Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1778 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15184 Week
» 68200 Month
» 187727 Year
» 3214580 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
MLSR/LNER Parker "N5" Class 0-6-2T
Company |
Old Number |
|
Company |
New Number |
Subtype |
|
Date |
Information |
MSLR |
47 |
renumbered to |
MSLR |
516 |
Renum |
m/e |
10/1893 |
|
MSLR |
7 |
renumbered to |
MSLR |
515 |
Renum |
m/e |
10/1893 |
|
MSLR |
171 |
renumbered to |
MSLR |
517 |
Renum |
m/e |
12/1893 |
|
MSLR |
754 |
renumbered to |
WLR |
8 |
|
m/e |
05/1895 |
|
MSLR |
755 |
renumbered to |
WLR |
9 |
|
m/e |
08/1895 |
|
MSLR |
200A |
renumbered to |
MSLR |
200 |
Renum |
m/e |
01/1896 |
|
MSLR |
754 |
renumbered to |
WMCQR |
19 |
|
m/e |
02/1896 |
|
MSLR |
755 |
renumbered to |
WMCQR |
20 |
|
m/e |
02/1896 |
|
MSLR |
756 |
renumbered to |
WMCQR |
23 |
|
m/e |
02/1896 |
|
WLR |
8 |
renumbered to |
LYR |
1368 |
|
m/e |
07/1897 |
|
WLR |
9 |
renumbered to |
LYR |
1369 |
|
m/e |
07/1897 |
|
WMCQR |
19 |
renumbered to |
GCR |
754 |
|
m/e |
01/1898 |
|
WMCQR |
20 |
renumbered to |
GCR |
755 |
|
m/e |
01/1898 |
|
WMCQR |
23 |
renumbered to |
GCR |
756 |
|
m/e |
01/1898 |
|
MSLR |
201A |
renumbered to |
GCR |
54 |
Renum |
m/e |
08/1900 |
|
MSLR |
203A |
renumbered to |
GCR |
25 |
Renum |
m/e |
08/1900 |
|
GCR |
205A |
renumbered to |
GCR |
173 |
Renum |
m/e |
08/1900 |
|
GCR |
206A |
renumbered to |
GCR |
189 |
Renum |
m/e |
08/1900 |
|
GCR |
207A |
renumbered to |
GCR |
251 |
Renum |
m/e |
08/1900 |
|
MSLR |
202A |
renumbered to |
GCR |
21 |
Renum |
m/e |
10/1900 |
|
GCR |
204A |
renumbered to |
GCR |
51 |
Renum |
m/e |
10/1900 |
|
MSLR |
538 |
renumbered to |
GCR |
127 |
Renum |
m/e |
12/1903 |
|
WMCQR |
17 |
renumbered to |
GCR |
409 |
Renum |
m/e |
01/1905 |
|
WMCQR |
18 |
renumbered to |
GCR |
410 |
Renum |
m/e |
01/1905 |
|
MSLR |
744 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5744 |
1924 |
m/e |
02/1924 |
|
MSLR |
747 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5747 |
1924 |
m/e |
02/1924 |
|
GCR |
755 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5755 |
1924 |
m/e |
02/1924 |
|
GCR |
770 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5770 |
1924 |
m/e |
02/1924 |
|
GCR |
930 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5930 |
1924 |
m/e |
02/1924 |
|
MSLR |
517 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5517 |
1924 |
m/e |
03/1924 |
|
GCR |
910 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5910 |
1924 |
m/e |
03/1924 |
|
GCR |
925 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5925 |
1924 |
m/e |
03/1924 |
|
GCR |
934 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5934 |
1924 |
m/e |
03/1924 |
|
GCR |
54 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5054 |
1924 |
m/e |
04/1924 |
|
MSLR |
547 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5547 |
1924 |
m/e |
04/1924 |
|
MSLR |
750 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5750 |
1924 |
m/e |
04/1924 |
|
GCR |
767 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5767 |
1924 |
m/e |
04/1924 |
|
GCR |
774 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5774 |
1924 |
m/e |
04/1924 |
|
GCR |
895 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5895 |
1924 |
m/e |
04/1924 |
|
GCR |
897 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5897 |
1924 |
m/e |
04/1924 |
|
GCR |
756 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5756 |
1924 |
m/e |
05/1924 |
|
GCR |
765 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5765 |
1924 |
m/e |
05/1924 |
|
GCR |
935 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5935 |
1924 |
m/e |
05/1924 |
|
GCR |
937 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5937 |
1924 |
m/e |
05/1924 |
|
MSLR |
519 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5519 |
1924 |
m/e |
06/1924 |
|
MSLR |
542 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5542 |
1924 |
m/e |
06/1924 |
|
GCR |
946 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5946 |
1924 |
m/e |
06/1924 |
|
MSLR |
540 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5540 |
1924 |
m/e |
07/1924 |
|
MSLR |
749 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5749 |
1924 |
m/e |
07/1924 |
|
GCR |
915 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5915 |
1924 |
m/e |
07/1924 |
|
GCR |
940 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5940 |
1924 |
m/e |
07/1924 |
|
GCR |
21 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5021 |
1924 |
m/e |
08/1924 |
|
MSLR |
520 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5520 |
1924 |
m/e |
08/1924 |
|
MSLR |
762 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5762 |
1924 |
m/e |
08/1924 |
|
GCR |
764 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5764 |
1924 |
m/e |
08/1924 |
|
GCR |
775 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5775 |
1924 |
m/e |
08/1924 |
|
GCR |
909 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5909 |
1924 |
m/e |
08/1924 |
|
GCR |
923 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5923 |
1924 |
m/e |
08/1924 |
|
GCR |
939 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5939 |
1924 |
m/e |
08/1924 |
|
GCR |
410 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5410 |
1924 |
m/e |
09/1924 |
|
MSLR |
537 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5537 |
1924 |
m/e |
09/1924 |
|
MSLR |
757 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5757 |
1924 |
m/e |
09/1924 |
|
GCR |
51 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5189 |
1924 |
m/e |
10/1924 |
|
MSLR |
531 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5531 |
1924 |
m/e |
10/1924 |
|
MSLR |
535 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5535 |
1924 |
m/e |
10/1924 |
|
MSLR |
548 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5548 |
1924 |
m/e |
10/1924 |
|
MSLR |
751 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5751 |
1924 |
m/e |
10/1924 |
|
GCR |
769 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5769 |
1924 |
m/e |
10/1924 |
|
MSLR |
541 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5541 |
1924 |
m/e |
11/1924 |
|
MSLR |
753 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5753 |
1924 |
m/e |
11/1924 |
|
GCR |
936 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5936 |
1924 |
m/e |
11/1924 |
|
GCR |
409 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5409 |
1924 |
m/e |
12/1924 |
|
MSLR |
523 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5523 |
1924 |
m/e |
12/1924 |
|
MSLR |
525 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5525 |
1924 |
m/e |
12/1924 |
|
MSLR |
526 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5526 |
1924 |
m/e |
12/1924 |
|
MSLR |
545 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5545 |
1924 |
m/e |
12/1924 |
|
GCR |
945 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5945 |
1924 |
m/e |
12/1924 |
|
MSLR |
746 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5746 |
1924 |
m/e |
01/1925 |
|
MSLR |
758 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5758 |
1924 |
m/e |
01/1925 |
|
GCR |
771 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5771 |
1924 |
m/e |
01/1925 |
|
GCR |
913 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5913 |
1924 |
m/e |
01/1925 |
|
GCR |
941 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5941 |
1924 |
m/e |
01/1925 |
|
GCR |
127 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5127 |
1924 |
m/e |
02/1925 |
|
MSLR |
534 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5534 |
1924 |
m/e |
02/1925 |
|
GCR |
902 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5902 |
1924 |
m/e |
02/1925 |
|
MSLR |
536 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5536 |
1924 |
m/e |
03/1925 |
|
GCR |
903 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5903 |
1924 |
m/e |
03/1925 |
|
GCR |
912 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5912 |
1924 |
m/e |
03/1925 |
|
GCR |
917 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5917 |
1924 |
m/e |
03/1925 |
|
MSLR |
516 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5516 |
1924 |
m/e |
04/1925 |
|
MSLR |
518 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5518 |
1924 |
m/e |
04/1925 |
|
MSLR |
527 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5527 |
1924 |
m/e |
04/1925 |
|
GCR |
922 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5922 |
1924 |
m/e |
04/1925 |
|
GCR |
944 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5944 |
1924 |
m/e |
04/1925 |
|
MSLR |
521 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5521 |
1924 |
m/e |
05/1925 |
|
GCR |
754 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5754 |
1924 |
m/e |
05/1925 |
|
MSLR |
759 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5759 |
1924 |
m/e |
05/1925 |
|
GCR |
763 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5763 |
1924 |
m/e |
05/1925 |
|
GCR |
905 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5905 |
1924 |
m/e |
05/1925 |
|
GCR |
927 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5927 |
1924 |
m/e |
05/1925 |
|
GCR |
931 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5931 |
1924 |
m/e |
05/1925 |
|
MSLR |
752 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5752 |
1924 |
m/e |
06/1925 |
|
MSLR |
760 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5760 |
1924 |
m/e |
06/1925 |
|
GCR |
918 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5918 |
1924 |
m/e |
06/1925 |
|
GCR |
929 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5929 |
1924 |
m/e |
06/1925 |
|
GCR |
173 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5251 |
1924 |
m/e |
07/1925 |
|
GCR |
914 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5914 |
1924 |
m/e |
07/1925 |
|
MSLR |
200 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5200 |
1924 |
m/e |
08/1925 |
|
GCR |
906 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5906 |
1924 |
m/e |
08/1925 |
|
GCR |
924 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5924 |
1924 |
m/e |
08/1925 |
|
GCR |
938 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5938 |
1924 |
m/e |
08/1925 |
|
MSLR |
533 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5533 |
1924 |
m/e |
09/1925 |
|
GCR |
933 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5933 |
1924 |
m/e |
09/1925 |
|
GCR |
920 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5920 |
1924 |
m/e |
10/1925 |
|
GCR |
928 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5928 |
1924 |
m/e |
10/1925 |
|
MSLR |
748 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5748 |
1924 |
m/e |
11/1925 |
|
GCR |
901 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5901 |
1924 |
m/e |
11/1925 |
|
MSLR |
528 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5528 |
1924 |
m/e |
12/1925 |
|
MSLR |
544 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5544 |
1924 |
m/e |
12/1925 |
|
GCR |
921 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5921 |
1924 |
m/e |
12/1925 |
|
GCR |
189 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5051 |
1924 |
m/e |
01/1926 |
|
MSLR |
524 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5524 |
1924 |
m/e |
01/1926 |
|
MSLR |
761 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5761 |
1924 |
m/e |
01/1926 |
|
GCR |
772 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5772 |
1924 |
m/e |
01/1926 |
|
GCR |
898 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5898 |
1924 |
m/e |
01/1926 |
|
GCR |
900 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5900 |
1924 |
m/e |
01/1926 |
|
MSLR |
539 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5539 |
1924 |
m/e |
02/1926 |
|
GCR |
899 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5899 |
1924 |
m/e |
02/1926 |
|
GCR |
251 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5173 |
1924 |
m/e |
03/1926 |
|
GCR |
773 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5773 |
1924 |
m/e |
03/1926 |
|
MSLR |
515 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5515 |
1924 |
m/e |
04/1926 |
|
GCR |
916 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5916 |
1924 |
m/e |
04/1926 |
|
GCR |
932 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5932 |
1924 |
m/e |
04/1926 |
|
GCR |
25 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5025 |
1924 |
m/e |
05/1926 |
|
MSLR |
522 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5522 |
1924 |
m/e |
05/1926 |
|
MSLR |
546 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5546 |
1924 |
m/e |
05/1926 |
|
MSLR |
530 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5530 |
1924 |
m/e |
06/1926 |
|
MSLR |
543 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5543 |
1924 |
m/e |
08/1926 |
|
MSLR |
745 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5745 |
1924 |
m/e |
08/1926 |
|
GCR |
907 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5907 |
1924 |
m/e |
08/1926 |
|
GCR |
911 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5911 |
1924 |
m/e |
08/1926 |
|
MSLR |
529 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5529 |
1924 |
m/e |
10/1926 |
|
MSLR |
532 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5532 |
1924 |
m/e |
10/1926 |
|
GCR |
943 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5943 |
1924 |
m/e |
11/1926 |
|
GCR |
896 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5896 |
1924 |
m/e |
12/1926 |
|
GCR |
942 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5942 |
1924 |
m/e |
12/1926 |
|
GCR |
908 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5908 |
1924 |
m/e |
02/1927 |
|
GCR |
904 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5904 |
1924 |
m/e |
03/1927 |
|
GCR |
768 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5768 |
1924 |
m/e |
06/1927 |
|
GCR |
766 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5766 |
1924 |
m/e |
07/1927 |
|
GCR |
894 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5894 |
1924 |
m/e |
07/1927 |
|
GCR |
919 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5919 |
1924 |
m/e |
10/1927 |
|
GCR |
926 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5926 |
1924 |
m/e |
01/1928 |
|
LNER |
5745 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9283 |
1946 |
on |
20/01/1946 |
|
LNER |
5751 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9289 |
1946 |
on |
27/01/1946 |
|
LNER |
5755 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9302 |
1946 |
on |
10/02/1946 |
|
LNER |
5759 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9298 |
1946 |
m/e |
03/1946 |
|
LNER |
5933 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9357 |
1946 |
m/e |
03/1946 |
|
LNER |
5762 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9301 |
1946 |
on |
10/03/1946 |
|
LNER |
5932 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9356 |
1946 |
on |
17/03/1946 |
|
LNER |
5894 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9318 |
1946 |
on |
24/03/1946 |
|
LNER |
5021 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9294 |
1946 |
m/e |
04/1946 |
|
LNER |
5542 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9275 |
1946 |
m/e |
04/1946 |
|
LNER |
5765 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9305 |
1946 |
m/e |
04/1946 |
|
LNER |
5767 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9307 |
1946 |
m/e |
04/1946 |
|
LNER |
5769 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9309 |
1946 |
m/e |
04/1946 |
|
LNER |
5771 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9311 |
1946 |
m/e |
04/1946 |
|
LNER |
5773 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9313 |
1946 |
m/e |
04/1946 |
|
LNER |
5929 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9353 |
1946 |
m/e |
04/1946 |
|
LNER |
5934 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9358 |
1946 |
m/e |
04/1946 |
|
LNER |
5189 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9317 |
1946 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
|
LNER |
5517 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9252 |
1946 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
|
LNER |
5523 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9257 |
1946 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
|
LNER |
5528 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9262 |
1946 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
|
LNER |
5764 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9304 |
1946 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
|
LNER |
5766 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9306 |
1946 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
|
LNER |
5902 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9326 |
1946 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
|
LNER |
5516 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9251 |
1946 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
|
LNER |
5530 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9264 |
1946 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
|
LNER |
5539 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9272 |
1946 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
|
LNER |
5544 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9277 |
1946 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
|
LNER |
5903 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9327 |
1946 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
|
LNER |
5173 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9316 |
1946 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
|
LNER |
5409 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9270 |
1946 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
|
LNER |
5522 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9256 |
1946 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
|
LNER |
5543 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9276 |
1946 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
|
LNER |
5548 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9281 |
1946 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
|
LNER |
5904 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9328 |
1946 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
|
LNER |
5909 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9333 |
1946 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
|
LNER |
5914 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9338 |
1946 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
|
LNER |
5916 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9340 |
1946 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
|
LNER |
5918 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9342 |
1946 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
|
LNER |
5919 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9343 |
1946 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
|
LNER |
5920 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9344 |
1946 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
|
LNER |
5922 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9346 |
1946 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
|
LNER |
5925 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9349 |
1946 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
|
LNER |
5935 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9359 |
1946 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
|
LNER |
5937 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9361 |
1946 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
|
LNER |
5525 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9259 |
1946 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
|
LNER |
5534 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9267 |
1946 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
|
LNER |
5535 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9268 |
1946 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
|
LNER |
5537 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9271 |
1946 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
|
LNER |
5540 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9273 |
1946 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
|
LNER |
5545 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9278 |
1946 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
|
LNER |
5746 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9284 |
1946 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
|
LNER |
5747 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9285 |
1946 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
|
LNER |
5748 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9286 |
1946 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
|
LNER |
5749 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9287 |
1946 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
|
LNER |
5750 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9288 |
1946 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
|
LNER |
5752 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9290 |
1946 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
|
LNER |
5753 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9291 |
1946 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
|
LNER |
5768 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9308 |
1946 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
|
LNER |
5896 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9320 |
1946 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
|
LNER |
5897 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9321 |
1946 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
|
LNER |
5898 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9322 |
1946 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
|
LNER |
5899 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9323 |
1946 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
|
LNER |
5900 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9324 |
1946 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
|
LNER |
5901 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9325 |
1946 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
|
LNER |
5910 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9334 |
1946 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
|
LNER |
5912 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9336 |
1946 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
|
LNER |
5915 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9339 |
1946 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
|
LNER |
5917 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9341 |
1946 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
|
LNER |
5921 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9345 |
1946 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
|
LNER |
5926 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9350 |
1946 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
|
LNER |
5927 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9351 |
1946 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
|
LNER |
5928 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9352 |
1946 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
|
LNER |
5930 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9354 |
1946 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
|
LNER |
5931 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9355 |
1946 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
|
LNER |
5936 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9360 |
1946 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
|
LNER |
5943 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9367 |
1946 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
|
LNER |
5127 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9269 |
1946 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
|
LNER |
5515 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9250 |
1946 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
|
LNER |
5519 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9254 |
1946 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
|
LNER |
5524 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9258 |
1946 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
|
LNER |
5541 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9274 |
1946 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
|
LNER |
5772 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9312 |
1946 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
|
LNER |
5895 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9319 |
1946 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
|
LNER |
5907 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9331 |
1946 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
|
LNER |
5908 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9332 |
1946 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
|
LNER |
5939 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9363 |
1946 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
|
LNER |
5051 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9315 |
1946 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
|
LNER |
5518 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9253 |
1946 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
|
LNER |
5526 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9260 |
1946 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
|
LNER |
5527 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9261 |
1946 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
|
LNER |
5532 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9265 |
1946 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
|
LNER |
5536 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9293 |
1946 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
|
LNER |
5744 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9282 |
1946 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
|
LNER |
5760 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9299 |
1946 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
|
LNER |
5763 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9303 |
1946 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
|
LNER |
5905 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9329 |
1946 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
|
LNER |
5906 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9330 |
1946 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
|
LNER |
5913 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9337 |
1946 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
|
LNER |
5924 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9348 |
1946 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
|
LNER |
5940 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9364 |
1946 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
|
LNER |
5025 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9295 |
1946 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
|
LNER |
5200 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9292 |
1946 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
|
LNER |
5529 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9263 |
1946 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
|
LNER |
5533 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9266 |
1946 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
|
LNER |
5546 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9279 |
1946 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
|
LNER |
5757 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9297 |
1946 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
|
LNER |
5761 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9300 |
1946 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
|
LNER |
5770 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9310 |
1946 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
|
LNER |
5775 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9314 |
1946 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
|
LNER |
5911 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9335 |
1946 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
|
LNER |
5923 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9347 |
1946 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
|
LNER |
5946 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9370 |
1946 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
|
LNER |
5054 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9296 |
1946 |
m/e |
12/1946 |
|
LNER |
5520 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9255 |
1946 |
m/e |
12/1946 |
|
LNER |
5547 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9280 |
1946 |
m/e |
12/1946 |
|
LNER |
5938 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9362 |
1946 |
m/e |
12/1946 |
|
LNER |
5941 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9365 |
1946 |
m/e |
12/1946 |
|
LNER |
5942 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9366 |
1946 |
m/e |
12/1946 |
|
LNER |
5944 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9368 |
1946 |
m/e |
01/1947 |
|
LNER |
5945 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9369 |
1946 |
m/e |
01/1947 |
|
LNER |
9253 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69253 |
|
m/e |
03/1948 |
|
LNER |
9301 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69301 |
|
m/e |
03/1948 |
|
LNER |
9354 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69354 |
|
m/e |
03/1948 |
|
LNER |
9280 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69280 |
|
m/e |
04/1948 |
|
LNER |
9281 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69281 |
|
m/e |
04/1948 |
|
LNER |
9304 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69304 |
|
m/e |
04/1948 |
|
LNER |
9329 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69329 |
|
m/e |
04/1948 |
|
LNER |
9338 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69338 |
|
m/e |
04/1948 |
|
LNER |
9352 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69352 |
|
m/e |
04/1948 |
|
LNER |
9361 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69361 |
|
m/e |
04/1948 |
|
LNER |
9256 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69256 |
|
m/e |
06/1948 |
|
LNER |
9268 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69268 |
|
m/e |
06/1948 |
|
LNER |
9282 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69282 |
|
m/e |
06/1948 |
|
LNER |
9366 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69366 |
|
m/e |
06/1948 |
|
LNER |
9255 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69255 |
|
m/e |
07/1948 |
|
LNER |
9267 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69267 |
|
m/e |
07/1948 |
|
LNER |
9311 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69311 |
|
m/e |
08/1948 |
|
LNER |
9315 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69315 |
|
m/e |
08/1948 |
|
LNER |
9335 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69335 |
|
m/e |
08/1948 |
|
LNER |
9367 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69367 |
|
m/e |
08/1948 |
|
LNER |
9259 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69259 |
|
m/e |
09/1948 |
|
LNER |
9336 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69336 |
|
m/e |
09/1948 |
|
LNER |
9368 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69368 |
|
m/e |
09/1948 |
|
LNER |
9254 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69254 |
|
m/e |
10/1948 |
|
LNER |
9284 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69284 |
|
m/e |
10/1948 |
|
LNER |
9316 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69316 |
|
m/e |
10/1948 |
|
LNER |
9355 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69355 |
|
m/e |
10/1948 |
|
LNER |
9332 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69332 |
|
m/e |
11/1948 |
|
LNER |
9341 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69341 |
|
m/e |
11/1948 |
|
LNER |
9360 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69360 |
|
m/e |
11/1948 |
|
LNER |
9252 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69252 |
|
m/e |
01/1949 |
|
LNER |
9261 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69261 |
|
m/e |
01/1949 |
|
LNER |
9269 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69269 |
|
m/e |
01/1949 |
|
LNER |
9307 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69307 |
|
m/e |
01/1949 |
|
LNER |
9312 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69312 |
|
m/e |
01/1949 |
|
LNER |
9326 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69326 |
|
m/e |
01/1949 |
|
LNER |
9364 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69364 |
|
m/e |
01/1949 |
|
LNER |
9370 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69370 |
|
m/e |
01/1949 |
|
LNER |
9251 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69251 |
|
m/e |
02/1949 |
|
LNER |
9276 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69276 |
|
m/e |
02/1949 |
|
LNER |
9292 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69292 |
|
m/e |
02/1949 |
|
LNER |
9317 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69317 |
|
m/e |
02/1949 |
|
LNER |
9328 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69328 |
|
m/e |
02/1949 |
|
LNER |
9333 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69333 |
|
m/e |
02/1949 |
|
LNER |
9343 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69343 |
|
m/e |
02/1949 |
|
LNER |
9347 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69347 |
|
m/e |
02/1949 |
|
LNER |
9359 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69359 |
|
m/e |
02/1949 |
|
LNER |
9258 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69258 |
|
m/e |
03/1949 |
|
LNER |
9262 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69262 |
|
m/e |
03/1949 |
|
LNER |
9265 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69265 |
|
m/e |
03/1949 |
|
LNER |
9270 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69270 |
|
m/e |
03/1949 |
|
LNER |
9272 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69272 |
|
m/e |
03/1949 |
|
LNER |
9274 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69274 |
|
m/e |
03/1949 |
|
LNER |
9275 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69275 |
|
m/e |
03/1949 |
|
LNER |
9288 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69288 |
|
m/e |
03/1949 |
|
LNER |
9291 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69291 |
|
m/e |
03/1949 |
|
LNER |
9293 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69293 |
|
m/e |
03/1949 |
|
LNER |
9295 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69295 |
|
m/e |
03/1949 |
|
LNER |
9296 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69296 |
|
m/e |
03/1949 |
|
LNER |
9298 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69298 |
|
m/e |
03/1949 |
|
LNER |
9308 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69308 |
|
m/e |
03/1949 |
|
LNER |
9327 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69327 |
|
m/e |
03/1949 |
|
LNER |
9331 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69331 |
|
m/e |
03/1949 |
|
LNER |
9337 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69337 |
|
m/e |
03/1949 |
|
LNER |
9339 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69339 |
|
m/e |
03/1949 |
|
LNER |
9342 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69342 |
|
m/e |
03/1949 |
|
LNER |
9344 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69344 |
|
m/e |
03/1949 |
|
LNER |
9356 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69356 |
|
m/e |
03/1949 |
|
LNER |
9264 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69264 |
|
m/e |
04/1949 |
|
LNER |
9286 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69286 |
|
m/e |
04/1949 |
|
LNER |
9365 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69365 |
|
m/e |
04/1949 |
|
LNER |
9277 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69277 |
|
m/e |
05/1949 |
|
LNER |
9279 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69279 |
|
m/e |
05/1949 |
|
LNER |
9294 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69294 |
|
m/e |
05/1949 |
|
LNER |
9324 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69324 |
|
m/e |
05/1949 |
|
LNER |
9340 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69340 |
|
m/e |
05/1949 |
|
LNER |
9287 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69287 |
|
m/e |
06/1949 |
|
LNER |
9289 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69289 |
|
m/e |
06/1949 |
|
LNER |
9306 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69306 |
|
m/e |
06/1949 |
|
LNER |
9330 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69330 |
|
m/e |
06/1949 |
|
LNER |
9346 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69346 |
|
m/e |
06/1949 |
|
LNER |
9349 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69349 |
|
m/e |
06/1949 |
|
LNER |
9362 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69362 |
|
m/e |
06/1949 |
|
LNER |
9363 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69363 |
|
m/e |
06/1949 |
|
LNER |
9285 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69285 |
|
m/e |
08/1949 |
|
LNER |
9260 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69260 |
|
m/e |
09/1949 |
|
LNER |
9266 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69266 |
|
m/e |
09/1949 |
|
LNER |
9319 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69319 |
|
m/e |
10/1949 |
|
LNER |
9310 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69310 |
|
m/e |
01/1950 |
|
LNER |
9323 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69323 |
|
m/e |
01/1950 |
|
LNER |
9351 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69351 |
|
m/e |
01/1950 |
|
LNER |
9357 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69357 |
|
m/e |
01/1950 |
|
LNER |
9299 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69299 |
|
m/e |
03/1950 |
|
LNER |
9278 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69278 |
|
m/e |
04/1950 |
|
LNER |
9303 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69303 |
|
m/e |
04/1950 |
|
LNER |
9309 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69309 |
|
m/e |
05/1950 |
|
LNER |
9325 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69325 |
|
m/e |
06/1950 |
|
LNER |
9345 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69345 |
|
m/e |
06/1950 |
|
LNER |
9290 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69290 |
|
m/e |
07/1950 |
|
LNER |
9321 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69321 |
|
m/e |
08/1950 |
|
LNER |
9348 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69348 |
|
m/e |
08/1950 |
|
LNER |
9305 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69305 |
|
m/e |
09/1950 |
|
LNER |
9257 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69257 |
|
m/e |
10/1950 |
|
LNER |
9334 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69334 |
|
m/e |
10/1950 |
|
LNER |
9322 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69322 |
|
m/e |
11/1950 |
|
LNER |
9263 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69263 |
|
w/e |
04/11/1950 |
|
LNER |
9302 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69302 |
|
w/e |
04/11/1950 |
|
LNER |
9358 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69358 |
|
w/e |
04/11/1950 |
|
LNER |
9320 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69320 |
|
w/e |
18/11/1950 |
|
LNER |
9318 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69318 |
|
w/e |
25/11/1950 |
|
LNER |
9350 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69350 |
|
w/e |
16/12/1950 |
|
LNER |
9369 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69369 |
|
w/e |
30/12/1950 |
|
LNER |
9297 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69297 |
|
m/e |
01/1951 |
|
LNER |
9353 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69353 |
|
m/e |
01/1951 |
|
LNER |
9250 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69250 |
|
m/e |
02/1951 |
|
LNER |
9300 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69300 |
|
m/e |
02/1951 |
|
LNER |
9283 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69283 |
|
m/e |
08/1951 |
|
LNER |
9313 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69313 |
|
m/e |
03/1952 |
|
LNER |
9314 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69314 |
|
m/e |
03/1952 |
|
LNER |
9273 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69273 |
|
m/e |
05/1952 |
|
LNER |
9271 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69271 |
|
m/e |
03/1953 |
|