Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 333 Today
» 957 Yesterday
» 4310 Week
» 15547 Month
» 248467 Year
» 1913843 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

GNR/LNER Gresley "N2" Class 0-6-2T


GNR LNER (1924) LNER (1946) BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
892 9562 69562 11/1925 12/01/1956 30.17
893 9563 69563 11/1925 22/04/1960 34.42
894 9564 69564 11/1925 24/06/1961 35.58
895 9565 69565 12/1925 17/04/1958 32.33
896 9566 69566 12/1925 17/06/1957 31.5
897 9567 69567 12/1925 28/04/1959 33.33
2685 9591 69591 12/1928 05/08/1959 30.67
2686 9592 69592 12/1928 23/09/1961 32.75
2687 9593 69593 01/1929 16/09/1962 33.67
2688 9594 69594 01/1929 02/01/1960 31
2689 9595 69595 02/1929 19/10/1957 28.67
2690 9596 69596 03/1929 02/09/1960 31.5