | Stratford | CAM | Cambridge | |
21/01/1950 | Reallocation | 67221 | CAM | Cambridge | KL | Kings Lynn | |
21/01/1950 | Reallocation | 67222 | KL | Kings Lynn | CAM | Cambridge | |
21/01/1950 | Reallocation | 7233 | LOW | Lowestoft | YB | Yarmouth Beach | |
06/05/1950 | Reallocation | 67227 | KL | Kings Lynn | 31D | South Lynn | |
31/05/1950 | Reallocation | 67227 | 31D | South Lynn | 31C | Kings Lynn | |
09/07/1950 | Reallocation | 67224 | LOW | Lowestoft | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | |
09/07/1950 | Reallocation | 67231 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | 32C | Lowestoft | |
30/07/1950 | Reallocation | 67224 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | 32G | Melton Constable | |
17/09/1950 | Reallocation | 67224 | 32G | Melton Constable | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | |
23/09/1950 | Reallocation | 67224 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | |
25/11/1950 | Reallocation | 67227 | 31C | Kings Lynn | 31D | South Lynn | |
30/11/1950 | Reallocation | 67227 | 31D | South Lynn | 31D | South Lynn | |
23/12/1950 | Reallocation | 67221 | KL | Kings Lynn | 31E | Bury St Edmunds | |
31/12/1950 | Reallocation | 67221 | 31E | Bury St Edmunds | 31E | Bury St Edmunds | |
23/06/1951 | Reallocation | 67232 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | 32C | Lowestoft | |
20/10/1951 | Reallocation | 67224 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | 32G | Melton Constable | |
19/01/1952 | Reallocation | 67236 | BURY | 31B | March | ||
26/01/1952 | Reallocation | 67227 | 31D | South Lynn | 31A | Cambridge | |
26/01/1952 | Reallocation | 67236 | 31B | March | 31B | March | |
16/02/1952 | Reallocation | 67227 | 31A | Cambridge | 31A | Cambridge | |
12/07/1952 | Reallocation | 67229 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | 32G | Melton Constable | |
19/07/1952 | Reallocation | 67229 | 32G | Melton Constable | 32G | Melton Constable | |
09/08/1952 | Reallocation | 67222 | CAM | Cambridge | 31E | Bury St Edmunds | |
09/08/1952 | Reallocation | 67238 | CAM | Cambridge | 31E | Bury St Edmunds | |
23/08/1952 | Reallocation | 67222 | 31E | Bury St Edmunds | 31E | Bury St Edmunds | |
23/08/1952 | Reallocation | 67238 | 31E | Bury St Edmunds | 31E | Bury St Edmunds | |
15/11/1952 | Reallocation | 67237 | BURY | 31A | Cambridge | ||
29/11/1952 | Reallocation | 67221 | 31E | Bury St Edmunds | 31A | Cambridge | |
29/11/1952 | Reallocation | 67237 | 31A | Cambridge | 31A | Cambridge | |
13/12/1952 | Reallocation | 67221 | 31A | Cambridge | 31A | Cambridge | |
13/12/1952 | Reallocation | 67236 | 31B | March | 31E | Bury St Edmunds | |
27/12/1952 | Reallocation | 67236 | 31E | Bury St Edmunds | 31E | Bury St Edmunds | |
20/06/1953 | Reallocation | 67237 | 31A | Cambridge | 31E | Bury St Edmunds | |
20/06/1953 | Reallocation | 67238 | 31E | Bury St Edmunds | 31A | Cambridge | |
08/1953 | Condemned | 67237 | 31E | Bury St Edmunds | COND | ||
24/10/1953 | Reallocation | 67223 | YB | Yarmouth Beach | 32C | Lowestoft | |
24/10/1953 | Reallocation | 67226 | YB | Yarmouth Beach | 32C | Lowestoft | |
24/10/1953 | Reallocation | 67233 | YB | Yarmouth Beach | 32C | Lowestoft | |
24/10/1953 | Reallocation | 67234 | YB | Yarmouth Beach | 32C | Lowestoft | |
24/10/1953 | Reallocation | 67235 | YB | Yarmouth Beach | 32D | Yarmouth South Town | |
25/09/1954 | Reallocation | 67229 | 32G | Melton Constable | 32D | Yarmouth South Town | |
23/10/1954 | Reallocation | 67221 | 31A | Cambridge | 31C | Kings Lynn | |
23/10/1954 | Reallocation | 67227 | 31A | Cambridge | 31C | Kings Lynn | |
13/11/1954 | Reallocation | 67229 | 32D | Yarmouth South Town | 32C | Lowestoft | |
25/12/1954 | Reallocation | 67221 | 31C | Kings Lynn | 31A | Cambridge | |
25/12/1954 | Reallocation | 67227 | 31C | Kings Lynn | 31A | Cambridge | |
25/07/1955 | Condemned | 67220 | IPS | Ipswich | COND | ||
17/08/1955 | Condemned | 67222 | 31E | Bury St Edmunds | COND | ||
17/08/1955 | Condemned | 67236 | 31E | Bury St Edmunds | COND | ||
07/11/1955 | Condemned | 67238 | 31A | Cambridge | COND | ||
14/11/1955 | Condemned | 67226 | 32C | Lowestoft | COND | ||
14/11/1955 | Condemned | 67232 | 32C | Lowestoft | COND | ||
13/12/1955 | Condemned | 67223 | 32C | Lowestoft | COND | ||
13/12/1955 | Condemned | 67233 | 32C | Lowestoft | COND | ||
17/12/1955 | Reallocation | 67221 | 31A | Cambridge | 30A | Stratford | |
17/12/1955 | Reallocation | 67224 | 32G | Melton Constable | 32C | Lowestoft | |
17/12/1955 | Reallocation | 67225 | MC | Melton Constable | 30E | Colchester | |
17/12/1955 | Reallocation | 67227 | 31A | Cambridge | 30A | Stratford | |
17/12/1955 | Reallocation | 67228 | MEL | 30A | Stratford | ||
30/12/1955 | Condemned | 67239 | IPS | Ipswich | COND | ||
16/01/1956 | Condemned | 67235 | 32D | Yarmouth South Town | COND | ||
21/01/1956 | Reallocation | 67235 | 98W | 30A | Stratford | ||
24/03/1956 | Reallocation | 67228 | 30A | Stratford | 30E | Colchester | |
28/05/1956 | Condemned | 67225 | 30E | Colchester | COND | ||
16/06/1956 | Reallocation | 67227 | 30A | Stratford | 30E | Colchester | |
17/08/1956 | Condemned | 67234 | 32C | Lowestoft | COND | ||
17/11/1956 | Reallocation | 67230 | LOW | Lowestoft | 30A | Stratford | |
19/11/1956 | Condemned | 67224 | 32C | Lowestoft | COND | ||
31/10/1957 | Condemned | 67221 | 30A | Stratford | COND | ||
08/01/1958 | Reallocation | 67228 | 30E | Colchester | 30A | Stratford | |
14/03/1958 | Condemned | 67231 | 32C | Lowestoft | COND | ||
18/03/1958 | Condemned | 67229 | 32C | Lowestoft | COND | ||
21/04/1958 | Condemned | 67228 | 30A | Stratford | COND | ||
08/05/1958 | Condemned | 67227 | 30E | Colchester | COND | ||
13/05/1958 | Condemned | 67230 | 30A | Stratford | COND |