NBR/LNER Holmes "J83" Class 0-6-0T
Date | Event | Number | From | Depot From | To | Depot To | Usage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
09/1947 | Condemned | 8462 | COND | ||||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 8442 | KPS | Kipps | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 8443 | KPS | Kipps | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 8444 | KPS | Kipps | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 8445 | KPS | Kipps | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 8446 | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 8447 | EFD | Eastfield | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 8448 | STM | St Margarets | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 8449 | STM | St Margarets | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 8450 | STM | St Margarets | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 8451 | THJ | Thornton Junction | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 8452 | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 8453 | THJ | Thornton Junction | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 8454 | STM | St Margarets | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 8455 | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 8456 | THJ | Thornton Junction | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 8457 | HAY | Haymarket | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 8458 | THJ | Thornton Junction | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 8459 | THJ | Thornton Junction | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 8460 | HAY | Haymarket | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 8461 | KPS | Kipps | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 8463 | STM | St Margarets | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 8464 | STM | St Margarets | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 8465 | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 8466 | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 8467 | THJ | Thornton Junction | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 8468 | EFD | Eastfield | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 8469 | PTH | Perth (LNER) | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 8470 | STM | St Margarets | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 8471 | POL | Polmont | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 8472 | STM | St Margarets | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 8473 | HAY | Haymarket | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 8474 | STM | St Margarets | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 8475 | EFD | Eastfield | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 8476 | EFD | Eastfield | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 8477 | STM | St Margarets | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 8478 | HAY | Haymarket | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 8479 | EFD | Eastfield | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 8480 | EFD | Eastfield | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 8481 | HAY | Haymarket | |||
25/02/1950 | Reallocation | 68469 | PTH | Perth (LNER) | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | |
22/04/1950 | Reallocation | 68469 | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | 64A | St Margarets | |
07/04/1951 | Reallocation | 68465 | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | |
21/04/1951 | Reallocation | 68465 | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | |
16/03/1956 | Condemned | 68476 | EFD | Eastfield | COND | ||
30/03/1956 | Condemned | 68446 | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | COND | ||
14/05/1956 | Condemned | 68455 | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | COND | ||
26/05/1956 | Condemned | 68473 | HAY | Haymarket | COND | ||
05/10/1956 | Condemned | 68469 | 64A | St Margarets | COND | ||
27/10/1956 | Reallocation | 68467 | THJ | Thornton Junction | 64E | Polmont | |
12/08/1957 | Condemned | 68465 | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | COND | ||
05/12/1957 | Condemned | 68450 | STM | St Margarets | COND | ||
21/02/1958 | Condemned | 68451 | THJ | Thornton Junction | COND | ||
10/03/1958 | Condemned | 68464 | STM | St Margarets | COND | ||
10/03/1958 | Condemned | 68475 | EFD | Eastfield | COND | ||
12/04/1958 | Reallocation | 68470 | STM | St Margarets | 65A | Eastfield | |
18/04/1958 | Condemned | 68474 | STM | St Margarets | COND | ||
10/05/1958 | Reallocation | 68466 | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | 64A | St Margarets | |
10/05/1958 | Reallocation | 68470 | 65A | Eastfield | 64A | St Margarets | |
06/06/1958 | Condemned | 68461 | KPS | Kipps | COND | ||
27/06/1958 | Condemned | 68452 | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | COND | ||
17/09/1958 | Condemned | 68449 | STM | St Margarets | COND | ||
06/11/1958 | Condemned | 68460 | HAY | Haymarket | COND | ||
24/11/1958 | Condemned | 68463 | STM | St Margarets | COND | ||
24/11/1958 | Condemned | 68478 | HAY | Haymarket | COND | ||
23/12/1958 | Condemned | 68466 | 64A | St Margarets | COND | ||
12/03/1959 | Condemned | 68480 | EFD | Eastfield | COND | ||
18/06/1959 | Condemned | 68468 | EFD | Eastfield | COND | ||
29/08/1959 | Reallocation | 68453 | THJ | Thornton Junction | 64A | St Margarets | |
29/08/1959 | Reallocation | 68456 | THJ | Thornton Junction | 64E | Polmont | |
02/09/1959 | Condemned | 68467 | 64E | Polmont | COND | ||
13/01/1960 | Condemned | 68444 | KPS | Kipps | COND | ||
13/02/1960 | Reallocation | 68458 | THJ | Thornton Junction | 67A | Corkerhill | |
11/03/1960 | Condemned | 68457 | HAY | Haymarket | COND | ||
16/01/1961 | Condemned | 68456 | 64E | Polmont | COND | ||
11/02/1961 | Reallocation | 68458 | 67A | Corkerhill | 67C | Ayr | |
24/02/1961 | Condemned | 68443 | KPS | Kipps | COND | ||
24/02/1961 | Condemned | 68447 | EFD | Eastfield | COND | ||
08/05/1961 | Condemned | 68459 | THJ | Thornton Junction | COND | ||
04/08/1961 | Condemned | 68471 | POL | Polmont | COND | ||
08/01/1962 | Condemned | 68442 | KPS | Kipps | COND | ||
18/01/1962 | Condemned | 68458 | 67C | Ayr | COND | ||
12/02/1962 | Condemned | 68454 | STM | St Margarets | COND | ||
12/02/1962 | Condemned | 68472 | STM | St Margarets | COND | ||
12/02/1962 | Condemned | 68481 | HAY | Haymarket | COND | ||
08/10/1962 | Condemned | 68445 | KPS | Kipps | COND | ||
08/10/1962 | Condemned | 68448 | STM | St Margarets | COND | ||
08/10/1962 | Condemned | 68453 | 64A | St Margarets | COND | ||
08/10/1962 | Condemned | 68470 | 64A | St Margarets | COND | ||
08/10/1962 | Condemned | 68479 | EFD | Eastfield | COND | ||
29/12/1962 | Condemned | 68477 | STM | St Margarets | COND |