GER/LNER Holden "G4" Class 0-4-4T
Class | GER | LNER | Built | Depot Name | From | Date Withdrawn | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
G4 | 1100 | 8100 | 12/1898 | W | Withdrawn | 07/1931 | 07/1931 |
G4 | 1101 | 8101 | 12/1898 | W | Withdrawn | 02/1933 | 02/1933 |
G4 | 1102 | 8102 | 12/1898 | W | Withdrawn | 01/1930 | 01/1930 |
G4 | 1103 | 8103 | 12/1898 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1929 | 10/1929 |
G4 | 1104 | 8104 | 01/1899 | W | Withdrawn | 01/1931 | 01/1931 |
G4 | 1105 | 8105 | 01/1899 | W | Withdrawn | 01/1938 | 01/1938 |
G4 | 1106 | 8106 | 01/1899 | W | Withdrawn | 07/1931 | 07/1931 |
G4 | 1107 | 8107 | 02/1899 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1931 | 10/1931 |
G4 | 1108 | 8108 | 02/1899 | W 60A 62B |
Withdrawn Inverness Dundee Tay Bridge |
08/1930 25/03/1950 09/10/1950 |
08/1930 |
G4 | 1109 | 8109 | 02/1899 | W | Withdrawn | 06/1933 | 06/1933 |
G4 | 1110 | 8110 | 10/1899 | W | Withdrawn | 04/1932 | 04/1932 |
G4 | 1111 | 8111 | 10/1899 | W | Withdrawn | 05/1930 | 05/1930 |
G4 | 1112 | 8112 | 10/1899 | W 65G |
Withdrawn Yoker |
12/1931 30/07/1950 |
12/1931 |
G4 | 1113 | 8113 | 11/1899 | W | Withdrawn | 02/1931 | 02/1931 |
G4 | 1114 | 8114 | 11/1899 | W | Withdrawn | 09/1931 | 09/1931 |
G4 | 1115 | 8115 | 11/1899 | W | Withdrawn | 07/1931 | 07/1931 |
G4 | 1116 | 8116 | 11/1899 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1933 | 12/1933 |
G4 | 1117 | 8117 | 11/1899 | W | Withdrawn | 02/1933 | 02/1933 |
G4 | 1118 | 8118 | 11/1899 | W | Withdrawn | 01/1930 | 01/1930 |
G4 | 1119 | 8119 | 11/1899 | W | Withdrawn | 04/1933 | 04/1933 |
G4 | 1120 | 8120 | 05/1900 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1929 | 11/1929 |
G4 | 1121 | 8121 | 05/1900 | W | Withdrawn | 02/1930 | 02/1930 |
G4 | 1122 | 8122 | 05/1900 | W DFU STM |
Withdrawn Dunfermline Upper St Margarets |
12/1932 04/12/1948 22/01/1949 |
12/1932 |
G4 | 1123 | 8123 | 05/1900 | W | Withdrawn | 08/1938 | 08/1938 |
G4 | 1124 | 8124 | 05/1900 | W 65A |
Withdrawn Eastfield |
09/1934 31/03/1951 |
09/1934 |
G4 | 1125 | 8125 | 05/1900 | W | Withdrawn | 06/1931 | 06/1931 |
G4 | 1126 | 8126 | 05/1900 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1933 | 12/1933 |
G4 | 1127 | 8127 | 05/1900 | W | Withdrawn | 01/1931 | 01/1931 |
G4 | 1128 | 8128 | 06/1900 | W | Withdrawn | 02/1930 | 02/1930 |
G4 | 1129 | 8129 | 06/1900 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1932 | 12/1932 |
G4 | 1130 | 8130 | 12/1900 | W | Withdrawn | 02/1932 | 02/1932 |
G4 | 1131 | 8131 | 12/1900 | W | Withdrawn | 06/1934 | 06/1934 |
G4 | 1132 | 8132 | 12/1900 | W | Withdrawn | 02/1932 | 02/1932 |
G4 | 1133 | 8133 | 12/1900 | W | Withdrawn | 04/1929 | 04/1929 |
G4 | 1134 | 8134 | 01/1901 | W | Withdrawn | 09/1936 | 09/1936 |
G4 | 1135 | 8135 | 01/1901 | W | Withdrawn | 06/1931 | 06/1931 |
G4 | 1136 | 8136 | 02/1901 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1931 | 12/1931 |
G4 | 1137 | 8137 | 02/1901 | W | Withdrawn | 08/1934 | 08/1934 |
G4 | 1138 | 8138 | 02/1901 | W | Withdrawn | 03/1931 | 03/1931 |
G4 | 1139 | 8139 | 02/1901 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1938 | 12/1938 |