N2 |
1606
|
4606
|
9490
|
69490
|
12/1920 |
06/07/1959 |
Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
09/1950 |
N2 |
1607
|
4607
|
9491
|
69491
|
04/1921 |
26/01/1959 |
Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
04/1948 |
N2 |
1608
|
4608
|
9492
|
69492
|
05/1921 |
26/11/1959 |
Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
03/1950 |
N2 |
1609
|
4609
|
9493
|
69493
|
06/1921 |
09/12/1958 |
Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
06/1948 |
N2 |
1610
|
4610
|
9494
|
69494
|
06/1921 |
13/01/1958 |
Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
10/1948 |
N2 |
1611
|
4611
|
9495
|
69495
|
07/1921 |
25/09/1958 |
Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
10/1944 |
N2 |
1612
|
4612
|
9496
|
69496
|
08/1921 |
14/04/1958 |
Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
04/1947 |
N2 |
1613
|
4613
|
9497
|
69497
|
08/1921 |
17/03/1958 |
Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
11/1946 |
N2 |
1614
|
4614
|
9498
|
69498
|
08/1921 |
11/09/1961 |
Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
02/1948 |
N2 |
1615
|
4615
|
9499
|
69499
|
08/1921 |
15/09/1958 |
Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
02/1947 |
N2 |
1721
|
4721
|
9500
|
69500
|
12/1920 |
01/08/1957 |
Vacuum |
10/1946 |
N2 |
1722
|
4722
|
9501
|
69501
|
12/1920 |
20/11/1957 |
Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
12/1950 |
N2 |
1723
|
4723
|
9502
|
69502
|
12/1920 |
12/05/1958 |
Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
08/1944 |
N2 |
1724
|
4724
|
9503
|
69503
|
12/1920 |
03/01/1957 |
Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
10/1951 |
N2 |
1725
|
4725
|
9504
|
69504
|
12/1920 |
23/09/1962 |
Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
02/1948 |
N2 |
1726
|
4726
|
9505
|
69505
|
12/1920 |
10/11/1960 |
Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
02/1947 |
N2 |
1727
|
4727
|
9506
|
69506
|
12/1920 |
31/05/1961 |
Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
11/1948 |
N2 |
1728
|
4728
|
9507
|
69507
|
12/1920 |
22/04/1960 |
Vacuum |
11/1945 |
N2 |
1729
|
4729
|
9508
|
69508
|
01/1921 |
03/12/1959 |
Vacuum |
06/1946 |
N2 |
1730
|
4730
|
9509
|
69509
|
01/1921 |
22/10/1960 |
Robinson pattern superheater removed |
11/1954 |
N2 |
1731
|
4731
|
9510
|
69510
|
01/1921 |
04/11/1959 |
Vacuum |
04/1947 |
N2 |
1732
|
4732
|
9511
|
69511
|
01/1921 |
15/12/1960 |
Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
01/1955 |
N2 |
1733
|
4733
|
9512
|
69512
|
01/1921 |
24/07/1962 |
Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
07/1947 |
N2 |
1734
|
4734
|
9513
|
69513
|
01/1921 |
29/05/1961 |
Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
07/1946 |
N2 |
1735
|
4735
|
9514
|
69514
|
02/1921 |
22/09/1955 |
Robinson pattern superheater removed |
06/1951 |
N2 |
1736
|
4736
|
9515
|
69515
|
02/1921 |
22/07/1959 |
Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
10/1945 |
N2 |
1737
|
4737
|
9516
|
69516
|
02/1921 |
26/01/1961 |
Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
09/1944 |
N2 |
1738
|
4738
|
9517
|
69517
|
02/1921 |
08/08/1959 |
Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
09/1947 |
N2 |
1739
|
4739
|
9518
|
69518
|
02/1921 |
16/01/1961 |
Robinson pattern superheater removed |
06/1939 |
N2 |
1740
|
4740
|
9519
|
69519
|
02/1921 |
10/1957 |
Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
12/1945 |
N2 |
1741
|
4741
|
9520
|
69520
|
02/1921 |
23/09/1962 |
Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
03/1949 |
N2 |
1742
|
4742
|
9521
|
69521
|
02/1921 |
01/06/1961 |
Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
11/1947 |
N2 |
1743
|
4743
|
9522
|
69522
|
02/1921 |
23/11/1959 |
Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
09/1944 |
N2 |
1744
|
4744
|
9523
|
69523
|
02/1921 |
16/09/1962 |
Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
04/1946 |
N2 |
1745
|
4745
|
9524
|
69524
|
02/1921 |
02/11/1959 |
Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
03/1946 |
N2 |
1746
|
4746
|
9525
|
69525
|
02/1921 |
04/03/1959 |
Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
08/1950 |
N2 |
1747
|
4747
|
9526
|
69526
|
03/1921 |
10/08/1959 |
Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
10/1947 |
N2 |
1748
|
4748
|
9527
|
69527
|
03/1921 |
11/06/1958 |
Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
10/1949 |
N2 |
1749
|
4749
|
9528
|
69528
|
03/1921 |
25/11/1959 |
Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
01/1948 |
N2 |
1750
|
4750
|
9529
|
69529
|
03/1921 |
23/09/1962 |
Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
10/1945 |
N2 |
1751
|
4751
|
9530
|
69530
|
03/1921 |
12/1959 |
Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
01/1950 |
N2 |
1752
|
4752
|
9531
|
69531
|
03/1921 |
07/07/1961 |
Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
11/1949 |
N2 |
1753
|
4753
|
9532
|
69532
|
03/1921 |
02/06/1959 |
Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
02/1947 |
N2 |
1754
|
4754
|
9533
|
69533
|
03/1921 |
26/09/1961 |
Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
11/1946 |
N2 |
1755
|
4755
|
9534
|
69534
|
03/1921 |
09/02/1959 |
Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
12/1946 |
N2 |
1756
|
4756
|
9535
|
69535
|
03/1921 |
16/09/1962 |
Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
04/1943 |
N2 |
1757
|
4757
|
9536
|
69536
|
03/1921 |
02/06/1959 |
Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
08/1946 |
N2 |
1758
|
4758
|
9537
|
69537
|
03/1921 |
27/04/1959 |
Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
07/1945 |
N2 |
1759
|
4759
|
9538
|
69538
|
04/1921 |
16/09/1962 |
Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
02/1950 |
N2 |
1760
|
4760
|
9539
|
69539
|
04/1921 |
06/07/1959 |
Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
07/1959 |
N2 |
1761
|
4761
|
9540
|
69540
|
04/1921 |
21/07/1960 |
Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
08/1947 |
N2 |
1762
|
4762
|
9541
|
69541
|
04/1921 |
06/08/1959 |
Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
12/1947 |
N2 |
1763
|
4763
|
9542
|
69542
|
04/1921 |
06/04/1959 |
Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
11/1946 |
N2 |
1764
|
4764
|
9543
|
69543
|
04/1921 |
11/09/1961 |
Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
05/1946 |
N2 |
1765
|
4765
|
9544
|
69544
|
04/1921 |
08/12/1958 |
Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
08/1950 |
N2 |
1766
|
4766
|
9545
|
69545
|
04/1921 |
20/07/1959 |
Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
06/1946 |
N2 |
1767
|
4767
|
9546
|
69546
|
04/1921 |
23/09/1962 |
Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
09/1950 |
N2 |
1768
|
4768
|
9547
|
69547
|
04/1921 |
10/06/1959 |
Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
03/1947 |
N2 |
1769
|
4769
|
9548
|
69548
|
04/1921 |
24/07/1959 |
Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
03/1946 |
N2 |
1770
|
4770
|
9549
|
69549
|
04/1921 |
12/09/1961 |
Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
03/1949 |
N2 |
|
2583
|
9550
|
69550
|
05/1925 |
02/09/1958 |
Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
09/1946 |
N2 |
|
2584
|
9551
|
69551
|
02/1925 |
03/12/1958 |
Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
04/1945 |
N2 |
|
2585
|
9552
|
69552
|
03/1925 |
09/05/1960 |
Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
12/1944 |
N2 |
|
2587
|
9554
|
69554
|
03/1925 |
10/06/1958 |
Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
08/1947 |
N2 |
|
2588
|
9555
|
69555
|
03/1925 |
06/04/1959 |
Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
09/1944 |
N2 |
|
2589
|
9556
|
69556
|
03/1925 |
18/12/1959 |
Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
10/1946 |
N2 |
|
2590
|
9557
|
69557
|
04/1925 |
17/06/1957 |
Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
03/1948 |
N2 |
|
2591
|
9558
|
69558
|
03/1925 |
03/06/1957 |
Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
06/1948 |
N2 |
|
2592
|
9559
|
69559
|
03/1925 |
18/07/1957 |
Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
05/1945 |
N2 |
|
2593
|
9560
|
69560
|
04/1925 |
18/10/1960 |
Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
12/1948 |
N2 |
|
2594
|
9561
|
69561
|
04/1925 |
25/05/1961 |
Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
07/1947 |
N2 |
|
892
|
9562
|
69562
|
11/1925 |
12/01/1956 |
Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector |
03/1951 |
N2 |
|
893
|
9563
|
69563
|
11/1925 |
22/04/1960 |
Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector |
09/1955 |
N2 |
|
894
|
9564
|
69564
|
11/1925 |
24/06/1961 |
Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
11/1954 |
N2 |
|
895
|
9565
|
69565
|
12/1925 |
17/04/1958 |
Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector |
06/1949 |
N2 |
|
896
|
9566
|
69566
|
12/1925 |
17/06/1957 |
Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
03/1945 |
N2 |
|
897
|
9567
|
69567
|
12/1925 |
28/04/1959 |
Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
04/1947 |
N2 |
|
2662
|
9568
|
69568
|
10/1928 |
16/09/1962 |
Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
05/1945 |
N2 |
|
2663
|
9569
|
69569
|
10/1928 |
23/03/1959 |
Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
03/1945 |
N2 |
|
2664
|
9570
|
69570
|
10/1928 |
15/12/1959 |
Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
10/1948 |
N2 |
|
2665
|
9571
|
69571
|
11/1928 |
01/06/1961 |
Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
11/1948 |
N2 |
|
2666
|
9572
|
69572
|
11/1928 |
11/03/1961 |
Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
08/1949 |
N2 |
|
2667
|
9573
|
69573
|
11/1928 |
24/11/1958 |
Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
07/1950 |
N2 |
|
2668
|
9574
|
69574
|
11/1928 |
14/02/1961 |
Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
12/1946 |
N2 |
|
2669
|
9575
|
69575
|
11/1928 |
16/09/1962 |
Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
05/1948 |
N2 |
|
2670
|
9576
|
69576
|
12/1928 |
22/07/1959 |
Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
04/1947 |
N2 |
|
2671
|
9577
|
69577
|
12/1928 |
05/05/1959 |
Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
01/1949 |
N2 |
|
2672
|
9578
|
69578
|
01/1929 |
25/11/1959 |
Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
12/1946 |
N2 |
|
2673
|
9579
|
69579
|
02/1929 |
16/09/1962 |
Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
04/1948 |
N2 |
|
2674
|
9580
|
69580
|
03/1929 |
11/09/1961 |
Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
07/1948 |
N2 |
|
2675
|
9581
|
69581
|
03/1929 |
01/12/1960 |
Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
03/1948 |
N2 |
|
2676
|
9582
|
69582
|
03/1929 |
26/09/1960 |
Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
08/1946 |
N2 |
|
2677
|
9583
|
69583
|
03/1929 |
16/09/1962 |
Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
12/1946 |
N2 |
|
2678
|
9584
|
69584
|
03/1929 |
10/07/1959 |
Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
07/1946 |
N2 |
|
2679
|
9585
|
69585
|
04/1929 |
23/09/1961 |
Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
06/1950 |
N2 |
|
2680
|
9586
|
69586
|
05/1929 |
03/03/1961 |
Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
05/1946 |
N2 |
|
2681
|
9587
|
69587
|
05/1929 |
11/07/1960 |
Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
04/1948 |
N2 |
|
2682
|
9588
|
69588
|
09/1928 |
29/02/1960 |
Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
12/1949 |
N2 |
|
2683
|
9589
|
69589
|
10/1928 |
07/03/1960 |
Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
06/1949 |
N2 |
|
2684
|
9590
|
69590
|
11/1928 |
03/06/1957 |
Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
09/1948 |
N2 |
|
2685
|
9591
|
69591
|
12/1928 |
05/08/1959 |
Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
03/1948 |
N2 |
|
2686
|
9592
|
69592
|
12/1928 |
23/09/1961 |
Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
12/1946 |
N2 |
|
2687
|
9593
|
69593
|
01/1929 |
16/09/1962 |
Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
11/1948 |
N2 |
|
2688
|
9594
|
69594
|
01/1929 |
02/01/1960 |
Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
02/1948 |
N2 |
|
2689
|
9595
|
69595
|
02/1929 |
19/10/1957 |
Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
07/1954 |