GER/LNER Hill "J19" Class 0-6-0
Date | Event | Number | From | Depot From | To | Depot To | Usage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
11/1935 | Reallocation | 8244 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | |||
11/1935 | Reallocation | 8145 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | |||
11/1935 | Reallocation | 8148 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | |||
11/1935 | Reallocation | 8261 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | |||
01/1936 | Reallocation | 8261 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | MAR | March | |
03/04/1948 | Reallocation | 4645 | CAM | Cambridge | |||
14/08/1948 | Reallocation | 4644 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | |
14/08/1948 | Reallocation | 4674 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | |||
25/12/1948 | Reallocation | 4650 | STR | Stratford | |||
25/12/1948 | Reallocation | 4651 | STR | Stratford | |||
25/12/1948 | Reallocation | 4654 | STR | Stratford | |||
25/12/1948 | Reallocation | 4656 | STR | Stratford | |||
25/12/1948 | Reallocation | 4660 | STR | Stratford | |||
25/12/1948 | Reallocation | 4664 | STR | Stratford | |||
25/12/1948 | Reallocation | 4665 | STR | Stratford | |||
22/01/1949 | Reallocation | 4672 | KL | Kings Lynn | |||
18/06/1949 | Reallocation | 4645 | CAM | Cambridge | SL | South Lynn | |
22/03/1952 | Reallocation | 64640 | 31B | March | |||
22/03/1952 | Reallocation | 64642 | 31B | March | |||
22/03/1952 | Reallocation | 64668 | 31B | March | |||
22/03/1952 | Reallocation | 64672 | KL | Kings Lynn | 31B | March | |
19/07/1952 | Reallocation | 64646 | 31D | South Lynn | |||
24/10/1953 | Reallocation | 64660 | STR | Stratford | 30E | Colchester | |
19/02/1955 | Reallocation | 64646 | 31D | South Lynn | 31A | Cambridge | |
18/05/1957 | Reallocation | 64640 | 31B | March | 31C | Kings Lynn | |
14/12/1957 | Reallocation | 64655 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | 30A | Stratford | |
14/12/1957 | Reallocation | 64668 | 31B | March | 30A | Stratford | |
11/10/1958 | Reallocation | 64661 | MAR | March | 31A | Cambridge | |
15/11/1958 | Reallocation | 64662 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | |||
12/12/1958 | Condemned | 64645 | SL | South Lynn | COND | ||
20/12/1958 | Reallocation | 64641 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | |||
20/12/1958 | Reallocation | 64643 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | |||
20/12/1958 | Reallocation | 64665 | STR | Stratford | 30E | Colchester | |
01/01/1959 | Condemned | 64649 | COND | ||||
01/01/1959 | Condemned | 64651 | STR | Stratford | COND | ||
01/01/1959 | Condemned | 64672 | 31B | March | COND | ||
19/01/1959 | Condemned | 64662 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | COND | ||
07/02/1959 | Reallocation | 64652 | 30F | Parkeston Quay | |||
07/03/1959 | Reallocation | 64647 | 31B | March | |||
07/03/1959 | Reallocation | 64653 | 31B | March | |||
07/03/1959 | Reallocation | 64655 | 30A | Stratford | 31B | March | |
07/03/1959 | Reallocation | 64656 | STR | Stratford | 31B | March | |
07/03/1959 | Reallocation | 64657 | 30E | Colchester | |||
07/03/1959 | Reallocation | 64659 | 31B | March | |||
07/03/1959 | Reallocation | 64664 | STR | Stratford | 30E | Colchester | |
07/03/1959 | Reallocation | 64665 | 30E | Colchester | 31B | March | |
07/03/1959 | Reallocation | 64668 | 30A | Stratford | 31B | March | |
07/03/1959 | Reallocation | 64670 | 31B | March | |||
14/03/1959 | Reallocation | 64653 | 31B | March | 30A | Stratford | |
14/03/1959 | Reallocation | 64655 | 31B | March | 30A | Stratford | |
14/03/1959 | Reallocation | 64656 | 31B | March | 30A | Stratford | |
14/03/1959 | Reallocation | 64670 | 31B | March | 30A | Stratford | |
16/05/1959 | Reallocation | 64641 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | 32B | Ipswich | |
16/05/1959 | Reallocation | 64659 | 31B | March | 32B | Ipswich | |
16/05/1959 | Reallocation | 64668 | 31B | March | 32B | Ipswich | |
06/06/1959 | Reallocation | 64655 | 30A | Stratford | 31B | March | |
20/06/1959 | Reallocation | 64673 | 31C | Kings Lynn | |||
04/07/1959 | Reallocation | 64647 | 31B | March | 31C | Kings Lynn | |
04/07/1959 | Reallocation | 64665 | 31B | March | 31C | Kings Lynn | |
27/07/1959 | Condemned | 64644 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | COND | ||
11/08/1959 | Condemned | 64648 | COND | ||||
24/08/1959 | Condemned | 64661 | 31A | Cambridge | COND | ||
03/10/1959 | Reallocation | 64641 | 32B | Ipswich | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | |
07/11/1959 | Reallocation | 64664 | 30E | Colchester | 30A | Stratford | |
07/11/1959 | Reallocation | 64667 | 30A | Stratford | |||
09/11/1959 | Condemned | 64658 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | COND | ||
21/11/1959 | Reallocation | 64655 | 31B | March | 31C | Kings Lynn | |
24/11/1959 | Condemned | 64670 | 30A | Stratford | COND | ||
26/11/1959 | Condemned | 64640 | 31C | Kings Lynn | COND | ||
12/12/1959 | Reallocation | 64650 | STR | Stratford | 30A | Stratford | |
12/12/1959 | Reallocation | 64657 | 30E | Colchester | 30A | Stratford | |
12/12/1959 | Reallocation | 64660 | 30E | Colchester | 30A | Stratford | |
12/12/1959 | Reallocation | 64666 | 30A | Stratford | |||
14/12/1959 | Condemned | 64665 | 31C | Kings Lynn | COND | ||
14/12/1959 | Condemned | 64668 | 32B | Ipswich | COND | ||
25/01/1960 | Condemned | 64641 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | COND | ||
25/01/1960 | Condemned | 64654 | STR | Stratford | COND | ||
27/02/1960 | Reallocation | 64647 | 31C | Kings Lynn | 31B | March | |
27/02/1960 | Reallocation | 64655 | 31C | Kings Lynn | 31A | Cambridge | |
27/02/1960 | Reallocation | 64673 | 31C | Kings Lynn | 31A | Cambridge | |
30/03/1960 | Condemned | 64642 | 31B | March | COND | ||
30/03/1960 | Condemned | 64647 | 31B | March | COND | ||
01/04/1960 | Condemned | 64659 | 32B | Ipswich | COND | ||
09/05/1960 | Condemned | 64656 | 30A | Stratford | COND | ||
29/08/1960 | Condemned | 64660 | 30A | Stratford | COND | ||
11/10/1960 | Condemned | 64650 | 30A | Stratford | COND | ||
11/10/1960 | Condemned | 64663 | COND | ||||
26/11/1960 | Reallocation | 64669 | 30A | Stratford | |||
26/11/1960 | Reallocation | 64671 | 31A | Cambridge | |||
26/11/1960 | Reallocation | 64673 | 31A | Cambridge | 30A | Stratford | |
07/01/1961 | Reallocation | 64652 | 30F | Parkeston Quay | 30A | Stratford | |
13/01/1961 | Condemned | 64653 | 30A | Stratford | COND | ||
13/01/1961 | Condemned | 64666 | 30A | Stratford | COND | ||
16/01/1961 | Condemned | 64674 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | COND | ||
17/01/1961 | Condemned | 64652 | 30A | Stratford | COND | ||
03/08/1961 | Condemned | 64655 | 31A | Cambridge | COND | ||
10/09/1961 | Condemned | 64667 | 30A | Stratford | COND | ||
10/09/1961 | Condemned | 64669 | 30A | Stratford | COND | ||
16/09/1961 | Reallocation | 64671 | 31A | Cambridge | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | |
26/10/1961 | Condemned | 64646 | 31A | Cambridge | COND | ||
23/11/1961 | Condemned | 64643 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | COND | ||
11/02/1962 | Condemned | 64671 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | COND | ||
06/08/1962 | Condemned | 64673 | 30A | Stratford | COND | ||
16/09/1962 | Condemned | 64657 | 30A | Stratford | COND | ||
16/09/1962 | Condemned | 64664 | 30A | Stratford | COND |