MSLR/LNER Parker "N4" Class 0-6-2T
MSLR | MSLR (Renum) | LNER (1924) | LNER (1946) | BR | Date To Service | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
161 | 512 | 5512 | 12/1889 | 01/1938 | 48.08 | ||||||||
165 | 513 | 5513 | 9225 | 69225 | 12/1889 | 31/12/1954 | Sheffield Darnall | 65 | |||||
173 | 514 | 5514 | 9226 | 69226 | 01/1890 | 10/1949 | Sheffield Darnall | 59.75 | |||||
604 | 5604 | 07/1890 | 08/1939 | 49.08 | |||||||||
605 | 5605 | 9227 | 69227 | 07/1890 | 09/11/1953 | Sheffield Darnall | 63.33 | ||||||
606 | 5606 | 9228 | 69228 | 07/1890 | 31/12/1954 | Sheffield Darnall | 64.42 | ||||||
607 | 5607 | 07/1890 | 04/1937 | 46.75 | |||||||||
608 | 5608 | 07/1890 | 04/1937 | 46.75 | |||||||||
609 | 5609 | 07/1890 | 09/1936 | 46.17 | |||||||||
610 | 5610 | 07/1890 | 11/1938 | 48.33 | |||||||||
611 | 5611 | 9229 | 69229 | 08/1890 | 23/06/1952 | Sheffield Darnall | 61.83 | ||||||
612 | 5612 | 08/1890 | 08/1933 | 43 | |||||||||
613 | 5613 | 08/1890 | 04/1933 | 42.67 | |||||||||
614 | 5614 | 9230 | 69230 | 11/1890 | 31/12/1954 | Sheffield Darnall | 64.08 | ||||||
615 | 5615 | 11/1890 | 12/1937 | 47.08 | |||||||||
616 | 5616 | 11/1890 | 04/1933 | 42.42 | |||||||||
617 | 5617 | 11/1890 | 08/1936 | 45.75 | |||||||||
618 | 5618 | 11/1890 | 09/1937 | 46.83 | |||||||||
619 | 5619 | 11/1890 | 10/1933 | 42.92 | |||||||||
620 | 5620 | 9231 | 69231 | 11/1890 | 01/10/1954 | Sheffield Darnall | 63.92 | ||||||
621 | 5621 | 12/1890 | 10/1937 | 46.83 | |||||||||
622 | 5622 | 9232 | 69232 | 12/1890 | 31/12/1954 | Sheffield Darnall | 64 | ||||||
623 | 5623 | 9233 | 69233 | 12/1890 | 03/12/1954 | Sheffield Darnall | 64 | ||||||
624 | 5624 | 01/1891 | 07/1938 | 47.5 | |||||||||
625 | 5625 | 9234 | 69234 | 01/1891 | 12/01/1953 | Sheffield Darnall | 62 | ||||||
626 | 5626 | 01/1891 | 01/1932 | 41 | |||||||||
627 | 5627 | 01/1891 | 04/1932 | 41.25 | |||||||||
628 | 5628 | 9235 | 69235 | 01/1891 | 08/1954 | Sheffield Darnall | 63.58 | ||||||
629 | 5629 | 9236 | 69236 | 04/1891 | 08/11/1954 | Sheffield Darnall | 63.58 | ||||||
630 | 5630 | 04/1891 | 03/1933 | 41.92 | |||||||||
631 | 5631 | 04/1891 | 06/1932 | 41.17 | |||||||||
632 | 5632 | 9237 | 69237 | 04/1891 | 03/07/1950 | Sheffield Darnall | 59.25 | ||||||
633 | 5633 | 9238 | 04/1891 | 07/1947 | 56.25 | ||||||||
634 | 5634 | 05/1891 | 03/1940 | 48.83 | |||||||||
635 | 5635 | 9239 | 69239 | 05/1891 | 24/03/1954 | Sheffield Darnall | 62.83 | ||||||
636 | 5636 | 9240 | 69240 | 05/1891 | 10/11/1952 | Sheffield Darnall | 61.5 | ||||||
637 | 5637 | 9241 | 69241 | 05/1891 | 09/1949 | Sheffield Darnall | 58.33 | ||||||
638 | 5638 | 05/1891 | 01/1932 | 40.67 | |||||||||
601 | 5601 | 05/1891 | 10/1933 | 42.42 | |||||||||
602 | 5602 | 05/1891 | 08/1939 | 48.25 | |||||||||
603 | 5603 | 07/1891 | 08/1933 | 42.08 |