MLSR/LNER Parker "N5" Class 0-6-2T
MSLR | MSLR (Renum) | WLR | WMCQR | LYR | GCR | GCR (Renum) | LNER (1924) | LNER (1946) | BR | Date To Service | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
7 | 515 | 5515 | 9250 | 69250 | 09/1891 | 13/08/1956 | 64.92 | |||||||||||
47 | 516 | 5516 | 9251 | 69251 | 08/1892 | 18/07/1949 | To London Midland Region | 56.92 | ||||||||||
171 | 517 | 5517 | 9252 | 69252 | 11/1892 | 25/08/1951 | 58.75 | |||||||||||
518 | 5518 | 9253 | 69253 | 08/1893 | 05/11/1955 | 62.25 | ||||||||||||
519 | 5519 | 9254 | 69254 | 09/1893 | 26/05/1956 | 62.67 | ||||||||||||
520 | 5520 | 9255 | 69255 | 09/1893 | 16/06/1956 | 62.75 | ||||||||||||
521 | 5521 | 09/1893 | 11/1936 | 43.17 | ||||||||||||||
522 | 5522 | 9256 | 69256 | 09/1893 | 19/11/1955 | 62.17 | ||||||||||||
523 | 5523 | 9257 | 69257 | 10/1893 | 12/12/1959 | 66.17 | ||||||||||||
524 | 5524 | 9258 | 69258 | 10/1893 | 10/09/1960 | 66.92 | ||||||||||||
525 | 5525 | 9259 | 69259 | 10/1893 | 14/11/1958 | 65.08 | ||||||||||||
526 | 5526 | 9260 | 69260 | 10/1893 | 23/07/1956 | 62.75 | ||||||||||||
527 | 5527 | 9261 | 69261 | 10/1893 | 08/01/1958 | 64.25 | ||||||||||||
528 | 5528 | 9262 | 69262 | 10/1893 | 22/12/1959 | 66.17 | ||||||||||||
529 | 5529 | 9263 | 69263 | 11/1893 | 17/11/1960 | 67 | ||||||||||||
530 | 5530 | 9264 | 69264 | 11/1893 | 14/02/1955 | 61.25 | ||||||||||||
531 | 5531 | 11/1893 | 12/1938 | 45.08 | ||||||||||||||
532 | 5532 | 9265 | 69265 | 11/1893 | 12/12/1959 | 66.08 | ||||||||||||
533 | 5533 | 9266 | 69266 | 12/1893 | 25/11/1960 | 66.92 | ||||||||||||
534 | 5534 | 9267 | 69267 | 12/1893 | 26/01/1960 | 66.08 | ||||||||||||
535 | 5535 | 9268 | 69268 | 01/1894 | 26/01/1960 | 66 | ||||||||||||
537 | 5537 | 9271 | 69271 | 01/1894 | 03/08/1958 | 64.58 | ||||||||||||
538 | 127 | 5127 | 9269 | 69269 | 01/1894 | 17/10/1958 | 64.75 | |||||||||||
539 | 5539 | 9272 | 69272 | 02/1894 | 26/05/1956 | 62.25 | ||||||||||||
540 | 5540 | 9273 | 69273 | 02/1894 | 27/06/1955 | 61.33 | ||||||||||||
541 | 5541 | 9274 | 69274 | 02/1894 | 26/11/1960 | 66.75 | ||||||||||||
542 | 5542 | 9275 | 69275 | 02/1894 | 19/11/1955 | 61.75 | ||||||||||||
543 | 5543 | 9276 | 69276 | 03/1894 | 22/12/1959 | 65.75 | ||||||||||||
544 | 5544 | 9277 | 69277 | 03/1894 | 20/11/1956 | 62.67 | ||||||||||||
545 | 5545 | 9278 | 69278 | 03/1894 | 19/11/1955 | 61.67 | ||||||||||||
546 | 5546 | 9279 | 69279 | 03/1894 | 13/06/1955 | 61.25 | ||||||||||||
547 | 5547 | 9280 | 69280 | 03/1894 | 22/11/1955 | 61.67 | ||||||||||||
548 | 5548 | 9281 | 69281 | 03/1894 | 31/08/1958 | 64.42 | ||||||||||||
744 | 5744 | 9282 | 69282 | 08/1894 | 25/07/1955 | 60.92 | ||||||||||||
745 | 5745 | 9283 | 69283 | 08/1894 | 12/06/1958 | 63.83 | ||||||||||||
746 | 5746 | 9284 | 69284 | 08/1894 | 03/08/1958 | 64 | ||||||||||||
747 | 5747 | 9285 | 69285 | 09/1894 | 05/11/1955 | 61.17 | ||||||||||||
748 | 5748 | 9286 | 69286 | 09/1894 | 26/11/1960 | 66.17 | ||||||||||||
749 | 5749 | 9287 | 69287 | 09/1894 | 11/07/1955 | 60.83 | ||||||||||||
750 | 5750 | 9288 | 69288 | 10/1894 | 23/04/1955 | 60.5 | ||||||||||||
751 | 5751 | 9289 | 69289 | 10/1894 | 20/02/1954 | 59.33 | ||||||||||||
752 | 5752 | 9290 | 69290 | 10/1894 | 02/10/1959 | 65 | ||||||||||||
753 | 5753 | 9291 | 69291 | 11/1894 | 04/11/1955 | 61 | ||||||||||||
536 | 5536 | 9293 | 69293 | 05/1895 | 29/11/1960 | 65.5 | ||||||||||||
200A | 200 | 5200 | 9292 | 69292 | 09/1895 | 29/01/1960 | 64.33 | |||||||||||
756 | 23 | 756 | 5756 | 12/1895 | 10/1938 | 42.83 | ||||||||||||
757 | 5757 | 9297 | 69297 | 02/1896 | 08/08/1958 | 62.5 | ||||||||||||
758 | 5758 | 03/1896 | 11/1937 | 41.67 | ||||||||||||||
759 | 5759 | 9298 | 69298 | 04/1896 | 12/12/1959 | 63.67 | ||||||||||||
760 | 5760 | 9299 | 69299 | 05/1896 | 29/01/1960 | 63.67 | ||||||||||||
761 | 5761 | 9300 | 69300 | 05/1896 | 03/08/1958 | 62.25 | ||||||||||||
762 | 5762 | 9301 | 69301 | 06/1896 | 16/12/1955 | 59.5 | ||||||||||||
201A | 54 | 5054 | 9296 | 69296 | 09/1896 | 06/12/1960 | 64.25 | |||||||||||
202A | 21 | 5021 | 9294 | 69294 | 10/1896 | 02/10/1959 | 63 | |||||||||||
203A | 25 | 5025 | 9295 | 69295 | 12/1896 | 12/04/1958 | 61.33 | |||||||||||
754 | 19 | 754 | 5754 | 01/1896 | 12/1938 | 42.92 | ||||||||||||
755 | 20 | 755 | 5755 | 9302 | 69302 | 01/1896 | 08/01/1958 | 62 | ||||||||||
17 | 409 | 5409 | 9270 | 69270 | 02/1896 | 10/1956 | 60.67 | |||||||||||
18 | 410 | 5410 | 02/1896 | 02/1936 | 40 | |||||||||||||
763 | 5763 | 9303 | 69303 | 03/1898 | 19/11/1955 | 57.67 | ||||||||||||
764 | 5764 | 9304 | 69304 | 03/1898 | 12/03/1955 | 57 | ||||||||||||
765 | 5765 | 9305 | 69305 | 05/1898 | 03/08/1958 | 60.25 | ||||||||||||
766 | 5766 | 9306 | 69306 | 05/1898 | 08/11/1955 | 57.5 | ||||||||||||
767 | 5767 | 9307 | 69307 | 05/1898 | 10/12/1960 | 62.58 | ||||||||||||
768 | 5768 | 9308 | 69308 | 05/1898 | 17/02/1960 | 61.75 | ||||||||||||
769 | 5769 | 9309 | 69309 | 07/1898 | 23/11/1960 | 62.33 | ||||||||||||
770 | 5770 | 9310 | 69310 | 07/1898 | 18/11/1955 | 57.33 | ||||||||||||
771 | 5771 | 9311 | 69311 | 07/1898 | 04/02/1952 | 53.58 | ||||||||||||
772 | 5772 | 9312 | 69312 | 07/1898 | 07/10/1957 | 59.25 | ||||||||||||
773 | 5773 | 9313 | 69313 | 08/1898 | 21/03/1955 | 56.58 | ||||||||||||
774 | 5774 | 08/1898 | 01/1939 | 40.42 | ||||||||||||||
775 | 5775 | 9314 | 69314 | 08/1898 | 20/01/1960 | 61.42 | ||||||||||||
204A | 51 | 5189 | 9317 | 69317 | 02/1898 | 11/02/1956 | 58 | |||||||||||
205A | 173 | 5251 | 02/1898 | 03/1943 | 45.08 | |||||||||||||
206A | 189 | 5051 | 9315 | 69315 | 04/1898 | 03/06/1958 | 60.17 | |||||||||||
207A | 251 | 5173 | 9316 | 69316 | 05/1898 | 11/03/1957 | 58.83 | |||||||||||
894 | 5894 | 9318 | 69318 | 03/1899 | 05/11/1956 | 57.67 | ||||||||||||
895 | 5895 | 9319 | 69319 | 03/1899 | 12/12/1959 | 60.75 | ||||||||||||
896 | 5896 | 9320 | 69320 | 04/1899 | 06/10/1959 | 60.5 | ||||||||||||
897 | 5897 | 9321 | 69321 | 05/1899 | 08/10/1956 | 57.42 | ||||||||||||
898 | 5898 | 9322 | 69322 | 06/1899 | 24/06/1959 | 60 | ||||||||||||
899 | 5899 | 9323 | 69323 | 06/1899 | 26/11/1956 | 57.42 | ||||||||||||
900 | 5900 | 9324 | 69324 | 07/1899 | 08/11/1954 | 55.33 | ||||||||||||
901 | 5901 | 9325 | 69325 | 08/1899 | 24/09/1956 | 57.08 | ||||||||||||
902 | 5902 | 9326 | 69326 | 09/1899 | 14/12/1957 | 58.25 | ||||||||||||
903 | 5903 | 9327 | 69327 | 09/1899 | 17/09/1959 | 60 | ||||||||||||
904 | 5904 | 9328 | 69328 | 10/1899 | 09/01/1957 | 57.25 | ||||||||||||
905 | 5905 | 9329 | 69329 | 11/1899 | 21/09/1957 | 57.83 | ||||||||||||
906 | 5906 | 9330 | 69330 | 11/1899 | 12/02/1955 | 55.25 | ||||||||||||
907 | 5907 | 9331 | 69331 | 11/1899 | 26/01/1957 | 57.17 | ||||||||||||
908 | 5908 | 9332 | 69332 | 12/1899 | 11/02/1959 | 59.17 | ||||||||||||
909 | 5909 | 9333 | 69333 | 12/1899 | 02/01/1956 | 56.08 | ||||||||||||
910 | 5910 | 9334 | 69334 | 01/1900 | 09/07/1956 | 56.5 | ||||||||||||
911 | 5911 | 9335 | 69335 | 02/1900 | 14/09/1957 | 57.58 | ||||||||||||
912 | 5912 | 9336 | 69336 | 03/1900 | 11/12/1954 | 54.75 | ||||||||||||
913 | 5913 | 9337 | 69337 | 03/1900 | 06/08/1956 | 56.42 | ||||||||||||
914 | 5914 | 9338 | 69338 | 04/1900 | 14/03/1955 | 54.92 | ||||||||||||
915 | 5915 | 9339 | 69339 | 05/1900 | 17/03/1956 | 55.83 | ||||||||||||
916 | 5916 | 9340 | 69340 | 06/1900 | 12/05/1956 | 55.92 | ||||||||||||
917 | 5917 | 9341 | 69341 | 06/1900 | 12/12/1959 | 59.5 | ||||||||||||
918 | 5918 | 9342 | 69342 | 07/1900 | 06/08/1959 | 59.08 | ||||||||||||
919 | 5919 | 9343 | 69343 | 09/1900 | 11/01/1960 | 59.33 | ||||||||||||
920 | 5920 | 9344 | 69344 | 10/1900 | 12/12/1959 | 59.17 | ||||||||||||
921 | 5921 | 9345 | 69345 | 11/1900 | 25/10/1956 | 55.92 | ||||||||||||
922 | 5922 | 9346 | 69346 | 12/1900 | 09/1957 | 56.75 | ||||||||||||
923 | 5923 | 9347 | 69347 | 12/1900 | 14/12/1957 | 57 | ||||||||||||
924 | 5924 | 9348 | 69348 | 12/1900 | 25/01/1957 | 56.08 | ||||||||||||
925 | 5925 | 9349 | 69349 | 04/1900 | 31/08/1958 | 58.33 | ||||||||||||
926 | 5926 | 9350 | 69350 | 04/1900 | 18/01/1957 | 56.75 | ||||||||||||
927 | 5927 | 9351 | 69351 | 04/1900 | 16/10/1956 | 56.5 | ||||||||||||
928 | 5928 | 9352 | 69352 | 05/1900 | 11/06/1955 | 55.08 | ||||||||||||
929 | 5929 | 9353 | 69353 | 05/1900 | 14/11/1955 | 55.5 | ||||||||||||
930 | 5930 | 9354 | 69354 | 05/1900 | 12/02/1960 | 59.75 | ||||||||||||
931 | 5931 | 9355 | 69355 | 05/1900 | 21/04/1958 | 57.92 | ||||||||||||
932 | 5932 | 9356 | 69356 | 05/1900 | 23/02/1957 | 56.75 | ||||||||||||
933 | 5933 | 9357 | 69357 | 05/1900 | 11/11/1955 | 55.5 | ||||||||||||
934 | 5934 | 9358 | 69358 | 05/1900 | 10/11/1956 | 56.5 | ||||||||||||
935 | 5935 | 9359 | 69359 | 05/1900 | 28/04/1956 | 55.92 | ||||||||||||
936 | 5936 | 9360 | 69360 | 06/1900 | 19/03/1960 | 59.75 | ||||||||||||
937 | 5937 | 9361 | 69361 | 06/1900 | 08/06/1959 | 59 | ||||||||||||
938 | 5938 | 9362 | 69362 | 06/1900 | 31/08/1958 | 58.17 | ||||||||||||
939 | 5939 | 9363 | 69363 | 07/1900 | 09/07/1956 | 56 | ||||||||||||
940 | 5940 | 9364 | 69364 | 07/1900 | 13/08/1955 | 55.08 | ||||||||||||
941 | 5941 | 9365 | 69365 | 02/1901 | 09/02/1957 | 56 | ||||||||||||
942 | 5942 | 9366 | 69366 | 02/1901 | 11/08/1956 | 55.5 | ||||||||||||
943 | 5943 | 9367 | 69367 | 02/1901 | 04/11/1955 | 54.75 | ||||||||||||
944 | 5944 | 9368 | 69368 | 02/1901 | 02/05/1955 | 54.25 | ||||||||||||
945 | 5945 | 9369 | 69369 | 03/1901 | 02/02/1957 | 55.92 | ||||||||||||
946 | 5946 | 9370 | 69370 | 03/1901 | 10/09/1960 | 59.5 |