GNR/LNER Gresley "N2" Class 0-6-2T
Class | GNR | LNER (1924) | LNER (1946) | BR | Built | Depot Name | From | Date Withdrawn | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
N2 | 1606 | 4606 | 9490 | 69490 | 12/1920 | KX W |
Kings Cross Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/07/1959 |
06/07/1959 |
N2 | 1607 | 4607 | 9491 | 69491 | 04/1921 | KX W |
Kings Cross Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 26/01/1959 |
26/01/1959 |
N2 | 1608 | 4608 | 9492 | 69492 | 05/1921 | KX W |
Kings Cross Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 26/11/1959 |
26/11/1959 |
N2 | 1609 | 4609 | 9493 | 69493 | 06/1921 | KX HAT HAT 34A W |
Kings Cross Hatfield Hatfield Kings Cross Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/1949 23/07/1949 29/12/1951 09/12/1958 |
09/12/1958 |
N2 | 1610 | 4610 | 9494 | 69494 | 06/1921 | KX 34C 35B 34A 34A 34C W |
Kings Cross Hatfield Grantham Kings Cross Kings Cross Hatfield Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 11/06/1950 01/09/1951 15/09/1951 22/09/1951 29/12/1951 13/01/1958 |
13/01/1958 |
N2 | 1611 | 4611 | 9495 | 69495 | 07/1921 | KX W |
Kings Cross Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 25/09/1958 |
25/09/1958 |
N2 | 1612 | 4612 | 9496 | 69496 | 08/1921 | KX 34B 34A W |
Kings Cross Hornsey Kings Cross Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 19/10/1957 14/12/1957 14/04/1958 |
14/04/1958 |
N2 | 1613 | 4613 | 9497 | 69497 | 08/1921 | KX W |
Kings Cross Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/03/1958 |
17/03/1958 |
N2 | 1614 | 4614 | 9498 | 69498 | 08/1921 | KX 34B 34E W |
Kings Cross Hornsey New England Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/10/1960 15/07/1961 11/09/1961 |
11/09/1961 |
N2 | 1615 | 4615 | 9499 | 69499 | 08/1921 | KX W |
Kings Cross Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 15/09/1958 |
15/09/1958 |
N2 | 1721 | 4721 | 9500 | 69500 | 12/1920 | PKD W |
Parkhead Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/08/1957 |
01/08/1957 |
N2 | 1722 | 4722 | 9501 | 69501 | 12/1920 | CLK 34C 34C 35B 34C 34A 34B W |
Colwick Hatfield Hatfield Grantham Hatfield Kings Cross Hornsey Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/05/1951 19/05/1951 01/09/1951 15/09/1951 24/10/1953 20/02/1954 20/11/1957 |
20/11/1957 |
N2 | 1723 | 4723 | 9502 | 69502 | 12/1920 | HAT KX 35B 34A 30A 30F 30F 34A 34B W |
Hatfield Kings Cross Grantham Kings Cross Stratford Parkeston Quay Parkeston Quay Kings Cross Hornsey Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/02/1948 01/09/1951 15/09/1951 19/07/1952 09/08/1952 23/08/1952 17/11/1956 18/05/1957 12/05/1958 |
12/05/1958 |
N2 | 1724 | 4724 | 9503 | 69503 | 12/1920 | KPS 61B W |
Kipps Aberdeen Ferryhill Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/06/1954 03/01/1957 |
03/01/1957 |
N2 | 1725 | 4725 | 9504 | 69504 | 12/1920 | KX HAT 34A 34C 34A 34C 34A 34C 34A 34B 34E W |
Kings Cross Hatfield Kings Cross Hatfield Kings Cross Hatfield Kings Cross Hatfield Kings Cross Hornsey New England Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/02/1948 25/07/1953 24/10/1953 20/03/1954 24/04/1954 22/05/1954 21/08/1954 14/06/1958 21/11/1959 08/07/1961 23/09/1962 |
23/09/1962 |
N2 | 1726 | 4726 | 9505 | 69505 | 12/1920 | HSY 34F W |
Hornsey Grantham Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 20/06/1959 10/11/1960 |
10/11/1960 |
N2 | 1727 | 4727 | 9506 | 69506 | 12/1920 | KX 34E W |
Kings Cross New England Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 30/01/1960 31/05/1961 |
31/05/1961 |
N2 | 1728 | 4728 | 9507 | 69507 | 12/1920 | PKD 65E 65C W |
Parkhead Kipps Parkhead Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/10/1951 19/04/1952 22/04/1960 |
22/04/1960 |
N2 | 1729 | 4729 | 9508 | 69508 | 01/1921 | HAW KPS 65C W |
Hawick Kipps Parkhead Withdrawn |
11/1935 01/01/1948 06/10/1951 03/12/1959 |
03/12/1959 |
N2 | 1730 | 4730 | 9509 | 69509 | 01/1921 | KPS 65C 65D 65C W |
Kipps Parkhead Dawsholm Parkhead Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/10/1951 17/05/1952 31/08/1957 22/10/1960 |
22/10/1960 |
N2 | 1731 | 4731 | 9510 | 69510 | 01/1921 | PKD 65E 65C 64G W |
Parkhead Kipps Parkhead Hawick Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/10/1951 19/04/1952 16/02/1957 04/11/1959 |
04/11/1959 |
N2 | 1732 | 4732 | 9511 | 69511 | 01/1921 | KPS 65C 65D W |
Kipps Parkhead Dawsholm Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/10/1951 17/05/1952 15/12/1960 |
15/12/1960 |
N2 | 1733 | 4733 | 9512 | 69512 | 01/1921 | KX 34B 34E W |
Kings Cross Hornsey New England Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/10/1960 15/07/1961 24/07/1962 |
24/07/1962 |
N2 | 1734 | 4734 | 9513 | 69513 | 01/1921 | HSY 34E W |
Hornsey New England Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 20/06/1959 29/05/1961 |
29/05/1961 |
N2 | 1735 | 4735 | 9514 | 69514 | 02/1921 | PKD W |
Parkhead Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 22/09/1955 |
22/09/1955 |
N2 | 1736 | 4736 | 9515 | 69515 | 02/1921 | HIT W |
Hitchin (GNR) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 22/07/1959 |
22/07/1959 |
N2 | 1737 | 4737 | 9516 | 69516 | 02/1921 | HSY 34A 34A 34C 34C 34A 34C 34A 34C 34A 34B 34F W |
Hornsey Kings Cross Kings Cross Hatfield Hatfield Kings Cross Hatfield Kings Cross Hatfield Kings Cross Hornsey Grantham Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 15/09/1951 22/09/1951 14/06/1952 21/06/1952 20/06/1953 21/11/1953 24/07/1954 25/09/1954 12/04/1958 14/06/1958 22/11/1958 26/01/1961 |
26/01/1961 |
N2 | 1738 | 4738 | 9517 | 69517 | 02/1921 | KX W |
Kings Cross Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 08/08/1959 |
08/08/1959 |
N2 | 1739 | 4739 | 9518 | 69518 | 02/1921 | HTN KPS W |
Heaton Kipps Withdrawn |
01/1936 01/01/1948 16/01/1961 |
16/01/1961 |
N2 | 1740 | 4740 | 9519 | 69519 | 02/1921 | NEA KX W |
Neasden Kings Cross Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/06/1948 10/1957 |
10/1957 |
N2 | 1741 | 4741 | 9520 | 69520 | 02/1921 | KX 34B 34E W |
Kings Cross Hornsey New England Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 21/11/1959 15/07/1961 23/09/1962 |
23/09/1962 |
N2 | 1742 | 4742 | 9521 | 69521 | 02/1921 | KX 34E W |
Kings Cross New England Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/08/1959 01/06/1961 |
01/06/1961 |
N2 | 1743 | 4743 | 9522 | 69522 | 02/1921 | HSY 34A 34A 34B 34B 34D W |
Hornsey Kings Cross Kings Cross Hornsey Hornsey Hitchin (GNR) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 15/09/1951 22/09/1951 01/11/1952 15/11/1952 18/07/1959 23/11/1959 |
23/11/1959 |
N2 | 1744 | 4744 | 9523 | 69523 | 02/1921 | KX 34E W |
Kings Cross New England Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 26/05/1962 16/09/1962 |
16/09/1962 |
N2 | 1745 | 4745 | 9524 | 69524 | 02/1921 | KX W |
Kings Cross Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 02/11/1959 |
02/11/1959 |
N2 | 1746 | 4746 | 9525 | 69525 | 02/1921 | KX 34B 34A W |
Kings Cross Hornsey Kings Cross Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 19/10/1957 16/08/1958 04/03/1959 |
04/03/1959 |
N2 | 1747 | 4747 | 9526 | 69526 | 03/1921 | KX W |
Kings Cross Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/08/1959 |
10/08/1959 |
N2 | 1748 | 4748 | 9527 | 69527 | 03/1921 | KX W |
Kings Cross Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 11/06/1958 |
11/06/1958 |
N2 | 1749 | 4749 | 9528 | 69528 | 03/1921 | KX W |
Kings Cross Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 25/11/1959 |
25/11/1959 |
N2 | 1750 | 4750 | 9529 | 69529 | 03/1921 | KX 34E W |
Kings Cross New England Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 16/09/1961 23/09/1962 |
23/09/1962 |
N2 | 1751 | 4751 | 9530 | 69530 | 03/1921 | HSY W 34A |
Hornsey Withdrawn Kings Cross |
01/01/1948 12/1959 02/01/1960 |
12/1959 |
N2 | 1752 | 4752 | 9531 | 69531 | 03/1921 | HSY 34D 34C 34F 34E W |
Hornsey Hitchin (GNR) Hatfield Grantham New England Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/02/1959 11/04/1959 18/06/1960 27/05/1961 07/07/1961 |
07/07/1961 |
N2 | 1753 | 4753 | 9532 | 69532 | 03/1921 | KX W |
Kings Cross Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 02/06/1959 |
02/06/1959 |
N2 | 1754 | 4754 | 9533 | 69533 | 03/1921 | HSY 34A W |
Hornsey Kings Cross Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 21/11/1959 26/09/1961 |
26/09/1961 |
N2 | 1755 | 4755 | 9534 | 69534 | 03/1921 | HAT 34A 34C 34B W |
Hatfield Kings Cross Hatfield Hornsey Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 23/01/1954 20/02/1954 14/06/1958 09/02/1959 |
09/02/1959 |
N2 | 1756 | 4756 | 9535 | 69535 | 03/1921 | KX 34E W |
Kings Cross New England Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 26/05/1962 16/09/1962 |
16/09/1962 |
N2 | 1757 | 4757 | 9536 | 69536 | 03/1921 | KX 34D W |
Kings Cross Hitchin (GNR) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/02/1959 02/06/1959 |
02/06/1959 |
N2 | 1758 | 4758 | 9537 | 69537 | 03/1921 | HAT 34B W |
Hatfield Hornsey Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 23/01/1954 27/04/1959 |
27/04/1959 |
N2 | 1759 | 4759 | 9538 | 69538 | 04/1921 | KX 34E W |
Kings Cross New England Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 26/05/1962 16/09/1962 |
16/09/1962 |
N2 | 1760 | 4760 | 9539 | 69539 | 04/1921 | KX W |
Kings Cross Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/07/1959 |
06/07/1959 |
N2 | 1761 | 4761 | 9540 | 69540 | 04/1921 | KX 34D 34E W |
Kings Cross Hitchin (GNR) New England Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/02/1959 20/06/1959 21/07/1960 |
21/07/1960 |
N2 | 1762 | 4762 | 9541 | 69541 | 04/1921 | KX 34B 34A W |
Kings Cross Hornsey Kings Cross Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 19/10/1957 14/12/1957 06/08/1959 |
06/08/1959 |
N2 | 1763 | 4763 | 9542 | 69542 | 04/1921 | KX W |
Kings Cross Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/04/1959 |
06/04/1959 |
N2 | 1764 | 4764 | 9543 | 69543 | 04/1921 | KX 34B 34E W |
Kings Cross Hornsey New England Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/10/1960 15/07/1961 11/09/1961 |
11/09/1961 |
N2 | 1765 | 4765 | 9544 | 69544 | 04/1921 | KX W |
Kings Cross Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 08/12/1958 |
08/12/1958 |
N2 | 1766 | 4766 | 9545 | 69545 | 04/1921 | KX W |
Kings Cross Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 20/07/1959 |
20/07/1959 |
N2 | 1767 | 4767 | 9546 | 69546 | 04/1921 | KX 34E W |
Kings Cross New England Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 16/09/1961 23/09/1962 |
23/09/1962 |
N2 | 1768 | 4768 | 9547 | 69547 | 04/1921 | HSY 34C W |
Hornsey Hatfield Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/11/1955 10/06/1959 |
10/06/1959 |
N2 | 1769 | 4769 | 9548 | 69548 | 04/1921 | KX 34B 34A 31E 34D W |
Kings Cross Hornsey Kings Cross Bury St Edmunds Hitchin (GNR) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 19/10/1957 14/12/1957 13/12/1958 07/02/1959 24/07/1959 |
24/07/1959 |
N2 | 1770 | 4770 | 9549 | 69549 | 04/1921 | KX 34F 34E W |
Kings Cross Grantham New England Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/06/1960 27/05/1961 12/09/1961 |
12/09/1961 |
N2/2 | 2583 | 9550 | 69550 | 05/1925 | CLK 34A 34C 34C 30A 30E 30E 30A 34A 34B W |
Colwick Kings Cross Hatfield Hatfield Stratford Colchester Colchester Stratford Kings Cross Hornsey Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/04/1951 05/05/1951 19/05/1951 20/09/1952 04/10/1952 18/10/1952 21/03/1953 20/10/1956 20/07/1957 02/09/1958 |
02/09/1958 | |
N2/2 | 2584 | 9551 | 69551 | 02/1925 | HAT 30F 30F 34A 34B W |
Hatfield Parkeston Quay Parkeston Quay Kings Cross Hornsey Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 09/08/1952 23/08/1952 17/11/1956 20/07/1957 03/12/1958 |
03/12/1958 | |
N2/2 | 2585 | 9552 | 69552 | 03/1925 | CLK 34C 34C 34A 34A 30F 30F 34A 34B 34F W |
Colwick Hatfield Hatfield Kings Cross Kings Cross Parkeston Quay Parkeston Quay Kings Cross Hornsey Grantham Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/05/1951 19/05/1951 14/06/1952 21/06/1952 09/08/1952 23/08/1952 17/11/1956 20/07/1957 22/11/1958 09/05/1960 |
09/05/1960 | |
N2/2 | 2586 | 9553 | 69553 | 03/1925 | KPS PKD 65E 65C 65D W |
Kipps Parkhead Kipps Parkhead Dawsholm Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 26/06/1948 06/10/1951 19/04/1952 17/05/1952 03/12/1959 |
03/12/1959 | |
N2/2 | 2587 | 9554 | 69554 | 03/1925 | HAT 34A 34C 34B W |
Hatfield Kings Cross Hatfield Hornsey Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 22/08/1953 23/01/1954 12/11/1955 10/06/1958 |
10/06/1958 | |
N2/2 | 2588 | 9555 | 69555 | 03/1925 | CLK 34A 34C 34C 30A 30E 30E 34B 30E 34A 34B W |
Colwick Kings Cross Hatfield Hatfield Stratford Colchester Colchester Hornsey Colchester Kings Cross Hornsey Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/04/1951 05/05/1951 19/05/1951 20/09/1952 04/10/1952 18/10/1952 17/12/1955 21/01/1956 20/10/1956 20/04/1957 06/04/1959 |
06/04/1959 | |
N2/2 | 2589 | 9556 | 69556 | 03/1925 | HSY W |
Hornsey Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 18/12/1959 |
18/12/1959 | |
N2/2 | 2590 | 9557 | 69557 | 04/1925 | HIT W |
Hitchin (GNR) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/06/1957 |
17/06/1957 | |
N2/2 | 2591 | 9558 | 69558 | 03/1925 | HAT 30A 30E 30E 34A W |
Hatfield Stratford Colchester Colchester Kings Cross Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 20/09/1952 04/10/1952 18/10/1952 25/08/1956 03/06/1957 |
03/06/1957 | |
N2/2 | 2592 | 9559 | 69559 | 03/1925 | HAT 30A 34A W |
Hatfield Stratford Kings Cross Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 09/08/1952 25/08/1956 18/07/1957 |
18/07/1957 | |
N2/2 | 2593 | 9560 | 69560 | 04/1925 | CLK 38E 34C 34C 34A 34A 34B 34B 34F W |
Colwick Woodford Halse Hatfield Hatfield Kings Cross Kings Cross Hornsey Hornsey Grantham Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/03/1950 05/05/1951 19/05/1951 15/09/1951 22/09/1951 01/11/1952 15/11/1952 20/06/1959 18/10/1960 |
18/10/1960 | |
N2/2 | 2594 | 9561 | 69561 | 04/1925 | NEA KX 30F 30F 34A 34D 34B 34F W |
Neasden Kings Cross Parkeston Quay Parkeston Quay Kings Cross Hitchin (GNR) Hornsey Grantham Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/06/1948 25/08/1951 22/09/1951 17/11/1956 20/07/1957 16/08/1958 20/06/1959 25/05/1961 |
25/05/1961 | |
N2/3 | 892 | 9562 | 69562 | 11/1925 | PKD W |
Parkhead Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/01/1956 |
12/01/1956 | |
N2/3 | 893 | 9563 | 69563 | 11/1925 | KPS 64A 64A 65E 65E 65C W |
Kipps St Margarets St Margarets Kipps Kipps Parkhead Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/10/1950 21/10/1950 25/11/1950 30/11/1950 27/12/1952 22/04/1960 |
22/04/1960 | |
N2/3 | 894 | 9564 | 69564 | 11/1925 | PKD 68E W |
Parkhead Carlisle Canal Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 31/08/1957 24/06/1961 |
24/06/1961 | |
N2/3 | 895 | 9565 | 69565 | 12/1925 | PKD W |
Parkhead Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/04/1958 |
17/04/1958 | |
N2/3 | 896 | 9566 | 69566 | 12/1925 | HSY 30F 30F 34A W |
Hornsey Parkeston Quay Parkeston Quay Kings Cross Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 25/08/1951 22/09/1951 17/11/1956 17/06/1957 |
17/06/1957 | |
N2/3 | 897 | 9567 | 69567 | 12/1925 | KX KX LIN HSY 34A 34A 34B W |
Kings Cross Kings Cross Lincoln Hornsey Kings Cross Kings Cross Hornsey Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/06/1948 30/10/1948 05/03/1949 15/09/1951 22/09/1951 18/04/1953 28/04/1959 |
28/04/1959 | |
N2/4 | 2662 | 9568 | 69568 | 10/1928 | KX 34B 34A 34E W |
Kings Cross Hornsey Kings Cross New England Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 19/10/1957 14/12/1957 26/05/1962 16/09/1962 |
16/09/1962 | |
N2/4 | 2663 | 9569 | 69569 | 10/1928 | KX W |
Kings Cross Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 23/03/1959 |
23/03/1959 | |
N2/4 | 2664 | 9570 | 69570 | 10/1928 | KX W |
Kings Cross Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 15/12/1959 |
15/12/1959 | |
N2/4 | 2665 | 9571 | 69571 | 11/1928 | KX 34C 34E W |
Kings Cross Hatfield New England Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 11/04/1959 20/06/1959 01/06/1961 |
01/06/1961 | |
N2/4 | 2666 | 9572 | 69572 | 11/1928 | KX 34B 34A W |
Kings Cross Hornsey Kings Cross Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 19/10/1957 21/11/1959 11/03/1961 |
11/03/1961 | |
N2/4 | 2667 | 9573 | 69573 | 11/1928 | KX W |
Kings Cross Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/11/1958 |
24/11/1958 | |
N2/4 | 2668 | 9574 | 69574 | 11/1928 | KX W |
Kings Cross Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/02/1961 |
14/02/1961 | |
N2/4 | 2669 | 9575 | 69575 | 11/1928 | KX 34E W |
Kings Cross New England Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 16/09/1961 16/09/1962 |
16/09/1962 | |
N2/4 | 2670 | 9576 | 69576 | 12/1928 | KX W |
Kings Cross Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 22/07/1959 |
22/07/1959 | |
N2/4 | 2671 | 9577 | 69577 | 12/1928 | KX 34C W |
Kings Cross Hatfield Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/02/1959 05/05/1959 |
05/05/1959 | |
N2/4 | 2672 | 9578 | 69578 | 01/1929 | KX W |
Kings Cross Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 25/11/1959 |
25/11/1959 | |
N2/4 | 2673 | 9579 | 69579 | 02/1929 | KX 34B 34E W |
Kings Cross Hornsey New England Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 23/07/1960 15/07/1961 16/09/1962 |
16/09/1962 | |
N2/4 | 2674 | 9580 | 69580 | 03/1929 | HAT 34A 34C 34A 34C 34A 34C 34F 34E W |
Hatfield Kings Cross Hatfield Kings Cross Hatfield Kings Cross Hatfield Grantham New England Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 21/11/1953 23/01/1954 24/07/1954 25/09/1954 12/04/1958 01/08/1959 18/06/1960 27/05/1961 11/09/1961 |
11/09/1961 | |
N2/4 | 2675 | 9581 | 69581 | 03/1929 | KX W |
Kings Cross Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/12/1960 |
01/12/1960 | |
N2/4 | 2676 | 9582 | 69582 | 03/1929 | HAT 34E W |
Hatfield New England Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 20/06/1959 26/09/1960 |
26/09/1960 | |
N2/4 | 2677 | 9583 | 69583 | 03/1929 | KX 34F 34E W |
Kings Cross Grantham New England Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 18/02/1961 27/05/1961 16/09/1962 |
16/09/1962 | |
N2/4 | 2678 | 9584 | 69584 | 03/1929 | KX W |
Kings Cross Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/07/1959 |
10/07/1959 | |
N2/4 | 2679 | 9585 | 69585 | 04/1929 | KX W |
Kings Cross Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 23/09/1961 |
23/09/1961 | |
N2/4 | 2680 | 9586 | 69586 | 05/1929 | HAT 34A 34C 34A W |
Hatfield Kings Cross Hatfield Kings Cross Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 20/06/1953 24/10/1953 26/03/1960 03/03/1961 |
03/03/1961 | |
N2/4 | 2681 | 9587 | 69587 | 05/1929 | HAT 34A 34B W |
Hatfield Kings Cross Hornsey Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/10/1953 23/01/1954 11/07/1960 |
11/07/1960 | |
N2/4 | 2682 | 9588 | 69588 | 09/1928 | HAT 34A 34C 34A 34C W |
Hatfield Kings Cross Hatfield Kings Cross Hatfield Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 20/06/1953 25/07/1953 20/02/1954 24/07/1954 29/02/1960 |
29/02/1960 | |
N2/4 | 2683 | 9589 | 69589 | 10/1928 | KX W |
Kings Cross Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/03/1960 |
07/03/1960 | |
N2/4 | 2684 | 9590 | 69590 | 11/1928 | HAT KX KX 30A 34A 34B 34B 34A W |
Hatfield Kings Cross Kings Cross Stratford Kings Cross Hornsey Hornsey Kings Cross Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/1949 23/07/1949 19/07/1952 23/08/1952 01/11/1952 15/11/1952 18/04/1953 03/06/1957 |
03/06/1957 | |
N2/3 | 2685 | 9591 | 69591 | 12/1928 | KX 34C W |
Kings Cross Hatfield Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/02/1959 05/08/1959 |
05/08/1959 | |
N2/3 | 2686 | 9592 | 69592 | 12/1928 | KX W |
Kings Cross Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 23/09/1961 |
23/09/1961 | |
N2/3 | 2687 | 9593 | 69593 | 01/1929 | KX 34E W |
Kings Cross New England Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 26/05/1962 16/09/1962 |
16/09/1962 | |
N2/3 | 2688 | 9594 | 69594 | 01/1929 | HAT 34B 34D W |
Hatfield Hornsey Hitchin (GNR) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/04/1954 18/07/1959 02/01/1960 |
02/01/1960 | |
N2/3 | 2689 | 9595 | 69595 | 02/1929 | PKD W |
Parkhead Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 19/10/1957 |
19/10/1957 | |
N2/3 | 2690 | 9596 | 69596 | 03/1929 | KPS W |
Kipps Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 02/09/1960 |
02/09/1960 |