Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 41 Today
» 818 Yesterday
» 859 Week
» 17810 Month
» 170763 Year
» 1836139 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

GER/LNER Hill "J19" Class 0-6-0


Class GER LNER (1924) LNER (1946) BR Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
J19 1240 8240 4640 64640 11/1912 31B
31C
W
March
Kings Lynn
Withdrawn
22/03/1952
18/05/1957
26/11/1959
26/11/1959
J19 1246 8246 4646 64646 11/1912 31D
31A
W
South Lynn
Cambridge
Withdrawn
19/07/1952
19/02/1955
26/10/1961
26/10/1961
J19 1249 8249 4649 64649 01/1913 W Withdrawn 01/01/1959 01/01/1959
J19 1140 8140 4650 64650 08/1916 STR
30A
W
Stratford
Stratford
Withdrawn
25/12/1948
12/12/1959
11/10/1960
11/10/1960
J19 1141 8141 4651 64651 08/1916 STR
W
Stratford
Withdrawn
25/12/1948
01/01/1959
01/01/1959
J19 1142 8142 4652 64652 08/1916 30F
30A
W
Parkeston Quay
Stratford
Withdrawn
07/02/1959
07/01/1961
17/01/1961
17/01/1961
J19 1143 8143 4653 64653 09/1916 31B
30A
W
March
Stratford
Withdrawn
07/03/1959
14/03/1959
13/01/1961
13/01/1961
J19 1144 8144 4654 64654 10/1916 STR
W
Stratford
Withdrawn
25/12/1948
25/01/1960
25/01/1960
J19 1145 8145 4655 64655 11/1916 30A
31B
30A
31B
31C
31A
W
Stratford
March
Stratford
March
Kings Lynn
Cambridge
Withdrawn
14/12/1957
07/03/1959
14/03/1959
06/06/1959
21/11/1959
27/02/1960
03/08/1961
03/08/1961
J19 1146 8146 4656 64656 11/1916 STR
31B
30A
W
Stratford
March
Stratford
Withdrawn
25/12/1948
07/03/1959
14/03/1959
09/05/1960
09/05/1960
J19 1147 8147 4657 64657 11/1916 30E
30A
W
Colchester
Stratford
Withdrawn
07/03/1959
12/12/1959
16/09/1962
16/09/1962
J19 1148 8148 4658 64658 12/1916 W Withdrawn 09/11/1959 09/11/1959
J19 1149 8149 4659 64659 01/1917 31B
32B
W
March
Ipswich
Withdrawn
07/03/1959
16/05/1959
01/04/1960
01/04/1960
J19 1260 8260 4660 64660 12/1917 STR
30E
30A
W
Stratford
Colchester
Stratford
Withdrawn
25/12/1948
24/10/1953
12/12/1959
29/08/1960
29/08/1960
J19 1261 8261 4661 64661 12/1917 31A
W
Cambridge
Withdrawn
11/10/1958
24/08/1959
24/08/1959
J19 1262 8262 4662 64662 01/1918 32A
W
Norwich Thorpe
Withdrawn
15/11/1958
19/01/1959
19/01/1959
J19 1263 8263 4663 64663 03/1918 W Withdrawn 11/10/1960 11/10/1960
J19 1264 8264 4664 64664 09/1918 STR
30E
30A
W
Stratford
Colchester
Stratford
Withdrawn
25/12/1948
07/03/1959
07/11/1959
16/09/1962
16/09/1962
J19 1265 8265 4665 64665 11/1918 STR
30E
31B
31C
W
Stratford
Colchester
March
Kings Lynn
Withdrawn
25/12/1948
20/12/1958
07/03/1959
04/07/1959
14/12/1959
14/12/1959
J19 1266 8266 4666 64666 11/1918 30A
W
Stratford
Withdrawn
12/12/1959
13/01/1961
13/01/1961
J19 1267 8267 4667 64667 12/1918 30A
W
Stratford
Withdrawn
07/11/1959
10/09/1961
10/09/1961
J19 1268 8268 4668 64668 01/1919 31B
30A
31B
32B
W
March
Stratford
March
Ipswich
Withdrawn
22/03/1952
14/12/1957
07/03/1959
16/05/1959
14/12/1959
14/12/1959
J19 1269 8269 4669 64669 03/1919 30A
W
Stratford
Withdrawn
26/11/1960
10/09/1961
10/09/1961
J19 1250 8250 4670 64670 09/1920 31B
30A
W
March
Stratford
Withdrawn
07/03/1959
14/03/1959
24/11/1959
24/11/1959
J19 1251 8251 4671 64671 10/1920 31A
32A
W
Cambridge
Norwich Thorpe
Withdrawn
26/11/1960
16/09/1961
11/02/1962
11/02/1962
J19 1252 8252 4672 64672 10/1920 KL
31B
W
Kings Lynn
March
Withdrawn
22/01/1949
22/03/1952
01/01/1959
01/01/1959
J19 1253 8253 4673 64673 10/1920 31C
31A
30A
W
Kings Lynn
Cambridge
Stratford
Withdrawn
20/06/1959
27/02/1960
26/11/1960
06/08/1962
06/08/1962
J19 1254 8254 4674 64674 11/1920 NOR
W
Norwich Thorpe
Withdrawn
14/08/1948
16/01/1961
16/01/1961