N4 |
161
|
512
|
5512
|
|
|
12/1889 |
01/1938 |
Flowerpot chimney fitted (loco brought within LNER Composite Gauge) |
10/1925 |
N4 |
165
|
513
|
5513
|
9225
|
69225
|
12/1889 |
31/12/1954 |
Flowerpot chimney fitted (loco brought within LNER Composite Gauge) |
04/1929 |
N4 |
173
|
514
|
5514
|
9226
|
(69226)
|
01/1890 |
10/1949 |
Flowerpot chimney fitted (loco brought within LNER Composite Gauge) |
07/1932 |
N4 |
604
|
|
5604
|
|
|
07/1890 |
08/1939 |
Flowerpot chimney fitted (loco brought within LNER Composite Gauge) |
03/1929 |
N4 |
605
|
|
5605
|
9227
|
69227
|
07/1890 |
09/11/1953 |
Flowerpot chimney fitted (loco brought within LNER Composite Gauge) |
03/1932 |
N4 |
606
|
|
5606
|
9228
|
69228
|
07/1890 |
31/12/1954 |
Flowerpot chimney fitted (loco brought within LNER Composite Gauge) |
06/1932 |
N4 |
607
|
|
5607
|
|
|
07/1890 |
04/1937 |
Flowerpot chimney fitted (loco brought within LNER Composite Gauge) |
06/1932 |
N4 |
608
|
|
5608
|
|
|
07/1890 |
04/1937 |
Flowerpot chimney fitted (loco brought within LNER Composite Gauge) |
04/1932 |
N4 |
609
|
|
5609
|
|
|
07/1890 |
09/1936 |
Flowerpot chimney fitted (loco brought within LNER Composite Gauge) |
11/1933 |
N4 |
610
|
|
5610
|
|
|
07/1890 |
11/1938 |
Flowerpot chimney fitted (loco brought within LNER Composite Gauge) |
01/1931 |
N4 |
611
|
|
5611
|
9229
|
69229
|
08/1890 |
23/06/1952 |
Flowerpot chimney fitted (loco brought within LNER Composite Gauge) |
06/1932 |
N4 |
612
|
|
5612
|
|
|
08/1890 |
08/1933 |
Saturated Diagram 21 Boiler Fitted |
05/1921 |
N4 |
613
|
|
5613
|
|
|
08/1890 |
04/1933 |
Saturated Diagram 21 Boiler Fitted |
08/1914 |
N4 |
614
|
|
5614
|
9230
|
69230
|
11/1890 |
31/12/1954 |
Flowerpot chimney fitted (loco brought within LNER Composite Gauge) |
02/1933 |
N4 |
615
|
|
5615
|
|
|
11/1890 |
12/1937 |
Flowerpot chimney fitted (loco brought within LNER Composite Gauge) |
01/1928 |
N4 |
616
|
|
5616
|
|
|
11/1890 |
04/1933 |
Flowerpot chimney fitted (loco brought within LNER Composite Gauge) |
01/1930 |
N4 |
617
|
|
5617
|
|
|
11/1890 |
08/1936 |
Flowerpot chimney fitted (loco brought within LNER Composite Gauge) |
08/1931 |
N4 |
618
|
|
5618
|
|
|
11/1890 |
09/1937 |
Flowerpot chimney fitted (loco brought within LNER Composite Gauge) |
11/1928 |
N4 |
619
|
|
5619
|
|
|
11/1890 |
10/1933 |
Saturated Diagram 21 Boiler Fitted |
08/1921 |
N4 |
620
|
|
5620
|
9231
|
69231
|
11/1890 |
01/10/1954 |
Flowerpot chimney fitted (loco brought within LNER Composite Gauge) |
01/1926 |
N4 |
621
|
|
5621
|
|
|
12/1890 |
10/1937 |
Flowerpot chimney fitted (loco brought within LNER Composite Gauge) |
08/1934 |
N4 |
622
|
|
5622
|
9232
|
69232
|
12/1890 |
31/12/1954 |
Flowerpot chimney fitted (loco brought within LNER Composite Gauge) |
05/1932 |
N4 |
623
|
|
5623
|
9233
|
69233
|
12/1890 |
03/12/1954 |
Flowerpot chimney fitted (loco brought within LNER Composite Gauge) |
08/1936 |
N4 |
624
|
|
5624
|
|
|
01/1891 |
07/1938 |
Flowerpot chimney fitted (loco brought within LNER Composite Gauge) |
11/1932 |
N4 |
625
|
|
5625
|
9234
|
69234
|
01/1891 |
12/01/1953 |
Flowerpot chimney fitted (loco brought within LNER Composite Gauge) |
10/1931 |
N4 |
626
|
|
5626
|
|
|
01/1891 |
01/1932 |
Saturated Diagram 21 Boiler Fitted |
01/1915 |
N4 |
627
|
|
5627
|
|
|
01/1891 |
04/1932 |
Saturated Diagram 21 Boiler Fitted |
11/1918 |
N4 |
628
|
|
5628
|
9235
|
69235
|
01/1891 |
08/1954 |
Flowerpot chimney fitted (loco brought within LNER Composite Gauge) |
10/1932 |
N4 |
629
|
|
5629
|
9236
|
69236
|
04/1891 |
08/11/1954 |
Flowerpot chimney fitted (loco brought within LNER Composite Gauge) |
12/1925 |
N4 |
630
|
|
5630
|
|
|
04/1891 |
03/1933 |
Flowerpot chimney fitted (loco brought within LNER Composite Gauge) |
09/1929 |
N4 |
631
|
|
5631
|
|
|
04/1891 |
06/1932 |
Saturated Diagram 21 Boiler Fitted |
06/1911 |
N4 |
632
|
|
5632
|
9237
|
69237
|
04/1891 |
03/07/1950 |
Flowerpot chimney fitted (loco brought within LNER Composite Gauge) |
09/1932 |
N4 |
633
|
|
5633
|
9238
|
|
04/1891 |
07/1947 |
Flowerpot chimney fitted (loco brought within LNER Composite Gauge) |
11/1929 |
N4 |
634
|
|
5634
|
|
|
05/1891 |
03/1940 |
Flowerpot chimney fitted (loco brought within LNER Composite Gauge) |
12/1933 |
N4 |
635
|
|
5635
|
9239
|
69239
|
05/1891 |
24/03/1954 |
Flowerpot chimney fitted (loco brought within LNER Composite Gauge) |
08/1932 |
N4 |
636
|
|
5636
|
9240
|
69240
|
05/1891 |
10/11/1952 |
Flowerpot chimney fitted (loco brought within LNER Composite Gauge) |
06/1933 |
N4 |
637
|
|
5637
|
9241
|
(69241)
|
05/1891 |
09/1949 |
Flowerpot chimney fitted (loco brought within LNER Composite Gauge) |
05/1930 |
N4 |
638
|
|
5638
|
|
|
05/1891 |
01/1932 |
Saturated Diagram 21 Boiler Fitted |
06/1914 |
N4 |
601
|
|
5601
|
|
|
05/1891 |
10/1933 |
Flowerpot chimney removed (loco no longer within LNER Composite Gauge) |
05/1931 |
N4 |
602
|
|
5602
|
|
|
05/1891 |
08/1939 |
Flowerpot chimney fitted (loco brought within LNER Composite Gauge) |
03/1934 |
N4 |
603
|
|
5603
|
|
|
07/1891 |
08/1933 |
Saturated Diagram 21 Boiler Fitted |
05/1912 |
N4 |
712
|
|
5712
|
|
|
02/1892 |
10/1933 |
Flowerpot chimney fitted (loco brought within LNER Composite Gauge) |
03/1928 |
N4 |
713
|
|
5713
|
9242
|
69242
|
02/1892 |
14/01/1952 |
Flowerpot chimney fitted (loco brought within LNER Composite Gauge) |
07/1928 |
N4 |
714
|
|
5714
|
|
|
02/1892 |
07/1933 |
Flowerpot chimney fitted (loco brought within LNER Composite Gauge) |
09/1930 |
N4 |
715
|
|
5715
|
|
|
02/1892 |
05/1937 |
Flowerpot chimney fitted (loco brought within LNER Composite Gauge) |
03/1935 |
N4 |
716
|
|
5716
|
9243
|
(69243)
|
02/1892 |
10/1949 |
Flowerpot chimney fitted (loco brought within LNER Composite Gauge) |
10/1934 |
N4 |
717
|
|
5717
|
|
|
02/1892 |
02/1934 |
Flowerpot chimney removed (loco no longer within LNER Composite Gauge) |
01/1931 |
N4 |
718
|
|
5718
|
9244
|
69244
|
02/1892 |
25/02/1952 |
Flowerpot chimney fitted (loco brought within LNER Composite Gauge) |
06/1928 |
N4 |
719
|
|
5719
|
|
|
03/1892 |
09/1936 |
Flowerpot chimney fitted (loco brought within LNER Composite Gauge) |
06/1933 |
N4 |
720
|
|
5720
|
9245
|
69245
|
03/1892 |
30/10/1950 |
Flowerpot chimney fitted (loco brought within LNER Composite Gauge) |
09/1933 |
N4 |
721
|
|
5721
|
9246
|
69246
|
03/1892 |
28/04/1952 |
Flowerpot chimney fitted (loco brought within LNER Composite Gauge) |
02/1934 |
N4 |
722
|
|
5722
|
|
|
03/1892 |
05/1932 |
Flowerpot chimney fitted (loco brought within LNER Composite Gauge) |
10/1929 |
N4 |
723
|
|
5723
|
|
|
03/1892 |
08/1939 |
Flowerpot chimney fitted (loco brought within LNER Composite Gauge) |
11/1933 |
N4 |
724
|
|
5724
|
9247
|
(69247)
|
03/1892 |
05/1950 |
Flowerpot chimney fitted (loco brought within LNER Composite Gauge) |
04/1932 |
N4 |
725
|
|
5725
|
(9248)
|
|
04/1892 |
02/1946 |
Flowerpot chimney fitted (loco brought within LNER Composite Gauge) |
09/1928 |