Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 3513 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16919 Week
» 69935 Month
» 189462 Year
» 3216315 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
NER/LNER Worsdell "N8" Class 0-6-2T
Company |
Old Number |
|
Company |
New Number |
Subtype |
|
Date |
Information |
|
|
renumbered to |
NER |
210 |
|
m/e |
06/1886 |
|
|
|
renumbered to |
NER |
212 |
|
m/e |
06/1886 |
|
|
|
renumbered to |
NER |
535 |
|
m/e |
07/1886 |
|
|
|
renumbered to |
NER |
856 |
|
m/e |
09/1886 |
|
|
|
renumbered to |
NER |
74 |
|
m/e |
09/1886 |
|
|
|
renumbered to |
NER |
859 |
|
m/e |
11/1886 |
|
|
|
renumbered to |
NER |
861 |
|
m/e |
10/1888 |
|
|
|
renumbered to |
NER |
863 |
|
m/e |
10/1888 |
|
|
|
renumbered to |
NER |
862 |
|
m/e |
10/1888 |
|
|
|
renumbered to |
NER |
864 |
|
m/e |
11/1888 |
|
|
|
renumbered to |
NER |
1152 |
|
m/e |
12/1888 |
|
|
|
renumbered to |
NER |
348 |
|
m/e |
12/1888 |
|
|
|
renumbered to |
NER |
346 |
|
m/e |
12/1888 |
|
|
|
renumbered to |
NER |
1127 |
|
m/e |
02/1889 |
|
|
|
renumbered to |
NER |
1105 |
|
m/e |
03/1889 |
|
|
|
renumbered to |
NER |
136 |
|
m/e |
03/1889 |
|
|
|
renumbered to |
NER |
345 |
|
m/e |
04/1889 |
|
|
|
renumbered to |
NER |
515 |
|
m/e |
04/1889 |
|
|
|
renumbered to |
NER |
573 |
|
m/e |
04/1889 |
|
|
|
renumbered to |
NER |
76 |
|
m/e |
05/1889 |
|
|
|
renumbered to |
NER |
1072 |
|
m/e |
05/1889 |
|
|
|
renumbered to |
NER |
267 |
|
m/e |
06/1889 |
|
|
|
renumbered to |
NER |
271 |
|
m/e |
10/1889 |
|
|
|
renumbered to |
NER |
780 |
|
m/e |
10/1889 |
|
|
|
renumbered to |
NER |
961 |
|
m/e |
11/1889 |
|
|
|
renumbered to |
NER |
1091 |
|
m/e |
11/1889 |
|
|
|
renumbered to |
NER |
293 |
|
m/e |
12/1889 |
|
|
|
renumbered to |
NER |
1104 |
|
m/e |
12/1889 |
|
NER |
9 |
renumbered to |
NER |
503 |
|
on |
01/01/1914 |
|
NER |
855 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
856 |
Replace |
m/e |
03/1939 |
Replaced original 856 due to the latter being scrapped in error. |
NER |
1104 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9400 |
1946 |
on |
20/01/1946 |
|
NER |
1105 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9389 |
1946 |
on |
27/01/1946 |
|
NER |
1127 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9386 |
1946 |
on |
27/01/1946 |
|
NER |
1072 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9393 |
1946 |
on |
17/02/1946 |
|
NER |
1091 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9399 |
1946 |
on |
24/02/1946 |
|
NER |
1152 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9385 |
1946 |
on |
03/03/1946 |
|
NER |
210 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9371 |
1946 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
|
NER |
212 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9372 |
1946 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
|
NER |
219 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9382 |
1946 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
|
NER |
503 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9374 |
1946 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
|
NER |
515 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9391 |
1946 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
|
NER |
74 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9375 |
1946 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
|
NER |
76 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9394 |
1946 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
|
NER |
862 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9379 |
1946 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
|
NER |
267 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9395 |
1946 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
|
NER |
535 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9373 |
1946 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
|
NER |
271 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9396 |
1946 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
|
NER |
346 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9383 |
1946 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
|
NER |
573 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9392 |
1946 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
|
LNER |
856 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9376 |
1946 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
|
NER |
859 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9377 |
1946 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
|
NER |
861 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9378 |
1946 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
|
NER |
864 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9381 |
1946 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
|
NER |
961 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9398 |
1946 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
|
NER |
293 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9401 |
1946 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
|
NER |
863 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9380 |
1946 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
|
NER |
136 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9387 |
1946 |
m/e |
12/1946 |
|
NER |
345 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9390 |
1946 |
m/e |
12/1946 |
|
NER |
348 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9384 |
1946 |
m/e |
12/1946 |
|
NER |
780 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9397 |
1946 |
m/e |
12/1946 |
|
LNER |
9371 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69371 |
|
m/e |
04/1948 |
|
LNER |
9372 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69372 |
|
m/e |
10/1948 |
|
LNER |
9392 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69392 |
|
m/e |
10/1948 |
|
LNER |
9401 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69401 |
|
m/e |
03/1949 |
|
LNER |
9391 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69391 |
|
m/e |
04/1949 |
|
LNER |
9387 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69387 |
|
m/e |
06/1949 |
|
LNER |
9377 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69377 |
|
m/e |
07/1949 |
|
LNER |
9393 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69393 |
|
m/e |
07/1949 |
|
LNER |
9381 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69381 |
|
m/e |
10/1949 |
|
LNER |
9386 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69386 |
|
m/e |
10/1949 |
|
LNER |
9389 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69389 |
|
m/e |
10/1949 |
|
LNER |
9395 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69395 |
|
m/e |
10/1949 |
|
LNER |
9379 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69379 |
|
m/e |
11/1949 |
|
LNER |
9382 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69382 |
|
m/e |
11/1949 |
|
LNER |
9385 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69385 |
|
m/e |
11/1949 |
|
LNER |
9398 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69398 |
|
m/e |
01/1950 |
|
LNER |
9394 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69394 |
|
m/e |
03/1950 |
|
LNER |
9390 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69390 |
|
m/e |
06/1950 |
|
LNER |
9378 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69378 |
|
m/e |
12/1951 |
|