28/09/1926 |
To Service |
1448 |
|
NEW |
NPT |
Newport (Teeside) |
|
05/10/1926 |
To Service |
1449 |
|
NEW |
NPT |
Newport (Teeside) |
|
14/10/1926 |
To Service |
1450 |
|
NEW |
NPT |
Newport (Teeside) |
|
15/10/1926 |
To Service |
1451 |
|
NEW |
HLD |
Hull Dairycoates |
|
21/10/1926 |
To Service |
1452 |
|
NEW |
HLD |
Hull Dairycoates |
|
21/10/1926 |
To Service |
1454 |
|
NEW |
HLD |
Hull Dairycoates |
|
21/10/1926 |
To Service |
1455 |
|
NEW |
NPT |
Newport (Teeside) |
|
28/10/1926 |
To Service |
1456 |
|
NEW |
NPT |
Newport (Teeside) |
|
04/11/1926 |
To Service |
1457 |
|
NEW |
NPT |
Newport (Teeside) |
|
09/11/1926 |
To Service |
1458 |
|
NEW |
WHL |
West Hartlepool |
|
12/11/1926 |
To Service |
1459 |
|
NEW |
WHL |
West Hartlepool |
|
17/11/1926 |
To Service |
1481 |
|
NEW |
WHL |
West Hartlepool |
|
30/11/1926 |
To Service |
1484 |
|
NEW |
IMM |
Immingham |
|
02/12/1926 |
To Service |
1492 |
|
NEW |
IMM |
Immingham |
|
03/12/1926 |
To Service |
1493 |
|
NEW |
IMM |
Immingham |
|
10/12/1926 |
To Service |
1494 |
|
NEW |
IMM |
Immingham |
|
14/12/1926 |
To Service |
1495 |
|
NEW |
IMM |
Immingham |
|
11/03/1927 |
To Service |
1270 |
|
NEW |
NPT |
Newport (Teeside) |
|
12/04/1927 |
To Service |
1496 |
|
NEW |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
14/04/1927 |
To Service |
1497 |
|
NEW |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
23/04/1927 |
Reallocation |
1497 |
GOR |
Gorton |
LIV |
Brunswick |
|
28/04/1927 |
To Service |
1498 |
|
NEW |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
03/05/1927 |
To Service |
1233 |
|
NEW |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
10/05/1927 |
To Service |
1255 |
|
NEW |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
10/05/1927 |
To Service |
1263 |
|
NEW |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
10/05/1927 |
To Service |
1259 |
|
NEW |
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
13/05/1927 |
To Service |
1265 |
|
NEW |
IMM |
Immingham |
|
18/05/1927 |
To Service |
1266 |
|
NEW |
IMM |
Immingham |
|
20/05/1927 |
To Service |
1267 |
|
NEW |
IMM |
Immingham |
|
25/05/1927 |
To Service |
1272 |
|
NEW |
IMM |
Immingham |
|
28/05/1927 |
To Service |
1273 |
|
NEW |
IMM |
Immingham |
|
28/05/1927 |
To Service |
1268 |
|
NEW |
IMM |
Immingham |
|
30/05/1927 |
To Service |
1269 |
|
NEW |
IMM |
Immingham |
|
30/05/1927 |
To Service |
1274 |
|
NEW |
IMM |
Immingham |
|
08/06/1927 |
To Service |
1277 |
|
NEW |
IMM |
Immingham |
|
09/06/1927 |
To Service |
1275 |
|
NEW |
IMM |
Immingham |
|
10/06/1927 |
To Service |
1281 |
|
NEW |
IMM |
Immingham |
|
16/06/1927 |
To Service |
1282 |
|
NEW |
IMM |
Immingham |
|
23/06/1927 |
To Service |
1286 |
|
NEW |
COP |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
|
23/06/1927 |
To Service |
1287 |
|
NEW |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
30/06/1927 |
To Service |
1289 |
|
NEW |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
16/07/1927 |
To Service |
1290 |
|
NEW |
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
16/07/1927 |
To Service |
1295 |
|
NEW |
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
21/07/1927 |
Reallocation |
1289 |
DON |
Doncaster |
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
22/07/1927 |
Reallocation |
1287 |
GOR |
Gorton |
LEI |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
31/08/1927 |
To Service |
1296 |
|
NEW |
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
02/09/1927 |
To Service |
1298 |
|
NEW |
IMM |
Immingham |
|
08/10/1927 |
Reallocation |
1269 |
IMM |
Immingham |
STR |
Stratford |
|
08/10/1927 |
Reallocation |
1295 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
STR |
Stratford |
|
08/10/1927 |
Reallocation |
1296 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
STR |
Stratford |
|
13/10/1927 |
Reallocation |
1484 |
IMM |
Immingham |
STR |
Stratford |
|
13/10/1927 |
Reallocation |
1265 |
IMM |
Immingham |
STR |
Stratford |
|
14/10/1927 |
Reallocation |
1266 |
IMM |
Immingham |
STR |
Stratford |
|
14/10/1927 |
Reallocation |
1267 |
IMM |
Immingham |
STR |
Stratford |
|
14/10/1927 |
Reallocation |
1268 |
IMM |
Immingham |
STR |
Stratford |
|
25/11/1927 |
Reallocation |
1451 |
HLD |
Hull Dairycoates |
BLA |
Blaydon |
|
25/11/1927 |
Reallocation |
1452 |
HLD |
Hull Dairycoates |
BLA |
Blaydon |
|
25/11/1927 |
Reallocation |
1454 |
HLD |
Hull Dairycoates |
BLA |
Blaydon |
|
13/12/1927 |
Reallocation |
1270 |
NPT |
Newport (Teeside) |
NHO |
New Holland |
|
06/02/1928 |
Reallocation |
1270 |
NHO |
New Holland |
NPT |
Newport (Teeside) |
|
10/02/1928 |
Reallocation |
1270 |
NPT |
Newport (Teeside) |
IMM |
Immingham |
|
17/02/1928 |
Reallocation |
1274 |
IMM |
Immingham |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
20/02/1928 |
Reallocation |
1298 |
IMM |
Immingham |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
18/07/1928 |
To Service |
2692 |
|
NEW |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
20/07/1928 |
To Service |
2691 |
|
NEW |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
20/07/1928 |
To Service |
2693 |
|
NEW |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
01/08/1928 |
To Service |
2694 |
|
NEW |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
06/08/1928 |
To Service |
2695 |
|
NEW |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
08/08/1928 |
To Service |
2696 |
|
NEW |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
09/08/1928 |
To Service |
2697 |
|
NEW |
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
14/08/1928 |
To Service |
2698 |
|
NEW |
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
15/08/1928 |
To Service |
2699 |
|
NEW |
BFD |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
|
17/08/1928 |
To Service |
2700 |
|
NEW |
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
25/08/1928 |
To Service |
2701 |
|
NEW |
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
27/08/1928 |
To Service |
2702 |
|
NEW |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
31/08/1928 |
To Service |
2703 |
|
NEW |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
04/09/1928 |
To Service |
2704 |
|
NEW |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
07/09/1928 |
To Service |
2705 |
|
NEW |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
12/09/1928 |
To Service |
2706 |
|
NEW |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
17/09/1928 |
To Service |
2707 |
|
NEW |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
19/09/1928 |
To Service |
2708 |
|
NEW |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
28/09/1928 |
To Service |
2709 |
|
NEW |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
28/09/1928 |
To Service |
2710 |
|
NEW |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
09/10/1928 |
To Service |
2711 |
|
NEW |
YK |
York (North) |
|
12/10/1928 |
To Service |
2712 |
|
NEW |
YK |
York (North) |
|
31/10/1928 |
Reallocation |
2709 |
GOR |
Gorton |
ANN |
Annesley |
|
10/11/1928 |
Reallocation |
2710 |
GOR |
Gorton |
ANN |
Annesley |
|
22/11/1928 |
Reallocation |
2712 |
YK |
York (North) |
STR |
Stratford |
|
22/11/1928 |
To Service |
2713 |
|
NEW |
YK |
York (North) |
|
22/11/1928 |
To Service |
2714 |
|
NEW |
YK |
York (North) |
|
26/11/1928 |
To Service |
2715 |
|
NEW |
YK |
York (North) |
|
27/11/1928 |
To Service |
2716 |
|
NEW |
YK |
York (North) |
|
29/11/1928 |
To Service |
2717 |
|
NEW |
YK |
York (North) |
|
30/11/1928 |
To Service |
2718 |
|
NEW |
YK |
York (North) |
|
03/12/1928 |
Reallocation |
2711 |
YK |
York (North) |
STR |
Stratford |
|
03/12/1928 |
Reallocation |
2713 |
YK |
York (North) |
STR |
Stratford |
|
03/12/1928 |
Reallocation |
2714 |
YK |
York (North) |
STR |
Stratford |
|
04/12/1928 |
To Service |
2719 |
|
NEW |
YK |
York (North) |
|
05/12/1928 |
Reallocation |
2715 |
YK |
York (North) |
STR |
Stratford |
|
06/12/1928 |
To Service |
2720 |
|
NEW |
YK |
York (North) |
|
07/12/1928 |
Reallocation |
2716 |
YK |
York (North) |
STR |
Stratford |
|
07/12/1928 |
Reallocation |
2718 |
YK |
York (North) |
STR |
Stratford |
|
14/12/1928 |
Reallocation |
2720 |
YK |
York (North) |
STR |
Stratford |
|
15/12/1928 |
Reallocation |
2705 |
DON |
Doncaster |
MEX |
Mexborough |
|
18/01/1929 |
Reallocation |
2717 |
YK |
York (North) |
STR |
Stratford |
|
19/01/1929 |
Reallocation |
2702 |
DON |
Doncaster |
MEX |
Mexborough |
|
24/01/1929 |
Reallocation |
2702 |
MEX |
Mexborough |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
25/01/1929 |
Reallocation |
2720 |
STR |
Stratford |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
|
26/01/1929 |
Reallocation |
2719 |
YK |
York (North) |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
|
26/03/1929 |
To Service |
2721 |
|
NEW |
YK |
York (North) |
|
08/04/1929 |
To Service |
2722 |
|
NEW |
YK |
York (North) |
|
09/04/1929 |
Reallocation |
2721 |
YK |
York (North) |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
|
10/04/1929 |
To Service |
2723 |
|
NEW |
YK |
York (North) |
|
15/04/1929 |
To Service |
2724 |
|
NEW |
YK |
York (North) |
|
16/04/1929 |
Reallocation |
2705 |
MEX |
Mexborough |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
18/04/1929 |
Reallocation |
2722 |
YK |
York (North) |
IPS |
Ipswich |
|
18/04/1929 |
Reallocation |
2723 |
YK |
York (North) |
IPS |
Ipswich |
|
20/04/1929 |
Reallocation |
2724 |
YK |
York (North) |
IPS |
Ipswich |
|
22/04/1929 |
To Service |
2725 |
|
NEW |
YK |
York (North) |
|
24/04/1929 |
To Service |
2726 |
|
NEW |
YK |
York (North) |
|
25/04/1929 |
Reallocation |
2722 |
IPS |
Ipswich |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
|
30/04/1929 |
To Service |
2727 |
|
NEW |
YK |
York (North) |
|
01/05/1929 |
Reallocation |
2726 |
YK |
York (North) |
STR |
Stratford |
|
02/05/1929 |
Reallocation |
2725 |
YK |
York (North) |
STR |
Stratford |
|
10/05/1929 |
Reallocation |
2727 |
YK |
York (North) |
STR |
Stratford |
|
10/05/1929 |
To Service |
2728 |
|
NEW |
YK |
York (North) |
|
10/05/1929 |
To Service |
2729 |
|
NEW |
YK |
York (North) |
|
17/05/1929 |
To Service |
2730 |
|
NEW |
YK |
York (North) |
|
20/05/1929 |
Reallocation |
1497 |
LIV |
Brunswick |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
20/05/1929 |
Reallocation |
1255 |
GOR |
Gorton |
LIV |
Brunswick |
|
24/05/1929 |
Reallocation |
2729 |
YK |
York (North) |
STR |
Stratford |
|
24/05/1929 |
Reallocation |
2730 |
YK |
York (North) |
STR |
Stratford |
|
29/05/1929 |
To Service |
2732 |
|
NEW |
YK |
York (North) |
|
30/05/1929 |
Reallocation |
2724 |
IPS |
Ipswich |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
|
30/05/1929 |
To Service |
2731 |
|
NEW |
YK |
York (North) |
|
30/05/1929 |
Reallocation |
2732 |
YK |
York (North) |
EFD |
Eastfield |
|
31/05/1929 |
Reallocation |
2723 |
IPS |
Ipswich |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
|
31/05/1929 |
Reallocation |
2731 |
YK |
York (North) |
EFD |
Eastfield |
|
06/06/1929 |
To Service |
2733 |
|
NEW |
PKD |
Parkhead |
|
11/06/1929 |
To Service |
2734 |
|
NEW |
PKD |
Parkhead |
|
14/06/1929 |
To Service |
2735 |
|
NEW |
STM |
St Margarets |
|
15/06/1929 |
Reallocation |
2728 |
YK |
York (North) |
STR |
Stratford |
|
16/06/1929 |
Reallocation |
1494 |
IMM |
Immingham |
LIN |
Lincoln |
|
16/06/1929 |
Reallocation |
1495 |
IMM |
Immingham |
LIN |
Lincoln |
|
19/06/1929 |
Reallocation |
1275 |
IMM |
Immingham |
LIN |
Lincoln |
|
20/06/1929 |
To Service |
2736 |
|
NEW |
STM |
St Margarets |
|
24/06/1929 |
Reallocation |
2709 |
ANN |
Annesley |
LIN |
Lincoln |
|
24/06/1929 |
Reallocation |
2710 |
ANN |
Annesley |
LIN |
Lincoln |
|
26/06/1929 |
To Service |
2737 |
|
NEW |
STM |
St Margarets |
|
03/07/1929 |
To Service |
2738 |
|
NEW |
EFD |
Eastfield |
|
03/07/1929 |
To Service |
2739 |
|
NEW |
CAR |
Carlisle Canal |
|
04/07/1929 |
Reallocation |
1272 |
IMM |
Immingham |
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
09/07/1929 |
To Service |
2740 |
|
NEW |
CAR |
Carlisle Canal |
|
10/07/1929 |
Reallocation |
2704 |
DON |
Doncaster |
IMM |
Immingham |
|
12/07/1929 |
To Service |
2741 |
|
NEW |
DEE |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
|
29/07/1929 |
Reallocation |
1494 |
LIN |
Lincoln |
IMM |
Immingham |
|
31/07/1929 |
To Service |
2742 |
|
NEW |
ABD |
Aberdeen Ferryhill |
|
01/08/1929 |
Reallocation |
2741 |
DEE |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
ABD |
Aberdeen Ferryhill |
|
07/08/1929 |
Reallocation |
2709 |
LIN |
Lincoln |
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
14/08/1929 |
Reallocation |
2710 |
LIN |
Lincoln |
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
19/08/1929 |
Reallocation |
1272 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
IMM |
Immingham |
|
19/08/1929 |
Reallocation |
2710 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
ANN |
Annesley |
|
20/08/1929 |
Reallocation |
2709 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
ANN |
Annesley |
|
22/08/1929 |
Reallocation |
1289 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
COP |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
|
23/08/1929 |
Reallocation |
2710 |
ANN |
Annesley |
LEI |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
28/08/1929 |
To Service |
2770 |
|
NEW |
YK |
York (North) |
|
04/09/1929 |
To Service |
2771 |
|
NEW |
YK |
York (North) |
|
07/09/1929 |
Reallocation |
2770 |
YK |
York (North) |
IPS |
Ipswich |
|
07/09/1929 |
Reallocation |
2771 |
YK |
York (North) |
IPS |
Ipswich |
|
11/09/1929 |
To Service |
2772 |
|
NEW |
YK |
York (North) |
|
18/09/1929 |
Reallocation |
2772 |
YK |
York (North) |
IPS |
Ipswich |
|
20/09/1929 |
To Service |
2774 |
|
NEW |
YK |
York (North) |
|
21/09/1929 |
Reallocation |
2704 |
IMM |
Immingham |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
21/09/1929 |
Reallocation |
2770 |
IPS |
Ipswich |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
|
28/09/1929 |
Reallocation |
2774 |
YK |
York (North) |
STR |
Stratford |
|
30/09/1929 |
To Service |
2773 |
|
NEW |
YK |
York (North) |
|
30/09/1929 |
To Service |
2775 |
|
NEW |
YK |
York (North) |
|
07/10/1929 |
Reallocation |
1289 |
COP |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
07/10/1929 |
To Service |
2776 |
|
NEW |
YK |
York (North) |
|
09/10/1929 |
Reallocation |
2773 |
YK |
York (North) |
STR |
Stratford |
|
11/10/1929 |
Reallocation |
2775 |
YK |
York (North) |
STR |
Stratford |
|
15/10/1929 |
Reallocation |
2776 |
YK |
York (North) |
STR |
Stratford |
|
16/10/1929 |
To Service |
2777 |
|
NEW |
YK |
York (North) |
|
18/10/1929 |
To Service |
2778 |
|
NEW |
YK |
York (North) |
|
21/10/1929 |
Reallocation |
2777 |
YK |
York (North) |
STR |
Stratford |
|
25/10/1929 |
To Service |
2779 |
|
NEW |
YK |
York (North) |
|
28/10/1929 |
Reallocation |
2778 |
YK |
York (North) |
STR |
Stratford |
|
30/10/1929 |
Reallocation |
1495 |
LIN |
Lincoln |
IMM |
Immingham |
|
31/10/1929 |
Reallocation |
2779 |
YK |
York (North) |
ANN |
Annesley |
|
04/11/1929 |
To Service |
2780 |
|
NEW |
YK |
York (North) |
|
07/11/1929 |
To Service |
2781 |
|
NEW |
YK |
York (North) |
|
08/11/1929 |
Reallocation |
2780 |
YK |
York (North) |
CLK |
Colwick |
|
12/11/1929 |
To Service |
2782 |
|
NEW |
YK |
York (North) |
|
15/11/1929 |
Reallocation |
2780 |
CLK |
Colwick |
ANN |
Annesley |
|
15/11/1929 |
Reallocation |
2781 |
YK |
York (North) |
CLK |
Colwick |
|
16/11/1929 |
Reallocation |
2782 |
YK |
York (North) |
SHF |
Sheffield Neepsend |
|
18/11/1929 |
To Service |
2783 |
|
NEW |
YK |
York (North) |
|
19/11/1929 |
Reallocation |
2781 |
CLK |
Colwick |
ANN |
Annesley |
|
21/11/1929 |
Reallocation |
2783 |
YK |
York (North) |
SHF |
Sheffield Neepsend |
|
26/11/1929 |
To Service |
2784 |
|
NEW |
YK |
York (North) |
|
29/11/1929 |
Reallocation |
1497 |
GOR |
Gorton |
LIV |
Brunswick |
|
29/11/1929 |
Reallocation |
1255 |
LIV |
Brunswick |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
29/11/1929 |
To Service |
2785 |
|
NEW |
YK |
York (North) |
|
05/12/1929 |
Reallocation |
2784 |
YK |
York (North) |
SHF |
Sheffield Neepsend |
|
06/12/1929 |
Reallocation |
2703 |
DON |
Doncaster |
LIN |
Lincoln |
|
10/12/1929 |
Reallocation |
2785 |
YK |
York (North) |
SHF |
Sheffield Neepsend |
|
11/12/1929 |
To Service |
1418 |
|
NEW |
BLA |
Blaydon |
|
14/12/1929 |
Reallocation |
1281 |
IMM |
Immingham |
LIN |
Lincoln |
|
14/12/1929 |
Reallocation |
2728 |
STR |
Stratford |
STE |
Southend on Sea |
|
19/12/1929 |
To Service |
1425 |
|
NEW |
BLA |
Blaydon |
|
03/01/1930 |
To Service |
1466 |
|
NEW |
BLA |
Blaydon |
|
08/01/1930 |
To Service |
1429 |
|
NEW |
BLA |
Blaydon |
|
13/01/1930 |
To Service |
1470 |
|
NEW |
YK |
York (North) |
|
18/01/1930 |
Reallocation |
2777 |
STR |
Stratford |
STE |
Southend on Sea |
|
18/01/1930 |
To Service |
1487 |
|
NEW |
YK |
York (North) |
|
25/01/1930 |
Reallocation |
1296 |
STR |
Stratford |
STE |
Southend on Sea |
|
25/01/1930 |
Reallocation |
2777 |
STE |
Southend on Sea |
STR |
Stratford |
|
30/01/1930 |
To Service |
1489 |
|
NEW |
NPT |
Newport (Teeside) |
|
31/01/1930 |
To Service |
1491 |
|
NEW |
NPT |
Newport (Teeside) |
|
01/02/1930 |
Reallocation |
1296 |
STE |
Southend on Sea |
STR |
Stratford |
|
01/02/1930 |
Reallocation |
2777 |
STR |
Stratford |
STE |
Southend on Sea |
|
08/02/1930 |
Reallocation |
2777 |
STE |
Southend on Sea |
STR |
Stratford |
|
13/02/1930 |
To Service |
2786 |
|
NEW |
HTN |
Heaton |
|
17/02/1930 |
Reallocation |
2786 |
HTN |
Heaton |
DEE |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
|
17/02/1930 |
To Service |
2787 |
|
NEW |
HTN |
Heaton |
|
24/02/1930 |
To Service |
2788 |
|
NEW |
EFD |
Eastfield |
|
27/02/1930 |
Reallocation |
2787 |
HTN |
Heaton |
EFD |
Eastfield |
|
15/03/1930 |
Reallocation |
1266 |
STR |
Stratford |
STE |
Southend on Sea |
|
07/04/1930 |
Reallocation |
1448 |
NPT |
Newport (Teeside) |
MID |
Middlesbrough |
|
07/04/1930 |
Reallocation |
1449 |
NPT |
Newport (Teeside) |
MID |
Middlesbrough |
|
12/04/1930 |
Reallocation |
2728 |
STE |
Southend on Sea |
STR |
Stratford |
|
12/04/1930 |
Reallocation |
2730 |
STR |
Stratford |
STE |
Southend on Sea |
|
19/04/1930 |
Reallocation |
2728 |
STR |
Stratford |
STE |
Southend on Sea |
|
19/04/1930 |
Reallocation |
2730 |
STE |
Southend on Sea |
STR |
Stratford |
|
26/04/1930 |
Reallocation |
1266 |
STE |
Southend on Sea |
STR |
Stratford |
|
20/06/1930 |
Reallocation |
2709 |
ANN |
Annesley |
LIN |
Lincoln |
|
20/06/1930 |
Reallocation |
2780 |
ANN |
Annesley |
LIN |
Lincoln |
|
02/07/1930 |
Reallocation |
1496 |
GOR |
Gorton |
MAR |
March |
|
02/07/1930 |
Reallocation |
1498 |
GOR |
Gorton |
MAR |
March |
|
26/07/1930 |
Reallocation |
1272 |
IMM |
Immingham |
LIN |
Lincoln |
|
26/07/1930 |
Reallocation |
1273 |
IMM |
Immingham |
LIN |
Lincoln |
|
02/08/1930 |
Reallocation |
2725 |
STR |
Stratford |
STE |
Southend on Sea |
|
04/08/1930 |
Reallocation |
2780 |
LIN |
Lincoln |
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
05/08/1930 |
Reallocation |
2709 |
LIN |
Lincoln |
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
06/08/1930 |
Reallocation |
1498 |
MAR |
March |
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
08/08/1930 |
Reallocation |
1496 |
MAR |
March |
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
09/08/1930 |
Reallocation |
2725 |
STE |
Southend on Sea |
STR |
Stratford |
|
09/08/1930 |
Reallocation |
2728 |
STE |
Southend on Sea |
STR |
Stratford |
|
13/08/1930 |
Reallocation |
1496 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
19/08/1930 |
Reallocation |
1498 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
19/08/1930 |
Reallocation |
2780 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
ANN |
Annesley |
|
21/08/1930 |
Reallocation |
2709 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
ANN |
Annesley |
|
02/09/1930 |
Reallocation |
2696 |
GOR |
Gorton |
MAR |
March |
|
03/09/1930 |
Reallocation |
1495 |
IMM |
Immingham |
MAR |
March |
|
20/09/1930 |
Reallocation |
2704 |
DON |
Doncaster |
CLK |
Colwick |
|
03/10/1930 |
Reallocation |
2704 |
CLK |
Colwick |
ANN |
Annesley |
|
30/01/1931 |
Reallocation |
1289 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
BFD |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
|
13/02/1931 |
Reallocation |
1493 |
IMM |
Immingham |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
14/02/1931 |
Reallocation |
2703 |
LIN |
Lincoln |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
30/03/1931 |
Reallocation |
1497 |
LIV |
Brunswick |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
30/03/1931 |
Reallocation |
2703 |
GOR |
Gorton |
LIV |
Brunswick |
|
04/06/1931 |
Reallocation |
2703 |
LIV |
Brunswick |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
05/06/1931 |
Reallocation |
2694 |
GOR |
Gorton |
LIV |
Brunswick |
|
10/06/1931 |
Reallocation |
1493 |
GOR |
Gorton |
LIN |
Lincoln |
|
12/06/1931 |
Reallocation |
2703 |
GOR |
Gorton |
LIN |
Lincoln |
|
10/08/1931 |
Reallocation |
1289 |
BFD |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
16/09/1931 |
To Service |
2963 |
|
NEW |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
18/09/1931 |
To Service |
2962 |
|
NEW |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
29/09/1931 |
To Service |
2964 |
|
NEW |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
|
13/10/1931 |
To Service |
2965 |
|
NEW |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
|
29/10/1931 |
To Service |
2967 |
|
NEW |
IMM |
Immingham |
|
30/10/1931 |
Reallocation |
2733 |
PKD |
Parkhead |
EFD |
Eastfield |
|
30/10/1931 |
Reallocation |
2734 |
PKD |
Parkhead |
EFD |
Eastfield |
|
06/11/1931 |
Reallocation |
2967 |
IMM |
Immingham |
LIN |
Lincoln |
|
11/11/1931 |
Reallocation |
2740 |
CAR |
Carlisle Canal |
EFD |
Eastfield |
|
24/11/1931 |
To Service |
2968 |
|
NEW |
MAR |
March |
|
09/12/1931 |
To Service |
2966 |
|
NEW |
LIN |
Lincoln |
|
16/12/1931 |
To Service |
2969 |
|
NEW |
MAR |
March |
|
24/12/1931 |
To Service |
2970 |
|
NEW |
MAR |
March |
|
22/01/1932 |
To Service |
2971 |
|
NEW |
MAR |
March |
|
29/01/1932 |
To Service |
2972 |
|
NEW |
MAR |
March |
|
17/02/1932 |
To Service |
2973 |
|
NEW |
SHF |
Sheffield Neepsend |
|
19/02/1932 |
To Service |
2974 |
|
NEW |
SHF |
Sheffield Neepsend |
|
10/03/1932 |
To Service |
2975 |
|
NEW |
ANN |
Annesley |
|
13/03/1932 |
Reallocation |
2704 |
ANN |
Annesley |
LEI |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
15/03/1932 |
To Service |
2976 |
|
NEW |
CLK |
Colwick |
|
04/04/1932 |
Reallocation |
2704 |
LEI |
Leicester (G.C.) |
ANN |
Annesley |
|
04/04/1932 |
Reallocation |
2975 |
ANN |
Annesley |
LEI |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
09/05/1932 |
Reallocation |
2772 |
IPS |
Ipswich |
STR |
Stratford |
|
27/05/1932 |
To Service |
2977 |
|
NEW |
EFD |
Eastfield |
|
07/06/1932 |
To Service |
2978 |
|
NEW |
EFD |
Eastfield |
|
15/06/1932 |
To Service |
2979 |
|
NEW |
EFD |
Eastfield |
|
16/06/1932 |
To Service |
2980 |
|
NEW |
EFD |
Eastfield |
|
05/08/1932 |
Reallocation |
1277 |
IMM |
Immingham |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
31/08/1932 |
To Service |
1453 |
|
NEW |
NEV |
Neville Hill |
|
09/09/1932 |
Reallocation |
1277 |
DON |
Doncaster |
IMM |
Immingham |
|
06/10/1932 |
To Service |
1469 |
|
NEW |
NEV |
Neville Hill |
|
13/10/1932 |
To Service |
1471 |
|
NEW |
DAR |
Darlington |
|
09/11/1932 |
To Service |
1480 |
|
NEW |
DAR |
Darlington |
|
01/02/1933 |
Reallocation |
2740 |
EFD |
Eastfield |
CAR |
Carlisle Canal |
|
19/05/1933 |
To Service |
1483 |
|
NEW |
HTN |
Heaton |
|
24/05/1933 |
To Service |
1482 |
|
NEW |
HTN |
Heaton |
|
30/05/1933 |
Reallocation |
1295 |
STR |
Stratford |
CLK |
Colwick |
|
31/05/1933 |
Reallocation |
1296 |
STR |
Stratford |
CLK |
Colwick |
|
31/05/1933 |
Reallocation |
2698 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
BFD |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
|
21/06/1933 |
Reallocation |
2694 |
LIV |
Brunswick |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
21/06/1933 |
Reallocation |
2695 |
GOR |
Gorton |
LIV |
Brunswick |
|
31/07/1933 |
Reallocation |
2698 |
BFD |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
07/08/1933 |
Reallocation |
1265 |
STR |
Stratford |
BFD |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
|
08/08/1933 |
Reallocation |
1484 |
STR |
Stratford |
BFD |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
|
21/08/1933 |
Reallocation |
1484 |
BFD |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
01/09/1933 |
Reallocation |
1265 |
BFD |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
26/09/1933 |
Reallocation |
1265 |
DON |
Doncaster |
TFD |
Trafford Park (LNER) |
|
16/10/1933 |
Reallocation |
1233 |
GOR |
Gorton |
TFD |
Trafford Park (LNER) |
|
16/10/1933 |
Reallocation |
1265 |
TFD |
Trafford Park (LNER) |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
17/10/1933 |
Reallocation |
1484 |
DON |
Doncaster |
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
04/11/1933 |
Reallocation |
2694 |
GOR |
Gorton |
CLK |
Colwick |
|
04/11/1933 |
Reallocation |
2779 |
ANN |
Annesley |
CLK |
Colwick |
|
07/11/1933 |
Reallocation |
2734 |
EFD |
Eastfield |
DEE |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
|
02/12/1933 |
Reallocation |
2694 |
CLK |
Colwick |
ANN |
Annesley |
|
02/12/1933 |
Reallocation |
2779 |
CLK |
Colwick |
ANN |
Annesley |
|
14/03/1934 |
Reallocation |
2785 |
SHF |
Sheffield Neepsend |
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
15/03/1934 |
Reallocation |
2706 |
DON |
Doncaster |
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
15/03/1934 |
To Service |
1412 |
|
NEW |
NPT |
Newport (Teeside) |
|
17/03/1934 |
To Service |
1468 |
|
NEW |
NPT |
Newport (Teeside) |
|
19/03/1934 |
To Service |
1463 |
|
NEW |
NPT |
Newport (Teeside) |
|
22/03/1934 |
To Service |
1467 |
|
NEW |
NPT |
Newport (Teeside) |
|
26/03/1934 |
Reallocation |
2724 |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
COL |
Colchester |
|
27/03/1934 |
To Service |
1472 |
|
NEW |
MID |
Middlesbrough |
|
28/03/1934 |
Reallocation |
1296 |
CLK |
Colwick |
TFD |
Trafford Park (LNER) |
|
03/04/1934 |
Reallocation |
2722 |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
COL |
Colchester |
|
10/04/1934 |
Reallocation |
1295 |
CLK |
Colwick |
TFD |
Trafford Park (LNER) |
|
11/04/1934 |
Reallocation |
2706 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
COP |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
|
18/04/1934 |
Reallocation |
2974 |
SHF |
Sheffield Neepsend |
BFD |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
|
02/05/1934 |
Reallocation |
2702 |
DON |
Doncaster |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
02/05/1934 |
Reallocation |
2705 |
DON |
Doncaster |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
02/05/1934 |
Reallocation |
2707 |
DON |
Doncaster |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
02/05/1934 |
Reallocation |
2973 |
SHF |
Sheffield Neepsend |
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
05/05/1934 |
Reallocation |
2973 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
BFD |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
|
27/06/1934 |
Reallocation |
2706 |
COP |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
16/07/1934 |
Reallocation |
1456 |
NPT |
Newport (Teeside) |
DAR |
Darlington |
|
16/07/1934 |
Reallocation |
1457 |
NPT |
Newport (Teeside) |
DAR |
Darlington |
|
28/07/1934 |
Reallocation |
2708 |
DON |
Doncaster |
MAR |
March |
|
07/08/1934 |
Reallocation |
2969 |
MAR |
March |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
15/10/1934 |
Reallocation |
2969 |
DON |
Doncaster |
STR |
Stratford |
|
19/10/1934 |
To Service |
1475 |
|
NEW |
NPT |
Newport (Teeside) |
|
24/10/1934 |
To Service |
1476 |
|
NEW |
NPT |
Newport (Teeside) |
|
29/10/1934 |
To Service |
1477 |
|
NEW |
NPT |
Newport (Teeside) |
|
14/11/1934 |
To Service |
1478 |
|
NEW |
NPT |
Newport (Teeside) |
|
15/11/1934 |
Reallocation |
1289 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
ANN |
Annesley |
|
27/11/1934 |
Reallocation |
1277 |
IMM |
Immingham |
SHF |
Sheffield Neepsend |
|
02/12/1934 |
Reallocation |
2707 |
GOR |
Gorton |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
04/12/1934 |
Reallocation |
2705 |
GOR |
Gorton |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
06/12/1934 |
Reallocation |
1277 |
SHF |
Sheffield Neepsend |
RET |
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
|
07/12/1934 |
To Service |
1479 |
|
NEW |
NPT |
Newport (Teeside) |
|
14/12/1934 |
To Service |
1488 |
|
NEW |
FER |
Ferryhill (Co. Durham) |
|
20/12/1934 |
To Service |
1490 |
|
NEW |
FER |
Ferryhill (Co. Durham) |
|
01/1935 |
Reallocation |
2739 |
CAR |
Carlisle Canal |
STM |
St Margarets |
|
07/01/1935 |
Reallocation |
2770 |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
IPS |
Ipswich |
|
18/01/1935 |
Reallocation |
2965 |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
STR |
Stratford |
|
26/01/1935 |
Reallocation |
2723 |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
COL |
Colchester |
|
26/01/1935 |
Reallocation |
2771 |
IPS |
Ipswich |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
|
09/02/1935 |
Reallocation |
2770 |
IPS |
Ipswich |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
|
19/02/1935 |
Reallocation |
1275 |
LIN |
Lincoln |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
20/02/1935 |
Reallocation |
1272 |
LIN |
Lincoln |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
02/03/1935 |
Reallocation |
2723 |
COL |
Colchester |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
|
14/03/1935 |
Reallocation |
1287 |
LEI |
Leicester (G.C.) |
ANN |
Annesley |
|
07/06/1935 |
To Service |
2941 |
|
NEW |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
08/06/1935 |
To Service |
2942 |
|
NEW |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
13/06/1935 |
To Service |
2943 |
|
NEW |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
19/06/1935 |
To Service |
2944 |
|
NEW |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
21/06/1935 |
To Service |
2945 |
|
NEW |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
22/06/1935 |
Reallocation |
1282 |
IMM |
Immingham |
LIN |
Lincoln |
|
28/06/1935 |
To Service |
2946 |
|
NEW |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
03/07/1935 |
To Service |
2947 |
|
NEW |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
05/07/1935 |
To Service |
2948 |
|
NEW |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
10/07/1935 |
To Service |
2949 |
|
NEW |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
11/07/1935 |
To Service |
2950 |
|
NEW |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
24/07/1935 |
Reallocation |
2946 |
DON |
Doncaster |
LIN |
Lincoln |
|
06/08/1935 |
To Service |
2951 |
|
NEW |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
07/08/1935 |
Reallocation |
2950 |
DON |
Doncaster |
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
07/08/1935 |
To Service |
2952 |
|
NEW |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
09/08/1935 |
Reallocation |
2941 |
DON |
Doncaster |
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
09/08/1935 |
Reallocation |
2942 |
DON |
Doncaster |
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
09/08/1935 |
Reallocation |
2945 |
DON |
Doncaster |
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
09/08/1935 |
Reallocation |
2947 |
DON |
Doncaster |
SHF |
Sheffield Neepsend |
|
09/08/1935 |
Reallocation |
2948 |
DON |
Doncaster |
SHF |
Sheffield Neepsend |
|
13/08/1935 |
To Service |
2953 |
|
NEW |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
14/08/1935 |
Reallocation |
2691 |
GOR |
Gorton |
LIV |
Brunswick |
|
14/08/1935 |
Reallocation |
2695 |
LIV |
Brunswick |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
16/08/1935 |
Reallocation |
1233 |
TFD |
Trafford Park (LNER) |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
16/08/1935 |
Reallocation |
2692 |
GOR |
Gorton |
TFD |
Trafford Park (LNER) |
|
19/08/1935 |
Reallocation |
2941 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
19/08/1935 |
Reallocation |
2945 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
19/08/1935 |
Reallocation |
2950 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
21/08/1935 |
To Service |
2981 |
|
NEW |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
22/08/1935 |
Reallocation |
2942 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
26/08/1935 |
Reallocation |
2941 |
DON |
Doncaster |
RET |
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
|
28/08/1935 |
Reallocation |
2942 |
DON |
Doncaster |
STR |
Stratford |
|
29/08/1935 |
Reallocation |
2945 |
DON |
Doncaster |
STR |
Stratford |
|
29/08/1935 |
Reallocation |
2949 |
DON |
Doncaster |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
30/08/1935 |
Reallocation |
2943 |
DON |
Doncaster |
STR |
Stratford |
|
30/08/1935 |
To Service |
2982 |
|
NEW |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
04/09/1935 |
Reallocation |
2950 |
DON |
Doncaster |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
04/09/1935 |
To Service |
2983 |
|
NEW |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
10/09/1935 |
Reallocation |
2951 |
DON |
Doncaster |
CLK |
Colwick |
|
10/09/1935 |
To Service |
2984 |
|
NEW |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
13/09/1935 |
Reallocation |
2944 |
DON |
Doncaster |
STR |
Stratford |
|
13/09/1935 |
To Service |
2985 |
|
NEW |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
13/09/1935 |
To Service |
2986 |
|
NEW |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
18/09/1935 |
To Service |
2987 |
|
NEW |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
25/09/1935 |
Reallocation |
1281 |
LIN |
Lincoln |
CLK |
Colwick |
|
26/09/1935 |
To Service |
2988 |
|
NEW |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
01/10/1935 |
To Service |
2989 |
|
NEW |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
04/10/1935 |
Reallocation |
2951 |
CLK |
Colwick |
MAR |
March |
|
04/10/1935 |
To Service |
2990 |
|
NEW |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
09/10/1935 |
To Service |
2991 |
|
NEW |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
11/10/1935 |
Reallocation |
2703 |
LIN |
Lincoln |
STR |
Stratford |
|
11/10/1935 |
Reallocation |
2989 |
DON |
Doncaster |
MAR |
March |
|
11/10/1935 |
To Service |
2992 |
|
NEW |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
12/10/1935 |
Reallocation |
2984 |
DON |
Doncaster |
STR |
Stratford |
|
12/10/1935 |
Reallocation |
2988 |
DON |
Doncaster |
MAR |
March |
|
14/10/1935 |
Reallocation |
2985 |
DON |
Doncaster |
STR |
Stratford |
|
16/10/1935 |
Reallocation |
2986 |
DON |
Doncaster |
MAR |
March |
|
17/10/1935 |
To Service |
2993 |
|
NEW |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
21/10/1935 |
Reallocation |
2987 |
DON |
Doncaster |
MAR |
March |
|
22/10/1935 |
To Service |
2994 |
|
NEW |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
28/10/1935 |
Reallocation |
2991 |
DON |
Doncaster |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
|
30/10/1935 |
Reallocation |
2990 |
DON |
Doncaster |
IPS |
Ipswich |
|
31/10/1935 |
To Service |
1436 |
|
NEW |
NEV |
Neville Hill |
|
31/10/1935 |
Reallocation |
2950 |
GOR |
Gorton |
MAR |
March |
|
04/11/1935 |
To Service |
1460 |
|
NEW |
NEV |
Neville Hill |
|
04/11/1935 |
Reallocation |
2992 |
DON |
Doncaster |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
|
05/11/1935 |
Reallocation |
2720 |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
COL |
Colchester |
|
08/11/1935 |
To Service |
1464 |
|
NEW |
NEV |
Neville Hill |
|
08/11/1935 |
Reallocation |
2946 |
LIN |
Lincoln |
MAR |
March |
|
08/11/1935 |
Reallocation |
2949 |
GOR |
Gorton |
MAR |
March |
|
12/11/1935 |
Reallocation |
1457 |
DAR |
Darlington |
STR |
Stratford |
|
13/11/1935 |
To Service |
1465 |
|
NEW |
SUN |
Sunderland |
|
15/11/1935 |
To Service |
1473 |
|
NEW |
SUN |
Sunderland |
|
20/11/1935 |
To Service |
1474 |
|
NEW |
DAR |
Darlington |
|
26/11/1935 |
To Service |
1485 |
|
NEW |
DAR |
Darlington |
|
03/12/1935 |
To Service |
1504 |
|
NEW |
HTN |
Heaton |
|
05/12/1935 |
To Service |
1486 |
|
NEW |
NPT |
Newport (Teeside) |
|
06/12/1935 |
To Service |
1505 |
|
NEW |
HTN |
Heaton |
|
07/12/1935 |
Reallocation |
2982 |
DON |
Doncaster |
MEX |
Mexborough |
|
07/12/1935 |
Reallocation |
2983 |
DON |
Doncaster |
MEX |
Mexborough |
|
13/12/1935 |
To Service |
1506 |
|
NEW |
WHL |
West Hartlepool |
|
14/12/1935 |
Reallocation |
2725 |
STR |
Stratford |
DAR |
Darlington |
|
20/12/1935 |
To Service |
1584 |
|
NEW |
BLA |
Blaydon |
|
28/12/1935 |
Reallocation |
2989 |
MAR |
March |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
|
30/12/1935 |
Reallocation |
1295 |
TFD |
Trafford Park (LNER) |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
30/12/1935 |
Reallocation |
2693 |
GOR |
Gorton |
TFD |
Trafford Park (LNER) |
|
15/01/1936 |
Reallocation |
2700 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
BFD |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
|
23/01/1936 |
Reallocation |
1448 |
MID |
Middlesbrough |
NPT |
Newport (Teeside) |
|
23/01/1936 |
Reallocation |
1449 |
MID |
Middlesbrough |
NPT |
Newport (Teeside) |
|
23/01/1936 |
Reallocation |
1479 |
NPT |
Newport (Teeside) |
MID |
Middlesbrough |
|
23/01/1936 |
Reallocation |
1486 |
NPT |
Newport (Teeside) |
MID |
Middlesbrough |
|
28/01/1936 |
Reallocation |
2993 |
DON |
Doncaster |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
|
01/02/1936 |
Reallocation |
1290 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
RET |
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
|
01/02/1936 |
Reallocation |
2770 |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
07/02/1936 |
Reallocation |
2964 |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
07/02/1936 |
Reallocation |
2949 |
MAR |
March |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
|
09/02/1936 |
Reallocation |
2699 |
BFD |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
12/02/1936 |
Reallocation |
1484 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
MAR |
March |
|
12/02/1936 |
Reallocation |
2785 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
CLK |
Colwick |
|
12/02/1936 |
Reallocation |
2950 |
MAR |
March |
IPS |
Ipswich |
|
13/02/1936 |
Reallocation |
2941 |
RET |
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
MAR |
March |
|
17/02/1936 |
Reallocation |
2700 |
BFD |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
25/02/1936 |
Reallocation |
2941 |
MAR |
March |
IPS |
Ipswich |
|
29/02/1936 |
Reallocation |
1484 |
MAR |
March |
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
29/02/1936 |
Reallocation |
2696 |
MAR |
March |
CLK |
Colwick |
|
02/03/1936 |
Reallocation |
2771 |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
MAR |
March |
|
05/03/1936 |
Reallocation |
1495 |
MAR |
March |
CLK |
Colwick |
|
13/03/1936 |
Reallocation |
2994 |
DON |
Doncaster |
IPS |
Ipswich |
|
19/03/1936 |
Reallocation |
1259 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
MAR |
March |
|
11/04/1936 |
Reallocation |
1495 |
CLK |
Colwick |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
14/04/1936 |
Reallocation |
1277 |
RET |
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
SHF |
Sheffield Neepsend |
|
14/04/1936 |
Reallocation |
2783 |
SHF |
Sheffield Neepsend |
RET |
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
|
28/04/1936 |
Reallocation |
2971 |
MAR |
March |
CLK |
Colwick |
|
26/05/1936 |
Reallocation |
1275 |
GOR |
Gorton |
TFD |
Trafford Park (LNER) |
|
27/05/1936 |
Reallocation |
1296 |
TFD |
Trafford Park (LNER) |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
15/06/1936 |
Reallocation |
1465 |
SUN |
Sunderland |
CON |
Consett |
|
17/06/1936 |
Reallocation |
2784 |
SHF |
Sheffield Neepsend |
RET |
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
|
06/07/1936 |
Reallocation |
2783 |
RET |
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
SHF |
Sheffield Neepsend |
|
21/07/1936 |
Reallocation |
2983 |
MEX |
Mexborough |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
30/07/1936 |
Reallocation |
2719 |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
COL |
Colchester |
|
05/08/1936 |
To Service |
2996 |
|
NEW |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
06/08/1936 |
To Service |
2995 |
|
NEW |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
12/08/1936 |
To Service |
2997 |
|
NEW |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
14/08/1936 |
To Service |
2998 |
|
NEW |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
19/08/1936 |
To Service |
2999 |
|
NEW |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
21/08/1936 |
To Service |
3000 |
|
NEW |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
01/09/1936 |
Reallocation |
1255 |
GOR |
Gorton |
TFD |
Trafford Park (LNER) |
|
01/09/1936 |
Reallocation |
1277 |
SHF |
Sheffield Neepsend |
RET |
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
|
01/09/1936 |
Reallocation |
2784 |
RET |
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
SHF |
Sheffield Neepsend |
|
02/09/1936 |
Reallocation |
2962 |
GOR |
Gorton |
TFD |
Trafford Park (LNER) |
|
02/09/1936 |
To Service |
1803 |
|
NEW |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
04/09/1936 |
Reallocation |
2996 |
DON |
Doncaster |
IPS |
Ipswich |
|
04/09/1936 |
To Service |
1813 |
|
NEW |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
11/09/1936 |
Reallocation |
2998 |
DON |
Doncaster |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
14/09/1936 |
Reallocation |
3000 |
DON |
Doncaster |
SHF |
Sheffield Neepsend |
|
15/09/1936 |
Reallocation |
2963 |
GOR |
Gorton |
TFD |
Trafford Park (LNER) |
|
18/09/1936 |
Reallocation |
2999 |
DON |
Doncaster |
SHF |
Sheffield Neepsend |
|
23/09/1936 |
To Service |
1824 |
|
NEW |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
23/09/1936 |
To Service |
1828 |
|
NEW |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
25/09/1936 |
Reallocation |
2997 |
DON |
Doncaster |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
25/09/1936 |
To Service |
1854 |
|
NEW |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
30/09/1936 |
Reallocation |
1813 |
GOR |
Gorton |
MAR |
March |
|
30/09/1936 |
To Service |
1856 |
|
NEW |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
02/10/1936 |
Reallocation |
1803 |
GOR |
Gorton |
MAR |
March |
|
02/10/1936 |
To Service |
1857 |
|
NEW |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
06/10/1936 |
To Service |
1869 |
|
NEW |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
10/10/1936 |
To Service |
1870 |
|
NEW |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
12/10/1936 |
Reallocation |
1472 |
MID |
Middlesbrough |
HAV |
Haverton Hill |
|
14/10/1936 |
To Service |
1532 |
|
NEW |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
17/10/1936 |
To Service |
1533 |
|
NEW |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
20/10/1936 |
Reallocation |
1824 |
GOR |
Gorton |
STR |
Stratford |
|
21/10/1936 |
To Service |
1534 |
|
NEW |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
23/10/1936 |
Reallocation |
1828 |
GOR |
Gorton |
CLK |
Colwick |
|
23/10/1936 |
To Service |
1536 |
|
NEW |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
24/10/1936 |
Reallocation |
1856 |
GOR |
Gorton |
CLK |
Colwick |
|
28/10/1936 |
To Service |
1539 |
|
NEW |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
31/10/1936 |
To Service |
1540 |
|
NEW |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
04/11/1936 |
To Service |
1543 |
|
NEW |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
08/11/1936 |
Reallocation |
1532 |
GOR |
Gorton |
NPT |
Newport (Teeside) |
|
09/11/1936 |
To Service |
1544 |
|
NEW |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
11/11/1936 |
Reallocation |
1534 |
GOR |
Gorton |
NPT |
Newport (Teeside) |
|
12/11/1936 |
Reallocation |
1857 |
GOR |
Gorton |
CLK |
Colwick |
|
12/11/1936 |
Reallocation |
1870 |
GOR |
Gorton |
STR |
Stratford |
|
12/11/1936 |
Reallocation |
1533 |
GOR |
Gorton |
NEV |
Neville Hill |
|
12/11/1936 |
Reallocation |
1544 |
GOR |
Gorton |
NEV |
Neville Hill |
|
13/11/1936 |
To Service |
1545 |
|
NEW |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
14/11/1936 |
Reallocation |
1854 |
GOR |
Gorton |
CLK |
Colwick |
|
14/11/1936 |
Reallocation |
1869 |
GOR |
Gorton |
STR |
Stratford |
|
14/11/1936 |
Reallocation |
1540 |
GOR |
Gorton |
SBK |
Starbeck |
|
18/11/1936 |
Reallocation |
1536 |
GOR |
Gorton |
NEV |
Neville Hill |
|
19/11/1936 |
Reallocation |
1533 |
NEV |
Neville Hill |
NPT |
Newport (Teeside) |
|
19/11/1936 |
Reallocation |
1536 |
NEV |
Neville Hill |
NPT |
Newport (Teeside) |
|
19/11/1936 |
Reallocation |
1540 |
SBK |
Starbeck |
WHL |
West Hartlepool |
|
19/11/1936 |
Reallocation |
1544 |
NEV |
Neville Hill |
NPT |
Newport (Teeside) |
|
24/11/1936 |
Reallocation |
1539 |
GOR |
Gorton |
NPT |
Newport (Teeside) |
|
26/11/1936 |
To Service |
1547 |
|
NEW |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
30/11/1936 |
Reallocation |
1543 |
GOR |
Gorton |
NPT |
Newport (Teeside) |
|
02/12/1936 |
Reallocation |
1286 |
COP |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
11/12/1936 |
Reallocation |
1545 |
GOR |
Gorton |
WHL |
West Hartlepool |
|
19/12/1936 |
Reallocation |
1547 |
GOR |
Gorton |
WHL |
West Hartlepool |
|
21/01/1937 |
Reallocation |
2995 |
DON |
Doncaster |
STR |
Stratford |
|
30/01/1937 |
Reallocation |
2982 |
MEX |
Mexborough |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
06/02/1937 |
Reallocation |
1532 |
NPT |
Newport (Teeside) |
MID |
Middlesbrough |
|
06/02/1937 |
Reallocation |
1533 |
NPT |
Newport (Teeside) |
MID |
Middlesbrough |
|
08/02/1937 |
Reallocation |
1281 |
CLK |
Colwick |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
08/02/1937 |
Reallocation |
1295 |
GOR |
Gorton |
LIV |
Brunswick |
|
08/02/1937 |
Reallocation |
2691 |
LIV |
Brunswick |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
03/03/1937 |
Reallocation |
1497 |
GOR |
Gorton |
TFD |
Trafford Park (LNER) |
|
03/03/1937 |
Reallocation |
2692 |
TFD |
Trafford Park (LNER) |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
31/03/1937 |
To Service |
1563 |
|
NEW |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
07/04/1937 |
To Service |
1577 |
|
NEW |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
12/04/1937 |
To Service |
1580 |
|
NEW |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
16/04/1937 |
To Service |
1585 |
|
NEW |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
22/04/1937 |
To Service |
1586 |
|
NEW |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
25/04/1937 |
Reallocation |
1563 |
GOR |
Gorton |
FER |
Ferryhill (Co. Durham) |
|
29/04/1937 |
To Service |
1587 |
|
NEW |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
03/05/1937 |
Reallocation |
1577 |
GOR |
Gorton |
TDK |
Tyne Dock |
|
05/05/1937 |
To Service |
1875 |
|
NEW |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
06/05/1937 |
Reallocation |
1580 |
GOR |
Gorton |
TDK |
Tyne Dock |
|
06/05/1937 |
Reallocation |
1585 |
GOR |
Gorton |
SUN |
Sunderland |
|
19/05/1937 |
Reallocation |
1586 |
GOR |
Gorton |
SKN |
Stockton |
|
19/05/1937 |
To Service |
1880 |
|
NEW |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
20/05/1937 |
Reallocation |
2970 |
MAR |
March |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
25/05/1937 |
Reallocation |
1587 |
GOR |
Gorton |
HAV |
Haverton Hill |
|
28/05/1937 |
Reallocation |
1875 |
GOR |
Gorton |
CAR |
Carlisle Canal |
|
28/05/1937 |
To Service |
1894 |
|
NEW |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
04/06/1937 |
Reallocation |
2970 |
DON |
Doncaster |
CLK |
Colwick |
|
14/06/1937 |
Reallocation |
1275 |
TFD |
Trafford Park (LNER) |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
14/06/1937 |
Reallocation |
2691 |
GOR |
Gorton |
TFD |
Trafford Park (LNER) |
|
19/06/1937 |
Reallocation |
1880 |
GOR |
Gorton |
CAR |
Carlisle Canal |
|
21/06/1937 |
Reallocation |
1894 |
GOR |
Gorton |
CAR |
Carlisle Canal |
|
01/07/1937 |
Reallocation |
1255 |
TFD |
Trafford Park (LNER) |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
01/07/1937 |
Reallocation |
2692 |
GOR |
Gorton |
TFD |
Trafford Park (LNER) |
|
21/07/1937 |
Reallocation |
1460 |
NEV |
Neville Hill |
SBK |
Starbeck |
|
22/10/1937 |
Reallocation |
1487 |
YK |
York (North) |
HLD |
Hull Dairycoates |
|
25/10/1937 |
Reallocation |
1464 |
NEV |
Neville Hill |
SBK |
Starbeck |
|
28/10/1937 |
Reallocation |
1470 |
YK |
York (North) |
HLD |
Hull Dairycoates |
|
16/12/1937 |
Reallocation |
2782 |
SHF |
Sheffield Neepsend |
STV |
Staveley (G.C.) |
|
16/12/1937 |
To Service |
1508 |
|
NEW |
HLD |
Hull Dairycoates |
|
05/01/1938 |
Reallocation |
1497 |
TFD |
Trafford Park (LNER) |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
05/01/1938 |
Reallocation |
1498 |
GOR |
Gorton |
TFD |
Trafford Park (LNER) |
|
10/01/1938 |
Reallocation |
1586 |
SKN |
Stockton |
MID |
Middlesbrough |
|
25/01/1938 |
To Service |
1509 |
|
NEW |
HLD |
Hull Dairycoates |
|
04/02/1938 |
Reallocation |
1496 |
GOR |
Gorton |
TFD |
Trafford Park (LNER) |
|
04/02/1938 |
Reallocation |
2963 |
TFD |
Trafford Park (LNER) |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
11/02/1938 |
To Service |
1535 |
|
NEW |
YK |
York (North) |
|
16/02/1938 |
To Service |
1537 |
|
NEW |
NPT |
Newport (Teeside) |
|
18/02/1938 |
To Service |
1538 |
|
NEW |
NPT |
Newport (Teeside) |
|
22/02/1938 |
Reallocation |
2981 |
DON |
Doncaster |
BFD |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
|
24/02/1938 |
To Service |
1541 |
|
NEW |
NPT |
Newport (Teeside) |
|
26/02/1938 |
Reallocation |
1255 |
GOR |
Gorton |
TFD |
Trafford Park (LNER) |
|
26/02/1938 |
Reallocation |
2693 |
TFD |
Trafford Park (LNER) |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
02/03/1938 |
To Service |
1542 |
|
NEW |
NPT |
Newport (Teeside) |
|
04/03/1938 |
To Service |
1546 |
|
NEW |
NPT |
Newport (Teeside) |
|
09/03/1938 |
To Service |
1548 |
|
NEW |
NPT |
Newport (Teeside) |
|
12/03/1938 |
Reallocation |
2952 |
DON |
Doncaster |
MAR |
March |
|
16/03/1938 |
To Service |
1551 |
|
NEW |
MID |
Middlesbrough |
|
25/03/1938 |
To Service |
1804 |
|
NEW |
STM |
St Margarets |
|
31/03/1938 |
To Service |
1808 |
|
NEW |
CAR |
Carlisle Canal |
|
01/04/1938 |
To Service |
1558 |
|
NEW |
MID |
Middlesbrough |
|
07/04/1938 |
To Service |
1560 |
|
NEW |
YK |
York (North) |
|
08/04/1938 |
To Service |
1835 |
|
NEW |
CAR |
Carlisle Canal |
|
12/04/1938 |
To Service |
1862 |
|
NEW |
CAR |
Carlisle Canal |
|
13/04/1938 |
To Service |
1863 |
|
NEW |
CAR |
Carlisle Canal |
|
21/04/1938 |
To Service |
1896 |
|
NEW |
CAR |
Carlisle Canal |
|
25/04/1938 |
To Service |
1898 |
|
NEW |
CLK |
Colwick |
|
29/04/1938 |
To Service |
1903 |
|
NEW |
CLK |
Colwick |
|
04/05/1938 |
To Service |
1922 |
|
NEW |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
05/05/1938 |
Reallocation |
2971 |
CLK |
Colwick |
LEI |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
06/05/1938 |
To Service |
1926 |
|
NEW |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
11/05/1938 |
To Service |
1927 |
|
NEW |
SHF |
Sheffield Neepsend |
|
13/05/1938 |
Reallocation |
2986 |
MAR |
March |
SHF |
Sheffield Neepsend |
|
14/05/1938 |
Reallocation |
2987 |
MAR |
March |
NWE |
New England |
|
14/05/1938 |
To Service |
1928 |
|
NEW |
IPS |
Ipswich |
|
14/05/1938 |
To Service |
1930 |
|
NEW |
SHF |
Sheffield Neepsend |
|
17/05/1938 |
Reallocation |
2987 |
NWE |
New England |
BOS |
Boston |
|
30/05/1938 |
To Service |
1940 |
|
NEW |
STR |
Stratford |
|
31/05/1938 |
To Service |
1933 |
|
NEW |
STR |
Stratford |
|
03/06/1938 |
Reallocation |
1498 |
TFD |
Trafford Park (LNER) |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
03/06/1938 |
Reallocation |
1233 |
GOR |
Gorton |
TFD |
Trafford Park (LNER) |
|
03/06/1938 |
To Service |
1942 |
|
NEW |
CAR |
Carlisle Canal |
|
08/06/1938 |
Reallocation |
1259 |
MAR |
March |
CAR |
Carlisle Canal |
|
09/06/1938 |
To Service |
1943 |
|
NEW |
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
15/06/1938 |
To Service |
1952 |
|
NEW |
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
17/06/1938 |
To Service |
1965 |
|
NEW |
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
19/06/1938 |
Reallocation |
1290 |
RET |
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
YK |
York (North) |
|
19/06/1938 |
Reallocation |
2783 |
SHF |
Sheffield Neepsend |
YK |
York (North) |
|
28/06/1938 |
To Service |
1971 |
|
NEW |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
02/07/1938 |
To Service |
1974 |
|
NEW |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
04/07/1938 |
Reallocation |
1534 |
NPT |
Newport (Teeside) |
HLD |
Hull Dairycoates |
|
08/07/1938 |
To Service |
1977 |
|
NEW |
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
20/07/1938 |
To Service |
1980 |
|
NEW |
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
28/07/1938 |
To Service |
1984 |
|
NEW |
STR |
Stratford |
|
29/07/1938 |
Reallocation |
2782 |
STV |
Staveley (G.C.) |
SHF |
Sheffield Neepsend |
|
09/08/1938 |
To Service |
1996 |
|
NEW |
MAR |
March |
|
12/08/1938 |
Reallocation |
2783 |
YK |
York (North) |
SHF |
Sheffield Neepsend |
|
21/08/1938 |
Reallocation |
2703 |
STR |
Stratford |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
|
21/08/1938 |
Reallocation |
2772 |
STR |
Stratford |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
|
23/08/1938 |
Reallocation |
1290 |
YK |
York (North) |
RET |
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
|
24/08/1938 |
Reallocation |
1488 |
FER |
Ferryhill (Co. Durham) |
BLA |
Blaydon |
|
24/08/1938 |
Reallocation |
1563 |
FER |
Ferryhill (Co. Durham) |
BLA |
Blaydon |
|
24/08/1938 |
To Service |
1997 |
|
NEW |
IPS |
Ipswich |
|
05/09/1938 |
Reallocation |
1259 |
CAR |
Carlisle Canal |
MAR |
March |
|
12/09/1938 |
Reallocation |
1942 |
CAR |
Carlisle Canal |
SHF |
Sheffield Neepsend |
|
22/09/1938 |
Reallocation |
2693 |
GOR |
Gorton |
NWE |
New England |
|
23/09/1938 |
Reallocation |
2695 |
GOR |
Gorton |
NWE |
New England |
|
26/09/1938 |
Reallocation |
1275 |
GOR |
Gorton |
TFD |
Trafford Park (LNER) |
|
26/09/1938 |
Reallocation |
2691 |
TFD |
Trafford Park (LNER) |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
27/09/1938 |
Reallocation |
1255 |
TFD |
Trafford Park (LNER) |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
27/09/1938 |
Reallocation |
1274 |
GOR |
Gorton |
TFD |
Trafford Park (LNER) |
|
28/09/1938 |
Reallocation |
2693 |
NWE |
New England |
BOS |
Boston |
|
06/10/1938 |
Reallocation |
2695 |
NWE |
New England |
BOS |
Boston |
|
11/10/1938 |
Reallocation |
1498 |
GOR |
Gorton |
TFD |
Trafford Park (LNER) |
|
11/10/1938 |
Reallocation |
2692 |
TFD |
Trafford Park (LNER) |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
12/10/1938 |
Reallocation |
1534 |
HLD |
Hull Dairycoates |
NPT |
Newport (Teeside) |
|
05/11/1938 |
Reallocation |
1295 |
LIV |
Brunswick |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
05/11/1938 |
Reallocation |
2692 |
GOR |
Gorton |
LIV |
Brunswick |
|
05/11/1938 |
Reallocation |
1468 |
NPT |
Newport (Teeside) |
DAR |
Darlington |
|
07/11/1938 |
Reallocation |
1458 |
WHL |
West Hartlepool |
HAV |
Haverton Hill |
|
07/11/1938 |
Reallocation |
1459 |
WHL |
West Hartlepool |
HAV |
Haverton Hill |
|
07/11/1938 |
Reallocation |
1490 |
FER |
Ferryhill (Co. Durham) |
DAR |
Darlington |
|
19/11/1938 |
Reallocation |
1290 |
RET |
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
28/11/1938 |
Reallocation |
1473 |
SUN |
Sunderland |
CON |
Consett |
|
19/12/1938 |
Reallocation |
1273 |
LIN |
Lincoln |
CLK |
Colwick |
|
15/01/1939 |
Reallocation |
2996 |
IPS |
Ipswich |
YAR |
Yarmouth South Town |
|
17/02/1939 |
Reallocation |
1274 |
TFD |
Trafford Park (LNER) |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
17/02/1939 |
Reallocation |
1295 |
GOR |
Gorton |
TFD |
Trafford Park (LNER) |
|
24/02/1939 |
Reallocation |
2962 |
TFD |
Trafford Park (LNER) |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
24/02/1939 |
Reallocation |
2963 |
GOR |
Gorton |
TFD |
Trafford Park (LNER) |
|
18/03/1939 |
Reallocation |
1270 |
IMM |
Immingham |
SHF |
Sheffield Neepsend |
|
19/03/1939 |
Reallocation |
2735 |
STM |
St Margarets |
TWD |
Tweedmouth |
|
19/03/1939 |
Reallocation |
2736 |
STM |
St Margarets |
TWD |
Tweedmouth |
|
26/03/1939 |
Reallocation |
2703 |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
STR |
Stratford |
|
26/03/1939 |
Reallocation |
2772 |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
STR |
Stratford |
|
10/05/1939 |
Reallocation |
1997 |
IPS |
Ipswich |
MAR |
March |
|
11/05/1939 |
Reallocation |
1928 |
IPS |
Ipswich |
MAR |
March |
|
14/05/1939 |
Reallocation |
2996 |
YAR |
Yarmouth South Town |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
12/06/1939 |
Reallocation |
1534 |
NPT |
Newport (Teeside) |
SEL |
Selby |
|
19/06/1939 |
Reallocation |
1467 |
NPT |
Newport (Teeside) |
TWD |
Tweedmouth |
|
23/06/1939 |
Reallocation |
1974 |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
MAR |
March |
|
26/06/1939 |
Reallocation |
1455 |
NPT |
Newport (Teeside) |
SBK |
Starbeck |
|
30/06/1939 |
Reallocation |
2998 |
GOR |
Gorton |
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
01/07/1939 |
Reallocation |
2707 |
DON |
Doncaster |
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
01/07/1939 |
Reallocation |
2735 |
TWD |
Tweedmouth |
MAL |
Malton |
|
02/07/1939 |
Reallocation |
2996 |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
IPS |
Ipswich |
|
06/07/1939 |
Reallocation |
1493 |
LIN |
Lincoln |
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
08/07/1939 |
Reallocation |
2736 |
TWD |
Tweedmouth |
CON |
Consett |
|
08/07/1939 |
Reallocation |
1585 |
SUN |
Sunderland |
TWD |
Tweedmouth |
|
31/07/1939 |
Reallocation |
1477 |
NPT |
Newport (Teeside) |
SEL |
Selby |
|
03/08/1939 |
Reallocation |
2987 |
BOS |
Boston |
CLK |
Colwick |
|
04/08/1939 |
Reallocation |
2982 |
DON |
Doncaster |
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
23/08/1939 |
Reallocation |
1277 |
RET |
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
29/08/1939 |
Reallocation |
1498 |
TFD |
Trafford Park (LNER) |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
29/08/1939 |
Reallocation |
1281 |
GOR |
Gorton |
TFD |
Trafford Park (LNER) |
|
04/09/1939 |
Reallocation |
1974 |
MAR |
March |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
25/09/1939 |
Reallocation |
2703 |
STR |
Stratford |
COL |
Colchester |
|
25/09/1939 |
Reallocation |
2714 |
STR |
Stratford |
COL |
Colchester |
|
25/09/1939 |
Reallocation |
2719 |
COL |
Colchester |
STR |
Stratford |
|
25/09/1939 |
Reallocation |
2720 |
COL |
Colchester |
STR |
Stratford |
|
25/09/1939 |
Reallocation |
2721 |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
STR |
Stratford |
|
25/09/1939 |
Reallocation |
2722 |
COL |
Colchester |
STR |
Stratford |
|
25/09/1939 |
Reallocation |
2723 |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
STR |
Stratford |
|
25/09/1939 |
Reallocation |
2777 |
STR |
Stratford |
COL |
Colchester |
|
25/09/1939 |
Reallocation |
2992 |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
STR |
Stratford |
|
29/09/1939 |
Reallocation |
2735 |
MAL |
Malton |
SBK |
Starbeck |
|
29/09/1939 |
Reallocation |
2949 |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
STR |
Stratford |
|
13/10/1939 |
Reallocation |
1974 |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
MAR |
March |
|
16/10/1939 |
Reallocation |
2774 |
STR |
Stratford |
MAR |
March |
|
16/10/1939 |
Reallocation |
2775 |
STR |
Stratford |
MAR |
March |
|
20/10/1939 |
Reallocation |
2772 |
STR |
Stratford |
MAR |
March |
|
21/10/1939 |
Reallocation |
1534 |
SEL |
Selby |
YK |
York (North) |
|
23/10/1939 |
Reallocation |
1477 |
SEL |
Selby |
YK |
York (North) |
|
27/10/1939 |
Reallocation |
1497 |
GOR |
Gorton |
TFD |
Trafford Park (LNER) |
|
27/10/1939 |
Reallocation |
1233 |
TFD |
Trafford Park (LNER) |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
22/11/1939 |
Reallocation |
2735 |
SBK |
Starbeck |
YK |
York (North) |
|
30/11/1939 |
Reallocation |
1275 |
TFD |
Trafford Park (LNER) |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
30/11/1939 |
Reallocation |
2962 |
GOR |
Gorton |
TFD |
Trafford Park (LNER) |
|
03/12/1939 |
Reallocation |
2703 |
COL |
Colchester |
STR |
Stratford |
|
03/12/1939 |
Reallocation |
2714 |
COL |
Colchester |
STR |
Stratford |
|
03/12/1939 |
Reallocation |
2719 |
STR |
Stratford |
COL |
Colchester |
|
03/12/1939 |
Reallocation |
2720 |
STR |
Stratford |
COL |
Colchester |
|
03/12/1939 |
Reallocation |
2724 |
COL |
Colchester |
STR |
Stratford |
|
03/12/1939 |
Reallocation |
2777 |
COL |
Colchester |
STR |
Stratford |
|
03/12/1939 |
Reallocation |
2989 |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
STR |
Stratford |
|
03/12/1939 |
Reallocation |
2992 |
STR |
Stratford |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
|
01/01/1940 |
Reallocation |
1551 |
MID |
Middlesbrough |
SKN |
Stockton |
|
13/01/1940 |
Reallocation |
1496 |
TFD |
Trafford Park (LNER) |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
13/01/1940 |
Reallocation |
2691 |
GOR |
Gorton |
TFD |
Trafford Park (LNER) |
|
17/01/1940 |
Reallocation |
1585 |
TWD |
Tweedmouth |
BLA |
Blaydon |
|
20/01/1940 |
Reallocation |
1467 |
TWD |
Tweedmouth |
GHD |
Gateshead |
|
01/02/1940 |
Reallocation |
1971 |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
IPS |
Ipswich |
|
23/02/1940 |
Reallocation |
2982 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
NWE |
New England |
|
23/02/1940 |
Reallocation |
1952 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
NWE |
New England |
|
27/02/1940 |
Reallocation |
1477 |
YK |
York (North) |
SEL |
Selby |
|
28/02/1940 |
Reallocation |
1492 |
IMM |
Immingham |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
28/02/1940 |
Reallocation |
1267 |
STR |
Stratford |
MAR |
March |
|
28/02/1940 |
Reallocation |
1269 |
STR |
Stratford |
MAR |
March |
|
28/02/1940 |
Reallocation |
1927 |
SHF |
Sheffield Neepsend |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
28/02/1940 |
Reallocation |
1930 |
SHF |
Sheffield Neepsend |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
29/02/1940 |
Reallocation |
2735 |
YK |
York (North) |
SEL |
Selby |
|
29/02/1940 |
Reallocation |
1534 |
YK |
York (North) |
SEL |
Selby |
|
29/02/1940 |
Reallocation |
1535 |
YK |
York (North) |
SEL |
Selby |
|
29/02/1940 |
Reallocation |
1560 |
YK |
York (North) |
SEL |
Selby |
|
24/06/1940 |
Reallocation |
1952 |
NWE |
New England |
STR |
Stratford |
|
04/07/1940 |
Reallocation |
1277 |
DON |
Doncaster |
STR |
Stratford |
|
04/07/1940 |
Reallocation |
1952 |
STR |
Stratford |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
12/07/1940 |
Reallocation |
1286 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
GRA |
Grantham |
|
12/07/1940 |
Reallocation |
2697 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
GRA |
Grantham |
|
14/07/1940 |
Reallocation |
2987 |
CLK |
Colwick |
GRA |
Grantham |
|
16/07/1940 |
Reallocation |
1468 |
DAR |
Darlington |
SKN |
Stockton |
|
16/07/1940 |
Reallocation |
1490 |
DAR |
Darlington |
SKN |
Stockton |
|
20/07/1940 |
Reallocation |
1477 |
SEL |
Selby |
SBK |
Starbeck |
|
20/07/1940 |
Reallocation |
1535 |
SEL |
Selby |
SBK |
Starbeck |
|
20/07/1940 |
Reallocation |
1560 |
SEL |
Selby |
SBK |
Starbeck |
|
24/07/1940 |
Reallocation |
2981 |
BFD |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
08/1940 |
Reallocation |
2739 |
STM |
St Margarets |
POL |
Polmont |
|
21/08/1940 |
Reallocation |
1290 |
GOR |
Gorton |
TFD |
Trafford Park (LNER) |
|
21/08/1940 |
Reallocation |
1295 |
TFD |
Trafford Park (LNER) |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
22/08/1940 |
Reallocation |
2970 |
CLK |
Colwick |
GRA |
Grantham |
|
06/09/1940 |
Reallocation |
2970 |
GRA |
Grantham |
CLK |
Colwick |
|
08/09/1940 |
Reallocation |
2723 |
STR |
Stratford |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
|
08/09/1940 |
Reallocation |
2726 |
STR |
Stratford |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
|
08/09/1940 |
Reallocation |
2728 |
STR |
Stratford |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
|
08/09/1940 |
Reallocation |
2991 |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
STR |
Stratford |
|
08/09/1940 |
Reallocation |
2992 |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
STR |
Stratford |
|
08/09/1940 |
Reallocation |
2993 |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
STR |
Stratford |
|
14/09/1940 |
Reallocation |
2971 |
LEI |
Leicester (G.C.) |
CLK |
Colwick |
|
01/10/1940 |
Reallocation |
2735 |
SEL |
Selby |
CAR |
Carlisle Canal |
|
19/10/1940 |
Reallocation |
2736 |
CON |
Consett |
CAR |
Carlisle Canal |
|
20/10/1940 |
Reallocation |
1896 |
CAR |
Carlisle Canal |
CON |
Consett |
|
23/10/1940 |
Reallocation |
2987 |
GRA |
Grantham |
CLK |
Colwick |
|
20/11/1940 |
Reallocation |
1470 |
HLD |
Hull Dairycoates |
DAR |
Darlington |
|
11/12/1940 |
Reallocation |
1933 |
STR |
Stratford |
IPS |
Ipswich |
|
12/12/1940 |
Reallocation |
1259 |
MAR |
March |
CAM |
Cambridge |
|
12/12/1940 |
Reallocation |
2708 |
MAR |
March |
CAM |
Cambridge |
|
30/12/1940 |
Reallocation |
1470 |
DAR |
Darlington |
SKN |
Stockton |
|
01/01/1941 |
Reallocation |
1835 |
CAR |
Carlisle Canal |
SEL |
Selby |
|
29/01/1941 |
Reallocation |
1940 |
STR |
Stratford |
IPS |
Ipswich |
|
02/02/1941 |
Reallocation |
2973 |
BFD |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
07/02/1941 |
To Service |
3081 |
|
NEW |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
14/02/1941 |
To Service |
3082 |
|
NEW |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
28/02/1941 |
To Service |
3083 |
|
NEW |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
02/03/1941 |
Reallocation |
2975 |
LEI |
Leicester (G.C.) |
ANN |
Annesley |
|
04/03/1941 |
To Service |
3084 |
|
NEW |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
09/03/1941 |
Reallocation |
1259 |
CAM |
Cambridge |
MAR |
March |
|
09/03/1941 |
Reallocation |
2708 |
CAM |
Cambridge |
MAR |
March |
|
17/03/1941 |
To Service |
3085 |
|
NEW |
STM |
St Margarets |
|
22/03/1941 |
To Service |
3086 |
|
NEW |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
25/03/1941 |
Reallocation |
2697 |
GRA |
Grantham |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
26/03/1941 |
Reallocation |
1286 |
GRA |
Grantham |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
26/03/1941 |
Reallocation |
2706 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
BFD |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
|
26/03/1941 |
Reallocation |
2707 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
BFD |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
|
30/03/1941 |
Reallocation |
3081 |
DON |
Doncaster |
SHF |
Sheffield Neepsend |
|
30/03/1941 |
Reallocation |
3082 |
DON |
Doncaster |
SHF |
Sheffield Neepsend |
|
30/03/1941 |
Reallocation |
3083 |
DON |
Doncaster |
SHF |
Sheffield Neepsend |
|
30/03/1941 |
Reallocation |
3084 |
DON |
Doncaster |
SHF |
Sheffield Neepsend |
|
30/03/1941 |
Reallocation |
3086 |
DON |
Doncaster |
SHF |
Sheffield Neepsend |
|
05/04/1941 |
Reallocation |
1270 |
SHF |
Sheffield Neepsend |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
05/04/1941 |
To Service |
3087 |
|
NEW |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
13/04/1941 |
Reallocation |
2718 |
STR |
Stratford |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
|
13/04/1941 |
Reallocation |
2726 |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
STR |
Stratford |
|
24/04/1941 |
To Service |
3088 |
|
NEW |
STM |
St Margarets |
|
30/04/1941 |
Reallocation |
1281 |
TFD |
Trafford Park (LNER) |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
30/04/1941 |
Reallocation |
2997 |
GOR |
Gorton |
TFD |
Trafford Park (LNER) |
|
03/05/1941 |
To Service |
3089 |
|
NEW |
NWE |
New England |
|
03/05/1941 |
To Service |
3090 |
|
NEW |
NWE |
New England |
|
11/05/1941 |
Reallocation |
3089 |
NWE |
New England |
GRA |
Grantham |
|
11/05/1941 |
Reallocation |
3090 |
NWE |
New England |
GRA |
Grantham |
|
13/05/1941 |
To Service |
3091 |
|
NEW |
GRA |
Grantham |
|
21/05/1941 |
To Service |
3092 |
|
NEW |
STM |
St Margarets |
|
27/05/1941 |
Reallocation |
1880 |
CAR |
Carlisle Canal |
EFD |
Eastfield |
|
06/1941 |
Reallocation |
1863 |
CAR |
Carlisle Canal |
EFD |
Eastfield |
|
05/06/1941 |
To Service |
3093 |
|
NEW |
GRA |
Grantham |
|
18/06/1941 |
To Service |
3094 |
|
NEW |
GRA |
Grantham |
|
03/07/1941 |
To Service |
3095 |
|
NEW |
NWE |
New England |
|
11/07/1941 |
Reallocation |
2707 |
BFD |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
14/07/1941 |
Reallocation |
1803 |
MAR |
March |
IPS |
Ipswich |
|
18/07/1941 |
To Service |
3096 |
|
NEW |
STM |
St Margarets |
|
20/07/1941 |
Reallocation |
2716 |
STR |
Stratford |
COL |
Colchester |
|
20/07/1941 |
Reallocation |
2720 |
COL |
Colchester |
STR |
Stratford |
|
22/07/1941 |
Reallocation |
3094 |
GRA |
Grantham |
NWE |
New England |
|
26/07/1941 |
Reallocation |
1296 |
GOR |
Gorton |
LIV |
Brunswick |
|
26/07/1941 |
Reallocation |
2692 |
LIV |
Brunswick |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
26/07/1941 |
Reallocation |
3093 |
GRA |
Grantham |
BOS |
Boston |
|
26/07/1941 |
Reallocation |
3094 |
NWE |
New England |
BOS |
Boston |
|
30/07/1941 |
Reallocation |
3095 |
NWE |
New England |
BOS |
Boston |
|
03/08/1941 |
Reallocation |
2716 |
COL |
Colchester |
STR |
Stratford |
|
03/08/1941 |
Reallocation |
2720 |
STR |
Stratford |
COL |
Colchester |
|
08/08/1941 |
To Service |
3097 |
|
NEW |
NWE |
New England |
|
21/08/1941 |
To Service |
3098 |
|
NEW |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
09/09/1941 |
Reallocation |
3098 |
DON |
Doncaster |
CLK |
Colwick |
|
08/10/1941 |
Reallocation |
3091 |
GRA |
Grantham |
CLK |
Colwick |
|
08/10/1941 |
Reallocation |
3093 |
BOS |
Boston |
CLK |
Colwick |
|
08/10/1941 |
Reallocation |
3094 |
BOS |
Boston |
CLK |
Colwick |
|
08/10/1941 |
Reallocation |
3095 |
BOS |
Boston |
CLK |
Colwick |
|
09/10/1941 |
Reallocation |
3089 |
GRA |
Grantham |
CLK |
Colwick |
|
09/10/1941 |
Reallocation |
3090 |
GRA |
Grantham |
CLK |
Colwick |
|
13/10/1941 |
Reallocation |
3089 |
CLK |
Colwick |
ANN |
Annesley |
|
13/10/1941 |
Reallocation |
3090 |
CLK |
Colwick |
ANN |
Annesley |
|
19/10/1941 |
Reallocation |
1484 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
19/10/1941 |
Reallocation |
1493 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
19/10/1941 |
Reallocation |
1943 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
19/10/1941 |
Reallocation |
1965 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
19/10/1941 |
Reallocation |
1977 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
22/10/1941 |
Reallocation |
1869 |
STR |
Stratford |
IPS |
Ipswich |
|
22/10/1941 |
Reallocation |
1922 |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
IPS |
Ipswich |
|
24/10/1941 |
Reallocation |
1266 |
STR |
Stratford |
IPS |
Ipswich |
|
24/10/1941 |
Reallocation |
2965 |
STR |
Stratford |
IPS |
Ipswich |
|
24/10/1941 |
Reallocation |
2969 |
STR |
Stratford |
IPS |
Ipswich |
|
29/10/1941 |
Reallocation |
2949 |
STR |
Stratford |
IPS |
Ipswich |
|
02/11/1941 |
Reallocation |
2714 |
STR |
Stratford |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
|
02/11/1941 |
Reallocation |
2719 |
COL |
Colchester |
STR |
Stratford |
|
05/11/1941 |
Reallocation |
2989 |
STR |
Stratford |
IPS |
Ipswich |
|
14/11/1941 |
Reallocation |
1473 |
CON |
Consett |
TDK |
Tyne Dock |
|
16/11/1941 |
Reallocation |
1497 |
TFD |
Trafford Park (LNER) |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
16/11/1941 |
Reallocation |
1263 |
GOR |
Gorton |
TFD |
Trafford Park (LNER) |
|
16/11/1941 |
Reallocation |
2714 |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
STR |
Stratford |
|
02/12/1941 |
Reallocation |
1980 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
BFD |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
|
31/12/1941 |
Reallocation |
1266 |
IPS |
Ipswich |
MAR |
March |
|
04/01/1942 |
Reallocation |
2969 |
IPS |
Ipswich |
MAR |
March |
|
17/03/1942 |
Reallocation |
2696 |
CLK |
Colwick |
GRA |
Grantham |
|
17/03/1942 |
Reallocation |
2976 |
CLK |
Colwick |
GRA |
Grantham |
|
11/04/1942 |
Reallocation |
2983 |
DON |
Doncaster |
NWE |
New England |
|
11/04/1942 |
Reallocation |
1926 |
DON |
Doncaster |
NWE |
New England |
|
11/04/1942 |
Reallocation |
1927 |
DON |
Doncaster |
NWE |
New England |
|
11/04/1942 |
Reallocation |
1952 |
DON |
Doncaster |
NWE |
New England |
|
16/04/1942 |
Reallocation |
1493 |
DON |
Doncaster |
NWE |
New England |
|
29/04/1942 |
Reallocation |
2952 |
MAR |
March |
GRA |
Grantham |
|
29/04/1942 |
Reallocation |
1996 |
MAR |
March |
GRA |
Grantham |
|
30/04/1942 |
Reallocation |
1974 |
MAR |
March |
GRA |
Grantham |
|
30/04/1942 |
Reallocation |
1997 |
MAR |
March |
GRA |
Grantham |
|
02/05/1942 |
Reallocation |
1813 |
MAR |
March |
GRA |
Grantham |
|
12/05/1942 |
Reallocation |
1928 |
MAR |
March |
GRA |
Grantham |
|
13/05/1942 |
Reallocation |
2696 |
GRA |
Grantham |
CLK |
Colwick |
|
14/05/1942 |
Reallocation |
2976 |
GRA |
Grantham |
CLK |
Colwick |
|
02/09/1942 |
Reallocation |
2950 |
IPS |
Ipswich |
MAR |
March |
|
28/09/1942 |
Reallocation |
1804 |
STM |
St Margarets |
EFD |
Eastfield |
|
25/10/1942 |
Reallocation |
2965 |
IPS |
Ipswich |
MAR |
March |
|
13/12/1942 |
Reallocation |
1265 |
GOR |
Gorton |
TFD |
Trafford Park (LNER) |
|
09/01/1943 |
Reallocation |
1965 |
DON |
Doncaster |
MAR |
March |
|
18/01/1943 |
Reallocation |
2982 |
NWE |
New England |
GRA |
Grantham |
|
18/01/1943 |
Reallocation |
1804 |
EFD |
Eastfield |
PKD |
Parkhead |
|
18/01/1943 |
Reallocation |
3097 |
NWE |
New England |
GRA |
Grantham |
|
17/03/1943 |
Reallocation |
2983 |
NWE |
New England |
GRA |
Grantham |
|
23/03/1943 |
Reallocation |
1448 |
NPT |
Newport (Teeside) |
DAR |
Darlington |
|
23/03/1943 |
Reallocation |
1449 |
NPT |
Newport (Teeside) |
DAR |
Darlington |
|
28/03/1943 |
Reallocation |
1450 |
NPT |
Newport (Teeside) |
DAR |
Darlington |
|
28/03/1943 |
Reallocation |
1458 |
HAV |
Haverton Hill |
BLA |
Blaydon |
|
28/03/1943 |
Reallocation |
1459 |
HAV |
Haverton Hill |
BLA |
Blaydon |
|
28/03/1943 |
Reallocation |
1481 |
WHL |
West Hartlepool |
DAR |
Darlington |
|
28/03/1943 |
Reallocation |
1487 |
HLD |
Hull Dairycoates |
SKN |
Stockton |
|
28/03/1943 |
Reallocation |
1489 |
NPT |
Newport (Teeside) |
DAR |
Darlington |
|
28/03/1943 |
Reallocation |
1491 |
NPT |
Newport (Teeside) |
DAR |
Darlington |
|
28/03/1943 |
Reallocation |
1453 |
NEV |
Neville Hill |
HAV |
Haverton Hill |
|
28/03/1943 |
Reallocation |
1469 |
NEV |
Neville Hill |
HAV |
Haverton Hill |
|
28/03/1943 |
Reallocation |
1482 |
HTN |
Heaton |
DAR |
Darlington |
|
28/03/1943 |
Reallocation |
1483 |
HTN |
Heaton |
DAR |
Darlington |
|
28/03/1943 |
Reallocation |
1412 |
NPT |
Newport (Teeside) |
DAR |
Darlington |
|
28/03/1943 |
Reallocation |
1463 |
NPT |
Newport (Teeside) |
DAR |
Darlington |
|
28/03/1943 |
Reallocation |
1467 |
GHD |
Gateshead |
DAR |
Darlington |
|
28/03/1943 |
Reallocation |
1475 |
NPT |
Newport (Teeside) |
DAR |
Darlington |
|
28/03/1943 |
Reallocation |
1476 |
NPT |
Newport (Teeside) |
DAR |
Darlington |
|
28/03/1943 |
Reallocation |
1478 |
NPT |
Newport (Teeside) |
DAR |
Darlington |
|
28/03/1943 |
Reallocation |
1479 |
MID |
Middlesbrough |
DAR |
Darlington |
|
28/03/1943 |
Reallocation |
1436 |
NEV |
Neville Hill |
SBK |
Starbeck |
|
28/03/1943 |
Reallocation |
1465 |
CON |
Consett |
DAR |
Darlington |
|
28/03/1943 |
Reallocation |
1473 |
TDK |
Tyne Dock |
DAR |
Darlington |
|
28/03/1943 |
Reallocation |
1486 |
MID |
Middlesbrough |
DAR |
Darlington |
|
28/03/1943 |
Reallocation |
1504 |
HTN |
Heaton |
DAR |
Darlington |
|
28/03/1943 |
Reallocation |
1505 |
HTN |
Heaton |
DAR |
Darlington |
|
28/03/1943 |
Reallocation |
1506 |
WHL |
West Hartlepool |
DAR |
Darlington |
|
28/03/1943 |
Reallocation |
1532 |
MID |
Middlesbrough |
DAR |
Darlington |
|
28/03/1943 |
Reallocation |
1533 |
MID |
Middlesbrough |
DAR |
Darlington |
|
28/03/1943 |
Reallocation |
1534 |
SEL |
Selby |
DAR |
Darlington |
|
28/03/1943 |
Reallocation |
1536 |
NPT |
Newport (Teeside) |
DAR |
Darlington |
|
28/03/1943 |
Reallocation |
1539 |
NPT |
Newport (Teeside) |
DAR |
Darlington |
|
28/03/1943 |
Reallocation |
1540 |
WHL |
West Hartlepool |
DAR |
Darlington |
|
28/03/1943 |
Reallocation |
1543 |
NPT |
Newport (Teeside) |
DAR |
Darlington |
|
28/03/1943 |
Reallocation |
1544 |
NPT |
Newport (Teeside) |
DAR |
Darlington |
|
28/03/1943 |
Reallocation |
1545 |
WHL |
West Hartlepool |
DAR |
Darlington |
|
28/03/1943 |
Reallocation |
1547 |
WHL |
West Hartlepool |
DAR |
Darlington |
|
28/03/1943 |
Reallocation |
1577 |
TDK |
Tyne Dock |
DAR |
Darlington |
|
28/03/1943 |
Reallocation |
1580 |
TDK |
Tyne Dock |
DAR |
Darlington |
|
28/03/1943 |
Reallocation |
1585 |
BLA |
Blaydon |
DAR |
Darlington |
|
28/03/1943 |
Reallocation |
1586 |
MID |
Middlesbrough |
DAR |
Darlington |
|
28/03/1943 |
Reallocation |
1587 |
HAV |
Haverton Hill |
BLA |
Blaydon |
|
28/03/1943 |
Reallocation |
1508 |
HLD |
Hull Dairycoates |
SKN |
Stockton |
|
28/03/1943 |
Reallocation |
1509 |
HLD |
Hull Dairycoates |
SKN |
Stockton |
|
28/03/1943 |
Reallocation |
1537 |
NPT |
Newport (Teeside) |
DAR |
Darlington |
|
28/03/1943 |
Reallocation |
1538 |
NPT |
Newport (Teeside) |
DAR |
Darlington |
|
28/03/1943 |
Reallocation |
1541 |
NPT |
Newport (Teeside) |
DAR |
Darlington |
|
28/03/1943 |
Reallocation |
1542 |
NPT |
Newport (Teeside) |
DAR |
Darlington |
|
28/03/1943 |
Reallocation |
1546 |
NPT |
Newport (Teeside) |
DAR |
Darlington |
|
28/03/1943 |
Reallocation |
1548 |
NPT |
Newport (Teeside) |
DAR |
Darlington |
|
28/03/1943 |
Reallocation |
1558 |
MID |
Middlesbrough |
DAR |
Darlington |
|
28/03/1943 |
Reallocation |
1835 |
SEL |
Selby |
DAR |
Darlington |
|
28/03/1943 |
Reallocation |
1896 |
CON |
Consett |
DAR |
Darlington |
|
13/04/1943 |
Reallocation |
2977 |
EFD |
Eastfield |
ABD |
Aberdeen Ferryhill |
|
17/04/1943 |
Reallocation |
2731 |
EFD |
Eastfield |
STM |
St Margarets |
|
17/04/1943 |
Reallocation |
2732 |
EFD |
Eastfield |
STM |
St Margarets |
|
17/04/1943 |
Reallocation |
2733 |
EFD |
Eastfield |
STM |
St Margarets |
|
17/04/1943 |
Reallocation |
2978 |
EFD |
Eastfield |
ABD |
Aberdeen Ferryhill |
|
17/04/1943 |
Reallocation |
2979 |
EFD |
Eastfield |
ABD |
Aberdeen Ferryhill |
|
17/04/1943 |
Reallocation |
2980 |
EFD |
Eastfield |
ABD |
Aberdeen Ferryhill |
|
17/04/1943 |
Reallocation |
1804 |
PKD |
Parkhead |
EFD |
Eastfield |
|
03/05/1943 |
Reallocation |
1286 |
GOR |
Gorton |
LIV |
Brunswick |
|
25/05/1943 |
Reallocation |
2771 |
MAR |
March |
STR |
Stratford |
|
25/05/1943 |
Reallocation |
1965 |
MAR |
March |
STR |
Stratford |
|
27/05/1943 |
Reallocation |
1269 |
MAR |
March |
STR |
Stratford |
|
28/05/1943 |
Reallocation |
2772 |
MAR |
March |
STR |
Stratford |
|
03/06/1943 |
Reallocation |
2775 |
MAR |
March |
STR |
Stratford |
|
05/06/1943 |
Reallocation |
1268 |
STR |
Stratford |
CLK |
Colwick |
|
08/06/1943 |
Reallocation |
1952 |
NWE |
New England |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
09/06/1943 |
Reallocation |
1267 |
MAR |
March |
STR |
Stratford |
|
09/06/1943 |
Reallocation |
1927 |
NWE |
New England |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
10/06/1943 |
Reallocation |
1493 |
NWE |
New England |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
13/06/1943 |
Reallocation |
2946 |
MAR |
March |
STR |
Stratford |
|
15/06/1943 |
Reallocation |
2951 |
MAR |
March |
STR |
Stratford |
|
18/06/1943 |
Reallocation |
1926 |
NWE |
New England |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
19/06/1943 |
Reallocation |
1453 |
HAV |
Haverton Hill |
BLA |
Blaydon |
|
19/06/1943 |
Reallocation |
1469 |
HAV |
Haverton Hill |
BLA |
Blaydon |
|
19/06/1943 |
Reallocation |
1472 |
HAV |
Haverton Hill |
BLA |
Blaydon |
|
19/06/1943 |
Reallocation |
1509 |
SKN |
Stockton |
BLA |
Blaydon |
|
19/06/1943 |
Reallocation |
1551 |
SKN |
Stockton |
BLA |
Blaydon |
|
21/06/1943 |
Reallocation |
1487 |
SKN |
Stockton |
BLA |
Blaydon |
|
21/06/1943 |
Reallocation |
1468 |
SKN |
Stockton |
BLA |
Blaydon |
|
21/06/1943 |
Reallocation |
1490 |
SKN |
Stockton |
BLA |
Blaydon |
|
21/06/1943 |
Reallocation |
1508 |
SKN |
Stockton |
BLA |
Blaydon |
|
23/06/1943 |
Reallocation |
1470 |
SKN |
Stockton |
BLA |
Blaydon |
|
23/06/1943 |
Reallocation |
1482 |
DAR |
Darlington |
BLA |
Blaydon |
|
26/06/1943 |
Reallocation |
1471 |
DAR |
Darlington |
BLA |
Blaydon |
|
26/06/1943 |
Reallocation |
1463 |
DAR |
Darlington |
BLA |
Blaydon |
|
26/06/1943 |
Reallocation |
1533 |
DAR |
Darlington |
BLA |
Blaydon |
|
26/06/1943 |
Reallocation |
1544 |
DAR |
Darlington |
BLA |
Blaydon |
|
03/07/1943 |
Reallocation |
2984 |
STR |
Stratford |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
|
04/07/1943 |
Reallocation |
2969 |
MAR |
March |
NWE |
New England |
|
05/07/1943 |
Reallocation |
1480 |
DAR |
Darlington |
SBK |
Starbeck |
|
05/07/1943 |
Reallocation |
2950 |
MAR |
March |
NWE |
New England |
|
05/07/1943 |
Reallocation |
1545 |
DAR |
Darlington |
SBK |
Starbeck |
|
08/07/1943 |
Reallocation |
1412 |
DAR |
Darlington |
SBK |
Starbeck |
|
08/07/1943 |
Reallocation |
1534 |
DAR |
Darlington |
SBK |
Starbeck |
|
10/07/1943 |
Reallocation |
1475 |
DAR |
Darlington |
SBK |
Starbeck |
|
10/07/1943 |
Reallocation |
1479 |
DAR |
Darlington |
SBK |
Starbeck |
|
11/07/1943 |
Reallocation |
2788 |
EFD |
Eastfield |
DAR |
Darlington |
|
14/07/1943 |
Reallocation |
1489 |
DAR |
Darlington |
SBK |
Starbeck |
|
14/07/1943 |
Reallocation |
1485 |
DAR |
Darlington |
SBK |
Starbeck |
|
14/07/1943 |
Reallocation |
1532 |
DAR |
Darlington |
SBK |
Starbeck |
|
14/07/1943 |
Reallocation |
1542 |
DAR |
Darlington |
SBK |
Starbeck |
|
14/07/1943 |
Reallocation |
1548 |
DAR |
Darlington |
BLA |
Blaydon |
|
16/07/1943 |
Reallocation |
1449 |
DAR |
Darlington |
BLA |
Blaydon |
|
16/07/1943 |
Reallocation |
1266 |
MAR |
March |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
16/07/1943 |
Reallocation |
2965 |
MAR |
March |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
16/07/1943 |
Reallocation |
2988 |
MAR |
March |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
16/07/1943 |
Reallocation |
1543 |
DAR |
Darlington |
BLA |
Blaydon |
|
16/07/1943 |
Reallocation |
1585 |
DAR |
Darlington |
BLA |
Blaydon |
|
18/07/1943 |
Reallocation |
1804 |
EFD |
Eastfield |
DAR |
Darlington |
|
27/07/1943 |
Reallocation |
1536 |
DAR |
Darlington |
BLA |
Blaydon |
|
27/07/1943 |
Reallocation |
1547 |
DAR |
Darlington |
BLA |
Blaydon |
|
27/07/1943 |
Reallocation |
1580 |
DAR |
Darlington |
BLA |
Blaydon |
|
08/1943 |
Reallocation |
1863 |
EFD |
Eastfield |
DEE |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
|
03/08/1943 |
Reallocation |
1448 |
DAR |
Darlington |
BLA |
Blaydon |
|
03/08/1943 |
Reallocation |
1456 |
DAR |
Darlington |
BLA |
Blaydon |
|
03/08/1943 |
Reallocation |
1481 |
DAR |
Darlington |
BLA |
Blaydon |
|
03/08/1943 |
Reallocation |
1476 |
DAR |
Darlington |
BLA |
Blaydon |
|
08/08/1943 |
Reallocation |
3089 |
ANN |
Annesley |
CLK |
Colwick |
|
09/08/1943 |
Reallocation |
1287 |
ANN |
Annesley |
CLK |
Colwick |
|
09/08/1943 |
Reallocation |
1289 |
ANN |
Annesley |
CLK |
Colwick |
|
09/08/1943 |
Reallocation |
2780 |
ANN |
Annesley |
CLK |
Colwick |
|
09/08/1943 |
Reallocation |
2781 |
ANN |
Annesley |
CLK |
Colwick |
|
09/08/1943 |
Reallocation |
2975 |
ANN |
Annesley |
CLK |
Colwick |
|
14/08/1943 |
Reallocation |
2710 |
LEI |
Leicester (G.C.) |
CLK |
Colwick |
|
18/08/1943 |
Reallocation |
2738 |
EFD |
Eastfield |
DAR |
Darlington |
|
18/08/1943 |
Reallocation |
2739 |
POL |
Polmont |
DEE |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
|
21/08/1943 |
Reallocation |
1484 |
DON |
Doncaster |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
21/08/1943 |
Reallocation |
1977 |
DON |
Doncaster |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
22/08/1943 |
Reallocation |
1835 |
DAR |
Darlington |
BLA |
Blaydon |
|
28/08/1943 |
Reallocation |
1880 |
EFD |
Eastfield |
DAR |
Darlington |
|
29/08/1943 |
Reallocation |
1259 |
MAR |
March |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
29/08/1943 |
Reallocation |
2983 |
GRA |
Grantham |
NWE |
New England |
|
29/08/1943 |
Reallocation |
3097 |
GRA |
Grantham |
NWE |
New England |
|
05/09/1943 |
Reallocation |
1930 |
DON |
Doncaster |
STR |
Stratford |
|
07/09/1943 |
Reallocation |
2992 |
STR |
Stratford |
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
08/09/1943 |
Reallocation |
1459 |
BLA |
Blaydon |
TWD |
Tweedmouth |
|
08/09/1943 |
Reallocation |
1563 |
BLA |
Blaydon |
TWD.1 |
Alnmouth |
|
08/09/1943 |
Reallocation |
1587 |
BLA |
Blaydon |
TWD |
Tweedmouth |
|
08/09/1943 |
Reallocation |
1508 |
BLA |
Blaydon |
TWD |
Tweedmouth |
|
09/09/1943 |
Reallocation |
2973 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
STR |
Stratford |
|
11/09/1943 |
Reallocation |
2699 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
IPS |
Ipswich |
|
12/09/1943 |
Reallocation |
2774 |
MAR |
March |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
12/09/1943 |
Reallocation |
2973 |
STR |
Stratford |
IPS |
Ipswich |
|
14/09/1943 |
Reallocation |
2953 |
DON |
Doncaster |
STR |
Stratford |
|
15/09/1943 |
Reallocation |
2994 |
IPS |
Ipswich |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
16/09/1943 |
Reallocation |
2708 |
MAR |
March |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
16/09/1943 |
Reallocation |
2972 |
MAR |
March |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
23/09/1943 |
Reallocation |
2787 |
EFD |
Eastfield |
DAR |
Darlington |
|
30/09/1943 |
Reallocation |
2775 |
STR |
Stratford |
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
03/10/1943 |
Reallocation |
1289 |
CLK |
Colwick |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
03/10/1943 |
Reallocation |
2781 |
CLK |
Colwick |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
06/10/1943 |
Reallocation |
2968 |
MAR |
March |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
17/10/1943 |
Reallocation |
2989 |
IPS |
Ipswich |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
24/10/1943 |
Reallocation |
1266 |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
IPS |
Ipswich |
|
26/10/1943 |
Reallocation |
2780 |
CLK |
Colwick |
DAR |
Darlington |
|
30/10/1943 |
Reallocation |
1495 |
GOR |
Gorton |
ANN |
Annesley |
|
30/10/1943 |
Reallocation |
1497 |
GOR |
Gorton |
ANN |
Annesley |
|
30/10/1943 |
Reallocation |
1498 |
GOR |
Gorton |
ANN |
Annesley |
|
30/10/1943 |
Reallocation |
1289 |
GOR |
Gorton |
ANN |
Annesley |
|
30/10/1943 |
Reallocation |
2697 |
GOR |
Gorton |
ANN |
Annesley |
|
30/10/1943 |
Reallocation |
1927 |
GOR |
Gorton |
ANN |
Annesley |
|
05/11/1943 |
Reallocation |
1286 |
LIV |
Brunswick |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
05/11/1943 |
Reallocation |
1296 |
LIV |
Brunswick |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
06/11/1943 |
Reallocation |
1273 |
CLK |
Colwick |
DAR |
Darlington |
|
07/11/1943 |
Reallocation |
1259 |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
IPS |
Ipswich |
|
07/11/1943 |
Reallocation |
2774 |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
IPS |
Ipswich |
|
13/11/1943 |
Reallocation |
2778 |
STR |
Stratford |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
|
22/11/1943 |
Reallocation |
3088 |
STM |
St Margarets |
DAR |
Darlington |
|
25/11/1943 |
Reallocation |
2788 |
DAR |
Darlington |
STM |
St Margarets |
|
05/12/1943 |
Reallocation |
1274 |
GOR |
Gorton |
13D |
Shoeburyness |
|
05/12/1943 |
Reallocation |
1286 |
GOR |
Gorton |
13D |
Shoeburyness |
|
12/12/1943 |
Reallocation |
2977 |
ABD |
Aberdeen Ferryhill |
CAR |
Carlisle Canal |
|
12/12/1943 |
Reallocation |
2979 |
ABD |
Aberdeen Ferryhill |
DEE |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
|
12/12/1943 |
Reallocation |
2980 |
ABD |
Aberdeen Ferryhill |
DEE |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
|
01/01/1944 |
Reallocation |
1274 |
13D |
Shoeburyness |
SHF |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
01/01/1944 |
Reallocation |
1286 |
13D |
Shoeburyness |
SHF |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
23/01/1944 |
Reallocation |
1494 |
IMM |
Immingham |
LIN |
Lincoln |
|
18/03/1944 |
Reallocation |
1996 |
GRA |
Grantham |
BOS |
Boston |
|
03/05/1944 |
Reallocation |
3092 |
STM |
St Margarets |
DAR |
Darlington |
|
23/05/1944 |
Reallocation |
2948 |
SHF |
Sheffield Neepsend |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
25/05/1944 |
Reallocation |
3084 |
SHF |
Sheffield Neepsend |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
01/06/1944 |
Reallocation |
2705 |
DON |
Doncaster |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
11/06/1944 |
Reallocation |
1943 |
DON |
Doncaster |
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
22/06/1944 |
Reallocation |
1539 |
DAR |
Darlington |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
24/06/1944 |
Reallocation |
2721 |
STR |
Stratford |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
|
24/06/1944 |
Reallocation |
2771 |
STR |
Stratford |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
|
24/06/1944 |
Reallocation |
2942 |
STR |
Stratford |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
|
21/07/1944 |
Reallocation |
2952 |
GRA |
Grantham |
NWE |
New England |
|
06/09/1944 |
Reallocation |
2985 |
STR |
Stratford |
IPS |
Ipswich |
|
06/09/1944 |
Reallocation |
1984 |
STR |
Stratford |
IPS |
Ipswich |
|
07/09/1944 |
Reallocation |
1930 |
STR |
Stratford |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
13/09/1944 |
Reallocation |
2772 |
STR |
Stratford |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
15/09/1944 |
Reallocation |
1450 |
DAR |
Darlington |
LIN |
Lincoln |
|
15/09/1944 |
Reallocation |
1538 |
DAR |
Darlington |
LIN |
Lincoln |
|
17/09/1944 |
Reallocation |
1980 |
BFD |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
22/09/1944 |
Reallocation |
2777 |
STR |
Stratford |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
25/09/1944 |
Reallocation |
2953 |
STR |
Stratford |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
29/09/1944 |
Reallocation |
2776 |
STR |
Stratford |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
07/01/1945 |
Reallocation |
2703 |
STR |
Stratford |
DAR |
Darlington |
|
07/01/1945 |
Reallocation |
2993 |
STR |
Stratford |
DAR |
Darlington |
|
16/02/1945 |
Reallocation |
2780 |
DAR |
Darlington |
CLK |
Colwick |
|
05/03/1945 |
Reallocation |
2731 |
STM |
St Margarets |
CAR |
Carlisle Canal |
|
22/03/1945 |
Reallocation |
1429 |
BLA |
Blaydon |
TWD.1 |
Alnmouth |
|
05/04/1945 |
Reallocation |
1273 |
DAR |
Darlington |
CLK |
Colwick |
|
16/04/1945 |
Reallocation |
2693 |
BOS |
Boston |
GRA |
Grantham |
|
16/04/1945 |
Reallocation |
2695 |
BOS |
Boston |
NWE |
New England |
|
16/04/1945 |
Reallocation |
1996 |
BOS |
Boston |
NWE |
New England |
|
02/05/1945 |
Reallocation |
1233 |
GOR |
Gorton |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
02/05/1945 |
Reallocation |
2705 |
GOR |
Gorton |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
17/06/1945 |
Reallocation |
1450 |
LIN |
Lincoln |
IMM |
Immingham |
|
17/06/1945 |
Reallocation |
1494 |
LIN |
Lincoln |
IMM |
Immingham |
|
17/06/1945 |
Reallocation |
2966 |
LIN |
Lincoln |
IMM |
Immingham |
|
23/06/1945 |
Reallocation |
2721 |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
STR |
Stratford |
|
23/06/1945 |
Reallocation |
2728 |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
STR |
Stratford |
|
23/06/1945 |
Reallocation |
2771 |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
STR |
Stratford |
|
23/06/1945 |
Reallocation |
2942 |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
STR |
Stratford |
|
01/07/1945 |
Reallocation |
2950 |
NWE |
New England |
LIN |
Lincoln |
|
01/07/1945 |
Reallocation |
2952 |
NWE |
New England |
LIN |
Lincoln |
|
01/07/1945 |
Reallocation |
3000 |
SHF |
Sheffield Neepsend |
LIN |
Lincoln |
|
01/07/1945 |
Reallocation |
3081 |
SHF |
Sheffield Neepsend |
LIN |
Lincoln |
|
23/07/1945 |
Reallocation |
1459 |
TWD |
Tweedmouth |
DAR |
Darlington |
|
23/07/1945 |
Reallocation |
1418 |
BLA |
Blaydon |
DAR |
Darlington |
|
23/07/1945 |
Reallocation |
1468 |
BLA |
Blaydon |
DAR |
Darlington |
|
23/07/1945 |
Reallocation |
1544 |
BLA |
Blaydon |
DAR |
Darlington |
|
23/07/1945 |
Reallocation |
1587 |
TWD |
Tweedmouth |
DAR |
Darlington |
|
23/07/1945 |
Reallocation |
1508 |
TWD |
Tweedmouth |
DAR |
Darlington |
|
23/07/1945 |
Reallocation |
1551 |
BLA |
Blaydon |
DAR |
Darlington |
|
30/07/1945 |
Reallocation |
2706 |
BFD |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
30/07/1945 |
Reallocation |
2974 |
BFD |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
30/07/1945 |
Reallocation |
2981 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
30/07/1945 |
Reallocation |
2998 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
30/07/1945 |
Reallocation |
1943 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
30/07/1945 |
Reallocation |
1980 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
01/08/1945 |
Reallocation |
1997 |
GRA |
Grantham |
NWE |
New England |
|
02/08/1945 |
Reallocation |
1996 |
NWE |
New England |
GRA |
Grantham |
|
20/08/1945 |
Reallocation |
2732 |
STM |
St Margarets |
CAR |
Carlisle Canal |
|
20/08/1945 |
Reallocation |
2733 |
STM |
St Margarets |
CAR |
Carlisle Canal |
|
20/08/1945 |
Reallocation |
2737 |
STM |
St Margarets |
CAR |
Carlisle Canal |
|
20/08/1945 |
Reallocation |
3085 |
STM |
St Margarets |
CAR |
Carlisle Canal |
|
20/08/1945 |
Reallocation |
3096 |
STM |
St Margarets |
HAW |
Hawick |
|
16/09/1945 |
Reallocation |
1255 |
GOR |
Gorton |
LIN |
Lincoln |
|
16/09/1945 |
Reallocation |
1272 |
GOR |
Gorton |
LIN |
Lincoln |
|
16/09/1945 |
Reallocation |
1275 |
GOR |
Gorton |
LIN |
Lincoln |
|
23/09/1945 |
Reallocation |
1494 |
IMM |
Immingham |
LIN |
Lincoln |
|
30/09/1945 |
Reallocation |
1265 |
TFD |
Trafford Park (LNER) |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
30/09/1945 |
Reallocation |
1290 |
TFD |
Trafford Park (LNER) |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
21/10/1945 |
Reallocation |
1450 |
IMM |
Immingham |
LIN |
Lincoln |
|
18/11/1945 |
Reallocation |
3097 |
NWE |
New England |
GRA |
Grantham |
|
09/12/1945 |
Reallocation |
2966 |
IMM |
Immingham |
LIN |
Lincoln |
|
31/12/1945 |
Reallocation |
2969 |
NWE |
New England |
GRA |
Grantham |
|
31/12/1945 |
Reallocation |
1996 |
GRA |
Grantham |
NWE |
New England |
|
06/01/1946 |
Reallocation |
2983 |
NWE |
New England |
GRA |
Grantham |
|
14/01/1946 |
Reallocation |
1268 |
CLK |
Colwick |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
14/01/1946 |
Reallocation |
1269 |
STR |
Stratford |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
14/01/1946 |
Reallocation |
1412 |
SBK |
Starbeck |
DAR |
Darlington |
|
14/01/1946 |
Reallocation |
1464 |
SBK |
Starbeck |
DAR |
Darlington |
|
14/01/1946 |
Reallocation |
1542 |
SBK |
Starbeck |
DAR |
Darlington |
|
17/01/1946 |
Reallocation |
2983 |
GRA |
Grantham |
NWE |
New England |
|
19/01/1946 |
Reallocation |
1267 |
STR |
Stratford |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
|
19/01/1946 |
Reallocation |
1277 |
STR |
Stratford |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
|
19/01/1946 |
Reallocation |
2718 |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
STR |
Stratford |
|
19/01/1946 |
Reallocation |
2720 |
COL |
Colchester |
STR |
Stratford |
|
19/01/1946 |
Reallocation |
2723 |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
STR |
Stratford |
|
28/01/1946 |
Reallocation |
2991 |
STR |
Stratford |
IPS |
Ipswich |
|
31/03/1946 |
Reallocation |
1854 |
CLK |
Colwick |
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
31/03/1946 |
Reallocation |
1857 |
CLK |
Colwick |
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
31/03/1946 |
Reallocation |
4952 |
CLK |
Colwick |
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
07/04/1946 |
Reallocation |
2771 |
STR |
Stratford |
IPS |
Ipswich |
|
15/04/1946 |
Reallocation |
2773 |
STR |
Stratford |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
17/04/1946 |
Reallocation |
2991 |
IPS |
Ipswich |
LOW |
Lowestoft |
|
26/04/1946 |
Reallocation |
2965 |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
IPS |
Ipswich |
|
26/04/1946 |
Reallocation |
2968 |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
IPS |
Ipswich |
|
30/04/1946 |
Reallocation |
1266 |
IPS |
Ipswich |
LOW |
Lowestoft |
|
19/05/1946 |
Reallocation |
2771 |
IPS |
Ipswich |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
08/06/1946 |
Reallocation |
4727 |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
STR |
Stratford |
|
08/06/1946 |
Reallocation |
4733 |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
STR |
Stratford |
|
15/06/1946 |
Reallocation |
2979 |
DEE |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
CAR |
Carlisle Canal |
|
15/06/1946 |
Reallocation |
2980 |
DEE |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
CAR |
Carlisle Canal |
|
15/07/1946 |
Reallocation |
4784 |
CAR |
Carlisle Canal |
THJ |
Thornton Junction |
|
15/07/1946 |
Reallocation |
2734 |
DEE |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
CAR |
Carlisle Canal |
|
28/07/1946 |
Reallocation |
1854 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
SHF |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
28/07/1946 |
Reallocation |
4952 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
SHF |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
29/07/1946 |
Reallocation |
2777 |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
IPS |
Ipswich |
|
29/07/1946 |
Reallocation |
2991 |
LOW |
Lowestoft |
IPS |
Ipswich |
|
04/08/1946 |
Reallocation |
4753 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
SHF |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
18/08/1946 |
Reallocation |
4729 |
CLK |
Colwick |
NWE |
New England |
|
18/08/1946 |
Reallocation |
4738 |
CLK |
Colwick |
NWE |
New England |
|
18/08/1946 |
Reallocation |
2696 |
CLK |
Colwick |
BFD |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
|
18/08/1946 |
Reallocation |
2780 |
CLK |
Colwick |
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
18/08/1946 |
Reallocation |
2785 |
CLK |
Colwick |
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
18/08/1946 |
Reallocation |
4836 |
CLK |
Colwick |
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
18/08/1946 |
Reallocation |
3089 |
CLK |
Colwick |
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
18/08/1946 |
Reallocation |
3095 |
CLK |
Colwick |
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
23/08/1946 |
Reallocation |
2987 |
CLK |
Colwick |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
23/08/1946 |
Reallocation |
4908 |
CLK |
Colwick |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
23/08/1946 |
Reallocation |
4910 |
CLK |
Colwick |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
23/08/1946 |
Reallocation |
4984 |
CLK |
Colwick |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
14/09/1946 |
Reallocation |
4951 |
CLK |
Colwick |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
22/09/1946 |
Reallocation |
4737 |
SHF |
Sheffield Darnall |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
22/09/1946 |
Reallocation |
4909 |
SHF |
Sheffield Darnall |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
22/09/1946 |
Reallocation |
4952 |
SHF |
Sheffield Darnall |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
22/09/1946 |
Reallocation |
4968 |
IPS |
Ipswich |
LOW |
Lowestoft |
|
22/09/1946 |
Reallocation |
4976 |
SHF |
Sheffield Neepsend |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
28/09/1946 |
Reallocation |
2969 |
GRA |
Grantham |
RET |
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
|
28/09/1946 |
Reallocation |
4906 |
GRA |
Grantham |
RET |
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
|
28/09/1946 |
Reallocation |
4987 |
GRA |
Grantham |
RET |
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
|
29/09/1946 |
Reallocation |
4815 |
TWD.1 |
Alnmouth |
BLA |
Blaydon |
|
29/09/1946 |
Reallocation |
4924 |
TWD.1 |
Alnmouth |
BLA |
Blaydon |
|
06/10/1946 |
Reallocation |
2985 |
IPS |
Ipswich |
LOW |
Lowestoft |
|
06/10/1946 |
Reallocation |
4912 |
IPS |
Ipswich |
LOW |
Lowestoft |
|
06/10/1946 |
Reallocation |
4959 |
IPS |
Ipswich |
LOW |
Lowestoft |
|
06/10/1946 |
Reallocation |
1997 |
NWE |
New England |
RET |
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
|
07/10/1946 |
Reallocation |
2983 |
NWE |
New England |
RET |
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
|
08/10/1946 |
Reallocation |
4833 |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
YAR |
Yarmouth South Town |
|
09/10/1946 |
Reallocation |
2772 |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
YAR |
Yarmouth South Town |
|
13/10/1946 |
Reallocation |
2982 |
GRA |
Grantham |
RET |
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
|
13/10/1946 |
Reallocation |
4956 |
GRA |
Grantham |
RET |
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
|
20/10/1946 |
Reallocation |
4718 |
GOR |
Gorton |
BRN |
Barnsley |
|
20/10/1946 |
Reallocation |
4735 |
GOR |
Gorton |
BRN |
Barnsley |
|
20/10/1946 |
Reallocation |
2999 |
SHF |
Sheffield Neepsend |
BRN |
Barnsley |
|
20/10/1946 |
Reallocation |
4972 |
SHF |
Sheffield Neepsend |
BRN |
Barnsley |
|
20/10/1946 |
Reallocation |
4974 |
GOR |
Gorton |
BRN |
Barnsley |
|
24/10/1946 |
Reallocation |
2784 |
SHF |
Sheffield Neepsend |
BRN |
Barnsley |
|
24/10/1946 |
Reallocation |
2948 |
GOR |
Gorton |
BRN |
Barnsley |
|
27/10/1946 |
Reallocation |
4732 |
SHF |
Sheffield Darnall |
BRN |
Barnsley |
|
04/11/1946 |
Reallocation |
4784 |
THJ |
Thornton Junction |
DEE |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
|
07/11/1946 |
Reallocation |
2988 |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
IPS |
Ipswich |
|
07/11/1946 |
Reallocation |
4957 |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
IPS |
Ipswich |
|
08/12/1946 |
Reallocation |
2951 |
STR |
Stratford |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
10/12/1946 |
Reallocation |
4798 |
YAR |
Yarmouth South Town |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
11/12/1946 |
Reallocation |
4913 |
STR |
Stratford |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
22/12/1946 |
Reallocation |
4734 |
LIN |
Lincoln |
IMM |
Immingham |
|
22/12/1946 |
Reallocation |
4827 |
LIN |
Lincoln |
IMM |
Immingham |
|
22/12/1946 |
Reallocation |
4828 |
LIN |
Lincoln |
IMM |
Immingham |
|
22/12/1946 |
Reallocation |
4937 |
LIN |
Lincoln |
IMM |
Immingham |
|
22/12/1946 |
Reallocation |
4971 |
LIN |
Lincoln |
IMM |
Immingham |
|
27/12/1946 |
Reallocation |
4833 |
YAR |
Yarmouth South Town |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
30/12/1946 |
Reallocation |
4791 |
DAR |
Darlington |
SALT |
Saltburn |
|
10/01/1947 |
Reallocation |
4791 |
SALT |
Saltburn |
DAR |
Darlington |
|
10/01/1947 |
Reallocation |
4943 |
DAR |
Darlington |
MID |
Middlesbrough |
|
12/01/1947 |
Reallocation |
4945 |
DAR |
Darlington |
MID |
Middlesbrough |
|
19/01/1947 |
Reallocation |
4938 |
DAR |
Darlington |
AUK |
West Auckland |
|
29/01/1947 |
Reallocation |
4945 |
MID |
Middlesbrough |
DAR |
Darlington |
|
30/01/1947 |
Reallocation |
4938 |
AUK |
West Auckland |
DAR |
Darlington |
|
09/02/1947 |
Reallocation |
4746 |
GRA |
Grantham |
NWE |
New England |
|
09/02/1947 |
Reallocation |
4965 |
GRA |
Grantham |
NWE |
New England |
|
10/02/1947 |
Reallocation |
4986 |
HAW |
Hawick |
STM |
St Margarets |
|
01/03/1947 |
Reallocation |
4943 |
MID |
Middlesbrough |
DAR |
Darlington |
|
07/03/1947 |
Reallocation |
4788 |
CAR |
Carlisle Canal |
STR |
Stratford |
|
17/03/1947 |
Reallocation |
4888 |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
CAR |
Carlisle Canal |
|
20/03/1947 |
Reallocation |
4787 |
CAR |
Carlisle Canal |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
|
20/03/1947 |
Reallocation |
4875 |
STR |
Stratford |
CAR |
Carlisle Canal |
|
24/03/1947 |
Reallocation |
4838 |
CAR |
Carlisle Canal |
IPS |
Ipswich |
|
24/03/1947 |
Reallocation |
4912 |
LOW |
Lowestoft |
CAR |
Carlisle Canal |
|
26/03/1947 |
Reallocation |
4726 |
LOW |
Lowestoft |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
26/03/1947 |
Reallocation |
4889 |
LOW |
Lowestoft |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
26/03/1947 |
Reallocation |
4959 |
LOW |
Lowestoft |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
26/03/1947 |
Reallocation |
4968 |
LOW |
Lowestoft |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
28/03/1947 |
Reallocation |
4785 |
CAR |
Carlisle Canal |
IPS |
Ipswich |
|
28/03/1947 |
Reallocation |
4895 |
IPS |
Ipswich |
CAR |
Carlisle Canal |
|
30/03/1947 |
Reallocation |
4716 |
ANN |
Annesley |
CLK |
Colwick |
|
30/03/1947 |
Reallocation |
4719 |
ANN |
Annesley |
CLK |
Colwick |
|
30/03/1947 |
Reallocation |
4720 |
ANN |
Annesley |
CLK |
Colwick |
|
30/03/1947 |
Reallocation |
4739 |
ANN |
Annesley |
CLK |
Colwick |
|
30/03/1947 |
Reallocation |
4747 |
ANN |
Annesley |
CLK |
Colwick |
|
30/03/1947 |
Reallocation |
4750 |
ANN |
Annesley |
CLK |
Colwick |
|
30/03/1947 |
Reallocation |
4757 |
ANN |
Annesley |
CLK |
Colwick |
|
30/03/1947 |
Reallocation |
4762 |
ANN |
Annesley |
CLK |
Colwick |
|
30/03/1947 |
Reallocation |
4805 |
ANN |
Annesley |
CLK |
Colwick |
|
30/03/1947 |
Reallocation |
4955 |
ANN |
Annesley |
CLK |
Colwick |
|
30/03/1947 |
Reallocation |
4980 |
ANN |
Annesley |
CLK |
Colwick |
|
06/04/1947 |
Reallocation |
4714 |
GOR |
Gorton |
LIV |
Brunswick |
|
06/04/1947 |
Reallocation |
4954 |
GOR |
Gorton |
LIV |
Brunswick |
|
08/04/1947 |
Reallocation |
4964 |
IPS |
Ipswich |
CAR |
Carlisle Canal |
|
13/04/1947 |
Reallocation |
4744 |
TFD |
Trafford Park (LNER) |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
13/04/1947 |
Reallocation |
4815 |
BLA |
Blaydon |
TWD.1 |
Alnmouth |
|
13/04/1947 |
Reallocation |
4824 |
TFD |
Trafford Park (LNER) |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
13/04/1947 |
Reallocation |
4880 |
IPS |
Ipswich |
CAR |
Carlisle Canal |
|
13/04/1947 |
Reallocation |
4914 |
SBK |
Starbeck |
DAR |
Darlington |
|
13/04/1947 |
Reallocation |
4916 |
SBK |
Starbeck |
DAR |
Darlington |
|
13/04/1947 |
Reallocation |
4924 |
BLA |
Blaydon |
TWD.1 |
Alnmouth |
|
15/04/1947 |
Reallocation |
4841 |
CAR |
Carlisle Canal |
IPS |
Ipswich |
|
15/04/1947 |
Reallocation |
4899 |
STR |
Stratford |
CAR |
Carlisle Canal |
|
20/04/1947 |
Reallocation |
4838 |
IPS |
Ipswich |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
21/04/1947 |
Reallocation |
4986 |
STM |
St Margarets |
CAR |
Carlisle Canal |
|
22/04/1947 |
Reallocation |
4789 |
CAR |
Carlisle Canal |
STR |
Stratford |
|
27/04/1947 |
Reallocation |
4718 |
BRN |
Barnsley |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
27/04/1947 |
Reallocation |
4732 |
BRN |
Barnsley |
CLK |
Colwick |
|
27/04/1947 |
Reallocation |
4734 |
IMM |
Immingham |
LIN |
Lincoln |
|
27/04/1947 |
Reallocation |
4735 |
BRN |
Barnsley |
CLK |
Colwick |
|
27/04/1947 |
Reallocation |
4827 |
IMM |
Immingham |
CLK |
Colwick |
|
27/04/1947 |
Reallocation |
4828 |
IMM |
Immingham |
CLK |
Colwick |
|
27/04/1947 |
Reallocation |
4879 |
BRN |
Barnsley |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
27/04/1947 |
Reallocation |
4903 |
BRN |
Barnsley |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
27/04/1947 |
Reallocation |
4937 |
IMM |
Immingham |
LIN |
Lincoln |
|
27/04/1947 |
Reallocation |
4971 |
IMM |
Immingham |
LIN |
Lincoln |
|
27/04/1947 |
Reallocation |
4972 |
BRN |
Barnsley |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
27/04/1947 |
Reallocation |
4974 |
BRN |
Barnsley |
CLK |
Colwick |
|
30/04/1947 |
Reallocation |
4822 |
STM |
St Margarets |
DEE |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
|
01/05/1947 |
Reallocation |
4793 |
CAR |
Carlisle Canal |
IPS |
Ipswich |
|
10/05/1947 |
Reallocation |
4787 |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
STR |
Stratford |
|
10/05/1947 |
Reallocation |
4788 |
STR |
Stratford |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
|
28/05/1947 |
Reallocation |
4810 |
BRN |
Barnsley |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
10/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
4892 |
IPS |
Ipswich |
CAR |
Carlisle Canal |
|
15/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
4820 |
DEE |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
IPS |
Ipswich |
|
18/06/1947 |
Reallocation |
4786 |
CAR |
Carlisle Canal |
DEE |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
|
02/07/1947 |
Reallocation |
4730 |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
STR |
Stratford |
|
02/07/1947 |
Reallocation |
4953 |
IPS |
Ipswich |
STR |
Stratford |
|
18/09/1947 |
Reallocation |
4877 |
STR |
Stratford |
CAR |
Carlisle Canal |
|
20/09/1947 |
Reallocation |
4963 |
STR |
Stratford |
CAR |
Carlisle Canal |
|
21/09/1947 |
Reallocation |
4784 |
DEE |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
23/09/1947 |
Reallocation |
4839 |
ABD |
Aberdeen Ferryhill |
STR |
Stratford |
|
23/09/1947 |
Reallocation |
4884 |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
CAR |
Carlisle Canal |
|
24/09/1947 |
Reallocation |
4840 |
CAR |
Carlisle Canal |
STR |
Stratford |
|
25/09/1947 |
Reallocation |
4727 |
STR |
Stratford |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
|
25/09/1947 |
Reallocation |
4765 |
STR |
Stratford |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
|
28/09/1947 |
Reallocation |
4790 |
CAR |
Carlisle Canal |
DEE |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
|
05/10/1947 |
Reallocation |
4759 |
DON |
Doncaster |
RET |
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
|
05/10/1947 |
Reallocation |
4898 |
DON |
Doncaster |
RET |
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
|
05/10/1947 |
Reallocation |
4908 |
DON |
Doncaster |
RET |
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
|
05/10/1947 |
Reallocation |
4961 |
DON |
Doncaster |
RET |
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
|
12/10/1947 |
Reallocation |
4798 |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
YAR |
Yarmouth South Town |
|
16/10/1947 |
Reallocation |
4975 |
CAR |
Carlisle Canal |
ABD |
Aberdeen Ferryhill |
|
17/10/1947 |
Reallocation |
4725 |
GOR |
Gorton |
SHF |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
17/10/1947 |
Reallocation |
4903 |
GOR |
Gorton |
SHF |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
26/10/1947 |
Reallocation |
4868 |
DAR |
Darlington |
TWD.1 |
Alnmouth |
|
12/11/1947 |
Reallocation |
4798 |
YAR |
Yarmouth South Town |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
12/11/1947 |
Reallocation |
4799 |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
YAR |
Yarmouth South Town |
|
16/11/1947 |
Reallocation |
4749 |
BFD |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
30/11/1947 |
Reallocation |
4749 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
COP |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
|
28/12/1947 |
Reallocation |
4867 |
DAR |
Darlington |
HLD |
Hull Dairycoates |
|
28/12/1947 |
Reallocation |
4914 |
DAR |
Darlington |
HLD |
Hull Dairycoates |
|
03/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4867 |
HLD |
Hull Dairycoates |
HLD |
Hull Dairycoates |
|
03/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4914 |
HLD |
Hull Dairycoates |
HLD |
Hull Dairycoates |
|
04/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4778 |
DAR |
Darlington |
AUK |
West Auckland |
|
04/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4799 |
YAR |
Yarmouth South Town |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
04/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4848 |
DAR |
Darlington |
AUK |
West Auckland |
|
04/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4863 |
DAR |
Darlington |
TWD |
Tweedmouth |
|
04/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4864 |
DAR |
Darlington |
HLD |
Hull Dairycoates |
|
04/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4897 |
DAR |
Darlington |
HLD |
Hull Dairycoates |
|
04/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4931 |
DAR |
Darlington |
HLD |
Hull Dairycoates |
|
04/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4939 |
DAR |
Darlington |
HLD |
Hull Dairycoates |
|
04/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4949 |
DAR |
Darlington |
TWD |
Tweedmouth |
|
10/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4778 |
AUK |
West Auckland |
AUK |
West Auckland |
|
10/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4799 |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
10/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4848 |
AUK |
West Auckland |
AUK |
West Auckland |
|
10/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4863 |
TWD |
Tweedmouth |
TWD |
Tweedmouth |
|
10/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4864 |
HLD |
Hull Dairycoates |
HLD |
Hull Dairycoates |
|
10/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4897 |
HLD |
Hull Dairycoates |
HLD |
Hull Dairycoates |
|
10/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4931 |
HLD |
Hull Dairycoates |
HLD |
Hull Dairycoates |
|
10/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4939 |
HLD |
Hull Dairycoates |
HLD |
Hull Dairycoates |
|
10/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4949 |
TWD |
Tweedmouth |
TWD |
Tweedmouth |
|
18/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4953 |
STR |
Stratford |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
|
24/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
4953 |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
|
08/02/1948 |
Reallocation |
4783 |
STR |
Stratford |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
|
08/02/1948 |
Reallocation |
4789 |
STR |
Stratford |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
|
14/02/1948 |
Reallocation |
4783 |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
|
14/02/1948 |
Reallocation |
4789 |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
|
15/02/1948 |
Reallocation |
4865 |
DAR |
Darlington |
BLA |
Blaydon |
|
15/02/1948 |
Reallocation |
4870 |
DAR |
Darlington |
HLD |
Hull Dairycoates |
|
15/02/1948 |
Reallocation |
4936 |
DAR |
Darlington |
BOR |
Borough Gardens |
|
21/02/1948 |
Reallocation |
4865 |
BLA |
Blaydon |
BLA |
Blaydon |
|
21/02/1948 |
Reallocation |
4870 |
HLD |
Hull Dairycoates |
HLD |
Hull Dairycoates |
|
21/02/1948 |
Reallocation |
4936 |
BOR |
Borough Gardens |
BOR |
Borough Gardens |
|
24/02/1948 |
Reallocation |
4949 |
TWD |
Tweedmouth |
BLA |
Blaydon |
|
28/02/1948 |
Reallocation |
4711 |
BLA |
Blaydon |
TWD |
Tweedmouth |
|
28/02/1948 |
Reallocation |
4813 |
BLA |
Blaydon |
TWD |
Tweedmouth |
|
28/02/1948 |
Reallocation |
4863 |
TWD |
Tweedmouth |
BLA |
Blaydon |
|
28/02/1948 |
Reallocation |
4949 |
BLA |
Blaydon |
BLA |
Blaydon |
|
01/03/1948 |
Reallocation |
4928 |
DAR |
Darlington |
HLD |
Hull Dairycoates |
|
01/03/1948 |
Reallocation |
4978 |
DAR |
Darlington |
HLD |
Hull Dairycoates |
|
06/03/1948 |
Reallocation |
4928 |
HLD |
Hull Dairycoates |
HLD |
Hull Dairycoates |
|
06/03/1948 |
Reallocation |
4978 |
HLD |
Hull Dairycoates |
HLD |
Hull Dairycoates |
|
22/03/1948 |
Reallocation |
4946 |
CAR |
Carlisle Canal |
STM |
St Margarets |
|
22/03/1948 |
Reallocation |
4963 |
CAR |
Carlisle Canal |
STM |
St Margarets |
|
22/03/1948 |
Reallocation |
4986 |
CAR |
Carlisle Canal |
STM |
St Margarets |
|
27/03/1948 |
Reallocation |
4946 |
STM |
St Margarets |
STM |
St Margarets |
|
27/03/1948 |
Reallocation |
4963 |
STM |
St Margarets |
STM |
St Margarets |
|
27/03/1948 |
Reallocation |
4986 |
STM |
St Margarets |
STM |
St Margarets |
|
18/04/1948 |
Reallocation |
4868 |
MLP |
|
DAR |
Darlington |
|
02/05/1948 |
Reallocation |
4749 |
COP |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
09/05/1948 |
Reallocation |
4926 |
BLA |
Blaydon |
HLD |
Hull Dairycoates |
|
09/05/1948 |
Reallocation |
4927 |
BLA |
Blaydon |
HLD |
Hull Dairycoates |
|
09/05/1948 |
Reallocation |
4941 |
BLA |
Blaydon |
HLD |
Hull Dairycoates |
|
13/05/1948 |
Reallocation |
4714 |
LIV |
Brunswick |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
15/05/1948 |
Reallocation |
4714 |
GOR |
Gorton |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
15/05/1948 |
Reallocation |
4926 |
HLD |
Hull Dairycoates |
HLD |
Hull Dairycoates |
|
15/05/1948 |
Reallocation |
4927 |
HLD |
Hull Dairycoates |
HLD |
Hull Dairycoates |
|
15/05/1948 |
Reallocation |
4941 |
HLD |
Hull Dairycoates |
HLD |
Hull Dairycoates |
|
16/05/1948 |
Reallocation |
4868 |
DAR |
Darlington |
TWD.1 |
Alnmouth |
|
16/05/1948 |
Reallocation |
4929 |
DAR |
Darlington |
BOR |
Borough Gardens |
|
22/05/1948 |
Reallocation |
4929 |
BOR |
Borough Gardens |
BOR |
Borough Gardens |
|
13/06/1948 |
Reallocation |
4710 |
DAR |
Darlington |
MID |
Middlesbrough |
|
13/06/1948 |
Reallocation |
4819 |
DAR |
Darlington |
MID |
Middlesbrough |
|
19/06/1948 |
Reallocation |
4710 |
MID |
Middlesbrough |
MID |
Middlesbrough |
|
19/06/1948 |
Reallocation |
4819 |
MID |
Middlesbrough |
MID |
Middlesbrough |
|
27/06/1948 |
Reallocation |
4756 |
DAR |
Darlington |
MID |
Middlesbrough |
|
03/07/1948 |
Reallocation |
4756 |
MID |
Middlesbrough |
MID |
Middlesbrough |
|
17/07/1948 |
Reallocation |
64791 |
DAR |
Darlington |
DAR |
Darlington |
|
25/07/1948 |
Reallocation |
4847 |
DAR |
Darlington |
MID |
Middlesbrough |
|
31/07/1948 |
Reallocation |
4847 |
MID |
Middlesbrough |
MID |
Middlesbrough |
|
29/08/1948 |
Reallocation |
4812 |
DAR |
Darlington |
BLA |
Blaydon |
|
29/08/1948 |
Reallocation |
4858 |
DAR |
Darlington |
BLA |
Blaydon |
|
29/08/1948 |
Reallocation |
4919 |
DAR |
Darlington |
SBK |
Starbeck |
|
29/08/1948 |
Reallocation |
64925 |
DAR |
Darlington |
BLA |
Blaydon |
|
29/08/1948 |
Reallocation |
4940 |
DAR |
Darlington |
BLA |
Blaydon |
|
29/08/1948 |
Reallocation |
4942 |
DAR |
Darlington |
SBK |
Starbeck |
|
29/08/1948 |
Reallocation |
4982 |
DAR |
Darlington |
BLA |
Blaydon |
|
04/09/1948 |
Reallocation |
4812 |
BLA |
Blaydon |
BLA |
Blaydon |
|
04/09/1948 |
Reallocation |
4858 |
BLA |
Blaydon |
BLA |
Blaydon |
|
04/09/1948 |
Reallocation |
4919 |
SBK |
Starbeck |
SBK |
Starbeck |
|
04/09/1948 |
Reallocation |
64925 |
BLA |
Blaydon |
BLA |
Blaydon |
|
04/09/1948 |
Reallocation |
4940 |
BLA |
Blaydon |
BLA |
Blaydon |
|
04/09/1948 |
Reallocation |
4942 |
SBK |
Starbeck |
SBK |
Starbeck |
|
04/09/1948 |
Reallocation |
4982 |
BLA |
Blaydon |
BLA |
Blaydon |
|
07/11/1948 |
Reallocation |
4709 |
BLA |
Blaydon |
HTN |
Heaton |
|
07/11/1948 |
Reallocation |
4817 |
BLA |
Blaydon |
HTN |
Heaton |
|
07/11/1948 |
Reallocation |
4863 |
BLA |
Blaydon |
HTN |
Heaton |
|
07/11/1948 |
Reallocation |
4865 |
BLA |
Blaydon |
HTN |
Heaton |
|
07/11/1948 |
Reallocation |
64915 |
BLA |
Blaydon |
HTN |
Heaton |
|
07/11/1948 |
Reallocation |
4920 |
BLA |
Blaydon |
HTN |
Heaton |
|
07/11/1948 |
Reallocation |
4923 |
BLA |
Blaydon |
HTN |
Heaton |
|
07/11/1948 |
Reallocation |
4934 |
BLA |
Blaydon |
HTN |
Heaton |
|
07/11/1948 |
Reallocation |
64947 |
BLA |
Blaydon |
HTN |
Heaton |
|
13/11/1948 |
Reallocation |
4709 |
HTN |
Heaton |
HTN |
Heaton |
|
13/11/1948 |
Reallocation |
4817 |
HTN |
Heaton |
HTN |
Heaton |
|
13/11/1948 |
Reallocation |
4863 |
HTN |
Heaton |
HTN |
Heaton |
|
13/11/1948 |
Reallocation |
4865 |
HTN |
Heaton |
HTN |
Heaton |
|
13/11/1948 |
Reallocation |
64915 |
HTN |
Heaton |
HTN |
Heaton |
|
13/11/1948 |
Reallocation |
4920 |
HTN |
Heaton |
HTN |
Heaton |
|
13/11/1948 |
Reallocation |
4923 |
HTN |
Heaton |
HTN |
Heaton |
|
13/11/1948 |
Reallocation |
4934 |
HTN |
Heaton |
HTN |
Heaton |
|
13/11/1948 |
Reallocation |
64947 |
HTN |
Heaton |
HTN |
Heaton |
|
14/11/1948 |
Reallocation |
64869 |
DAR |
Darlington |
BLA |
Blaydon |
|
14/11/1948 |
Reallocation |
4938 |
DAR |
Darlington |
SBK |
Starbeck |
|
14/11/1948 |
Reallocation |
4945 |
DAR |
Darlington |
HTN |
Heaton |
|
20/11/1948 |
Reallocation |
64869 |
BLA |
Blaydon |
BLA |
Blaydon |
|
20/11/1948 |
Reallocation |
4938 |
SBK |
Starbeck |
SBK |
Starbeck |
|
20/11/1948 |
Reallocation |
4945 |
HTN |
Heaton |
HTN |
Heaton |
|
12/12/1948 |
Reallocation |
64862 |
DAR |
Darlington |
WHL |
West Hartlepool |
|
12/12/1948 |
Reallocation |
64916 |
DAR |
Darlington |
WHL |
West Hartlepool |
|
18/12/1948 |
Reallocation |
64862 |
WHL |
West Hartlepool |
WHL |
West Hartlepool |
|
18/12/1948 |
Reallocation |
64916 |
WHL |
West Hartlepool |
WHL |
West Hartlepool |
|
16/01/1949 |
Reallocation |
64730 |
STR |
Stratford |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
|
16/01/1949 |
Reallocation |
4765 |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
STR |
Stratford |
|
16/01/1949 |
Reallocation |
4783 |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
STR |
Stratford |
|
16/01/1949 |
Reallocation |
64787 |
STR |
Stratford |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
|
22/01/1949 |
Reallocation |
64730 |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
|
22/01/1949 |
Reallocation |
4765 |
STR |
Stratford |
STR |
Stratford |
|
22/01/1949 |
Reallocation |
64787 |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
|
20/03/1949 |
Reallocation |
4978 |
HLD |
Hull Dairycoates |
WHL |
West Hartlepool |
|
26/03/1949 |
Reallocation |
4978 |
WHL |
West Hartlepool |
WHL |
West Hartlepool |
|
10/04/1949 |
Reallocation |
4886 |
RET |
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
COP |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
|
10/04/1949 |
Reallocation |
64887 |
RET |
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
COP |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
|
16/04/1949 |
Reallocation |
4886 |
COP |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
COP |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
|
16/04/1949 |
Reallocation |
64887 |
COP |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
COP |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
|
15/05/1949 |
Reallocation |
64766 |
STR |
Stratford |
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
15/05/1949 |
Reallocation |
64767 |
STR |
Stratford |
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
15/05/1949 |
Reallocation |
4768 |
STR |
Stratford |
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
21/05/1949 |
Reallocation |
64766 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
21/05/1949 |
Reallocation |
64767 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
21/05/1949 |
Reallocation |
4768 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
23/05/1949 |
Reallocation |
64982 |
BLA |
Blaydon |
TWD |
Tweedmouth |
|
05/06/1949 |
Reallocation |
64843 |
BLA |
Blaydon |
TWD |
Tweedmouth |
|
11/06/1949 |
Reallocation |
64843 |
TWD |
Tweedmouth |
TWD |
Tweedmouth |
|
12/06/1949 |
Reallocation |
64879 |
GOR |
Gorton |
LIV |
Brunswick |
|
19/06/1949 |
Reallocation |
64834 |
IPS |
Ipswich |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
17/07/1949 |
Reallocation |
64854 |
BLA |
Blaydon |
TWD |
Tweedmouth |
|
23/07/1949 |
Reallocation |
64854 |
TWD |
Tweedmouth |
TWD |
Tweedmouth |
|
14/08/1949 |
Reallocation |
64844 |
BLA |
Blaydon |
TWD |
Tweedmouth |
|
14/08/1949 |
Reallocation |
64879 |
LIV |
Brunswick |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
14/08/1949 |
Reallocation |
64925 |
BLA |
Blaydon |
TWD |
Tweedmouth |
|
04/09/1949 |
Reallocation |
64705 |
BLA |
Blaydon |
HLD |
Hull Dairycoates |
|
04/09/1949 |
Reallocation |
64812 |
BLA |
Blaydon |
HLD |
Hull Dairycoates |
|
04/09/1949 |
Reallocation |
64858 |
BLA |
Blaydon |
HLD |
Hull Dairycoates |
|
10/09/1949 |
Reallocation |
64705 |
HLD |
Hull Dairycoates |
HLD |
Hull Dairycoates |
|
10/09/1949 |
Reallocation |
64812 |
HLD |
Hull Dairycoates |
HLD |
Hull Dairycoates |
|
10/09/1949 |
Reallocation |
64858 |
HLD |
Hull Dairycoates |
HLD |
Hull Dairycoates |
|
18/09/1949 |
Reallocation |
64701 |
BLA |
Blaydon |
GHD |
Gateshead |
|
18/09/1949 |
Reallocation |
4704 |
BLA |
Blaydon |
GHD |
Gateshead |
|
18/09/1949 |
Reallocation |
64707 |
BLA |
Blaydon |
GHD |
Gateshead |
|
18/09/1949 |
Reallocation |
64766 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
STR |
Stratford |
|
18/09/1949 |
Reallocation |
4768 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
STR |
Stratford |
|
18/09/1949 |
Reallocation |
64839 |
STR |
Stratford |
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
18/09/1949 |
Reallocation |
64840 |
STR |
Stratford |
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
18/09/1949 |
Reallocation |
64853 |
BLA |
Blaydon |
GHD |
Gateshead |
|
18/09/1949 |
Reallocation |
64871 |
BLA |
Blaydon |
GHD |
Gateshead |
|
18/09/1949 |
Reallocation |
4907 |
STR |
Stratford |
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
24/09/1949 |
Reallocation |
64701 |
GHD |
Gateshead |
GHD |
Gateshead |
|
24/09/1949 |
Reallocation |
4704 |
GHD |
Gateshead |
GHD |
Gateshead |
|
24/09/1949 |
Reallocation |
64707 |
GHD |
Gateshead |
GHD |
Gateshead |
|
24/09/1949 |
Reallocation |
64766 |
STR |
Stratford |
STR |
Stratford |
|
24/09/1949 |
Reallocation |
64767 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
STR |
Stratford |
|
24/09/1949 |
Reallocation |
4768 |
STR |
Stratford |
STR |
Stratford |
|
24/09/1949 |
Reallocation |
64853 |
GHD |
Gateshead |
GHD |
Gateshead |
|
24/09/1949 |
Reallocation |
64871 |
GHD |
Gateshead |
GHD |
Gateshead |
|
24/09/1949 |
Reallocation |
4907 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
25/09/1949 |
Reallocation |
64725 |
SHF |
Sheffield Darnall |
LIN |
Lincoln |
|
25/09/1949 |
Reallocation |
64861 |
SBK |
Starbeck |
SCA |
Scarborough |
|
25/09/1949 |
Reallocation |
4919 |
SBK |
Starbeck |
SCA |
Scarborough |
|
25/09/1949 |
Reallocation |
64935 |
SBK |
Starbeck |
SCA |
Scarborough |
|
28/09/1949 |
Reallocation |
64767 |
STR |
Stratford |
STR |
Stratford |
|
01/10/1949 |
Reallocation |
64725 |
LIN |
Lincoln |
LIN |
Lincoln |
|
01/10/1949 |
Reallocation |
64861 |
SCA |
Scarborough |
SCA |
Scarborough |
|
01/10/1949 |
Reallocation |
4919 |
SCA |
Scarborough |
SCA |
Scarborough |
|
01/10/1949 |
Reallocation |
64935 |
SCA |
Scarborough |
SCA |
Scarborough |
|
02/10/1949 |
Reallocation |
64705 |
HLD |
Hull Dairycoates |
BLA |
Blaydon |
|
02/10/1949 |
Reallocation |
64812 |
HLD |
Hull Dairycoates |
BLA |
Blaydon |
|
02/10/1949 |
Reallocation |
64858 |
HLD |
Hull Dairycoates |
BLA |
Blaydon |
|
08/10/1949 |
Reallocation |
64705 |
BLA |
Blaydon |
BLA |
Blaydon |
|
08/10/1949 |
Reallocation |
64812 |
BLA |
Blaydon |
BLA |
Blaydon |
|
08/10/1949 |
Reallocation |
64858 |
BLA |
Blaydon |
BLA |
Blaydon |
|
12/10/1949 |
Reallocation |
64733 |
STR |
Stratford |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
16/10/1949 |
Reallocation |
64727 |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
16/10/1949 |
Reallocation |
64733 |
GOR |
Gorton |
TFD |
Trafford Park (LNER) |
|
16/10/1949 |
Reallocation |
64873 |
STR |
Stratford |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
|
18/10/1949 |
Reallocation |
64727 |
GOR |
Gorton |
TFD |
Trafford Park (LNER) |
|
19/10/1949 |
Reallocation |
64834 |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
IPS |
Ipswich |
|
22/10/1949 |
Reallocation |
64873 |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
|
23/10/1949 |
Reallocation |
4856 |
BLA |
Blaydon |
HTN |
Heaton |
|
23/10/1949 |
Reallocation |
4917 |
BLA |
Blaydon |
TWD |
Tweedmouth |
|
29/10/1949 |
Reallocation |
4856 |
HTN |
Heaton |
HTN |
Heaton |
|
29/10/1949 |
Reallocation |
4917 |
TWD |
Tweedmouth |
TWD |
Tweedmouth |
|
29/10/1949 |
Reallocation |
64982 |
TWD |
Tweedmouth |
TWD |
Tweedmouth |
|
11/12/1949 |
Reallocation |
64748 |
NWE |
New England |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
11/12/1949 |
Reallocation |
4805 |
CLK |
Colwick |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
14/12/1949 |
Reallocation |
64918 |
GOR |
Gorton |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
15/12/1949 |
Reallocation |
64732 |
CLK |
Colwick |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
17/12/1949 |
Reallocation |
64748 |
GOR |
Gorton |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
17/12/1949 |
Reallocation |
4805 |
GOR |
Gorton |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
18/12/1949 |
Reallocation |
64794 |
ABD |
Aberdeen Ferryhill |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
24/12/1949 |
Reallocation |
64794 |
64A |
St Margarets |
STM |
St Margarets |
|
25/12/1949 |
Reallocation |
4805 |
GOR |
Gorton |
BID |
Bidston |
|
01/01/1950 |
Reallocation |
4805 |
BID |
Bidston |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
03/01/1950 |
Reallocation |
64741 |
GOR |
Gorton |
BID |
Bidston |
|
10/01/1950 |
Reallocation |
64741 |
BID |
Bidston |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
15/01/1950 |
Reallocation |
64821 |
DAR |
Darlington |
MID |
Middlesbrough |
|
20/01/1950 |
Reallocation |
64966 |
GOR |
Gorton |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
21/01/1950 |
Reallocation |
64821 |
MID |
Middlesbrough |
MID |
Middlesbrough |
|
22/01/1950 |
Reallocation |
64746 |
NWE |
New England |
SHF |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
22/01/1950 |
Reallocation |
4846 |
BLA |
Blaydon |
BOR |
Borough Gardens |
|
22/01/1950 |
Reallocation |
4969 |
NWE |
New England |
SHF |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
28/01/1950 |
Reallocation |
64746 |
SHF |
Sheffield Darnall |
SHF |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
28/01/1950 |
Reallocation |
4846 |
BOR |
Borough Gardens |
BOR |
Borough Gardens |
|
28/01/1950 |
Reallocation |
4969 |
SHF |
Sheffield Darnall |
SHF |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
29/01/1950 |
Reallocation |
64791 |
DAR |
Darlington |
NEV |
Neville Hill |
|
29/01/1950 |
Reallocation |
64850 |
DAR |
Darlington |
NEV |
Neville Hill |
|
29/01/1950 |
Reallocation |
64921 |
DAR |
Darlington |
NEV |
Neville Hill |
|
29/01/1950 |
Reallocation |
64943 |
DAR |
Darlington |
NEV |
Neville Hill |
|
04/02/1950 |
Reallocation |
64791 |
NEV |
Neville Hill |
NEV |
Neville Hill |
|
04/02/1950 |
Reallocation |
64850 |
NEV |
Neville Hill |
NEV |
Neville Hill |
|
04/02/1950 |
Reallocation |
64921 |
NEV |
Neville Hill |
NEV |
Neville Hill |
|
04/02/1950 |
Reallocation |
64943 |
NEV |
Neville Hill |
NEV |
Neville Hill |
|
12/02/1950 |
Reallocation |
64863 |
HTN |
Heaton |
50B |
Neville Hill |
|
12/02/1950 |
Reallocation |
64920 |
HTN |
Heaton |
50B |
Neville Hill |
|
12/02/1950 |
Reallocation |
4934 |
HTN |
Heaton |
50B |
Neville Hill |
|
18/02/1950 |
Reallocation |
64863 |
50B |
Neville Hill |
50B |
Neville Hill |
|
18/02/1950 |
Reallocation |
64920 |
50B |
Neville Hill |
50B |
Neville Hill |
|
18/02/1950 |
Reallocation |
4934 |
50B |
Neville Hill |
50B |
Neville Hill |
|
19/03/1950 |
Reallocation |
64729 |
NWE |
New England |
38A |
Colwick |
|
25/03/1950 |
Reallocation |
64729 |
38A |
Colwick |
38A |
Colwick |
|
26/03/1950 |
Reallocation |
64965 |
NWE |
New England |
38A |
Colwick |
|
16/04/1950 |
Reallocation |
64798 |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
38E |
Woodford Halse |
|
16/04/1950 |
Reallocation |
64838 |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
38E |
Woodford Halse |
|
16/04/1950 |
Reallocation |
64872 |
IPS |
Ipswich |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
30/04/1950 |
Reallocation |
64724 |
IPS |
Ipswich |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
30/04/1950 |
Reallocation |
64799 |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
37A |
Ardsley |
|
30/04/1950 |
Reallocation |
64872 |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
37A |
Ardsley |
|
14/05/1950 |
Reallocation |
4805 |
GOR |
Gorton |
38A |
Colwick |
|
14/05/1950 |
Reallocation |
64807 |
GOR |
Gorton |
38A |
Colwick |
|
22/05/1950 |
Reallocation |
64733 |
TFD |
Trafford Park (LNER) |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
22/05/1950 |
Reallocation |
64954 |
LIV |
Brunswick |
TFD |
Trafford Park (LNER) |
|
04/06/1950 |
Reallocation |
64730 |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
40A |
Lincoln |
|
04/06/1950 |
Reallocation |
64779 |
STR |
Stratford |
30F |
Parkeston Quay |
|
04/06/1950 |
Reallocation |
64780 |
STR |
Stratford |
30F |
Parkeston Quay |
|
04/06/1950 |
Reallocation |
4783 |
STR |
Stratford |
30F |
Parkeston Quay |
|
04/06/1950 |
Reallocation |
64789 |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
40A |
Lincoln |
|
04/06/1950 |
Reallocation |
64804 |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
40A |
Lincoln |
|
04/06/1950 |
Reallocation |
4886 |
COP |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
40A |
Lincoln |
|
04/06/1950 |
Reallocation |
64887 |
COP |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
40A |
Lincoln |
|
11/06/1950 |
Reallocation |
64738 |
NWE |
New England |
40A |
Lincoln |
|
18/06/1950 |
Reallocation |
64770 |
STR |
Stratford |
30F |
Parkeston Quay |
|
18/06/1950 |
Reallocation |
64777 |
STR |
Stratford |
30F |
Parkeston Quay |
|
18/06/1950 |
Reallocation |
64780 |
30F |
Parkeston Quay |
30A |
Stratford |
|
18/06/1950 |
Reallocation |
4783 |
30F |
Parkeston Quay |
30A |
Stratford |
|
25/06/1950 |
Reallocation |
64710 |
MID |
Middlesbrough |
51A |
Darlington |
|
25/06/1950 |
Reallocation |
64756 |
MID |
Middlesbrough |
51A |
Darlington |
|
25/06/1950 |
Reallocation |
4819 |
MID |
Middlesbrough |
51A |
Darlington |
|
30/06/1950 |
Reallocation |
64730 |
40A |
Lincoln |
40A |
Lincoln |
|
30/06/1950 |
Reallocation |
64738 |
40A |
Lincoln |
40A |
Lincoln |
|
30/06/1950 |
Reallocation |
64770 |
30F |
Parkeston Quay |
30F |
Parkeston Quay |
|
30/06/1950 |
Reallocation |
64777 |
30F |
Parkeston Quay |
30F |
Parkeston Quay |
|
30/06/1950 |
Reallocation |
64779 |
30F |
Parkeston Quay |
30F |
Parkeston Quay |
|
30/06/1950 |
Reallocation |
64780 |
30A |
Stratford |
30A |
Stratford |
|
30/06/1950 |
Reallocation |
64789 |
40A |
Lincoln |
40A |
Lincoln |
|
30/06/1950 |
Reallocation |
64804 |
40A |
Lincoln |
40A |
Lincoln |
|
30/06/1950 |
Reallocation |
64887 |
40A |
Lincoln |
40A |
Lincoln |
|
09/07/1950 |
Reallocation |
64869 |
BLA |
Blaydon |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
23/07/1950 |
Reallocation |
64861 |
SCA |
Scarborough |
50D |
Starbeck |
|
30/07/1950 |
Reallocation |
64756 |
51A |
Darlington |
51F |
West Auckland |
|
20/08/1950 |
Reallocation |
64949 |
BLA |
Blaydon |
50B |
Neville Hill |
|
27/08/1950 |
Reallocation |
4819 |
51A |
Darlington |
50B |
Neville Hill |
|
03/09/1950 |
Reallocation |
64710 |
51A |
Darlington |
50B |
Neville Hill |
|
10/09/1950 |
Reallocation |
64933 |
DAR |
Darlington |
50B |
Neville Hill |
|
01/10/1950 |
Reallocation |
64919 |
SCA |
Scarborough |
50B |
Neville Hill |
|
01/10/1950 |
Reallocation |
64922 |
SBK |
Starbeck |
50B |
Neville Hill |
|
08/10/1950 |
Reallocation |
64798 |
38E |
Woodford Halse |
38A |
Colwick |
|
08/10/1950 |
Reallocation |
64838 |
38E |
Woodford Halse |
38A |
Colwick |
|
15/10/1950 |
Reallocation |
4708 |
STR |
Stratford |
32B |
Ipswich |
|
15/10/1950 |
Reallocation |
64767 |
STR |
Stratford |
32B |
Ipswich |
|
15/10/1950 |
Reallocation |
64771 |
STR |
Stratford |
32B |
Ipswich |
|
16/10/1950 |
Reallocation |
4708 |
32B |
Ipswich |
32B |
Ipswich |
|
16/10/1950 |
Reallocation |
64767 |
32B |
Ipswich |
32B |
Ipswich |
|
16/10/1950 |
Reallocation |
64771 |
32B |
Ipswich |
32B |
Ipswich |
|
22/10/1950 |
Reallocation |
4708 |
32B |
Ipswich |
30A |
Stratford |
|
22/10/1950 |
Reallocation |
4773 |
STR |
Stratford |
32B |
Ipswich |
|
28/10/1950 |
Reallocation |
4708 |
30A |
Stratford |
30A |
Stratford |
|
28/10/1950 |
Reallocation |
4773 |
32B |
Ipswich |
32B |
Ipswich |
|
19/11/1950 |
Reallocation |
64817 |
HTN |
Heaton |
51A |
Darlington |
|
19/11/1950 |
Reallocation |
64940 |
BLA |
Blaydon |
51A |
Darlington |
|
19/11/1950 |
Reallocation |
64982 |
TWD |
Tweedmouth |
51A |
Darlington |
|
30/11/1950 |
Reallocation |
64817 |
51A |
Darlington |
51A |
Darlington |
|
30/11/1950 |
Reallocation |
64940 |
51A |
Darlington |
51A |
Darlington |
|
30/11/1950 |
Reallocation |
64982 |
51A |
Darlington |
51A |
Darlington |
|
03/12/1950 |
Reallocation |
64864 |
HLD |
Hull Dairycoates |
54C |
Borough Gardens |
|
03/12/1950 |
Reallocation |
64939 |
HLD |
Hull Dairycoates |
54C |
Borough Gardens |
|
24/12/1950 |
Reallocation |
64870 |
HLD |
Hull Dairycoates |
54C |
Borough Gardens |
|
24/12/1950 |
Reallocation |
64897 |
HLD |
Hull Dairycoates |
54C |
Borough Gardens |
|
24/12/1950 |
Reallocation |
64931 |
HLD |
Hull Dairycoates |
54C |
Borough Gardens |
|
31/12/1950 |
Reallocation |
64864 |
54C |
Borough Gardens |
54C |
Borough Gardens |
|
31/12/1950 |
Reallocation |
64870 |
54C |
Borough Gardens |
54C |
Borough Gardens |
|
31/12/1950 |
Reallocation |
64897 |
54C |
Borough Gardens |
54C |
Borough Gardens |
|
31/12/1950 |
Reallocation |
64931 |
54C |
Borough Gardens |
54C |
Borough Gardens |
|
31/12/1950 |
Reallocation |
64939 |
54C |
Borough Gardens |
54C |
Borough Gardens |
|
07/01/1951 |
Reallocation |
64727 |
TFD |
Trafford Park (LNER) |
12B |
Carlisle Canal |
|
07/01/1951 |
Reallocation |
64733 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
12B |
Carlisle Canal |
|
07/01/1951 |
Reallocation |
64817 |
51A |
Darlington |
51D |
Middlesbrough |
|
07/01/1951 |
Reallocation |
64935 |
SCA |
Scarborough |
50B |
Neville Hill |
|
07/01/1951 |
Reallocation |
64940 |
51A |
Darlington |
51D |
Middlesbrough |
|
14/01/1951 |
Reallocation |
64771 |
32B |
Ipswich |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
19/01/1951 |
Reallocation |
4773 |
32B |
Ipswich |
30A |
Stratford |
|
21/01/1951 |
Reallocation |
64820 |
IPS |
Ipswich |
37A |
Ardsley |
|
21/01/1951 |
Reallocation |
64833 |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
37A |
Ardsley |
|
28/01/1951 |
Reallocation |
64984 |
DON |
Doncaster |
36E |
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
|
31/01/1951 |
Reallocation |
64727 |
12B |
Carlisle Canal |
12B |
Carlisle Canal |
|
31/01/1951 |
Reallocation |
64733 |
12B |
Carlisle Canal |
12B |
Carlisle Canal |
|
31/01/1951 |
Reallocation |
64767 |
32B |
Ipswich |
30A |
Stratford |
|
31/01/1951 |
Reallocation |
64771 |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
31/01/1951 |
Reallocation |
4773 |
30A |
Stratford |
30A |
Stratford |
|
31/01/1951 |
Reallocation |
64817 |
51D |
Middlesbrough |
51D |
Middlesbrough |
|
31/01/1951 |
Reallocation |
64820 |
37A |
Ardsley |
37A |
Ardsley |
|
31/01/1951 |
Reallocation |
64833 |
37A |
Ardsley |
37A |
Ardsley |
|
31/01/1951 |
Reallocation |
64935 |
50B |
Neville Hill |
50B |
Neville Hill |
|
31/01/1951 |
Reallocation |
64940 |
51D |
Middlesbrough |
51D |
Middlesbrough |
|
04/02/1951 |
Reallocation |
64926 |
HLD |
Hull Dairycoates |
54C |
Borough Gardens |
|
04/02/1951 |
Reallocation |
64927 |
HLD |
Hull Dairycoates |
54C |
Borough Gardens |
|
25/02/1951 |
Reallocation |
64862 |
WHL |
West Hartlepool |
51D |
Middlesbrough |
|
03/03/1951 |
Reallocation |
64862 |
51D |
Middlesbrough |
51D |
Middlesbrough |
|
04/03/1951 |
Reallocation |
64852 |
BLA |
Blaydon |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
04/03/1951 |
Reallocation |
64865 |
HTN |
Heaton |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
04/03/1951 |
Reallocation |
64893 |
DON |
Doncaster |
36E |
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
|
04/03/1951 |
Reallocation |
64984 |
36E |
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
10/03/1951 |
Reallocation |
64852 |
52A |
Gateshead |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
10/03/1951 |
Reallocation |
64865 |
52A |
Gateshead |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
11/03/1951 |
Reallocation |
64723 |
TFD |
Trafford Park (LNER) |
38A |
Colwick |
|
11/03/1951 |
Reallocation |
64732 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
30A |
Stratford |
|
11/03/1951 |
Reallocation |
64738 |
40A |
Lincoln |
39A |
Gorton |
|
11/03/1951 |
Reallocation |
64823 |
TFD |
Trafford Park (LNER) |
38A |
Colwick |
|
11/03/1951 |
Reallocation |
64966 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
30A |
Stratford |
|
31/03/1951 |
Reallocation |
64738 |
39A |
Gorton |
39A |
Gorton |
|
31/03/1951 |
Reallocation |
64893 |
36E |
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
36E |
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
|
31/03/1951 |
Reallocation |
64984 |
36A |
Doncaster |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
01/04/1951 |
Reallocation |
64729 |
38A |
Colwick |
37A |
Ardsley |
|
01/04/1951 |
Reallocation |
64732 |
30A |
Stratford |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
01/04/1951 |
Reallocation |
64831 |
CLK |
Colwick |
37A |
Ardsley |
|
01/04/1951 |
Reallocation |
64901 |
TFD |
Trafford Park (LNER) |
9G |
Northwich |
|
01/04/1951 |
Reallocation |
64954 |
TFD |
Trafford Park (LNER) |
9G |
Northwich |
|
01/04/1951 |
Reallocation |
64966 |
30A |
Stratford |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
07/04/1951 |
Reallocation |
64729 |
37A |
Ardsley |
37A |
Ardsley |
|
07/04/1951 |
Reallocation |
64831 |
37A |
Ardsley |
37A |
Ardsley |
|
07/04/1951 |
Reallocation |
64901 |
9G |
Northwich |
9G |
Northwich |
|
07/04/1951 |
Reallocation |
64954 |
9G |
Northwich |
9G |
Northwich |
|
08/04/1951 |
Reallocation |
4824 |
GOR |
Gorton |
39B |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
08/04/1951 |
Reallocation |
64879 |
GOR |
Gorton |
39B |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
08/04/1951 |
Reallocation |
64962 |
GOR |
Gorton |
39B |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
08/04/1951 |
Reallocation |
64972 |
GOR |
Gorton |
39B |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
14/04/1951 |
Reallocation |
4824 |
39B |
Sheffield Darnall |
39B |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
14/04/1951 |
Reallocation |
64879 |
39B |
Sheffield Darnall |
39B |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
14/04/1951 |
Reallocation |
64962 |
39B |
Sheffield Darnall |
39B |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
21/04/1951 |
Reallocation |
64771 |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
30A |
Stratford |
|
20/05/1951 |
Reallocation |
64720 |
CLK |
Colwick |
37A |
Ardsley |
|
20/05/1951 |
Reallocation |
64757 |
CLK |
Colwick |
37A |
Ardsley |
|
20/05/1951 |
Reallocation |
64763 |
CLK |
Colwick |
37A |
Ardsley |
|
20/05/1951 |
Reallocation |
64781 |
STR |
Stratford |
30F |
Parkeston Quay |
|
20/05/1951 |
Reallocation |
64787 |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
37A |
Ardsley |
|
20/05/1951 |
Reallocation |
64837 |
CLK |
Colwick |
37A |
Ardsley |
|
20/05/1951 |
Reallocation |
64867 |
HLD |
Hull Dairycoates |
50B |
Neville Hill |
|
20/05/1951 |
Reallocation |
64941 |
HLD |
Hull Dairycoates |
54C |
Borough Gardens |
|
20/05/1951 |
Reallocation |
64981 |
CLK |
Colwick |
37A |
Ardsley |
|
26/05/1951 |
Reallocation |
64720 |
37A |
Ardsley |
37A |
Ardsley |
|
26/05/1951 |
Reallocation |
64757 |
37A |
Ardsley |
37A |
Ardsley |
|
26/05/1951 |
Reallocation |
64763 |
37A |
Ardsley |
37A |
Ardsley |
|
26/05/1951 |
Reallocation |
64781 |
30F |
Parkeston Quay |
30F |
Parkeston Quay |
|
26/05/1951 |
Reallocation |
64787 |
37A |
Ardsley |
37A |
Ardsley |
|
26/05/1951 |
Reallocation |
64837 |
37A |
Ardsley |
37A |
Ardsley |
|
26/05/1951 |
Reallocation |
64867 |
50B |
Neville Hill |
50B |
Neville Hill |
|
26/05/1951 |
Reallocation |
64941 |
54C |
Borough Gardens |
54C |
Borough Gardens |
|
26/05/1951 |
Reallocation |
64981 |
37A |
Ardsley |
37A |
Ardsley |
|
10/06/1951 |
Reallocation |
64867 |
50B |
Neville Hill |
50F |
Malton |
|
16/06/1951 |
Reallocation |
64867 |
50F |
Malton |
50F |
Malton |
|
24/06/1951 |
Reallocation |
64770 |
30F |
Parkeston Quay |
30A |
Stratford |
|
24/06/1951 |
Reallocation |
64781 |
30F |
Parkeston Quay |
30A |
Stratford |
|
24/06/1951 |
Reallocation |
64787 |
37A |
Ardsley |
30F |
Parkeston Quay |
|
24/06/1951 |
Reallocation |
64874 |
STR |
Stratford |
30F |
Parkeston Quay |
|
24/06/1951 |
Reallocation |
64876 |
STR |
Stratford |
37A |
Ardsley |
|
24/06/1951 |
Reallocation |
64900 |
IPS |
Ipswich |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
30/06/1951 |
Reallocation |
64770 |
30A |
Stratford |
30A |
Stratford |
|
30/06/1951 |
Reallocation |
64781 |
30A |
Stratford |
30A |
Stratford |
|
30/06/1951 |
Reallocation |
64787 |
30F |
Parkeston Quay |
30F |
Parkeston Quay |
|
30/06/1951 |
Reallocation |
64874 |
30F |
Parkeston Quay |
30F |
Parkeston Quay |
|
30/06/1951 |
Reallocation |
64876 |
37A |
Ardsley |
37A |
Ardsley |
|
30/06/1951 |
Reallocation |
64900 |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
01/07/1951 |
Reallocation |
64710 |
50B |
Neville Hill |
54C |
Borough Gardens |
|
01/07/1951 |
Reallocation |
64919 |
50B |
Neville Hill |
54C |
Borough Gardens |
|
01/07/1951 |
Reallocation |
64921 |
NEV |
Neville Hill |
54C |
Borough Gardens |
|
07/07/1951 |
Reallocation |
64710 |
54C |
Borough Gardens |
54C |
Borough Gardens |
|
07/07/1951 |
Reallocation |
64919 |
54C |
Borough Gardens |
54C |
Borough Gardens |
|
07/07/1951 |
Reallocation |
64921 |
54C |
Borough Gardens |
54C |
Borough Gardens |
|
08/07/1951 |
Reallocation |
64770 |
30A |
Stratford |
30F |
Parkeston Quay |
|
08/07/1951 |
Reallocation |
64779 |
30F |
Parkeston Quay |
30A |
Stratford |
|
28/07/1951 |
Reallocation |
64770 |
30F |
Parkeston Quay |
30F |
Parkeston Quay |
|
28/07/1951 |
Reallocation |
64779 |
30A |
Stratford |
30A |
Stratford |
|
05/08/1951 |
Reallocation |
64723 |
38A |
Colwick |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
12/08/1951 |
Reallocation |
64773 |
30A |
Stratford |
30F |
Parkeston Quay |
|
18/08/1951 |
Reallocation |
64773 |
30F |
Parkeston Quay |
30F |
Parkeston Quay |
|
02/09/1951 |
Reallocation |
64713 |
DON |
Doncaster |
53A |
Hull Dairycoates |
|
02/09/1951 |
Reallocation |
64725 |
LIN |
Lincoln |
53A |
Hull Dairycoates |
|
02/09/1951 |
Reallocation |
64730 |
40A |
Lincoln |
53A |
Hull Dairycoates |
|
02/09/1951 |
Reallocation |
64758 |
DON |
Doncaster |
51A |
Darlington |
|
02/09/1951 |
Reallocation |
64835 |
DON |
Doncaster |
50B |
Neville Hill |
|
02/09/1951 |
Reallocation |
64886 |
40A |
Lincoln |
50B |
Neville Hill |
|
02/09/1951 |
Reallocation |
64904 |
LIN |
Lincoln |
51A |
Darlington |
|
02/09/1951 |
Reallocation |
64910 |
DON |
Doncaster |
53A |
Hull Dairycoates |
|
02/09/1951 |
Reallocation |
64971 |
LIN |
Lincoln |
52B |
Heaton |
|
02/09/1951 |
Reallocation |
64977 |
DON |
Doncaster |
40A |
Lincoln |
|
02/09/1951 |
Reallocation |
64984 |
36A |
Doncaster |
40A |
Lincoln |
|
08/09/1951 |
Reallocation |
64758 |
51A |
Darlington |
51A |
Darlington |
|
08/09/1951 |
Reallocation |
64835 |
50B |
Neville Hill |
50B |
Neville Hill |
|
08/09/1951 |
Reallocation |
64886 |
50B |
Neville Hill |
50B |
Neville Hill |
|
08/09/1951 |
Reallocation |
64904 |
51A |
Darlington |
51A |
Darlington |
|
08/09/1951 |
Reallocation |
64971 |
52B |
Heaton |
52B |
Heaton |
|
08/09/1951 |
Reallocation |
64977 |
40A |
Lincoln |
40A |
Lincoln |
|
08/09/1951 |
Reallocation |
64984 |
40A |
Lincoln |
40A |
Lincoln |
|
30/09/1951 |
Reallocation |
64959 |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
32C |
Lowestoft |
|
06/10/1951 |
Reallocation |
64959 |
32C |
Lowestoft |
32C |
Lowestoft |
|
14/10/1951 |
Reallocation |
64803 |
IPS |
Ipswich |
30A |
Stratford |
|
14/10/1951 |
Reallocation |
64958 |
IPS |
Ipswich |
30A |
Stratford |
|
14/10/1951 |
Reallocation |
64959 |
32C |
Lowestoft |
30A |
Stratford |
|
20/10/1951 |
Reallocation |
64784 |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
30A |
Stratford |
|
20/10/1951 |
Reallocation |
64803 |
30A |
Stratford |
30A |
Stratford |
|
20/10/1951 |
Reallocation |
64958 |
30A |
Stratford |
30A |
Stratford |
|
20/10/1951 |
Reallocation |
64959 |
30A |
Stratford |
30A |
Stratford |
|
21/10/1951 |
Reallocation |
64797 |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
32C |
Lowestoft |
|
27/10/1951 |
Reallocation |
64797 |
32C |
Lowestoft |
32C |
Lowestoft |
|
17/11/1951 |
Reallocation |
64730 |
53A |
Hull Dairycoates |
50B |
Neville Hill |
|
18/11/1951 |
Reallocation |
64910 |
53A |
Hull Dairycoates |
51D |
Middlesbrough |
|
24/11/1951 |
Reallocation |
64910 |
51D |
Middlesbrough |
51D |
Middlesbrough |
|
23/12/1951 |
Reallocation |
64903 |
SHF |
Sheffield Darnall |
37A |
Ardsley |
|
23/12/1951 |
Reallocation |
64972 |
39B |
Sheffield Darnall |
37A |
Ardsley |
|
29/12/1951 |
Reallocation |
64903 |
37A |
Ardsley |
37A |
Ardsley |
|
29/12/1951 |
Reallocation |
64972 |
37A |
Ardsley |
37A |
Ardsley |
|
03/02/1952 |
Reallocation |
64879 |
39B |
Sheffield Darnall |
37A |
Ardsley |
|
03/02/1952 |
Reallocation |
64969 |
SHF |
Sheffield Darnall |
37A |
Ardsley |
|
10/02/1952 |
Reallocation |
64797 |
32C |
Lowestoft |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
11/02/1952 |
Reallocation |
64709 |
HTN |
Heaton |
53A |
Hull Dairycoates |
|
11/02/1952 |
Reallocation |
64947 |
HTN |
Heaton |
53A |
Hull Dairycoates |
|
23/02/1952 |
Reallocation |
64709 |
53A |
Hull Dairycoates |
53A |
Hull Dairycoates |
|
23/02/1952 |
Reallocation |
64797 |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
23/02/1952 |
Reallocation |
64879 |
37A |
Ardsley |
37A |
Ardsley |
|
23/02/1952 |
Reallocation |
64947 |
53A |
Hull Dairycoates |
53A |
Hull Dairycoates |
|
23/02/1952 |
Reallocation |
64969 |
37A |
Ardsley |
37A |
Ardsley |
|
23/02/1952 |
Reallocation |
64971 |
52B |
Heaton |
53A |
Hull Dairycoates |
|
16/03/1952 |
Reallocation |
64732 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
37A |
Ardsley |
|
16/03/1952 |
Reallocation |
64903 |
37A |
Ardsley |
37C |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
|
16/03/1952 |
Reallocation |
64907 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
37C |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
|
16/03/1952 |
Reallocation |
64918 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
37A |
Ardsley |
|
16/03/1952 |
Reallocation |
64966 |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
37A |
Ardsley |
|
22/03/1952 |
Reallocation |
64732 |
37A |
Ardsley |
37A |
Ardsley |
|
22/03/1952 |
Reallocation |
64903 |
37C |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
37C |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
|
22/03/1952 |
Reallocation |
64907 |
37C |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
37C |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
|
22/03/1952 |
Reallocation |
64918 |
37A |
Ardsley |
37A |
Ardsley |
|
22/03/1952 |
Reallocation |
64966 |
37A |
Ardsley |
37A |
Ardsley |
|
27/04/1952 |
Reallocation |
64891 |
DON |
Doncaster |
38A |
Colwick |
|
27/04/1952 |
Reallocation |
64976 |
DON |
Doncaster |
38A |
Colwick |
|
27/04/1952 |
Reallocation |
64981 |
37A |
Ardsley |
38A |
Colwick |
|
17/05/1952 |
Reallocation |
64891 |
38A |
Colwick |
38A |
Colwick |
|
17/05/1952 |
Reallocation |
64976 |
38A |
Colwick |
38A |
Colwick |
|
17/05/1952 |
Reallocation |
64981 |
38A |
Colwick |
38A |
Colwick |
|
06/07/1952 |
Reallocation |
64703 |
BLA |
Blaydon |
53A |
Hull Dairycoates |
|
06/07/1952 |
Reallocation |
64758 |
51A |
Darlington |
50B |
Neville Hill |
|
06/07/1952 |
Reallocation |
64904 |
51A |
Darlington |
53A |
Hull Dairycoates |
|
12/07/1952 |
Reallocation |
64703 |
53A |
Hull Dairycoates |
53A |
Hull Dairycoates |
|
12/07/1952 |
Reallocation |
64758 |
50B |
Neville Hill |
50B |
Neville Hill |
|
12/07/1952 |
Reallocation |
64904 |
53A |
Hull Dairycoates |
53A |
Hull Dairycoates |
|
17/08/1952 |
Reallocation |
64956 |
RET |
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
17/08/1952 |
Reallocation |
64987 |
RET |
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
31/08/1952 |
Reallocation |
64940 |
51D |
Middlesbrough |
51F |
West Auckland |
|
31/08/1952 |
Reallocation |
64982 |
51A |
Darlington |
51F |
West Auckland |
|
06/09/1952 |
Reallocation |
64940 |
51F |
West Auckland |
51F |
West Auckland |
|
06/09/1952 |
Reallocation |
64956 |
36A |
Doncaster |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
06/09/1952 |
Reallocation |
64982 |
51F |
West Auckland |
51F |
West Auckland |
|
06/09/1952 |
Reallocation |
64987 |
36A |
Doncaster |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
14/09/1952 |
Reallocation |
64817 |
51D |
Middlesbrough |
51C |
West Hartlepool |
|
14/09/1952 |
Reallocation |
64862 |
51D |
Middlesbrough |
51C |
West Hartlepool |
|
14/09/1952 |
Reallocation |
64910 |
51D |
Middlesbrough |
51C |
West Hartlepool |
|
22/09/1952 |
Reallocation |
64876 |
37A |
Ardsley |
30A |
Stratford |
|
22/09/1952 |
Reallocation |
64985 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
30A |
Stratford |
|
28/09/1952 |
Reallocation |
64797 |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
32C |
Lowestoft |
|
04/10/1952 |
Reallocation |
64797 |
32C |
Lowestoft |
32C |
Lowestoft |
|
04/10/1952 |
Reallocation |
64817 |
51C |
West Hartlepool |
51C |
West Hartlepool |
|
04/10/1952 |
Reallocation |
64862 |
51C |
West Hartlepool |
51C |
West Hartlepool |
|
04/10/1952 |
Reallocation |
64876 |
30A |
Stratford |
30A |
Stratford |
|
04/10/1952 |
Reallocation |
64910 |
51C |
West Hartlepool |
51C |
West Hartlepool |
|
04/10/1952 |
Reallocation |
64985 |
30A |
Stratford |
30A |
Stratford |
|
05/10/1952 |
Reallocation |
64719 |
CLK |
Colwick |
35C |
Spital Bridge |
|
05/10/1952 |
Reallocation |
64902 |
DON |
Doncaster |
35C |
Spital Bridge |
|
12/10/1952 |
Reallocation |
64723 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
38A |
Colwick |
|
12/10/1952 |
Reallocation |
64789 |
40A |
Lincoln |
35C |
Spital Bridge |
|
12/10/1952 |
Reallocation |
64883 |
LIN |
Lincoln |
35C |
Spital Bridge |
|
12/10/1952 |
Reallocation |
64901 |
9G |
Northwich |
35C |
Spital Bridge |
|
12/10/1952 |
Reallocation |
64951 |
DON |
Doncaster |
35C |
Spital Bridge |
|
12/10/1952 |
Reallocation |
64954 |
9G |
Northwich |
35C |
Spital Bridge |
|
12/10/1952 |
Reallocation |
64965 |
38A |
Colwick |
35C |
Spital Bridge |
|
13/10/1952 |
Reallocation |
64723 |
38A |
Colwick |
35C |
Spital Bridge |
|
26/10/1952 |
Reallocation |
64928 |
HLD |
Hull Dairycoates |
50F |
Malton |
|
01/11/1952 |
Reallocation |
64719 |
35C |
Spital Bridge |
35C |
Spital Bridge |
|
01/11/1952 |
Reallocation |
64723 |
35C |
Spital Bridge |
35C |
Spital Bridge |
|
01/11/1952 |
Reallocation |
64789 |
35C |
Spital Bridge |
35C |
Spital Bridge |
|
01/11/1952 |
Reallocation |
64883 |
35C |
Spital Bridge |
35C |
Spital Bridge |
|
01/11/1952 |
Reallocation |
64901 |
35C |
Spital Bridge |
35C |
Spital Bridge |
|
01/11/1952 |
Reallocation |
64902 |
35C |
Spital Bridge |
35C |
Spital Bridge |
|
01/11/1952 |
Reallocation |
64928 |
50F |
Malton |
50F |
Malton |
|
01/11/1952 |
Reallocation |
64951 |
35C |
Spital Bridge |
35C |
Spital Bridge |
|
01/11/1952 |
Reallocation |
64954 |
35C |
Spital Bridge |
35C |
Spital Bridge |
|
01/11/1952 |
Reallocation |
64965 |
35C |
Spital Bridge |
35C |
Spital Bridge |
|
30/11/1952 |
Reallocation |
64713 |
53A |
Hull Dairycoates |
52C |
Blaydon |
|
07/12/1952 |
Reallocation |
64703 |
53A |
Hull Dairycoates |
52B |
Heaton |
|
07/12/1952 |
Reallocation |
64904 |
53A |
Hull Dairycoates |
52B |
Heaton |
|
27/12/1952 |
Reallocation |
64703 |
52B |
Heaton |
52B |
Heaton |
|
27/12/1952 |
Reallocation |
64713 |
52C |
Blaydon |
52C |
Blaydon |
|
27/12/1952 |
Reallocation |
64904 |
52B |
Heaton |
52B |
Heaton |
|
28/12/1952 |
Reallocation |
64797 |
32C |
Lowestoft |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
28/12/1952 |
Reallocation |
64896 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
35C |
Spital Bridge |
|
04/01/1953 |
Reallocation |
64700 |
BLA |
Blaydon |
54C |
Borough Gardens |
|
04/01/1953 |
Reallocation |
64707 |
GHD |
Gateshead |
54C |
Borough Gardens |
|
04/01/1953 |
Reallocation |
64713 |
52C |
Blaydon |
54C |
Borough Gardens |
|
04/01/1953 |
Reallocation |
64812 |
BLA |
Blaydon |
52C.1 |
Alston |
|
04/01/1953 |
Reallocation |
64851 |
ALS |
|
54C |
Borough Gardens |
|
04/01/1953 |
Reallocation |
64854 |
TWD |
Tweedmouth |
54C |
Borough Gardens |
|
04/01/1953 |
Reallocation |
64864 |
54C |
Borough Gardens |
52C |
Blaydon |
|
04/01/1953 |
Reallocation |
64870 |
54C |
Borough Gardens |
52C |
Blaydon |
|
04/01/1953 |
Reallocation |
64897 |
54C |
Borough Gardens |
52C |
Blaydon |
|
04/01/1953 |
Reallocation |
64929 |
BOR |
Borough Gardens |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
04/01/1953 |
Reallocation |
64941 |
54C |
Borough Gardens |
52D |
Tweedmouth |
|
01/02/1953 |
Reallocation |
64919 |
54C |
Borough Gardens |
54A |
Sunderland |
|
01/02/1953 |
Reallocation |
64939 |
54C |
Borough Gardens |
54A |
Sunderland |
|
12/04/1953 |
Reallocation |
64891 |
38A |
Colwick |
35C |
Spital Bridge |
|
12/04/1953 |
Reallocation |
64981 |
38A |
Colwick |
35C |
Spital Bridge |
|
10/05/1953 |
Reallocation |
64794 |
STM |
St Margarets |
64F |
Bathgate |
|
07/06/1953 |
Reallocation |
64812 |
52C.1 |
Alston |
52C |
Blaydon |
|
07/06/1953 |
Reallocation |
64882 |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
32B |
Ipswich |
|
14/06/1953 |
Reallocation |
64968 |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
32B |
Ipswich |
|
21/06/1953 |
Reallocation |
64738 |
39A |
Gorton |
35C |
Spital Bridge |
|
21/06/1953 |
Reallocation |
64765 |
STR |
Stratford |
35C |
Spital Bridge |
|
21/06/1953 |
Reallocation |
64833 |
37A |
Ardsley |
35C |
Spital Bridge |
|
30/08/1953 |
Reallocation |
64765 |
35C |
Spital Bridge |
30A |
Stratford |
|
13/09/1953 |
Reallocation |
64738 |
35C |
Spital Bridge |
35A |
New England |
|
13/09/1953 |
Reallocation |
64833 |
35C |
Spital Bridge |
35A |
New England |
|
20/09/1953 |
Reallocation |
64882 |
32B |
Ipswich |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
27/09/1953 |
Reallocation |
64729 |
37A |
Ardsley |
40D |
Tuxford |
|
27/09/1953 |
Reallocation |
64735 |
CLK |
Colwick |
40D |
Tuxford |
|
27/09/1953 |
Reallocation |
64738 |
35A |
New England |
39A |
Gorton |
|
27/09/1953 |
Reallocation |
64750 |
CLK |
Colwick |
40D |
Tuxford |
|
27/09/1953 |
Reallocation |
64751 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
40D |
Tuxford |
|
27/09/1953 |
Reallocation |
64763 |
37A |
Ardsley |
40D |
Tuxford |
|
27/09/1953 |
Reallocation |
64799 |
37A |
Ardsley |
40D |
Tuxford |
|
27/09/1953 |
Reallocation |
64805 |
38A |
Colwick |
40D |
Tuxford |
|
27/09/1953 |
Reallocation |
64807 |
38A |
Colwick |
40D |
Tuxford |
|
27/09/1953 |
Reallocation |
64821 |
MID |
Middlesbrough |
50D |
Starbeck |
|
27/09/1953 |
Reallocation |
64828 |
CLK |
Colwick |
40D |
Tuxford |
|
27/09/1953 |
Reallocation |
64833 |
35A |
New England |
37A |
Ardsley |
|
27/09/1953 |
Reallocation |
64838 |
38A |
Colwick |
40D |
Tuxford |
|
27/09/1953 |
Reallocation |
64847 |
MID |
Middlesbrough |
50D |
Starbeck |
|
27/09/1953 |
Reallocation |
64976 |
38A |
Colwick |
40D |
Tuxford |
|
07/10/1953 |
Reallocation |
64968 |
32B |
Ipswich |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
18/10/1953 |
Reallocation |
64724 |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
32C |
Lowestoft |
|
18/10/1953 |
Reallocation |
64853 |
GHD |
Gateshead |
52B |
Heaton |
|
15/11/1953 |
Reallocation |
64881 |
LIN |
Lincoln |
40D |
Tuxford |
|
22/11/1953 |
Reallocation |
64959 |
30A |
Stratford |
40A |
Lincoln |
|
06/12/1953 |
Reallocation |
64734 |
LIN |
Lincoln |
40D |
Tuxford |
|
24/01/1954 |
Reallocation |
64724 |
32C |
Lowestoft |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
31/01/1954 |
Reallocation |
64794 |
64F |
Bathgate |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
14/02/1954 |
Reallocation |
64734 |
40D |
Tuxford |
40A |
Lincoln |
|
14/02/1954 |
Reallocation |
64881 |
40D |
Tuxford |
40A |
Lincoln |
|
28/03/1954 |
Reallocation |
64897 |
52C |
Blaydon |
52D.1 |
Alnmouth |
|
18/04/1954 |
Reallocation |
64938 |
SBK |
Starbeck |
50F |
Malton |
|
25/04/1954 |
Reallocation |
64947 |
53A |
Hull Dairycoates |
50F |
Malton |
|
09/05/1954 |
Reallocation |
64726 |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
32B |
Ipswich |
|
09/05/1954 |
Reallocation |
64911 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
37B |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
|
13/06/1954 |
Reallocation |
64712 |
GOR |
Gorton |
40A |
Lincoln |
|
13/06/1954 |
Reallocation |
64714 |
GOR |
Gorton |
40A |
Lincoln |
|
13/06/1954 |
Reallocation |
64738 |
39A |
Gorton |
39B |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
13/06/1954 |
Reallocation |
64744 |
GOR |
Gorton |
39B |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
13/06/1954 |
Reallocation |
64755 |
GOR |
Gorton |
40A |
Lincoln |
|
13/06/1954 |
Reallocation |
64819 |
50B |
Neville Hill |
53A |
Hull Dairycoates |
|
13/06/1954 |
Reallocation |
64860 |
SBK |
Starbeck |
50B |
Neville Hill |
|
13/06/1954 |
Reallocation |
64864 |
52C |
Blaydon |
53A |
Hull Dairycoates |
|
13/06/1954 |
Reallocation |
64904 |
52B |
Heaton |
53A |
Hull Dairycoates |
|
13/06/1954 |
Reallocation |
64949 |
50B |
Neville Hill |
53A |
Hull Dairycoates |
|
15/08/1954 |
Reallocation |
64960 |
SHF |
Sheffield Neepsend |
40A |
Lincoln |
|
29/08/1954 |
Reallocation |
64756 |
51F |
West Auckland |
51D |
Middlesbrough |
|
29/08/1954 |
Reallocation |
64810 |
GOR |
Gorton |
39B |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
29/08/1954 |
Reallocation |
64848 |
AUK |
West Auckland |
51D |
Middlesbrough |
|
19/09/1954 |
Reallocation |
64817 |
51C |
West Hartlepool |
51J |
Northallerton |
|
19/09/1954 |
Reallocation |
64910 |
51C |
West Hartlepool |
51J |
Northallerton |
|
19/09/1954 |
Reallocation |
64916 |
WHL |
West Hartlepool |
52B |
Heaton |
|
19/09/1954 |
Reallocation |
64978 |
WHL |
West Hartlepool |
51J |
Northallerton |
|
26/09/1954 |
Reallocation |
64712 |
40A |
Lincoln |
40D |
Tuxford |
|
26/09/1954 |
Reallocation |
64730 |
50B |
Neville Hill |
50C |
Selby |
|
26/09/1954 |
Reallocation |
64741 |
GOR |
Gorton |
40A |
Lincoln |
|
26/09/1954 |
Reallocation |
64850 |
NEV |
Neville Hill |
50C |
Selby |
|
26/09/1954 |
Reallocation |
64922 |
50B |
Neville Hill |
50C |
Selby |
|
10/10/1954 |
Reallocation |
64725 |
53A |
Hull Dairycoates |
50C |
Selby |
|
10/10/1954 |
Reallocation |
64904 |
53A |
Hull Dairycoates |
50C |
Selby |
|
17/10/1954 |
Reallocation |
64810 |
39B |
Sheffield Darnall |
30A |
Stratford |
|
17/10/1954 |
Reallocation |
64890 |
SHF |
Sheffield Neepsend |
30A |
Stratford |
|
17/10/1954 |
Reallocation |
64973 |
SHF |
Sheffield Neepsend |
30A |
Stratford |
|
07/11/1954 |
Reallocation |
64900 |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
32G |
Melton Constable |
|
09/01/1955 |
Reallocation |
64712 |
40D |
Tuxford |
40A |
Lincoln |
|
16/01/1955 |
Reallocation |
64729 |
40D |
Tuxford |
30A |
Stratford |
|
16/01/1955 |
Reallocation |
64735 |
40D |
Tuxford |
38A |
Colwick |
|
16/01/1955 |
Reallocation |
64750 |
40D |
Tuxford |
30A |
Stratford |
|
16/01/1955 |
Reallocation |
64751 |
40D |
Tuxford |
30A |
Stratford |
|
16/01/1955 |
Reallocation |
64763 |
40D |
Tuxford |
38A |
Colwick |
|
16/01/1955 |
Reallocation |
64799 |
40D |
Tuxford |
30A |
Stratford |
|
16/01/1955 |
Reallocation |
64805 |
40D |
Tuxford |
30A |
Stratford |
|
16/01/1955 |
Reallocation |
64807 |
40D |
Tuxford |
30A |
Stratford |
|
16/01/1955 |
Reallocation |
64828 |
40D |
Tuxford |
30A |
Stratford |
|
16/01/1955 |
Reallocation |
64838 |
40D |
Tuxford |
30A |
Stratford |
|
16/01/1955 |
Reallocation |
64976 |
40D |
Tuxford |
38A |
Colwick |
|
18/02/1955 |
Reallocation |
64882 |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
32B |
Ipswich |
|
06/03/1955 |
Reallocation |
64756 |
51D |
Middlesbrough |
51F |
West Auckland |
|
06/03/1955 |
Reallocation |
64817 |
51J |
Northallerton |
51F |
West Auckland |
|
06/03/1955 |
Reallocation |
64848 |
51D |
Middlesbrough |
51F |
West Auckland |
|
06/03/1955 |
Reallocation |
64862 |
51C |
West Hartlepool |
51F |
West Auckland |
|
06/03/1955 |
Reallocation |
64900 |
32G |
Melton Constable |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
06/03/1955 |
Reallocation |
64910 |
51J |
Northallerton |
51F |
West Auckland |
|
20/03/1955 |
Reallocation |
64810 |
30A |
Stratford |
30F |
Parkeston Quay |
|
20/03/1955 |
Reallocation |
64828 |
30A |
Stratford |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
20/03/1955 |
Reallocation |
64838 |
30A |
Stratford |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
03/04/1955 |
Reallocation |
64756 |
51F |
West Auckland |
51D |
Middlesbrough |
|
03/04/1955 |
Reallocation |
64848 |
51F |
West Auckland |
51D |
Middlesbrough |
|
15/05/1955 |
Reallocation |
64729 |
30A |
Stratford |
31A |
Cambridge |
|
15/05/1955 |
Reallocation |
64751 |
30A |
Stratford |
31A |
Cambridge |
|
15/05/1955 |
Reallocation |
64803 |
30A |
Stratford |
31A |
Cambridge |
|
26/06/1955 |
Reallocation |
64756 |
51D |
Middlesbrough |
51F |
West Auckland |
|
26/06/1955 |
Reallocation |
64848 |
51D |
Middlesbrough |
51F |
West Auckland |
|
26/06/1955 |
Reallocation |
64870 |
52C |
Blaydon |
50B |
Neville Hill |
|
26/06/1955 |
Reallocation |
64916 |
52B |
Heaton |
52D.1 |
Alnmouth |
|
26/06/1955 |
Reallocation |
64922 |
50C |
Selby |
50B |
Neville Hill |
|
10/07/1955 |
Reallocation |
64715 |
LIN |
Lincoln |
38A |
Colwick |
|
10/07/1955 |
Reallocation |
64736 |
LIN |
Lincoln |
35C |
Spital Bridge |
|
10/07/1955 |
Reallocation |
64741 |
40A |
Lincoln |
38A |
Colwick |
|
24/07/1955 |
Reallocation |
64783 |
30A |
Stratford |
35C |
Spital Bridge |
|
07/08/1955 |
Reallocation |
64850 |
50C |
Selby |
50B |
Neville Hill |
|
07/08/1955 |
Reallocation |
64860 |
50B |
Neville Hill |
50C |
Selby |
|
04/09/1955 |
Reallocation |
64783 |
35C |
Spital Bridge |
30A |
Stratford |
|
25/09/1955 |
Reallocation |
64817 |
51F |
West Auckland |
54A |
Sunderland |
|
25/09/1955 |
Reallocation |
64890 |
30A |
Stratford |
31A |
Cambridge |
|
25/09/1955 |
Reallocation |
64910 |
51F |
West Auckland |
54A |
Sunderland |
|
25/09/1955 |
Reallocation |
64940 |
51F |
West Auckland |
54A |
Sunderland |
|
25/09/1955 |
Reallocation |
64958 |
30A |
Stratford |
31A |
Cambridge |
|
09/10/1955 |
Reallocation |
64724 |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
32B |
Ipswich |
|
27/11/1955 |
Reallocation |
64810 |
30F |
Parkeston Quay |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
27/11/1955 |
Reallocation |
64876 |
30A |
Stratford |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
27/11/1955 |
Reallocation |
64985 |
30A |
Stratford |
30F |
Parkeston Quay |
|
18/12/1955 |
Reallocation |
64966 |
37A |
Ardsley |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
18/12/1955 |
Reallocation |
64972 |
37A |
Ardsley |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
22/04/1956 |
Reallocation |
64913 |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
32G |
Melton Constable |
|
27/05/1956 |
Reallocation |
64801 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
37C |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
|
10/06/1956 |
Reallocation |
64910 |
54A |
Sunderland |
53A |
Hull Dairycoates |
|
10/06/1956 |
Reallocation |
64927 |
54C |
Borough Gardens |
51F |
West Auckland |
|
10/06/1956 |
Reallocation |
64939 |
54A |
Sunderland |
53A |
Hull Dairycoates |
|
10/06/1956 |
Reallocation |
64940 |
54A |
Sunderland |
53A |
Hull Dairycoates |
|
24/06/1956 |
Reallocation |
64802 |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
32F |
Yarmouth Beach |
|
26/08/1956 |
Reallocation |
64802 |
32F |
Yarmouth Beach |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
07/10/1956 |
Reallocation |
64913 |
32G |
Melton Constable |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
28/10/1956 |
Reallocation |
64764 |
STR |
Stratford |
30F |
Parkeston Quay |
|
28/10/1956 |
Reallocation |
64771 |
30A |
Stratford |
30F |
Parkeston Quay |
|
28/10/1956 |
Reallocation |
64776 |
STR |
Stratford |
30F |
Parkeston Quay |
|
28/10/1956 |
Reallocation |
64799 |
30A |
Stratford |
35A |
New England |
|
28/10/1956 |
Reallocation |
64805 |
30A |
Stratford |
35A |
New England |
|
28/10/1956 |
Reallocation |
64873 |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
35A |
New England |
|
28/10/1956 |
Reallocation |
64874 |
30F |
Parkeston Quay |
35A |
New England |
|
28/10/1956 |
Reallocation |
64985 |
30F |
Parkeston Quay |
35A |
New England |
|
11/11/1956 |
Reallocation |
64815 |
TWD.1 |
Alnmouth |
52C |
Blaydon |
|
18/11/1956 |
Reallocation |
64978 |
51J |
Northallerton |
51F |
West Auckland |
|
25/11/1956 |
Reallocation |
64902 |
35C |
Spital Bridge |
36D |
Barnsley |
|
06/01/1957 |
Reallocation |
64802 |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
32G |
Melton Constable |
|
06/01/1957 |
Reallocation |
64913 |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
32G |
Melton Constable |
|
03/02/1957 |
Reallocation |
64913 |
32G |
Melton Constable |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
17/03/1957 |
Reallocation |
64799 |
35A |
New England |
30A |
Stratford |
|
17/03/1957 |
Reallocation |
64805 |
35A |
New England |
30A |
Stratford |
|
07/04/1957 |
Reallocation |
64883 |
35C |
Spital Bridge |
33A |
Plaistow |
|
07/04/1957 |
Reallocation |
64891 |
35C |
Spital Bridge |
33A |
Plaistow |
|
07/04/1957 |
Reallocation |
64896 |
35C |
Spital Bridge |
33A |
Plaistow |
|
07/04/1957 |
Reallocation |
64901 |
35C |
Spital Bridge |
33A |
Plaistow |
|
07/04/1957 |
Reallocation |
64951 |
35C |
Spital Bridge |
33A |
Plaistow |
|
07/04/1957 |
Reallocation |
64981 |
35C |
Spital Bridge |
33A |
Plaistow |
|
14/04/1957 |
Reallocation |
64873 |
35A |
New England |
30A |
Stratford |
|
14/04/1957 |
Reallocation |
64874 |
35A |
New England |
30A |
Stratford |
|
14/04/1957 |
Reallocation |
64985 |
35A |
New England |
35C |
Spital Bridge |
|
12/05/1957 |
Reallocation |
64968 |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
32G |
Melton Constable |
|
19/05/1957 |
Reallocation |
64962 |
39B |
Sheffield Darnall |
30A |
Stratford |
|
26/05/1957 |
Reallocation |
64883 |
33A |
Plaistow |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
26/05/1957 |
Reallocation |
64891 |
33A |
Plaistow |
32B |
Ipswich |
|
26/05/1957 |
Reallocation |
64896 |
33A |
Plaistow |
30F |
Parkeston Quay |
|
26/05/1957 |
Reallocation |
64901 |
33A |
Plaistow |
35C |
Spital Bridge |
|
26/05/1957 |
Reallocation |
64953 |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
33A |
Plaistow |
|
26/05/1957 |
Reallocation |
64954 |
35C |
Spital Bridge |
33A |
Plaistow |
|
26/05/1957 |
Reallocation |
64956 |
36A |
Doncaster |
33A |
Plaistow |
|
26/05/1957 |
Reallocation |
64957 |
IPS |
Ipswich |
33A |
Plaistow |
|
02/06/1957 |
Reallocation |
64828 |
36A |
Doncaster |
36D |
Barnsley |
|
02/06/1957 |
Reallocation |
64952 |
DON |
Doncaster |
33A |
Plaistow |
|
02/06/1957 |
Reallocation |
64981 |
33A |
Plaistow |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
16/06/1957 |
Reallocation |
64705 |
BLA |
Blaydon |
52D.1 |
Alnmouth |
|
16/06/1957 |
Reallocation |
64713 |
54C |
Borough Gardens |
52B |
Heaton |
|
16/06/1957 |
Reallocation |
64796 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
56G |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
|
16/06/1957 |
Reallocation |
64864 |
53A |
Hull Dairycoates |
52B |
Heaton |
|
16/06/1957 |
Reallocation |
64872 |
37A |
Ardsley |
56G |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
|
16/06/1957 |
Reallocation |
64926 |
54C |
Borough Gardens |
52B |
Heaton |
|
16/06/1957 |
Reallocation |
64929 |
52A |
Gateshead |
52D.1 |
Alnmouth |
|
16/06/1957 |
Reallocation |
64931 |
54C |
Borough Gardens |
52B |
Heaton |
|
16/06/1957 |
Reallocation |
64939 |
53A |
Hull Dairycoates |
52B |
Heaton |
|
16/06/1957 |
Reallocation |
64949 |
53A |
Hull Dairycoates |
52B |
Heaton |
|
30/06/1957 |
Reallocation |
64849 |
BLA |
Blaydon |
52B |
Heaton |
|
07/07/1957 |
Reallocation |
64701 |
GHD |
Gateshead |
52B |
Heaton |
|
07/07/1957 |
Reallocation |
64871 |
GHD |
Gateshead |
52B |
Heaton |
|
28/07/1957 |
Reallocation |
64968 |
32G |
Melton Constable |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
15/09/1957 |
Reallocation |
64725 |
50C |
Selby |
50B |
Neville Hill |
|
15/09/1957 |
Reallocation |
64730 |
50C |
Selby |
50B |
Neville Hill |
|
15/09/1957 |
Reallocation |
64791 |
NEV |
Neville Hill |
56G |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
|
15/09/1957 |
Reallocation |
64886 |
50B |
Neville Hill |
56G |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
|
15/09/1957 |
Reallocation |
64947 |
50F |
Malton |
56G |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
|
29/09/1957 |
Reallocation |
64797 |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
32C |
Lowestoft |
|
13/10/1957 |
Reallocation |
64802 |
32G |
Melton Constable |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
13/10/1957 |
Reallocation |
64882 |
32B |
Ipswich |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
27/10/1957 |
Reallocation |
64753 |
SHF |
Sheffield Darnall |
39A |
Gorton |
|
27/10/1957 |
Reallocation |
64809 |
SHF |
Sheffield Neepsend |
39A |
Gorton |
|
27/10/1957 |
Reallocation |
64824 |
39B |
Sheffield Darnall |
39A |
Gorton |
|
03/11/1957 |
Reallocation |
64739 |
CLK |
Colwick |
38B |
Annesley |
|
03/11/1957 |
Reallocation |
64747 |
CLK |
Colwick |
38B |
Annesley |
|
03/11/1957 |
Reallocation |
64798 |
38A |
Colwick |
38B |
Annesley |
|
03/11/1957 |
Reallocation |
64955 |
CLK |
Colwick |
38B |
Annesley |
|
10/11/1957 |
Reallocation |
64702 |
LIN |
Lincoln |
30A |
Stratford |
|
10/11/1957 |
Reallocation |
64804 |
40A |
Lincoln |
30A |
Stratford |
|
10/11/1957 |
Reallocation |
64849 |
52B |
Heaton |
52C |
Blaydon |
|
17/11/1957 |
Reallocation |
64738 |
39B |
Sheffield Darnall |
39A |
Gorton |
|
17/11/1957 |
Reallocation |
64744 |
39B |
Sheffield Darnall |
39A |
Gorton |
|
12/01/1958 |
Reallocation |
64791 |
56G |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
56F |
Low Moor |
|
12/01/1958 |
Reallocation |
64796 |
56G |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
56F |
Low Moor |
|
12/01/1958 |
Reallocation |
64801 |
37C |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
56F |
Low Moor |
|
12/01/1958 |
Reallocation |
64872 |
56G |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
56F |
Low Moor |
|
12/01/1958 |
Reallocation |
64886 |
56G |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
56F |
Low Moor |
|
12/01/1958 |
Reallocation |
64903 |
37C |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
56F |
Low Moor |
|
12/01/1958 |
Reallocation |
64907 |
37C |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
56F |
Low Moor |
|
12/01/1958 |
Reallocation |
64947 |
56G |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
56F |
Low Moor |
|
09/03/1958 |
Reallocation |
64787 |
30F |
Parkeston Quay |
30A |
Stratford |
|
09/03/1958 |
Reallocation |
64788 |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
30A |
Stratford |
|
09/03/1958 |
Reallocation |
64896 |
30F |
Parkeston Quay |
30A |
Stratford |
|
09/03/1958 |
Reallocation |
64911 |
37B |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
56B |
Ardsley |
|
23/03/1958 |
Reallocation |
64769 |
STR |
Stratford |
31B |
March |
|
23/03/1958 |
Reallocation |
64770 |
30F |
Parkeston Quay |
31B |
March |
|
23/03/1958 |
Reallocation |
64772 |
STR |
Stratford |
31B |
March |
|
23/03/1958 |
Reallocation |
64774 |
STR |
Stratford |
31B |
March |
|
13/04/1958 |
Reallocation |
64764 |
30F |
Parkeston Quay |
30A |
Stratford |
|
13/04/1958 |
Reallocation |
64773 |
30F |
Parkeston Quay |
30A |
Stratford |
|
20/04/1958 |
Reallocation |
64771 |
30F |
Parkeston Quay |
31B |
March |
|
20/04/1958 |
Reallocation |
64782 |
STR |
Stratford |
31B |
March |
|
11/05/1958 |
Reallocation |
64949 |
52B |
Heaton |
52D.1 |
Alnmouth |
|
25/05/1958 |
Reallocation |
64764 |
30A |
Stratford |
31B |
March |
|
25/05/1958 |
Reallocation |
64779 |
30A |
Stratford |
31B |
March |
|
08/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
64947 |
56F |
Low Moor |
53A |
Hull Dairycoates |
|
08/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
64958 |
31A |
Cambridge |
33A |
Plaistow |
|
08/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
64962 |
30A |
Stratford |
33A |
Plaistow |
|
08/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
64968 |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
33A |
Plaistow |
|
08/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
64985 |
35C |
Spital Bridge |
31A |
Cambridge |
|
15/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
64726 |
32B |
Ipswich |
32G |
Melton Constable |
|
29/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
64965 |
35C |
Spital Bridge |
33A |
Plaistow |
|
11/08/1958 |
Reallocation |
64794 |
64A |
St Margarets |
64C |
Dalry Road |
|
11/08/1958 |
Reallocation |
64946 |
STM |
St Margarets |
64C |
Dalry Road |
|
11/08/1958 |
Reallocation |
64963 |
STM |
St Margarets |
64C |
Dalry Road |
|
11/08/1958 |
Reallocation |
64986 |
STM |
St Margarets |
64C |
Dalry Road |
|
28/08/1958 |
Reallocation |
64751 |
31A |
Cambridge |
31B |
March |
|
14/09/1958 |
Reallocation |
64911 |
56B |
Ardsley |
56C |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
|
28/09/1958 |
Reallocation |
64729 |
31A |
Cambridge |
31B |
March |
|
12/10/1958 |
Reallocation |
64890 |
31A |
Cambridge |
31B |
March |
|
19/10/1958 |
Reallocation |
64726 |
32G |
Melton Constable |
32C |
Lowestoft |
|
08/11/1958 |
Reallocation |
64727 |
12B |
Carlisle Canal |
9G |
Gorton |
|
08/11/1958 |
Reallocation |
64875 |
CAR |
Carlisle Canal |
9G |
Gorton |
|
08/11/1958 |
Reallocation |
64930 |
CAR |
Carlisle Canal |
9G |
Gorton |
|
09/11/1958 |
Reallocation |
64712 |
40A |
Lincoln |
40F |
Boston |
|
09/11/1958 |
Reallocation |
64716 |
CLK |
Colwick |
40F |
Boston |
|
09/11/1958 |
Reallocation |
64728 |
LIN |
Lincoln |
40F |
Boston |
|
09/11/1958 |
Reallocation |
64741 |
38A |
Colwick |
40F |
Boston |
|
09/11/1958 |
Reallocation |
64823 |
38A |
Colwick |
40F |
Boston |
|
09/11/1958 |
Reallocation |
64887 |
40A |
Lincoln |
40F |
Boston |
|
09/11/1958 |
Reallocation |
64960 |
40A |
Lincoln |
40F |
Boston |
|
26/11/1958 |
Reallocation |
64804 |
30A |
Stratford |
31B |
March |
|
30/11/1958 |
Reallocation |
64726 |
32C |
Lowestoft |
40A |
Lincoln |
|
30/11/1958 |
Reallocation |
64802 |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
40A |
Lincoln |
|
30/11/1958 |
Reallocation |
64882 |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
40A |
Lincoln |
|
07/12/1958 |
Reallocation |
64702 |
30A |
Stratford |
41A |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
07/12/1958 |
Reallocation |
64719 |
35C |
Spital Bridge |
41A |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
07/12/1958 |
Reallocation |
64723 |
35C |
Spital Bridge |
40A |
Lincoln |
|
07/12/1958 |
Reallocation |
64729 |
31B |
March |
40A |
Lincoln |
|
07/12/1958 |
Reallocation |
64736 |
35C |
Spital Bridge |
41A |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
07/12/1958 |
Reallocation |
64751 |
31B |
March |
40A |
Lincoln |
|
07/12/1958 |
Reallocation |
64755 |
40A |
Lincoln |
40F |
Boston |
|
07/12/1958 |
Reallocation |
64804 |
31B |
March |
41A |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
07/12/1958 |
Reallocation |
64807 |
30A |
Stratford |
41A |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
07/12/1958 |
Reallocation |
64890 |
31B |
March |
40A |
Lincoln |
|
07/12/1958 |
Reallocation |
64896 |
30A |
Stratford |
40A |
Lincoln |
|
07/12/1958 |
Reallocation |
64960 |
40F |
Boston |
40A |
Lincoln |
|
07/12/1958 |
Reallocation |
64977 |
40A |
Lincoln |
40E |
Colwick |
|
21/12/1958 |
Reallocation |
64874 |
30A |
Stratford |
40A |
Lincoln |
|
21/12/1958 |
Reallocation |
64889 |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
40A |
Lincoln |
|
04/01/1959 |
Reallocation |
64714 |
40A |
Lincoln |
36E |
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
|
04/01/1959 |
Reallocation |
64722 |
LIN |
Lincoln |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
04/01/1959 |
Reallocation |
64802 |
40A |
Lincoln |
40E |
Colwick |
|
04/01/1959 |
Reallocation |
64882 |
40A |
Lincoln |
40E |
Colwick |
|
04/01/1959 |
Reallocation |
64961 |
RET |
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
40A |
Lincoln |
|
04/01/1959 |
Reallocation |
64966 |
36A |
Doncaster |
40A |
Lincoln |
|
08/01/1959 |
Reallocation |
64729 |
40A |
Lincoln |
40E |
Colwick |
|
22/01/1959 |
Reallocation |
64943 |
NEV |
Neville Hill |
53A |
Hull Dairycoates |
|
25/01/1959 |
Reallocation |
64705 |
52D.1 |
Alnmouth |
56B |
Ardsley |
|
25/01/1959 |
Reallocation |
64729 |
40E |
Colwick |
40F |
Boston |
|
25/01/1959 |
Reallocation |
64817 |
54A |
Sunderland |
56F |
Low Moor |
|
25/01/1959 |
Reallocation |
64919 |
54A |
Sunderland |
56F |
Low Moor |
|
03/1959 |
Reallocation |
64741 |
40F |
Boston |
40A |
Lincoln |
|
01/03/1959 |
Reallocation |
64712 |
40F |
Boston |
40E |
Colwick |
|
01/03/1959 |
Reallocation |
64716 |
40F |
Boston |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
01/03/1959 |
Reallocation |
64723 |
40A |
Lincoln |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
01/03/1959 |
Reallocation |
64755 |
40F |
Boston |
40A |
Lincoln |
|
01/03/1959 |
Reallocation |
64827 |
CLK |
Colwick |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
01/03/1959 |
Reallocation |
64874 |
40A |
Lincoln |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
01/03/1959 |
Reallocation |
64882 |
40E |
Colwick |
36E |
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
|
01/03/1959 |
Reallocation |
64887 |
40F |
Boston |
40E |
Colwick |
|
10/03/1959 |
Reallocation |
64795 |
ABD |
Aberdeen Ferryhill |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
13/03/1959 |
Reallocation |
64975 |
ABD |
Aberdeen Ferryhill |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
06/05/1959 |
Condemned |
64715 |
38A |
Colwick |
|
COND |
|
10/05/1959 |
Reallocation |
64831 |
37A |
Ardsley |
53A |
Hull Dairycoates |
|
10/05/1959 |
Reallocation |
64833 |
37A |
Ardsley |
53A |
Hull Dairycoates |
|
18/05/1959 |
Condemned |
64734 |
40A |
Lincoln |
|
COND |
|
18/05/1959 |
Condemned |
64768 |
STR |
Stratford |
|
COND |
|
18/05/1959 |
Condemned |
64829 |
IPS |
Ipswich |
|
COND |
|
18/05/1959 |
Condemned |
64873 |
30A |
Stratford |
|
COND |
|
22/05/1959 |
Condemned |
64714 |
36E |
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
|
COND |
|
01/06/1959 |
Condemned |
64752 |
IPS |
Ipswich |
|
COND |
|
01/06/1959 |
Condemned |
64787 |
30A |
Stratford |
|
COND |
|
12/06/1959 |
Condemned |
64785 |
IPS |
Ipswich |
|
COND |
|
14/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
64700 |
54C |
Borough Gardens |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
14/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
64707 |
54C |
Borough Gardens |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
14/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
64710 |
54C |
Borough Gardens |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
14/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
64713 |
52B |
Heaton |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
14/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
64796 |
56F |
Low Moor |
56B |
Ardsley |
|
14/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
64812 |
52C |
Blaydon |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
14/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
64814 |
BLA |
Blaydon |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
14/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
64818 |
SBK |
Starbeck |
50C |
Selby |
|
14/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
64846 |
BOR |
Borough Gardens |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
14/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
64847 |
50D |
Starbeck |
50C |
Selby |
|
14/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
64851 |
54C |
Borough Gardens |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
14/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
64854 |
54C |
Borough Gardens |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
14/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
64921 |
54C |
Borough Gardens |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
14/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
64936 |
BOR |
Borough Gardens |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
14/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
64938 |
50F |
Malton |
50C |
Selby |
|
22/06/1959 |
Condemned |
64788 |
30A |
Stratford |
|
COND |
|
29/06/1959 |
Condemned |
64762 |
CLK |
Colwick |
|
COND |
|
29/06/1959 |
Condemned |
64763 |
38A |
Colwick |
|
COND |
|
26/07/1959 |
Reallocation |
64725 |
50B |
Neville Hill |
50C |
Selby |
|
27/07/1959 |
Condemned |
64731 |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
COND |
|
27/07/1959 |
Condemned |
64799 |
30A |
Stratford |
|
COND |
|
27/07/1959 |
Condemned |
64900 |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
COND |
|
03/08/1959 |
Condemned |
64735 |
38A |
Colwick |
|
COND |
|
10/08/1959 |
Condemned |
64755 |
40A |
Lincoln |
|
COND |
|
17/08/1959 |
Condemned |
64776 |
30F |
Parkeston Quay |
|
COND |
|
17/08/1959 |
Reallocation |
64790 |
DEE |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
62A |
Thornton Junction |
|
17/08/1959 |
Reallocation |
64792 |
DEE |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
62A |
Thornton Junction |
|
21/08/1959 |
Condemned |
64753 |
39A |
Gorton |
|
COND |
|
23/08/1959 |
Reallocation |
64978 |
51F |
West Auckland |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
25/08/1959 |
Condemned |
64737 |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
COND |
|
25/08/1959 |
Condemned |
64773 |
30A |
Stratford |
|
COND |
|
28/08/1959 |
Reallocation |
64747 |
38B |
Annesley |
9G |
Gorton |
|
30/08/1959 |
Reallocation |
64860 |
50C |
Selby |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
30/08/1959 |
Reallocation |
64938 |
50C |
Selby |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
13/09/1959 |
Reallocation |
64706 |
SBK |
Starbeck |
50A |
York (North) |
|
13/09/1959 |
Reallocation |
64725 |
50C |
Selby |
50A |
York (North) |
|
13/09/1959 |
Reallocation |
64818 |
50C |
Selby |
50A |
York (North) |
|
13/09/1959 |
Reallocation |
64821 |
50D |
Starbeck |
50A |
York (North) |
|
13/09/1959 |
Reallocation |
64845 |
SBK |
Starbeck |
50A |
York (North) |
|
13/09/1959 |
Reallocation |
64847 |
50C |
Selby |
50A |
York (North) |
|
13/09/1959 |
Reallocation |
64855 |
SBK |
Starbeck |
50A |
York (North) |
|
13/09/1959 |
Reallocation |
64857 |
SBK |
Starbeck |
50A |
York (North) |
|
13/09/1959 |
Reallocation |
64859 |
SBK |
Starbeck |
50A |
York (North) |
|
13/09/1959 |
Reallocation |
64861 |
50D |
Starbeck |
50A |
York (North) |
|
13/09/1959 |
Reallocation |
64866 |
SBK |
Starbeck |
50A |
York (North) |
|
13/09/1959 |
Reallocation |
64904 |
50C |
Selby |
50A |
York (North) |
|
13/09/1959 |
Reallocation |
64942 |
SBK |
Starbeck |
50A |
York (North) |
|
13/09/1959 |
Reallocation |
64944 |
SBK |
Starbeck |
50A |
York (North) |
|
28/09/1959 |
Condemned |
64702 |
41A |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
COND |
|
28/09/1959 |
Condemned |
64766 |
STR |
Stratford |
|
COND |
|
28/09/1959 |
Condemned |
64797 |
32C |
Lowestoft |
|
COND |
|
28/09/1959 |
Condemned |
64803 |
31A |
Cambridge |
|
COND |
|
28/09/1959 |
Condemned |
64832 |
CLK |
Colwick |
|
COND |
|
28/09/1959 |
Condemned |
64876 |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
COND |
|
28/09/1959 |
Condemned |
64881 |
40A |
Lincoln |
|
COND |
|
28/09/1959 |
Condemned |
64905 |
IPS |
Ipswich |
|
COND |
|
05/10/1959 |
Condemned |
64805 |
30A |
Stratford |
|
COND |
|
06/10/1959 |
Condemned |
64841 |
IPS |
Ipswich |
|
COND |
|
19/10/1959 |
Condemned |
64894 |
IPS |
Ipswich |
|
COND |
|
21/10/1959 |
Condemned |
64913 |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
COND |
|
21/10/1959 |
Condemned |
64961 |
40A |
Lincoln |
|
COND |
|
25/10/1959 |
Reallocation |
64800 |
IPS |
Ipswich |
31B |
March |
|
25/10/1959 |
Reallocation |
64826 |
IPS |
Ipswich |
31B |
March |
|
25/10/1959 |
Reallocation |
64891 |
32B |
Ipswich |
31B |
March |
|
30/10/1959 |
Reallocation |
64953 |
33A |
Plaistow |
33B |
Tilbury |
|
31/10/1959 |
Reallocation |
64951 |
33A |
Plaistow |
33B |
Tilbury |
|
31/10/1959 |
Reallocation |
64952 |
33A |
Plaistow |
33B |
Tilbury |
|
31/10/1959 |
Reallocation |
64954 |
33A |
Plaistow |
33B |
Tilbury |
|
31/10/1959 |
Reallocation |
64956 |
33A |
Plaistow |
33B |
Tilbury |
|
31/10/1959 |
Reallocation |
64957 |
33A |
Plaistow |
33B |
Tilbury |
|
31/10/1959 |
Reallocation |
64958 |
33A |
Plaistow |
33B |
Tilbury |
|
31/10/1959 |
Reallocation |
64962 |
33A |
Plaistow |
33B |
Tilbury |
|
31/10/1959 |
Reallocation |
64965 |
33A |
Plaistow |
33B |
Tilbury |
|
31/10/1959 |
Reallocation |
64968 |
33A |
Plaistow |
33B |
Tilbury |
|
01/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
64700 |
52A |
Gateshead |
52G |
Sunderland |
|
01/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
64704 |
GHD |
Gateshead |
52G |
Sunderland |
|
01/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
64710 |
52A |
Gateshead |
52G |
Sunderland |
|
01/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
64730 |
50B |
Neville Hill |
51L |
Thornaby |
|
01/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
64758 |
50B |
Neville Hill |
51L |
Thornaby |
|
01/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
64850 |
50B |
Neville Hill |
51L |
Thornaby |
|
06/11/1959 |
Condemned |
64761 |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
COND |
|
08/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
64777 |
30F |
Parkeston Quay |
30A |
Stratford |
|
08/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
64823 |
40F |
Boston |
40E |
Colwick |
|
08/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
64847 |
50A |
York (North) |
52G |
Sunderland |
|
08/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
64866 |
50A |
York (North) |
52G |
Sunderland |
|
08/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
64889 |
40A |
Lincoln |
40E |
Colwick |
|
10/11/1959 |
Condemned |
64983 |
CLK |
Colwick |
|
COND |
|
13/11/1959 |
Condemned |
64750 |
30A |
Stratford |
|
COND |
|
13/11/1959 |
Condemned |
64973 |
30A |
Stratford |
|
COND |
|
20/11/1959 |
Condemned |
64834 |
IFS |
|
|
COND |
|
22/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
64706 |
50A |
York (North) |
51L |
Thornaby |
|
22/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
64818 |
50A |
York (North) |
51L |
Thornaby |
|
22/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
64857 |
50A |
York (North) |
51L |
Thornaby |
|
22/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
64904 |
50A |
York (North) |
53A |
Hull Dairycoates |
|
25/11/1959 |
Condemned |
64976 |
38A |
Colwick |
|
COND |
|
26/11/1959 |
Condemned |
64793 |
IPS |
Ipswich |
|
COND |
|
05/12/1959 |
Condemned |
64912 |
CAR |
Carlisle Canal |
|
COND |
|
07/12/1959 |
Condemned |
64751 |
40A |
Lincoln |
|
COND |
|
11/12/1959 |
Condemned |
64972 |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
COND |
|
13/12/1959 |
Reallocation |
64701 |
52B |
Heaton |
52G |
Sunderland |
|
13/12/1959 |
Reallocation |
64703 |
52B |
Heaton |
52G |
Sunderland |
|
13/12/1959 |
Reallocation |
64725 |
50A |
York (North) |
51L |
Thornaby |
|
13/12/1959 |
Reallocation |
64806 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
52B |
Heaton |
|
13/12/1959 |
Reallocation |
64821 |
50A |
York (North) |
51L |
Thornaby |
|
13/12/1959 |
Reallocation |
64825 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
52G |
Sunderland |
|
13/12/1959 |
Reallocation |
64833 |
53A |
Hull Dairycoates |
52G |
Sunderland |
|
13/12/1959 |
Reallocation |
64835 |
50B |
Neville Hill |
51L |
Thornaby |
|
13/12/1959 |
Reallocation |
64837 |
37A |
Ardsley |
52B |
Heaton |
|
13/12/1959 |
Reallocation |
64845 |
50A |
York (North) |
51L |
Thornaby |
|
13/12/1959 |
Reallocation |
64853 |
52B |
Heaton |
52G |
Sunderland |
|
13/12/1959 |
Reallocation |
64855 |
50A |
York (North) |
51L |
Thornaby |
|
13/12/1959 |
Reallocation |
64859 |
50A |
York (North) |
51L |
Thornaby |
|
13/12/1959 |
Reallocation |
64861 |
50A |
York (North) |
51L |
Thornaby |
|
13/12/1959 |
Reallocation |
64866 |
52G |
Sunderland |
52B |
Heaton |
|
13/12/1959 |
Reallocation |
64870 |
50B |
Neville Hill |
51L |
Thornaby |
|
13/12/1959 |
Reallocation |
64944 |
50A |
York (North) |
50B |
Neville Hill |
|
30/12/1959 |
Condemned |
64980 |
CLK |
Colwick |
|
COND |
|
30/12/1959 |
Condemned |
64988 |
CLK |
Colwick |
|
COND |
|
31/12/1959 |
Condemned |
64984 |
40A |
Lincoln |
|
COND |
|
31/12/1959 |
Condemned |
64985 |
31A |
Cambridge |
|
COND |
|
01/01/1960 |
Condemned |
64959 |
40A |
Lincoln |
|
COND |
|
03/01/1960 |
Reallocation |
64828 |
36D |
Barnsley |
41F |
Mexborough |
|
03/01/1960 |
Reallocation |
64902 |
36D |
Barnsley |
41F |
Mexborough |
|
04/01/1960 |
Condemned |
64777 |
30A |
Stratford |
|
COND |
|
04/01/1960 |
Condemned |
64780 |
30A |
Stratford |
|
COND |
|
20/01/1960 |
Condemned |
64887 |
40E |
Colwick |
|
COND |
|
21/01/1960 |
Condemned |
64769 |
31B |
March |
|
COND |
|
21/01/1960 |
Condemned |
64800 |
31B |
March |
|
COND |
|
26/01/1960 |
Condemned |
64838 |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
COND |
|
31/01/1960 |
Reallocation |
64789 |
35C |
Spital Bridge |
31B |
March |
|
31/01/1960 |
Reallocation |
64901 |
35C |
Spital Bridge |
31B |
March |
|
01/02/1960 |
Condemned |
64771 |
31B |
March |
|
COND |
|
01/02/1960 |
Condemned |
64827 |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
COND |
|
01/02/1960 |
Condemned |
64960 |
40A |
Lincoln |
|
COND |
|
04/02/1960 |
Condemned |
64712 |
40E |
Colwick |
|
COND |
|
04/02/1960 |
Condemned |
64977 |
40E |
Colwick |
|
COND |
|
05/02/1960 |
Condemned |
64981 |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
COND |
|
08/02/1960 |
Condemned |
64724 |
32B |
Ipswich |
|
COND |
|
08/02/1960 |
Condemned |
64826 |
31B |
March |
|
COND |
|
08/02/1960 |
Condemned |
64830 |
RET |
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
|
COND |
|
08/02/1960 |
Condemned |
64891 |
31B |
March |
|
COND |
|
15/02/1960 |
Condemned |
64721 |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
COND |
|
15/02/1960 |
Condemned |
64722 |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
COND |
|
15/02/1960 |
Condemned |
64937 |
LIN |
Lincoln |
|
COND |
|
15/02/1960 |
Condemned |
64967 |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
COND |
|
19/02/1960 |
Condemned |
64898 |
RET |
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
|
COND |
|
22/02/1960 |
Condemned |
64728 |
40F |
Boston |
|
COND |
|
07/03/1960 |
Condemned |
64781 |
30A |
Stratford |
|
COND |
|
11/03/1960 |
Condemned |
64883 |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
COND |
|
11/03/1960 |
Condemned |
64902 |
41F |
Mexborough |
|
COND |
|
13/03/1960 |
Reallocation |
64736 |
41A |
Sheffield Darnall |
40E |
Colwick |
|
13/03/1960 |
Reallocation |
64746 |
SHF |
Sheffield Darnall |
40E |
Colwick |
|
13/03/1960 |
Reallocation |
64804 |
41A |
Sheffield Darnall |
40E |
Colwick |
|
14/03/1960 |
Condemned |
64951 |
33B |
Tilbury |
|
COND |
|
14/03/1960 |
Condemned |
64952 |
33B |
Tilbury |
|
COND |
|
14/03/1960 |
Condemned |
64953 |
33B |
Tilbury |
|
COND |
|
14/03/1960 |
Condemned |
64957 |
33B |
Tilbury |
|
COND |
|
14/03/1960 |
Condemned |
64958 |
33B |
Tilbury |
|
COND |
|
14/03/1960 |
Condemned |
64965 |
33B |
Tilbury |
|
COND |
|
15/03/1960 |
Condemned |
64759 |
RET |
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
|
COND |
|
15/03/1960 |
Condemned |
64774 |
31B |
March |
|
COND |
|
15/03/1960 |
Condemned |
64782 |
31B |
March |
|
COND |
|
15/03/1960 |
Condemned |
64954 |
33B |
Tilbury |
|
COND |
|
15/03/1960 |
Condemned |
64956 |
33B |
Tilbury |
|
COND |
|
16/03/1960 |
Condemned |
64962 |
33B |
Tilbury |
|
COND |
|
16/03/1960 |
Condemned |
64968 |
33B |
Tilbury |
|
COND |
|
20/03/1960 |
Reallocation |
64942 |
50A |
York (North) |
52G |
Sunderland |
|
21/03/1960 |
Condemned |
64828 |
41F |
Mexborough |
|
COND |
|
21/03/1960 |
Condemned |
64890 |
40A |
Lincoln |
|
COND |
|
29/03/1960 |
Condemned |
64824 |
39A |
Gorton |
|
COND |
|
05/04/1960 |
Condemned |
64807 |
41A |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
COND |
|
11/04/1960 |
Condemned |
64948 |
CAR |
Carlisle Canal |
|
COND |
|
01/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
64742 |
GOR |
Gorton |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
|
01/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
64747 |
9G |
Gorton |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
|
01/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
64809 |
39A |
Gorton |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
|
06/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
64963 |
64C |
Dalry Road |
62C |
Dunfermline Upper |
|
12/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
64705 |
56B |
Ardsley |
56A |
Wakefield |
|
11/07/1960 |
Condemned |
64741 |
40A |
Lincoln |
|
COND |
|
11/07/1960 |
Condemned |
64789 |
31B |
March |
|
COND |
|
11/07/1960 |
Condemned |
64893 |
36E |
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
|
COND |
|
11/07/1960 |
Condemned |
64966 |
40A |
Lincoln |
|
COND |
|
25/07/1960 |
Condemned |
64802 |
40E |
Colwick |
|
COND |
|
02/08/1960 |
Condemned |
64717 |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
COND |
|
17/08/1960 |
Condemned |
64765 |
30A |
Stratford |
|
COND |
|
18/08/1960 |
Condemned |
64708 |
30A |
Stratford |
|
COND |
|
20/08/1960 |
Condemned |
64784 |
30A |
Stratford |
|
COND |
|
20/08/1960 |
Condemned |
64889 |
40E |
Colwick |
|
COND |
|
26/08/1960 |
Condemned |
64775 |
STR |
Stratford |
|
COND |
|
27/08/1960 |
Condemned |
64896 |
40A |
Lincoln |
|
COND |
|
29/08/1960 |
Reallocation |
64975 |
64A |
St Margarets |
65D |
Dawsholm |
|
31/08/1960 |
Condemned |
64974 |
CLK |
Colwick |
|
COND |
|
11/09/1960 |
Reallocation |
64719 |
41A |
Sheffield Darnall |
51F |
West Auckland |
|
11/09/1960 |
Reallocation |
64778 |
AUK |
West Auckland |
41A |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
11/09/1960 |
Reallocation |
64835 |
51L |
Thornaby |
51F |
West Auckland |
|
11/09/1960 |
Reallocation |
64854 |
52A |
Gateshead |
52G |
Sunderland |
|
11/09/1960 |
Reallocation |
64904 |
53A |
Hull Dairycoates |
50E |
Scarborough |
|
11/09/1960 |
Reallocation |
64910 |
53A |
Hull Dairycoates |
55H |
Neville Hill |
|
11/09/1960 |
Reallocation |
64947 |
53A |
Hull Dairycoates |
55H |
Neville Hill |
|
12/09/1960 |
Condemned |
64778 |
41A |
Sheffield Darnall |
|
COND |
|
25/09/1960 |
Reallocation |
64810 |
36A |
Doncaster |
36E |
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
|
09/10/1960 |
Reallocation |
64815 |
52C |
Blaydon |
51C |
West Hartlepool |
|
09/10/1960 |
Reallocation |
64849 |
52C |
Blaydon |
51C |
West Hartlepool |
|
09/10/1960 |
Reallocation |
64904 |
50E |
Scarborough |
50B |
Hull Dairycoates |
|
16/10/1960 |
Reallocation |
64757 |
37A |
Ardsley |
51L |
Thornaby |
|
16/10/1960 |
Reallocation |
64969 |
37A |
Ardsley |
51F |
West Auckland |
|
16/10/1960 |
Reallocation |
64979 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
51F |
West Auckland |
|
19/10/1960 |
Condemned |
64764 |
31B |
March |
|
COND |
|
19/10/1960 |
Condemned |
64770 |
31B |
March |
|
COND |
|
26/10/1960 |
Condemned |
64738 |
39A |
Gorton |
|
COND |
|
02/11/1960 |
Condemned |
64783 |
30A |
Stratford |
|
COND |
|
06/11/1960 |
Reallocation |
64911 |
56C |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
56B |
Ardsley |
|
13/11/1960 |
Reallocation |
64707 |
52A |
Gateshead |
52G |
Sunderland |
|
22/11/1960 |
Condemned |
64726 |
40A |
Lincoln |
|
COND |
|
25/11/1960 |
Reallocation |
64955 |
38B |
Annesley |
9G |
Gorton |
|
20/12/1960 |
Reallocation |
64880 |
CAR |
Carlisle Canal |
9G |
Gorton |
|
05/01/1961 |
Condemned |
64823 |
40E |
Colwick |
|
COND |
|
13/01/1961 |
Condemned |
64743 |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
COND |
|
13/01/1961 |
Condemned |
64767 |
30A |
Stratford |
|
COND |
|
15/01/1961 |
Reallocation |
64713 |
52A |
Gateshead |
52F |
Blyth (North) |
|
15/01/1961 |
Reallocation |
64814 |
52A |
Gateshead |
52F |
Blyth (North) |
|
15/01/1961 |
Reallocation |
64816 |
BLA |
Blaydon |
52B |
Heaton |
|
15/01/1961 |
Reallocation |
64842 |
BLA |
Blaydon |
52B |
Heaton |
|
15/01/1961 |
Reallocation |
64846 |
52A |
Gateshead |
52F |
Blyth (North) |
|
15/01/1961 |
Reallocation |
64858 |
BLA |
Blaydon |
52G |
Sunderland |
|
15/01/1961 |
Reallocation |
64910 |
55H |
Neville Hill |
52B |
Heaton |
|
17/02/1961 |
Condemned |
64885 |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
COND |
|
18/02/1961 |
Condemned |
64878 |
SHF |
Sheffield Neepsend |
|
COND |
|
20/02/1961 |
Condemned |
64746 |
40E |
Colwick |
|
COND |
|
21/02/1961 |
Condemned |
64808 |
SHF |
Sheffield Neepsend |
|
COND |
|
26/02/1961 |
Reallocation |
64812 |
52A |
Gateshead |
52H |
Tyne Dock |
|
26/02/1961 |
Reallocation |
64851 |
52A |
Gateshead |
52H |
Tyne Dock |
|
26/02/1961 |
Reallocation |
64921 |
52A |
Gateshead |
52H |
Tyne Dock |
|
14/03/1961 |
Condemned |
64729 |
40F |
Boston |
|
COND |
|
15/03/1961 |
Condemned |
64987 |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
COND |
|
22/03/1961 |
Condemned |
64908 |
RET |
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
|
COND |
|
24/03/1961 |
Condemned |
64723 |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
COND |
|
26/03/1961 |
Reallocation |
64705 |
56A |
Wakefield |
56B |
Ardsley |
|
05/04/1961 |
Condemned |
64716 |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
COND |
|
05/04/1961 |
Condemned |
64909 |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
COND |
|
11/04/1961 |
Condemned |
64882 |
36E |
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
|
COND |
|
12/04/1961 |
Condemned |
64906 |
RET |
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
|
COND |
|
17/04/1961 |
Condemned |
64700 |
52G |
Sunderland |
|
COND |
|
17/04/1961 |
Condemned |
64710 |
52G |
Sunderland |
|
COND |
|
17/04/1961 |
Condemned |
64874 |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
COND |
|
19/04/1961 |
Condemned |
64804 |
40E |
Colwick |
|
COND |
|
24/04/1961 |
Condemned |
64964 |
CAR |
Carlisle Canal |
|
COND |
|
12/05/1961 |
Condemned |
64892 |
CAR |
Carlisle Canal |
|
COND |
|
24/05/1961 |
Condemned |
64970 |
RET |
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
|
COND |
|
11/06/1961 |
Reallocation |
64713 |
52F |
Blyth (North) |
52G |
Sunderland |
|
20/06/1961 |
Condemned |
64831 |
53A |
Hull Dairycoates |
|
COND |
|
26/06/1961 |
Condemned |
64810 |
36E |
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
|
COND |
|
01/07/1961 |
Condemned |
64748 |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
COND |
|
03/07/1961 |
Condemned |
64772 |
31B |
March |
|
COND |
|
03/07/1961 |
Condemned |
64930 |
9G |
Gorton |
|
COND |
|
03/07/1961 |
Condemned |
64932 |
CAR |
Carlisle Canal |
|
COND |
|
09/07/1961 |
Reallocation |
64850 |
51L |
Thornaby |
50F |
Malton |
|
10/07/1961 |
Condemned |
64736 |
40E |
Colwick |
|
COND |
|
21/07/1961 |
Condemned |
64845 |
51L |
Thornaby |
|
COND |
|
21/07/1961 |
Condemned |
64914 |
HLD |
Hull Dairycoates |
|
COND |
|
21/07/1961 |
Condemned |
64928 |
50F |
Malton |
|
COND |
|
30/07/1961 |
Reallocation |
64814 |
52F |
Blyth (North) |
52B |
Heaton |
|
30/07/1961 |
Reallocation |
64846 |
52F |
Blyth (North) |
52H |
Tyne Dock |
|
30/07/1961 |
Reallocation |
64853 |
52G |
Sunderland |
52H |
Tyne Dock |
|
12/08/1961 |
Condemned |
64815 |
51C |
West Hartlepool |
|
COND |
|
20/08/1961 |
Reallocation |
64812 |
52H |
Tyne Dock |
52G |
Sunderland |
|
20/08/1961 |
Reallocation |
64843 |
TWD |
Tweedmouth |
52G |
Sunderland |
|
20/08/1961 |
Reallocation |
64846 |
52H |
Tyne Dock |
52G |
Sunderland |
|
20/08/1961 |
Reallocation |
64851 |
52H |
Tyne Dock |
52G |
Sunderland |
|
20/08/1961 |
Reallocation |
64853 |
52H |
Tyne Dock |
52G |
Sunderland |
|
20/08/1961 |
Reallocation |
64921 |
52H |
Tyne Dock |
52G |
Sunderland |
|
25/08/1961 |
Condemned |
64707 |
52G |
Sunderland |
|
COND |
|
25/08/1961 |
Condemned |
64732 |
37A |
Ardsley |
|
COND |
|
25/08/1961 |
Condemned |
64916 |
52D.1 |
Alnmouth |
|
COND |
|
27/08/1961 |
Reallocation |
64946 |
64C |
Dalry Road |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
08/09/1961 |
Condemned |
64720 |
37A |
Ardsley |
|
COND |
|
20/09/1961 |
Condemned |
64779 |
31B |
March |
|
COND |
|
08/10/1961 |
Reallocation |
64814 |
52B |
Heaton |
52F |
Blyth (North) |
|
08/10/1961 |
Reallocation |
64869 |
52A |
Gateshead |
52F |
Blyth (North) |
|
09/10/1961 |
Condemned |
64839 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
COND |
|
13/10/1961 |
Condemned |
64901 |
31B |
March |
|
COND |
|
19/10/1961 |
Condemned |
64733 |
12B |
Carlisle Canal |
|
COND |
|
22/10/1961 |
Condemned |
64725 |
51L |
Thornaby |
|
COND |
|
22/10/1961 |
Condemned |
64862 |
51F |
West Auckland |
|
COND |
|
22/10/1961 |
Condemned |
64904 |
50B |
Hull Dairycoates |
|
COND |
|
22/10/1961 |
Condemned |
64931 |
52B |
Heaton |
|
COND |
|
02/11/1961 |
Condemned |
64825 |
52G |
Sunderland |
|
COND |
|
05/11/1961 |
Reallocation |
64852 |
52A |
Gateshead |
52B |
Heaton |
|
11/11/1961 |
Condemned |
64745 |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
COND |
|
12/11/1961 |
Reallocation |
64921 |
52G |
Sunderland |
52B |
Heaton |
|
16/11/1961 |
Condemned |
64920 |
50B |
Neville Hill |
|
COND |
|
17/11/1961 |
Condemned |
64837 |
52B |
Heaton |
|
COND |
|
26/11/1961 |
Reallocation |
64861 |
51L |
Thornaby |
55H |
Neville Hill |
|
13/12/1961 |
Condemned |
64816 |
52B |
Heaton |
|
COND |
|
18/12/1961 |
Reallocation |
64794 |
64C |
Dalry Road |
62A |
Thornton Junction |
|
18/12/1961 |
Reallocation |
64986 |
64C |
Dalry Road |
62A |
Thornton Junction |
|
24/12/1961 |
Reallocation |
64818 |
51L |
Thornaby |
51F |
West Auckland |
|
24/12/1961 |
Reallocation |
64855 |
51L |
Thornaby |
52B |
Heaton |
|
24/12/1961 |
Reallocation |
64859 |
51L |
Thornaby |
51F |
West Auckland |
|
04/01/1962 |
Condemned |
64792 |
62A |
Thornton Junction |
|
COND |
|
05/01/1962 |
Condemned |
64979 |
51F |
West Auckland |
|
COND |
|
14/01/1962 |
Reallocation |
64806 |
52B |
Heaton |
52G |
Sunderland |
|
14/01/1962 |
Reallocation |
64942 |
52G |
Sunderland |
52B |
Heaton |
|
18/01/1962 |
Condemned |
64870 |
51L |
Thornaby |
|
COND |
|
21/01/1962 |
Reallocation |
64706 |
51L |
Thornaby |
52G |
Sunderland |
|
22/01/1962 |
Reallocation |
64795 |
64A |
St Margarets |
62C |
Dunfermline Upper |
|
27/01/1962 |
Condemned |
64809 |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
|
COND |
|
29/01/1962 |
Condemned |
64963 |
62C |
Dunfermline Upper |
|
COND |
|
31/01/1962 |
Condemned |
64863 |
50B |
Neville Hill |
|
COND |
|
10/02/1962 |
Condemned |
64718 |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
COND |
|
17/02/1962 |
Reallocation |
64946 |
64A |
St Margarets |
62C |
Dunfermline Upper |
|
24/02/1962 |
Condemned |
64867 |
50F |
Malton |
|
COND |
|
25/02/1962 |
Reallocation |
64850 |
50F |
Malton |
50B |
Hull Dairycoates |
|
24/03/1962 |
Condemned |
64744 |
39A |
Gorton |
|
COND |
|
24/03/1962 |
Condemned |
64884 |
CAR |
Carlisle Canal |
|
COND |
|
29/03/1962 |
Condemned |
64703 |
52G |
Sunderland |
|
COND |
|
29/03/1962 |
Condemned |
64705 |
56B |
Ardsley |
|
COND |
|
29/03/1962 |
Condemned |
64706 |
52G |
Sunderland |
|
COND |
|
29/03/1962 |
Condemned |
64817 |
56F |
Low Moor |
|
COND |
|
29/03/1962 |
Condemned |
64843 |
52G |
Sunderland |
|
COND |
|
29/03/1962 |
Condemned |
64858 |
52G |
Sunderland |
|
COND |
|
29/03/1962 |
Condemned |
64915 |
HTN |
Heaton |
|
COND |
|
30/03/1962 |
Condemned |
64811 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
COND |
|
05/04/1962 |
Reallocation |
64955 |
9G |
Gorton |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
|
08/04/1962 |
Reallocation |
64814 |
52F |
Blyth (North) |
52D.1 |
Alnmouth |
|
08/04/1962 |
Reallocation |
64869 |
52F |
Blyth (North) |
52D.1 |
Alnmouth |
|
13/04/1962 |
Condemned |
64903 |
56F |
Low Moor |
|
COND |
|
15/04/1962 |
Reallocation |
64859 |
51F |
West Auckland |
56D |
Mirfield |
|
15/04/1962 |
Reallocation |
64927 |
51F |
West Auckland |
56D |
Mirfield |
|
18/04/1962 |
Condemned |
64713 |
52G |
Sunderland |
|
COND |
|
18/04/1962 |
Condemned |
64842 |
52B |
Heaton |
|
COND |
|
18/04/1962 |
Condemned |
64868 |
ALN |
|
|
COND |
|
18/04/1962 |
Condemned |
64939 |
52B |
Heaton |
|
COND |
|
25/04/1962 |
Condemned |
64836 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
COND |
|
17/05/1962 |
Condemned |
64806 |
52G |
Sunderland |
|
COND |
|
23/05/1962 |
Condemned |
64711 |
TWD |
Tweedmouth |
|
COND |
|
23/05/1962 |
Condemned |
64947 |
55H |
Neville Hill |
|
COND |
|
24/05/1962 |
Condemned |
64820 |
37A |
Ardsley |
|
COND |
|
17/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
64719 |
51F |
West Auckland |
56B |
Ardsley |
|
17/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
64756 |
51F |
West Auckland |
56B |
Ardsley |
|
17/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
64818 |
51F |
West Auckland |
56B |
Ardsley |
|
17/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
64857 |
51L |
Thornaby |
55H |
Neville Hill |
|
17/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
64969 |
51F |
West Auckland |
56B |
Ardsley |
|
25/06/1962 |
Condemned |
64971 |
53A |
Hull Dairycoates |
|
COND |
|
21/07/1962 |
Condemned |
64742 |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
|
COND |
|
21/07/1962 |
Condemned |
64955 |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
|
COND |
|
30/07/1962 |
Reallocation |
64727 |
9G |
Gorton |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
|
30/07/1962 |
Reallocation |
64875 |
9G |
Gorton |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
|
13/08/1962 |
Condemned |
64794 |
62A |
Thornton Junction |
|
COND |
|
19/08/1962 |
Reallocation |
64910 |
52B |
Heaton |
52D.1 |
Alnmouth |
|
20/08/1962 |
Condemned |
64855 |
52B |
Heaton |
|
COND |
|
22/08/1962 |
Condemned |
64949 |
52D.1 |
Alnmouth |
|
COND |
|
09/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
64917 |
TWD |
Tweedmouth |
52D.1 |
Alnmouth |
|
12/09/1962 |
Condemned |
64819 |
53A |
Hull Dairycoates |
|
COND |
|
15/09/1962 |
Condemned |
64740 |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
COND |
|
15/09/1962 |
Condemned |
64798 |
38B |
Annesley |
|
COND |
|
24/09/1962 |
Condemned |
64866 |
52B |
Heaton |
|
COND |
|
15/10/1962 |
Condemned |
64856 |
HTN |
Heaton |
|
COND |
|
15/10/1962 |
Condemned |
64871 |
52B |
Heaton |
|
COND |
|
15/10/1962 |
Condemned |
64923 |
HTN |
Heaton |
|
COND |
|
15/10/1962 |
Condemned |
64926 |
52B |
Heaton |
|
COND |
|
15/10/1962 |
Condemned |
64945 |
HTN |
Heaton |
|
COND |
|
20/10/1962 |
Condemned |
64875 |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
|
COND |
|
20/10/1962 |
Condemned |
64880 |
9G |
Gorton |
|
COND |
|
27/10/1962 |
Condemned |
64727 |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
|
COND |
|
27/10/1962 |
Condemned |
64877 |
CAR |
Carlisle Canal |
|
COND |
|
27/10/1962 |
Condemned |
64888 |
CAR |
Carlisle Canal |
|
COND |
|
27/10/1962 |
Condemned |
64895 |
CAR |
Carlisle Canal |
|
COND |
|
27/10/1962 |
Condemned |
64899 |
CAR |
Carlisle Canal |
|
COND |
|
03/11/1962 |
Condemned |
64739 |
38B |
Annesley |
|
COND |
|
10/11/1962 |
Condemned |
64747 |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
|
COND |
|
12/11/1962 |
Condemned |
64749 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
COND |
|
12/11/1962 |
Condemned |
64754 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
COND |
|
12/11/1962 |
Condemned |
64911 |
56B |
Ardsley |
|
COND |
|
13/11/1962 |
Condemned |
64879 |
37A |
Ardsley |
|
COND |
|
16/11/1962 |
Condemned |
64701 |
52G |
Sunderland |
|
COND |
|
16/11/1962 |
Condemned |
64730 |
51L |
Thornaby |
|
COND |
|
16/11/1962 |
Condemned |
64758 |
51L |
Thornaby |
|
COND |
|
16/11/1962 |
Condemned |
64821 |
51L |
Thornaby |
|
COND |
|
16/11/1962 |
Condemned |
64846 |
52G |
Sunderland |
|
COND |
|
16/11/1962 |
Condemned |
64847 |
52G |
Sunderland |
|
COND |
|
16/11/1962 |
Condemned |
64849 |
51C |
West Hartlepool |
|
COND |
|
16/11/1962 |
Condemned |
64938 |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
COND |
|
18/11/1962 |
Reallocation |
64859 |
56D |
Mirfield |
56B |
Ardsley |
|
18/11/1962 |
Reallocation |
64886 |
56F |
Low Moor |
56B |
Ardsley |
|
18/11/1962 |
Reallocation |
64927 |
56D |
Mirfield |
56B |
Ardsley |
|
23/11/1962 |
Condemned |
64709 |
53A |
Hull Dairycoates |
|
COND |
|
23/11/1962 |
Condemned |
64719 |
56B |
Ardsley |
|
COND |
|
23/11/1962 |
Condemned |
64814 |
52D.1 |
Alnmouth |
|
COND |
|
23/11/1962 |
Condemned |
64910 |
52D.1 |
Alnmouth |
|
COND |
|
23/11/1962 |
Condemned |
64922 |
50B |
Neville Hill |
|
COND |
|
23/11/1962 |
Condemned |
64924 |
TWD.1 |
Alnmouth |
|
COND |
|
23/11/1962 |
Condemned |
64929 |
52D.1 |
Alnmouth |
|
COND |
|
26/11/1962 |
Condemned |
64757 |
51L |
Thornaby |
|
COND |
|
26/11/1962 |
Condemned |
64791 |
56F |
Low Moor |
|
COND |
|
26/11/1962 |
Condemned |
64801 |
56F |
Low Moor |
|
COND |
|
26/11/1962 |
Condemned |
64833 |
52G |
Sunderland |
|
COND |
|
26/11/1962 |
Condemned |
64872 |
56F |
Low Moor |
|
COND |
|
26/11/1962 |
Condemned |
64907 |
56F |
Low Moor |
|
COND |
|
27/11/1962 |
Condemned |
64840 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
COND |
|
27/11/1962 |
Condemned |
64886 |
56B |
Ardsley |
|
COND |
|
30/11/1962 |
Condemned |
64760 |
ARD |
Ardsley |
|
COND |
|
30/11/1962 |
Condemned |
64918 |
37A |
Ardsley |
|
COND |
|
30/11/1962 |
Condemned |
64969 |
56B |
Ardsley |
|
COND |
|
03/12/1962 |
Condemned |
64704 |
52G |
Sunderland |
|
COND |
|
03/12/1962 |
Condemned |
64756 |
56B |
Ardsley |
|
COND |
|
03/12/1962 |
Condemned |
64812 |
52G |
Sunderland |
|
COND |
|
03/12/1962 |
Condemned |
64813 |
TWD |
Tweedmouth |
|
COND |
|
03/12/1962 |
Condemned |
64818 |
56B |
Ardsley |
|
COND |
|
03/12/1962 |
Condemned |
64835 |
51F |
West Auckland |
|
COND |
|
03/12/1962 |
Condemned |
64844 |
TWD |
Tweedmouth |
|
COND |
|
03/12/1962 |
Condemned |
64848 |
51F |
West Auckland |
|
COND |
|
03/12/1962 |
Condemned |
64850 |
50B |
Hull Dairycoates |
|
COND |
|
03/12/1962 |
Condemned |
64851 |
52G |
Sunderland |
|
COND |
|
03/12/1962 |
Condemned |
64852 |
52B |
Heaton |
|
COND |
|
03/12/1962 |
Condemned |
64853 |
52G |
Sunderland |
|
COND |
|
03/12/1962 |
Condemned |
64854 |
52G |
Sunderland |
|
COND |
|
03/12/1962 |
Condemned |
64857 |
55H |
Neville Hill |
|
COND |
|
03/12/1962 |
Condemned |
64859 |
56B |
Ardsley |
|
COND |
|
03/12/1962 |
Condemned |
64860 |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
COND |
|
03/12/1962 |
Condemned |
64861 |
55H |
Neville Hill |
|
COND |
|
03/12/1962 |
Condemned |
64864 |
52B |
Heaton |
|
COND |
|
03/12/1962 |
Condemned |
64865 |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
COND |
|
03/12/1962 |
Condemned |
64869 |
52D.1 |
Alnmouth |
|
COND |
|
03/12/1962 |
Condemned |
64897 |
52D.1 |
Alnmouth |
|
COND |
|
03/12/1962 |
Condemned |
64917 |
52D.1 |
Alnmouth |
|
COND |
|
03/12/1962 |
Condemned |
64919 |
56F |
Low Moor |
|
COND |
|
03/12/1962 |
Condemned |
64921 |
52B |
Heaton |
|
COND |
|
03/12/1962 |
Condemned |
64925 |
TWD |
Tweedmouth |
|
COND |
|
03/12/1962 |
Condemned |
64927 |
56B |
Ardsley |
|
COND |
|
03/12/1962 |
Condemned |
64936 |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
COND |
|
03/12/1962 |
Condemned |
64941 |
52D |
Tweedmouth |
|
COND |
|
03/12/1962 |
Condemned |
64942 |
52B |
Heaton |
|
COND |
|
03/12/1962 |
Condemned |
64978 |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
COND |
|
03/12/1962 |
Condemned |
64982 |
51F |
West Auckland |
|
COND |
|
12/12/1962 |
Condemned |
64933 |
50B |
Neville Hill |
|
COND |
|
12/12/1962 |
Condemned |
64944 |
50B |
Neville Hill |
|
COND |
|
13/12/1962 |
Condemned |
64796 |
56B |
Ardsley |
|
COND |
|
17/12/1962 |
Condemned |
64934 |
50B |
Neville Hill |
|
COND |
|
17/12/1962 |
Condemned |
64935 |
50B |
Neville Hill |
|
COND |
|
17/12/1962 |
Condemned |
64940 |
53A |
Hull Dairycoates |
|
COND |
|
17/12/1962 |
Condemned |
64943 |
53A |
Hull Dairycoates |
|
COND |
|
29/12/1962 |
Condemned |
64786 |
DEE |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
|
COND |
|
29/12/1962 |
Condemned |
64790 |
62A |
Thornton Junction |
|
COND |
|
29/12/1962 |
Condemned |
64795 |
62C |
Dunfermline Upper |
|
COND |
|
29/12/1962 |
Condemned |
64822 |
DEE |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
|
COND |
|
29/12/1962 |
Condemned |
64946 |
62C |
Dunfermline Upper |
|
COND |
|
29/12/1962 |
Condemned |
64950 |
DEE |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
|
COND |
|
29/12/1962 |
Condemned |
64975 |
65D |
Dawsholm |
|
COND |
|
29/12/1962 |
Condemned |
64986 |
62A |
Thornton Junction |
|
COND |
|