GNR/LNER Stirling "J52" Class 0-6-0ST
GNR | LNER (1924) | LNER (1946) | BR | BR (Dept) | Date To Service | Rebuilt From | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1201 | 4201 | 8805 | 68805 | 08/1897 | 20/10/1955 | 58.17 | ||||||||
1202 | 4202 | 8806 | 68806 | 08/1897 | 31/12/1955 | 58.33 | ||||||||
1203 | 4203 | 8807 | 68807 | 09/1897 | 23/09/1955 | 58 | ||||||||
1204 | 4204 | 8808 | 68808 | 09/1897 | 12/04/1957 | 59.58 | ||||||||
1205 | 4205 | 8809 | 68809 | 09/1897 | 11/09/1956 | 59 | ||||||||
1206 | 4206 | 8810 | 68810 | 10/1897 | 12/11/1955 | 58.08 | ||||||||
1207 | 4207 | 8811 | 68811 | 10/1897 | 27/05/1957 | 59.58 | ||||||||
1208 | 4208 | 8812 | 68812 | 10/1897 | 16/09/1955 | 57.92 | ||||||||
1209 | 4209 | 8813 | 68813 | 10/1897 | 15/10/1956 | 59 | ||||||||
1210 | 4210 | 8814 | 68814 | 10/1897 | 24/11/1955 | 58.08 | ||||||||
1216 | 4216 | 8815 | 68815 | 12/1898 | 15/05/1958 | 59.42 | ||||||||
1217 | 4217 | 8816 | 2 | 01/1899 | 03/1956 | Grantham | 57.17 | |||||||
1218 | 4218 | 8817 | 68817 | 02/1899 | 04/04/1958 | 59.17 | ||||||||
1219 | 4219 | 8818 | 68818 | 02/1899 | 16/11/1955 | 56.75 | ||||||||
1220 | 4220 | 8819 | 68819 | 02/1899 | 18/06/1956 | 57.33 | ||||||||
1221 | 4221 | 8820 | 68820 | 03/1899 | 16/12/1955 | 56.75 | ||||||||
1222 | 4222 | 8821 | 68821 | 03/1899 | 14/03/1956 | 57 | ||||||||
1223 | 4223 | 8822 | 68822 | 04/1899 | 11/10/1956 | 57.5 | ||||||||
1224 | 4224 | 8823 | 68823 | 04/1899 | 24/06/1957 | 58.17 | ||||||||
1225 | 4225 | 8824 | 68824 | 04/1899 | 27/05/1959 | 60.08 | ||||||||
1226 | 4226 | 8825 | 68825 | 04/1899 | 10/08/1953 | 54.33 | ||||||||
1227 | 4227 | 8826 | 68826 | 04/1899 | 11/03/1957 | 57.92 | ||||||||
1228 | 4228 | 8827 | 68827 | 04/1899 | 03/01/1956 | 56.75 | ||||||||
1229 | 4229 | 8828 | 68828 | 04/1899 | 03/02/1958 | 58.83 | ||||||||
1230 | 4230 | 8829 | 68829 | 04/1899 | 10/02/1958 | 58.83 | ||||||||
1231 | 4231 | 8830 | 68830 | 04/1899 | 13/07/1956 | 57.25 | ||||||||
1232 | 4232 | 8831 | 68831 | 04/1899 | 20/01/1959 | 59.75 | ||||||||
1233 | 4233 | 8832 | 68832 | 04/1899 | 21/10/1957 | 58.5 | ||||||||
1234 | 4234 | 8833 | 68833 | 04/1899 | 20/02/1956 | 56.83 | ||||||||
1235 | 4235 | 8834 | 68834 | 04/1899 | 22/02/1960 | 60.83 | ||||||||
1236 | 4236 | 8835 | 68835 | 04/1899 | 10/02/1958 | 58.83 | ||||||||
1237 | 4237 | 8836 | 68836 | 04/1899 | 03/10/1956 | 57.5 | ||||||||
1238 | 4238 | 8837 | 68837 | 04/1899 | 23/02/1959 | 59.83 | ||||||||
1239 | 4239 | 8838 | 68838 | 04/1899 | 07/08/1956 | 57.33 | ||||||||
1240 | 4240 | 8839 | 68839 | 04/1899 | 12/04/1958 | 59 | ||||||||
1241 | 4241 | 8840 | 68840 | 05/1899 | 27/01/1958 | 58.67 | ||||||||
1242 | 4242 | 8841 | 68841 | 05/1899 | 01/04/1957 | 57.92 | ||||||||
1243 | 4243 | 8842 | 68842 | 05/1899 | 26/07/1958 | 59.17 | ||||||||
1244 | 4244 | 8843 | 68843 | 05/1899 | 22/04/1957 | 57.92 | ||||||||
1245 | 4245 | 8844 | 68844 | 05/1899 | 25/10/1954 | 55.42 | ||||||||
1246 | 4246 | 8845 | 68845 | 1 | 05/1899 | 02/1958 | Doncaster | 58.75 | ||||||
1247 | 4247 | 8846 | 68846 | 05/1899 | 08/05/1959 | 60 | Prs | Preserved | ||||||
1248 | 4248 | 8847 | 68847 | 05/1899 | 01/08/1958 | 59.25 | ||||||||
1249 | 4249 | 8848 | 68848 | 05/1899 | 24/07/1958 | 59.17 | ||||||||
1250 | 4250 | 8849 | 68849 | 05/1899 | 16/12/1957 | 58.58 | ||||||||
1251 | 4251 | 8850 | 68850 | 12/1901 | 25/10/1954 | 52.83 | ||||||||
1252 | 4252 | 8851 | 68851 | 12/1901 | 06/05/1957 | 55.42 | ||||||||
1253 | 4253 | 8852 | 68852 | 12/1901 | 31/12/1955 | 54 | ||||||||
1254 | 4254 | 8853 | 68853 | 12/1901 | 12/07/1956 | 54.58 | ||||||||
1255 | 4255 | 8854 | 68854 | 12/1901 | 19/07/1954 | 52.58 | ||||||||
1256 | 4256 | 8855 | 68855 | 12/1901 | 14/11/1956 | 54.92 | ||||||||
1257 | 4257 | 8856 | 68856 | 12/1901 | 23/11/1955 | 53.92 | ||||||||
1258 | 4258 | 8857 | 68857 | 12/1901 | 14/04/1958 | 56.33 | ||||||||
1259 | 4259 | 8858 | 68858 | 12/1901 | 16/12/1955 | 54 | ||||||||
1260 | 4260 | 8859 | 68859 | 02/1902 | 02/08/1954 | 52.5 | ||||||||
1261 | 4261 | 8860 | 68860 | 01/1902 | 23/12/1957 | 55.92 | ||||||||
1262 | 4262 | 8861 | 68861 | 02/1902 | 10/1955 | 53.67 | ||||||||
1263 | 4263 | 8862 | 68862 | 02/1902 | 13/10/1958 | 56.67 | ||||||||
1264 | 4264 | 8863 | 68863 | 03/1902 | 08/05/1958 | 56.17 | ||||||||
1265 | 4265 | 8864 | 68864 | 03/1902 | 19/10/1955 | 53.58 | ||||||||
1266 | 4266 | 8865 | 68865 | 03/1902 | 27/10/1955 | 53.58 | ||||||||
1267 | 4267 | 8866 | 68866 | 03/1902 | 02/09/1958 | 56.5 | ||||||||
1268 | 4268 | 8867 | 68867 | 04/1902 | 10/02/1958 | 55.83 | ||||||||
1269 | 4269 | 8868 | 68868 | 03/1902 | 28/10/1955 | 53.58 | ||||||||
1270 | 4270 | 8869 | 68869 | 03/1902 | 20/03/1961 | 59 | ||||||||
1271 | 4271 | 8870 | 68870 | 10/1905 | 22/03/1958 | 52.42 | ||||||||
1272 | 4272 | 8871 | 68871 | 10/1905 | 10/02/1958 | 52.33 | ||||||||
1273 | 4273 | 8872 | 68872 | 10/1905 | 21/08/1956 | 50.83 | ||||||||
1274 | 4274 | 8873 | 68873 | 10/1905 | 30/09/1955 | 49.92 | ||||||||
1275 | 4275 | 8874 | 68874 | 11/1905 | 16/10/1957 | 51.92 | ||||||||
1276 | 4276 | 8875 | 68875 | 11/1905 | 20/03/1961 | 55.33 | ||||||||
1277 | 4277 | 8876 | 68876 | 11/1905 | 05/03/1956 | 50.33 | ||||||||
1278 | 4278 | 8877 | 68877 | 11/1905 | 20/11/1956 | 51 | ||||||||
1279 | 4279 | 8878 | 68878 | 11/1905 | 25/05/1956 | 50.5 | ||||||||
1280 | 4280 | 8879 | 68879 | 12/1905 | 20/09/1955 | 49.75 | ||||||||
1281 | 4281 | 8880 | 68880 | 12/1908 | 17/08/1956 | 47.67 | ||||||||
1282 | 4282 | 8881 | 68881 | 12/1908 | 09/12/1955 | 47 | ||||||||
1283 | 4283 | 8882 | 68882 | 12/1908 | 27/01/1958 | 49.08 | ||||||||
1284 | 4284 | 8883 | 68883 | 12/1908 | 26/09/1955 | 46.75 | ||||||||
1285 | 4285 | 8884 | 68884 | 01/1909 | 14/09/1955 | 46.67 | ||||||||
1286 | 4286 | 8885 | 68885 | 02/1909 | 18/09/1956 | 47.58 | ||||||||
1287 | 4287 | 8886 | 68886 | 02/1909 | 25/11/1957 | 48.75 | ||||||||
1288 | 4288 | 8887 | 68887 | 02/1909 | 26/08/1957 | 48.5 | ||||||||
1289 | 4289 | 8888 | 68888 | 02/1909 | 21/10/1957 | 48.67 | ||||||||
1290 | 4290 | 8889 | 68889 | 03/1909 | 30/05/1955 | 46.17 | ||||||||
921 | 3921 | 12/1892 | 08/1923 from J53 |
07/1939 | 46.58 | |||||||||
922 | 3922 | 8757 | 68757 | 12/1892 | 01/1924 from J53 |
29/11/1954 | 61.92 | |||||||
923 | 3923 | 8758 | 68758 | 02/1893 | 08/1924 from J53 |
25/11/1955 | 62.75 | |||||||
924 | 3924 | 02/1893 | 05/1924 from J53 |
03/1936 | 43.08 | |||||||||
925 | 3925 | 8759 | 68759 | 03/1893 | 07/1930 from J53 |
19/07/1956 | 63.33 | |||||||
926 | 3926 | 8760 | 68760 | 03/1893 | 12/1923 from J53 |
09/11/1954 | 61.67 | |||||||
927 | 3927 | 8761 | 68761 | 04/1893 | 11/1929 from J53 |
27/05/1957 | 64.08 | |||||||
929 | 3929 | 8762 | 68762 | 06/1893 | 01/1924 from J53 |
06/08/1951 | 58.17 | |||||||
930 | 3930 | 8763 | 68763 | 06/1893 | 09/1924 from J53 |
10/1950 | 57.33 | |||||||
961 | 3961 | 8764 | 68764 | 07/1893 | 12/1925 from J53 |
01/11/1954 | 61.33 | |||||||
962 | 3962 | 8765 | 68765 | 08/1893 | 09/1924 from J53 |
09/12/1955 | 62.33 | |||||||
963 | 3963 | 8766 | 68766 | 08/1893 | 09/1932 from J53 |
23/01/1952 | 58.42 | |||||||
964 | 3964 | 10/1893 | 04/1927 from J53 |
08/1939 | 45.83 | |||||||||
965 | 3965 | 8767 | 68767 | 11/1893 | 02/1931 from J53 |
04/12/1950 | 57.08 | |||||||
966 | 3966 | 8768 | 68768 | 12/1893 | 01/1928 from J53 |
25/10/1957 | 63.83 | |||||||
967 | 3967 | 8769 | 68769 | 12/1893 | 01/1930 from J53 |
23/09/1955 | 61.75 | |||||||
968 | 3968 | 8770 | 68770 | 01/1894 | 03/1924 from J53 |
05/08/1953 | 59.58 | |||||||
969 | 3969 | 8771 | 68771 | 02/1894 | 09/1932 from J53 |
10/10/1955 | 61.67 | |||||||
970 | 3970 | 8772 | 68772 | 03/1894 | 02/1922 from J53 |
06/09/1954 | 60.5 | |||||||
971 | 3971 | 8773 | 68773 | 08/1894 | 11/1928 from J53 |
13/04/1953 | 58.67 | |||||||
972 | 3972 | 8774 | 68774 | 09/1894 | 12/1923 from J53 |
20/07/1953 | 58.83 | |||||||
973 | 3973 | 8775 | 68775 | 10/1894 | 04/1926 from J53 |
14/07/1952 | 57.75 | |||||||
974 | 3974 | 8776 | 68776 | 11/1894 | 11/1924 from J53 |
26/10/1953 | 58.92 | |||||||
975 | 3975 | 8777 | 68777 | 12/1894 | 12/1931 from J53 |
29/11/1954 | 59.92 | |||||||
976 | 3976 | 8778 | 68778 | 12/1894 | 10/1924 from J53 |
03/07/1957 | 62.58 | |||||||
977 | 3977 | 8779 | 68779 | 05/1895 | 09/1922 from J53 |
27/04/1953 | 57.92 | |||||||
978 | 3978 | 8780 | 68780 | 06/1895 | 06/1923 from J53 |
25/01/1954 | 58.58 | |||||||
979 | 3979 | 8781 | 68781 | 08/1895 | 11/1932 from J53 |
13/12/1954 | 59.33 | |||||||
980 | 3980 | 8782 | 68782 | 10/1895 | 06/1923 from J53 |
11/1936 | 41.08 | |||||||
1046 | 4046 | 8783 | 68783 | 07/1896 | 02/1931 from J53 |
03/10/1955 | 59.25 | |||||||
1047 | 4047 | 8784 | 68784 | 07/1896 | 05/1924 from J53 |
25/11/1957 | 61.33 | |||||||
1048 | 4048 | 8785 | 68785 | 07/1896 | 06/1924 from J53 |
06/01/1958 | 61.5 | |||||||
1049 | 4049 | 8786 | 68786 | 07/1896 | 11/1923 from J53 |
23/11/1953 | 57.33 | |||||||
1050 | 4050 | 8787 | 68787 | 07/1896 | 10/1923 from J53 |
19/10/1955 | 59.25 | |||||||
1051 | 4051 | 8788 | 68788 | 07/1896 | 09/1923 from J53 |
27/12/1954 | 58.42 | |||||||
1052 | 4052 | 8789 | 68789 | 07/1896 | 03/1924 from J53 |
29/04/1952 | 55.75 | |||||||
1053 | 4053 | 8790 | 68790 | 07/1896 | 12/1924 from J53 |
11/07/1955 | 59 | |||||||
1054 | 4054 | 8791 | 68791 | 07/1896 | 10/1924 from J53 |
08/11/1954 | 58.33 | |||||||
1055 | 4055 | 8792 | 68792 | 07/1896 | 12/1927 from J53 |
09/06/1952 | 55.92 | |||||||
1056 | 4056 | 8793 | 68793 | 07/1896 | 11/1923 from J53 |
21/05/1956 | 59.83 | |||||||
1057 | 4057 | 8794 | 68794 | 07/1896 | 05/1926 from J53 |
14/12/1953 | 57.42 | |||||||
1058 | 4058 | 8795 | 68795 | 07/1896 | 01/1930 from J53 |
23/11/1955 | 59.33 | |||||||
1059 | 4059 | 8796 | 68796 | 07/1896 | 05/1926 from J53 |
03/11/1955 | 59.33 | |||||||
1060 | 4060 | 8797 | 68797 | 07/1896 | 09/1922 from J53 |
03/11/1955 | 59.33 | |||||||
1211 | 4211 | 8798 | 68798 | 06/1897 | 06/1932 from J53 |
08/11/1954 | 57.42 | |||||||
1212 | 4212 | 8799 | 68799 | 06/1897 | 10/1925 from J53 |
04/10/1954 | 57.33 | |||||||
1213 | 4213 | 8800 | 68800 | 06/1897 | 09/1930 from J53 |
10/07/1958 | 61.08 | |||||||
1214 | 4214 | 8801 | 68801 | 06/1897 | 01/1930 from J53 |
12/1950 | 53.5 | |||||||
1215 | 4215 | 8802 | 68802 | 06/1897 | 05/1929 from J53 |
27/12/1954 | 57.5 | |||||||
111 | 3111 | 8803 | 68803 | 08/1897 | 02/1924 from J53 |
05/08/1953 | 56 | |||||||
155 | 3155A | 8804 | 68804 | 08/1897 | 12/1925 from J53 |
17/10/1955 | 58.17 |