GER/LNER Hill "N7" Class 0-6-2T
GER | LNER (1924) | LNER (1944) | LNER (1946) | BR | Date To Service | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1000 | 8000 | 7978 | 9600 | 69600 | 01/1915 | 03/02/1959 | 44.08 | ||||||
1001 | 8001 | 7979 | 9601 | 69601 | 02/1915 | 05/05/1958 | 43.25 | ||||||
1002 | 8002 | 7980 | 9602 | 69602 | 07/1921 | 27/07/1959 | 38 | ||||||
1003 | 8003 | 7981 | 9603 | 69603 | 07/1921 | 27/07/1959 | 38 | ||||||
1004 | 8004 | 7982 | 9604 | 69604 | 09/1921 | 10/08/1959 | 37.92 | ||||||
1005 | 8005 | 7983 | 9605 | 69605 | 09/1921 | 06/10/1958 | 37.08 | ||||||
1006 | 8006 | 7984 | 9606 | 69606 | 09/1921 | 11/08/1958 | 36.92 | ||||||
1007 | 8007 | 7985 | 9607 | 69607 | 10/1921 | 22/07/1958 | 36.75 | ||||||
1008 | 8008 | 7986 | 9608 | 69608 | 10/1921 | 11/08/1958 | 36.83 | ||||||
1009 | 8009 | 7987 | 9609 | 69609 | 10/1921 | 28/04/1958 | 36.5 | ||||||
1010 | 8010 | 7988 | 9610 | 69610 | 11/1921 | 01/01/1959 | 37.17 | ||||||
1011 | 8011 | 7989 | 9611 | 69611 | 11/1921 | 24/11/1960 | 39 | ||||||
990E | 7990 | 9612 | 69612 | 12/1923 | 03/08/1959 | 35.67 | |||||||
991E | 7991 | 9613 | 69613 | 12/1923 | 09/11/1959 | 35.92 | |||||||
992E | 7992 | 9614 | 69614 | 12/1923 | 04/12/1960 | 37 | |||||||
993E | 7993 | 9615 | 69615 | 01/1924 | 12/09/1960 | 36.67 | |||||||
994E | 7994 | 9616 | 69616 | 01/1924 | 01/01/1959 | 35 | |||||||
995E | 7995 | 9617 | 69617 | 01/1924 | 04/07/1960 | 36.5 | |||||||
996E | 7996 | 9618 | 69618 | 01/1924 | 10/09/1961 | 37.67 | |||||||
997E | 7997 | 9619 | 69619 | 02/1924 | 16/02/1959 | 35 | |||||||
998E | 7998 | 9620 | 69620 | 02/1924 | 24/11/1960 | 36.75 | |||||||
999E | 7999 | 9621 | 69621 | 03/1924 | 11/09/1962 | 38.5 | Prs | Preserved |