GER/LNER Holden "G4" Class 0-4-4T
Date | Event | Number | From | Depot From | To | Depot To | Usage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
04/1929 | Condemned | 8133 | COND | ||||
10/1929 | Condemned | 8103 | COND | ||||
11/1929 | Condemned | 8120 | COND | ||||
01/1930 | Condemned | 8102 | COND | ||||
01/1930 | Condemned | 8118 | COND | ||||
02/1930 | Condemned | 8121 | COND | ||||
02/1930 | Condemned | 8128 | COND | ||||
05/1930 | Condemned | 8111 | COND | ||||
08/1930 | Condemned | 8108 | COND | ||||
01/1931 | Condemned | 8104 | COND | ||||
01/1931 | Condemned | 8127 | COND | ||||
02/1931 | Condemned | 8113 | COND | ||||
03/1931 | Condemned | 8138 | COND | ||||
06/1931 | Condemned | 8125 | COND | ||||
06/1931 | Condemned | 8135 | COND | ||||
07/1931 | Condemned | 8100 | COND | ||||
07/1931 | Condemned | 8106 | COND | ||||
07/1931 | Condemned | 8115 | COND | ||||
09/1931 | Condemned | 8114 | COND | ||||
10/1931 | Condemned | 8107 | COND | ||||
12/1931 | Condemned | 8112 | COND | ||||
12/1931 | Condemned | 8136 | COND | ||||
02/1932 | Condemned | 8130 | COND | ||||
02/1932 | Condemned | 8132 | COND | ||||
04/1932 | Condemned | 8110 | COND | ||||
12/1932 | Condemned | 8122 | COND | ||||
12/1932 | Condemned | 8129 | COND | ||||
02/1933 | Condemned | 8101 | COND | ||||
02/1933 | Condemned | 8117 | COND | ||||
04/1933 | Condemned | 8119 | COND | ||||
06/1933 | Condemned | 8109 | COND | ||||
12/1933 | Condemned | 8116 | COND | ||||
12/1933 | Condemned | 8126 | COND | ||||
06/1934 | Condemned | 8131 | COND | ||||
08/1934 | Condemned | 8137 | COND | ||||
09/1934 | Condemned | 8124 | COND | ||||
09/1936 | Condemned | 8134 | COND | ||||
01/1938 | Condemned | 8105 | COND | ||||
08/1938 | Condemned | 8123 | COND | ||||
12/1938 | Condemned | 8139 | COND | ||||
04/12/1948 | Reallocation | 8122 | 98W | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | ||
22/01/1949 | Reallocation | 8122 | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | STM | St Margarets | |
25/03/1950 | Reallocation | 8108 | 98W | 60A | Inverness | ||
30/07/1950 | Reallocation | 8112 | 98W | 65G | Yoker | ||
09/10/1950 | Reallocation | 8108 | 60A | Inverness | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | |
31/03/1951 | Reallocation | 8124 | 98W | 65A | Eastfield |