J15 |
698
|
|
|
7698
|
|
|
02/1886 |
10/1936 |
Saturated LNER Diagram 32 Boiler Fitted |
08/1933 |
J15 |
800
|
|
609
|
7609
|
|
|
04/1886 |
10/1935 |
Saturated LNER Diagram 32 Boiler Fitted |
08/1932 |
J15 |
806
|
|
|
7806
|
|
|
07/1886 |
10/1939 |
Saturated LNER Diagram 32 Boiler Fitted |
08/1932 |
J15 |
809
|
|
|
7809
|
|
|
08/1886 |
08/1936 |
Saturated LNER Diagram 32 Boiler Fitted |
08/1933 |
J15 |
813
|
|
|
7813
|
5350
|
(65350)
|
12/1886 |
02/1951 |
Saturated LNER Diagram 32 Boiler Fitted |
09/1945 |
J15 |
814
|
|
|
7814
|
|
|
12/1886 |
08/1938 |
Saturated LNER Diagram 32 Boiler Fitted |
08/1932 |
J15 |
818
|
|
|
7818
|
|
|
02/1887 |
11/1938 |
Saturated LNER Diagram 32 Boiler Fitted |
08/1932 |
J15 |
819
|
|
|
7819
|
|
|
02/1887 |
04/1938 |
Saturated LNER Diagram 32 Boiler Fitted |
08/1932 |
J15 |
828
|
|
|
7828
|
5353
|
(65353)
|
09/1887 |
12/1949 |
Saturated LNER Diagram 32 Boiler Fitted |
10/1942 |
J15 |
530
|
|
|
7530
|
5355
|
(65355)
|
11/1887 |
04/1951 |
Saturated LNER Diagram 32 Boiler Fitted |
06/1932 |
J15 |
532
|
|
|
7532
|
5356
|
65356
|
01/1888 |
08/04/1957 |
Saturated LNER Diagram 32 Boiler Fitted |
10/1939 |
J15 |
833
|
|
|
7833
|
5359
|
65359
|
10/1888 |
05/12/1955 |
Saturated LNER Diagram 32 Boiler Fitted |
06/1937 |
J15 |
834
|
|
|
7834
|
5360
|
|
10/1888 |
11/1947 |
Saturated LNER Diagram 32 Boiler Fitted |
05/1932 |
J15 |
836
|
|
|
7836
|
5361
|
65361
|
07/1889 |
16/09/1962 |
Saturated LNER Diagram 32 Boiler Fitted |
10/1944 |
J15 |
837
|
|
|
7837
|
5362
|
(65362)
|
07/1889 |
07/1951 |
Saturated LNER Diagram 32 Boiler Fitted |
09/1942 |
J15 |
839
|
|
|
7839
|
|
|
07/1889 |
07/1936 |
Saturated LNER Diagram 32 Boiler Fitted |
08/1932 |
J15 |
840
|
|
|
7840
|
5363
|
(65363)
|
07/1889 |
08/1949 |
Saturated LNER Diagram 32 Boiler Fitted |
05/1944 |
J15 |
843
|
|
|
7843
|
5364
|
(65364)
|
07/1889 |
06/1949 |
Saturated Diagram 31 Boiler Fitted |
01/1944 |
J15 |
846
|
|
|
7846
|
5365
|
(65365)
|
10/1889 |
07/1950 |
Saturated LNER Diagram 32 Boiler Fitted |
03/1947 |
J15 |
852
|
|
|
7852
|
5370
|
65370
|
10/1889 |
26/05/1956 |
Saturated LNER Diagram 32 Boiler Fitted |
09/1945 |
J15 |
853
|
|
|
7853
|
5371
|
(65371)
|
10/1889 |
12/1949 |
Saturated LNER Diagram 32 Boiler Fitted |
06/1935 |
J15 |
854
|
|
|
7854
|
5372
|
65372
|
10/1889 |
09/1949 |
Saturated LNER Diagram 32 Boiler Fitted |
11/1946 |
J15 |
855
|
|
|
7855
|
5373
|
(65373)
|
10/1889 |
25/11/1950 |
Saturated LNER Diagram 32 Boiler Fitted |
04/1941 |
J15 |
857
|
|
|
7857
|
5374
|
(65374)
|
11/1889 |
25/11/1950 |
Saturated LNER Diagram 32 Boiler Fitted |
03/1943 |
J15 |
860
|
|
|
7860
|
5375
|
(65375)
|
11/1889 |
11/1949 |
Saturated LNER Diagram 32 Boiler Fitted |
08/1938 |
J15 |
865
|
|
|
7865
|
5376
|
(65376)
|
11/1889 |
06/1949 |
Saturated LNER Diagram 32 Boiler Fitted |
11/1941 |
J15 |
869
|
|
|
7869
|
5378
|
65378
|
12/1889 |
23/04/1951 |
Saturated LNER Diagram 32 Boiler Fitted |
09/1945 |
J15 |
871
|
|
|
7871
|
5379
|
(65379)
|
12/1889 |
09/1949 |
Saturated LNER Diagram 32 Boiler Fitted |
02/1946 |
J15 |
872
|
|
|
7872
|
5380
|
(65380)
|
12/1889 |
13/01/1948 |
Saturated LNER Diagram 32 Boiler Fitted |
06/1932 |
J15 |
874
|
|
|
7874
|
5381
|
(65381)
|
12/1889 |
25/11/1948 |
Saturated LNER Diagram 32 Boiler Fitted |
01/1940 |
J15 |
875
|
|
|
7875
|
5382
|
(65382)
|
08/1890 |
03/1952 |
Saturated LNER Diagram 32 Boiler Fitted |
05/1932 |
J15 |
876
|
|
|
7876
|
5383
|
(65383)
|
08/1890 |
06/02/1948 |
Saturated LNER Diagram 32 Boiler Fitted |
07/1945 |
J15 |
877
|
|
|
7877
|
5384
|
65384
|
08/1890 |
28/03/1955 |
Saturated LNER Diagram 32 Boiler Fitted |
05/1936 |
J15 |
880
|
|
|
7880
|
5386
|
(65386)
|
09/1890 |
01/1950 |
Saturated LNER Diagram 32 Boiler Fitted |
05/1937 |
J15 |
881
|
|
|
7881
|
5387
|
(65387)
|
09/1890 |
08/1949 |
Saturated LNER Diagram 32 Boiler Fitted |
04/1935 |
J15 |
883
|
|
|
7883
|
5388
|
65388
|
09/1890 |
22/05/1959 |
Saturated LNER Diagram 32 Boiler Fitted |
12/1939 |
J15 |
886
|
|
|
7886
|
5389
|
65389
|
10/1890 |
12/04/1960 |
Saturated LNER Diagram 32 Boiler Fitted |
05/1935 |
J15 |
887
|
|
|
7887
|
5390
|
65390
|
10/1890 |
13/12/1958 |
Saturated LNER Diagram 32 Boiler Fitted |
11/1946 |
J15 |
888
|
|
|
7888
|
5391
|
65391
|
10/1890 |
01/12/1958 |
Saturated LNER Diagram 32 Boiler Fitted |
04/1943 |
J15 |
911
|
|
|
7911
|
5405
|
65405
|
11/1891 |
16/08/1958 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
04/1932 |
J15 |
941
|
|
|
7941
|
5424
|
65424
|
08/1892 |
18/12/1959 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
05/1933 |
J15 |
512
|
|
|
7512
|
5432
|
65432
|
05/1899 |
10/03/1958 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
01/1935 |
J15 |
523
|
|
|
7523
|
5438
|
65438
|
09/1899 |
19/07/1958 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
07/1934 |
J15 |
645
|
|
|
7645
|
5445
|
65445
|
08/1899 |
01/08/1962 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
09/1931 |
J15 |
646
|
|
|
7646
|
5446
|
65446
|
08/1899 |
19/12/1960 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
01/1932 |
J15 |
647
|
|
|
7647
|
5447
|
65447
|
08/1899 |
13/04/1959 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
02/1932 |
J15 |
648
|
|
|
7648
|
5448
|
65448
|
09/1899 |
07/03/1960 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
11/1931 |
J15 |
649
|
|
|
7649
|
5449
|
65449
|
09/1899 |
14/12/1959 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
02/1932 |