GNR/LNER Gresley "N2" Class 0-6-2T
GNR | LNER (1924) | LNER (1946) | BR | Date To Service | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1606 | 4606 | 9490 | 69490 | 12/1920 | 06/07/1959 | 38.58 | ||||||
1607 | 4607 | 9491 | 69491 | 04/1921 | 26/01/1959 | 37.75 | ||||||
1608 | 4608 | 9492 | 69492 | 05/1921 | 26/11/1959 | 38.5 | ||||||
1609 | 4609 | 9493 | 69493 | 06/1921 | 09/12/1958 | 37.5 | ||||||
1610 | 4610 | 9494 | 69494 | 06/1921 | 13/01/1958 | 36.58 | ||||||
1611 | 4611 | 9495 | 69495 | 07/1921 | 25/09/1958 | 37.17 | ||||||
1612 | 4612 | 9496 | 69496 | 08/1921 | 14/04/1958 | 36.67 | ||||||
1613 | 4613 | 9497 | 69497 | 08/1921 | 17/03/1958 | 36.58 | ||||||
1614 | 4614 | 9498 | 69498 | 08/1921 | 11/09/1961 | 40.08 | ||||||
1615 | 4615 | 9499 | 69499 | 08/1921 | 15/09/1958 | 37.08 | ||||||
1721 | 4721 | 9500 | 69500 | 12/1920 | 01/08/1957 | 36.67 | ||||||
1722 | 4722 | 9501 | 69501 | 12/1920 | 20/11/1957 | 36.92 | ||||||
1723 | 4723 | 9502 | 69502 | 12/1920 | 12/05/1958 | 37.42 | ||||||
1724 | 4724 | 9503 | 69503 | 12/1920 | 03/01/1957 | 36.08 | ||||||
1725 | 4725 | 9504 | 69504 | 12/1920 | 23/09/1962 | 41.75 | ||||||
1726 | 4726 | 9505 | 69505 | 12/1920 | 10/11/1960 | 39.92 | ||||||
1727 | 4727 | 9506 | 69506 | 12/1920 | 31/05/1961 | 40.42 | ||||||
1728 | 4728 | 9507 | 69507 | 12/1920 | 22/04/1960 | 39.33 | ||||||
1729 | 4729 | 9508 | 69508 | 01/1921 | 03/12/1959 | 38.92 | ||||||
1730 | 4730 | 9509 | 69509 | 01/1921 | 22/10/1960 | 39.75 | ||||||
1731 | 4731 | 9510 | 69510 | 01/1921 | 04/11/1959 | 38.83 | ||||||
1732 | 4732 | 9511 | 69511 | 01/1921 | 15/12/1960 | 39.92 | ||||||
1733 | 4733 | 9512 | 69512 | 01/1921 | 24/07/1962 | 41.5 | ||||||
1734 | 4734 | 9513 | 69513 | 01/1921 | 29/05/1961 | 40.33 | ||||||
1735 | 4735 | 9514 | 69514 | 02/1921 | 22/09/1955 | 34.58 | ||||||
1736 | 4736 | 9515 | 69515 | 02/1921 | 22/07/1959 | 38.42 | ||||||
1737 | 4737 | 9516 | 69516 | 02/1921 | 26/01/1961 | 39.92 | ||||||
1738 | 4738 | 9517 | 69517 | 02/1921 | 08/08/1959 | 38.5 | ||||||
1739 | 4739 | 9518 | 69518 | 02/1921 | 16/01/1961 | 39.92 | ||||||
1740 | 4740 | 9519 | 69519 | 02/1921 | 10/1957 | 36.67 | ||||||
1741 | 4741 | 9520 | 69520 | 02/1921 | 23/09/1962 | 41.58 | ||||||
1742 | 4742 | 9521 | 69521 | 02/1921 | 01/06/1961 | 40.33 | ||||||
1743 | 4743 | 9522 | 69522 | 02/1921 | 23/11/1959 | 38.75 | ||||||
1744 | 4744 | 9523 | 69523 | 02/1921 | 16/09/1962 | 41.58 | Prs | Preserved | ||||
1745 | 4745 | 9524 | 69524 | 02/1921 | 02/11/1959 | 38.75 | ||||||
1746 | 4746 | 9525 | 69525 | 02/1921 | 04/03/1959 | 38.08 | ||||||
1747 | 4747 | 9526 | 69526 | 03/1921 | 10/08/1959 | 38.42 | ||||||
1748 | 4748 | 9527 | 69527 | 03/1921 | 11/06/1958 | 37.25 | ||||||
1749 | 4749 | 9528 | 69528 | 03/1921 | 25/11/1959 | 38.67 | ||||||
1750 | 4750 | 9529 | 69529 | 03/1921 | 23/09/1962 | 41.5 | ||||||
1751 | 4751 | 9530 | 69530 | 03/1921 | 12/1959 | 38.75 | ||||||
1752 | 4752 | 9531 | 69531 | 03/1921 | 07/07/1961 | 40.33 | ||||||
1753 | 4753 | 9532 | 69532 | 03/1921 | 02/06/1959 | 38.25 | ||||||
1754 | 4754 | 9533 | 69533 | 03/1921 | 26/09/1961 | 40.5 | ||||||
1755 | 4755 | 9534 | 69534 | 03/1921 | 09/02/1959 | 37.92 | ||||||
1756 | 4756 | 9535 | 69535 | 03/1921 | 16/09/1962 | 41.5 | ||||||
1757 | 4757 | 9536 | 69536 | 03/1921 | 02/06/1959 | 38.25 | ||||||
1758 | 4758 | 9537 | 69537 | 03/1921 | 27/04/1959 | 38.08 | ||||||
1759 | 4759 | 9538 | 69538 | 04/1921 | 16/09/1962 | 41.42 | ||||||
1760 | 4760 | 9539 | 69539 | 04/1921 | 06/07/1959 | 38.25 | ||||||
1761 | 4761 | 9540 | 69540 | 04/1921 | 21/07/1960 | 39.25 | ||||||
1762 | 4762 | 9541 | 69541 | 04/1921 | 06/08/1959 | 38.33 | ||||||
1763 | 4763 | 9542 | 69542 | 04/1921 | 06/04/1959 | 38 | ||||||
1764 | 4764 | 9543 | 69543 | 04/1921 | 11/09/1961 | 40.42 | ||||||
1765 | 4765 | 9544 | 69544 | 04/1921 | 08/12/1958 | 37.67 | ||||||
1766 | 4766 | 9545 | 69545 | 04/1921 | 20/07/1959 | 38.25 | ||||||
1767 | 4767 | 9546 | 69546 | 04/1921 | 23/09/1962 | 41.42 | ||||||
1768 | 4768 | 9547 | 69547 | 04/1921 | 10/06/1959 | 38.17 | ||||||
1769 | 4769 | 9548 | 69548 | 04/1921 | 24/07/1959 | 38.25 | ||||||
1770 | 4770 | 9549 | 69549 | 04/1921 | 12/09/1961 | 40.42 |