Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 56 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 2982 Week
» 4720 Month
» 132163 Year
» 1797539 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

GNR/LNER Gresley "O2" Class 2-8-0


Date Event Number From Depot From To Depot To Usage
05/1918 To Service 461   NEW NWE New England  
04/1921 To Service 477   NEW NWE New England  
04/1921 To Service 478   NEW NWE New England  
06/1921 To Service 479   NEW NWE New England  
06/1921 To Service 480   NEW NWE New England  
06/1921 To Service 481   NEW NWE New England  
06/1921 To Service 482   NEW NWE New England  
07/1921 To Service 483   NEW NWE New England  
07/1921 To Service 484   NEW NWE New England  
07/1921 To Service 485   NEW NWE New England  
07/1921 To Service 486   NEW NWE New England  
01/11/1923 To Service 487   NEW NWE New England  
03/11/1923 To Service 488   NEW NWE New England  
14/11/1923 To Service 489   NEW NWE New England  
30/11/1923 To Service 490   NEW NWE New England  
05/12/1923 To Service 491   NEW NWE New England  
15/12/1923 To Service 492   NEW NWE New England  
22/12/1923 To Service 493   NEW NWE New England  
29/12/1923 To Service 494   NEW NWE New England  
06/02/1924 To Service 495   NEW NWE New England  
23/02/1924 To Service 3496   NEW DON Doncaster  
22/03/1924 To Service 3497   NEW NWE New England  
29/03/1924 To Service 3498   NEW NWE New England  
26/04/1924 To Service 3499   NEW NWE New England  
22/05/1924 To Service 500   NEW NWE New England  
07/06/1924 To Service 3501   NEW NPT Newport (Teeside)  
01/01/1925 Reallocation 3496 DON Doncaster NWE New England  
28/02/1925 Reallocation 3501 NPT Newport (Teeside) NWE New England  
07/03/1928 Reallocation 3490 NWE New England MEX Mexborough  
20/04/1928 Reallocation 3490 MEX Mexborough NWE New England  
23/04/1932 To Service 2954   NEW MAR March  
19/05/1932 To Service 2955   NEW MAR March  
28/05/1932 To Service 2956   NEW MAR March  
23/06/1932 To Service 2957   NEW MAR March  
07/07/1932 To Service 2958   NEW MAR March  
11/07/1932 To Service 2959   NEW MAR March  
29/07/1932 To Service 2960   NEW MAR March  
17/08/1932 To Service 2961   NEW MAR March  
29/11/1933 To Service 2430   NEW MAR March  
08/12/1933 To Service 2431   NEW MAR March  
15/12/1933 To Service 2432   NEW MAR March  
28/12/1933 To Service 2433   NEW MAR March  
20/01/1934 To Service 2434   NEW MAR March  
27/01/1934 To Service 2435   NEW MAR March  
20/02/1934 To Service 2436   NEW MAR March  
15/03/1934 To Service 2437   NEW MAR March  
27/12/1935 Reallocation 2437 MAR March NWE New England  
04/01/1936 Reallocation 2437 NWE New England MAR March  
22/05/1942 To Service 3833   NEW DON Doncaster  
10/06/1942 To Service 3834   NEW DON Doncaster  
26/06/1942 To Service 3835   NEW DON Doncaster  
31/07/1942 To Service 3836   NEW DON Doncaster  
21/08/1942 To Service 3837   NEW DON Doncaster  
02/09/1942 To Service 3838   NEW DON Doncaster  
12/09/1942 To Service 3839   NEW DON Doncaster  
21/09/1942 To Service 3840   NEW DON Doncaster  
05/10/1942 To Service 3841   NEW DON Doncaster  
10/10/1942 To Service 3842   NEW DON Doncaster  
23/10/1942 To Service 3843   NEW DON Doncaster  
03/11/1942 To Service 3844   NEW DON Doncaster  
06/11/1942 To Service 3845   NEW DON Doncaster  
18/11/1942 To Service 3846   NEW DON Doncaster  
21/11/1942 Reallocation 3845 DON Doncaster NWE New England  
21/11/1942 Reallocation 3846 DON Doncaster NWE New England  
21/11/1942 To Service 3847   NEW DON Doncaster  
28/11/1942 To Service 3848   NEW DON Doncaster  
04/12/1942 To Service 3849   NEW DON Doncaster  
11/12/1942 To Service 3850   NEW DON Doncaster  
17/12/1942 To Service 3851   NEW DON Doncaster  
21/12/1942 To Service 3852   NEW DON Doncaster  
26/12/1942 To Service 3853   NEW DON Doncaster  
31/12/1942 To Service 3854   NEW DON Doncaster  
02/01/1943 To Service 3855   NEW DON Doncaster  
07/01/1943 To Service 3856   NEW DON Doncaster  
21/01/1943 To Service 3857   NEW DON Doncaster  
10/02/1943 Reallocation 3497 NWE New England DON Doncaster  
11/05/1943 Reallocation 3461 NWE New England DON Doncaster  
12/05/1943 Reallocation 3478 NWE New England DON Doncaster  
13/05/1943 Reallocation 3479 NWE New England DON Doncaster  
14/05/1943 Reallocation 3477 NWE New England DON Doncaster  
15/05/1943 Reallocation 3480 NWE New England DON Doncaster  
13/06/1943 Reallocation 3481 NWE New England DON Doncaster  
13/06/1943 Reallocation 3482 NWE New England DON Doncaster  
05/09/1943 Reallocation 3485 NWE New England DON Doncaster  
05/09/1943 Reallocation 3486 NWE New England DON Doncaster  
06/09/1943 Reallocation 3483 NWE New England DON Doncaster  
06/09/1943 Reallocation 3484 NWE New England DON Doncaster  
06/09/1943 Reallocation 3489 NWE New England DON Doncaster  
06/09/1943 Reallocation 3490 NWE New England DON Doncaster  
07/09/1943 Reallocation 3488 NWE New England DON Doncaster  
09/09/1943 Reallocation 3487 NWE New England DON Doncaster  
10/12/1943 Reallocation 3493 NWE New England DON Doncaster  
10/12/1943 Reallocation 3494 NWE New England DON Doncaster  
10/12/1943 Reallocation 3495 NWE New England DON Doncaster  
11/12/1943 Reallocation 3492 NWE New England DON Doncaster  
12/12/1943 Reallocation 3498 NWE New England DON Doncaster  
23/01/1944 Reallocation 3461 DON Doncaster CLK Colwick  
23/01/1944 Reallocation 3477 DON Doncaster CLK Colwick  
23/01/1944 Reallocation 3478 DON Doncaster CLK Colwick  
23/01/1944 Reallocation 3479 DON Doncaster CLK Colwick  
23/01/1944 Reallocation 3480 DON Doncaster CLK Colwick  
23/01/1944 Reallocation 3483 DON Doncaster CLK Colwick  
23/01/1944 Reallocation 3484 DON Doncaster CLK Colwick  
23/01/1944 Reallocation 3485 DON Doncaster CLK Colwick  
23/01/1944 Reallocation 3486 DON Doncaster CLK Colwick  
23/01/1944 Reallocation 3487 DON Doncaster CLK Colwick  
23/01/1944 Reallocation 3488 DON Doncaster CLK Colwick  
23/01/1944 Reallocation 3489 DON Doncaster CLK Colwick  
23/01/1944 Reallocation 3490 DON Doncaster CLK Colwick  
23/01/1944 Reallocation 3492 DON Doncaster CLK Colwick  
23/01/1944 Reallocation 3493 DON Doncaster CLK Colwick  
23/01/1944 Reallocation 3494 DON Doncaster CLK Colwick  
23/01/1944 Reallocation 3495 DON Doncaster CLK Colwick  
23/01/1944 Reallocation 3497 DON Doncaster CLK Colwick  
23/01/1944 Reallocation 3498 DON Doncaster CLK Colwick  
23/01/1944 Reallocation 3833 DON Doncaster CLK Colwick  
23/01/1944 Reallocation 3834 DON Doncaster CLK Colwick  
23/01/1944 Reallocation 3835 DON Doncaster CLK Colwick  
23/01/1944 Reallocation 3836 DON Doncaster CLK Colwick  
23/01/1944 Reallocation 3837 DON Doncaster CLK Colwick  
23/01/1944 Reallocation 3838 DON Doncaster CLK Colwick  
23/01/1944 Reallocation 3839 DON Doncaster CLK Colwick  
23/01/1944 Reallocation 3840 DON Doncaster CLK Colwick  
23/01/1944 Reallocation 3841 DON Doncaster CLK Colwick  
23/01/1944 Reallocation 3842 DON Doncaster CLK Colwick  
23/01/1944 Reallocation 3843 DON Doncaster CLK Colwick  
23/01/1944 Reallocation 3844 DON Doncaster CLK Colwick  
23/01/1944 Reallocation 3848 DON Doncaster CLK Colwick  
23/01/1944 Reallocation 3850 DON Doncaster CLK Colwick  
23/01/1944 Reallocation 3851 DON Doncaster CLK Colwick  
23/01/1944 Reallocation 3852 DON Doncaster CLK Colwick  
23/01/1944 Reallocation 3853 DON Doncaster CLK Colwick  
23/01/1944 Reallocation 3854 DON Doncaster CLK Colwick  
23/01/1944 Reallocation 3855 DON Doncaster CLK Colwick  
23/01/1944 Reallocation 3856 DON Doncaster CLK Colwick  
23/01/1944 Reallocation 3857 DON Doncaster CLK Colwick  
25/01/1944 Reallocation 3849 DON Doncaster CLK Colwick  
19/02/1944 Reallocation 3481 DON Doncaster CLK Colwick  
19/02/1944 Reallocation 3482 DON Doncaster CLK Colwick  
29/03/1944 Reallocation 3486 CLK Colwick NWE New England  
29/03/1944 Reallocation 3854 CLK Colwick NWE New England  
29/03/1944 Reallocation 3856 CLK Colwick NWE New England  
29/03/1944 Reallocation 3857 CLK Colwick NWE New England  
21/09/1944 Reallocation 3479 CLK Colwick NWE New England  
21/09/1944 Reallocation 3489 CLK Colwick NWE New England  
21/09/1944 Reallocation 3492 CLK Colwick NWE New England  
24/09/1944 Reallocation 3490 CLK Colwick NWE New England  
24/09/1944 Reallocation 3493 CLK Colwick NWE New England  
24/09/1944 Reallocation 3497 CLK Colwick NWE New England  
24/09/1944 Reallocation 3498 CLK Colwick NWE New England  
21/12/1944 Reallocation 3480 CLK Colwick NWE New England  
24/12/1944 Reallocation 3461 CLK Colwick NWE New England  
24/12/1944 Reallocation 3477 CLK Colwick NWE New England  
24/12/1944 Reallocation 3478 CLK Colwick NWE New England  
17/01/1945 Reallocation 3481 CLK Colwick NWE New England  
17/01/1945 Reallocation 3482 CLK Colwick NWE New England  
17/01/1945 Reallocation 3483 CLK Colwick NWE New England  
17/01/1945 Reallocation 3484 CLK Colwick NWE New England  
17/01/1945 Reallocation 3485 CLK Colwick NWE New England  
17/01/1945 Reallocation 3487 CLK Colwick NWE New England  
17/01/1945 Reallocation 3488 CLK Colwick NWE New England  
17/01/1945 Reallocation 3494 CLK Colwick NWE New England  
17/01/1945 Reallocation 3495 CLK Colwick NWE New England  
17/01/1945 Reallocation 3833 CLK Colwick NWE New England  
17/05/1945 Reallocation 3490 NWE New England GRA Grantham  
25/06/1945 Reallocation 3461 NWE New England CLK Colwick  
25/06/1945 Reallocation 3477 NWE New England CLK Colwick  
25/06/1945 Reallocation 3478 NWE New England CLK Colwick  
25/06/1945 Reallocation 3479 NWE New England CLK Colwick  
25/06/1945 Reallocation 3480 NWE New England CLK Colwick  
25/06/1945 Reallocation 3481 NWE New England CLK Colwick  
25/06/1945 Reallocation 3482 NWE New England CLK Colwick  
25/06/1945 Reallocation 3483 NWE New England CLK Colwick  
25/06/1945 Reallocation 3484 NWE New England GRA Grantham  
25/06/1945 Reallocation 3485 NWE New England GRA Grantham  
25/06/1945 Reallocation 3486 NWE New England GRA Grantham  
25/06/1945 Reallocation 3487 NWE New England GRA Grantham  
25/06/1945 Reallocation 3488 NWE New England GRA Grantham  
25/06/1945 Reallocation 3489 NWE New England GRA Grantham  
25/06/1945 Reallocation 3491 NWE New England GRA Grantham  
25/06/1945 Reallocation 3492 NWE New England GRA Grantham  
25/06/1945 Reallocation 3493 NWE New England GRA Grantham  
25/06/1945 Reallocation 3494 NWE New England GRA Grantham  
25/06/1945 Reallocation 3495 NWE New England GRA Grantham  
25/06/1945 Reallocation 3496 NWE New England GRA Grantham  
18/11/1945 Reallocation 3854 NWE New England DON Doncaster  
20/11/1945 Reallocation 3498 NWE New England DON Doncaster  
30/11/1945 Reallocation 3497 NWE New England DON Doncaster  
30/11/1945 Reallocation 3499 NWE New England DON Doncaster  
30/11/1945 Reallocation 500 NWE New England DON Doncaster  
02/12/1945 Reallocation 3461 CLK Colwick DON Doncaster  
05/12/1945 Reallocation 3480 CLK Colwick DON Doncaster  
05/12/1945 Reallocation 3481 CLK Colwick DON Doncaster  
05/12/1945 Reallocation 3482 CLK Colwick DON Doncaster  
09/12/1945 Reallocation 3477 CLK Colwick DON Doncaster  
09/12/1945 Reallocation 3478 CLK Colwick DON Doncaster  
09/12/1945 Reallocation 3479 CLK Colwick DON Doncaster  
09/12/1945 Reallocation 3483 CLK Colwick DON Doncaster  
09/12/1945 Reallocation 3834 CLK Colwick DON Doncaster  
09/12/1945 Reallocation 3855 CLK Colwick DON Doncaster  
11/12/1945 Reallocation 3501 NWE New England DON Doncaster  
11/12/1945 Reallocation 3833 NWE New England DON Doncaster  
11/12/1945 Reallocation 3845 NWE New England DON Doncaster  
18/12/1945 Reallocation 3856 NWE New England DON Doncaster  
18/12/1945 Reallocation 3857 NWE New England DON Doncaster  
28/12/1945 Reallocation 3846 NWE New England DON Doncaster  
20/10/1946 Reallocation 3967 CLK Colwick LNG Langwith Junction  
20/10/1946 Reallocation 3969 CLK Colwick LNG Langwith Junction  
20/10/1946 Reallocation 3970 CLK Colwick LNG Langwith Junction  
20/10/1946 Reallocation 3841 CLK Colwick LNG Langwith Junction  
20/10/1946 Reallocation 3842 CLK Colwick LNG Langwith Junction  
20/10/1946 Reallocation 3973 CLK Colwick LNG Langwith Junction  
20/10/1946 Reallocation 3974 CLK Colwick LNG Langwith Junction  
20/10/1946 Reallocation 3848 CLK Colwick LNG Langwith Junction  
20/10/1946 Reallocation 3850 CLK Colwick LNG Langwith Junction  
20/10/1946 Reallocation 3981 CLK Colwick LNG Langwith Junction  
20/10/1946 Reallocation 3983 CLK Colwick LNG Langwith Junction  
27/10/1946 Reallocation 3921 DON Doncaster LNG Langwith Junction  
27/10/1946 Reallocation 3923 DON Doncaster LNG Langwith Junction  
27/10/1946 Reallocation 3924 DON Doncaster LNG Langwith Junction  
27/10/1946 Reallocation 3925 DON Doncaster LNG Langwith Junction  
27/10/1946 Reallocation 3926 DON Doncaster LNG Langwith Junction  
27/10/1946 Reallocation 3927 DON Doncaster LNG Langwith Junction  
27/10/1946 Reallocation 3942 DON Doncaster LNG Langwith Junction  
27/10/1946 Reallocation 3943 DON Doncaster LNG Langwith Junction  
27/10/1946 Reallocation 3946 DON Doncaster LNG Langwith Junction  
27/10/1946 Reallocation 3964 DON Doncaster LNG Langwith Junction  
27/10/1946 Reallocation 3976 DON Doncaster LNG Langwith Junction  
27/10/1946 Reallocation 3854 DON Doncaster LNG Langwith Junction  
27/10/1946 Reallocation 3985 DON Doncaster LNG Langwith Junction  
27/10/1946 Reallocation 3856 DON Doncaster LNG Langwith Junction  
27/10/1946 Reallocation 3987 DON Doncaster LNG Langwith Junction  
28/10/1946 Reallocation 3836 CLK Colwick LNG Langwith Junction  
24/11/1946 Reallocation 3928 DON Doncaster LNG Langwith Junction  
15/12/1946 Reallocation 3945 DON Doncaster LNG Langwith Junction  
09/02/1947 Reallocation 3934 GRA Grantham FRO Frodingham  
09/02/1947 Reallocation 3937 GRA Grantham FRO Frodingham  
09/02/1947 Reallocation 3939 GRA Grantham FRO Frodingham  
09/02/1947 Reallocation 3941 GRA Grantham FRO Frodingham  
05/10/1947 Reallocation 3965 CLK Colwick LNG Langwith Junction  
05/10/1947 Reallocation 3968 CLK Colwick LNG Langwith Junction  
05/10/1947 Reallocation 3979 CLK Colwick LNG Langwith Junction  
05/10/1947 Reallocation 3982 CLK Colwick LNG Langwith Junction  
20/10/1947 Reallocation 3922 DON Doncaster FRO Frodingham  
20/10/1947 Reallocation 3944 DON Doncaster FRO Frodingham  
20/10/1947 Reallocation 3963 DON Doncaster FRO Frodingham  
20/10/1947 Reallocation 3975 DON Doncaster FRO Frodingham  
20/02/1948 Reallocation 3970 LNG Langwith Junction ANN Annesley  
20/02/1948 Reallocation 3987 LNG Langwith Junction ANN Annesley  
21/02/1948 Reallocation 3970 ANN Annesley ANN Annesley  
21/02/1948 Reallocation 3987 ANN Annesley ANN Annesley  
07/03/1948 Reallocation 3970 ANN Annesley LNG Langwith Junction  
07/03/1948 Reallocation 3987 ANN Annesley LNG Langwith Junction  
13/03/1948 Reallocation 3970 LNG Langwith Junction LNG Langwith Junction  
13/03/1948 Reallocation 3987 LNG Langwith Junction LNG Langwith Junction  
21/05/1948 Condemned 63921 LNG Langwith Junction   COND  
21/05/1949 Reallocation 63960 MAR March GRA Grantham  
07/02/1950 Reallocation 63987 LNG Langwith Junction 36B Mexborough  
12/03/1950 Reallocation 63941 FRO Frodingham 40E Langwith Junction  
12/03/1950 Reallocation 63975 FRO Frodingham 40E Langwith Junction  
18/03/1950 Reallocation 63941 40E Langwith Junction 40E Langwith Junction  
18/03/1950 Reallocation 63975 40E Langwith Junction 40E Langwith Junction  
14/05/1950 Reallocation 63948 MAR March 35B Grantham  
14/05/1950 Reallocation 63950 MAR March 35B Grantham  
21/05/1950 Reallocation 63951 MAR March 36A Doncaster  
21/05/1950 Reallocation 63952 MAR March 36A Doncaster  
21/05/1950 Reallocation 63953 MAR March 36A Doncaster  
21/05/1950 Reallocation 63954 MAR March 36A Doncaster  
21/05/1950 Reallocation 63955 MAR March 36A Doncaster  
21/05/1950 Reallocation 63956 MAR March 36A Doncaster  
21/05/1950 Reallocation 63957 MAR March 36A Doncaster  
04/06/1950 Reallocation 63949 MAR March 35B Grantham  
18/06/1950 Reallocation 63923 LNG Langwith Junction 35B Grantham  
18/06/1950 Reallocation 63924 LNG Langwith Junction 36B Mexborough  
18/06/1950 Reallocation 63965 LNG Langwith Junction 35B Grantham  
18/06/1950 Reallocation 63966 LNG Langwith Junction 35B Grantham  
18/06/1950 Reallocation 63974 LNG Langwith Junction 36B Mexborough  
25/06/1950 Reallocation 63925 LNG Langwith Junction 36A Doncaster  
25/06/1950 Reallocation 63926 LNG Langwith Junction 36A Doncaster  
25/06/1950 Reallocation 63928 LNG Langwith Junction 36A Doncaster  
25/06/1950 Reallocation 63941 40E Langwith Junction 36A Doncaster  
25/06/1950 Reallocation 63942 LNG Langwith Junction 36A Doncaster  
25/06/1950 Reallocation 63943 LNG Langwith Junction 36A Doncaster  
25/06/1950 Reallocation 63945 LNG Langwith Junction 36A Doncaster  
25/06/1950 Reallocation 63946 LNG Langwith Junction 36A Doncaster  
25/06/1950 Reallocation 63947 MAR March 36A Doncaster  
25/06/1950 Reallocation 63958 MAR March 36A Doncaster  
25/06/1950 Reallocation 63959 MAR March 36A Doncaster  
25/06/1950 Reallocation 63961 MAR March 36A Doncaster  
25/06/1950 Reallocation 63962 MAR March 36A Doncaster  
25/06/1950 Reallocation 63964 LNG Langwith Junction 36A Doncaster  
25/06/1950 Reallocation 63967 LNG Langwith Junction 36A Doncaster  
25/06/1950 Reallocation 63968 LNG Langwith Junction 36A Doncaster  
30/06/1950 Reallocation 63923 35B Grantham 35B Grantham  
30/06/1950 Reallocation 63924 36B Mexborough 36B Mexborough  
30/06/1950 Reallocation 63925 36A Doncaster 36A Doncaster  
30/06/1950 Reallocation 63926 36A Doncaster 36A Doncaster  
30/06/1950 Reallocation 63928 36A Doncaster 36A Doncaster  
30/06/1950 Reallocation 63941 36A Doncaster 36A Doncaster  
30/06/1950 Reallocation 63942 36A Doncaster 36A Doncaster  
30/06/1950 Reallocation 63943 36A Doncaster 36A Doncaster  
30/06/1950 Reallocation 63945 36A Doncaster 36A Doncaster  
30/06/1950 Reallocation 63946 36A Doncaster 36A Doncaster  
30/06/1950 Reallocation 63947 36A Doncaster 36A Doncaster  
30/06/1950 Reallocation 63949 35B Grantham 35B Grantham  
30/06/1950 Reallocation 63958 36A Doncaster 36A Doncaster  
30/06/1950 Reallocation 63959 36A Doncaster 36A Doncaster  
30/06/1950 Reallocation 63961 36A Doncaster 36A Doncaster  
30/06/1950 Reallocation 63962 36A Doncaster 36A Doncaster  
30/06/1950 Reallocation 63964 36A Doncaster 36A Doncaster  
30/06/1950 Reallocation 63965 35B Grantham 35B Grantham  
30/06/1950 Reallocation 63966 35B Grantham 35B Grantham  
30/06/1950 Reallocation 63967 36A Doncaster 36A Doncaster  
30/06/1950 Reallocation 63968 36A Doncaster 36A Doncaster  
30/06/1950 Reallocation 63974 36B Mexborough 36B Mexborough  
02/07/1950 Reallocation 63927 LNG Langwith Junction 36B Mexborough  
02/07/1950 Reallocation 63969 LNG Langwith Junction 36B Mexborough  
02/07/1950 Reallocation 63970 LNG Langwith Junction 36B Mexborough  
02/07/1950 Reallocation 63971 LNG Langwith Junction 36B Mexborough  
02/07/1950 Reallocation 63972 LNG Langwith Junction 36B Mexborough  
02/07/1950 Reallocation 63973 LNG Langwith Junction 36B Mexborough  
02/07/1950 Reallocation 63975 40E Langwith Junction 36B Mexborough  
02/07/1950 Reallocation 63977 DON Doncaster 36B Mexborough  
02/07/1950 Reallocation 63978 LNG Langwith Junction 36B Mexborough  
02/07/1950 Reallocation 63979 LNG Langwith Junction 36B Mexborough  
02/07/1950 Reallocation 63980 LNG Langwith Junction 36B Mexborough  
02/07/1950 Reallocation 63981 LNG Langwith Junction 36B Mexborough  
02/07/1950 Reallocation 63982 LNG Langwith Junction 36B Mexborough  
02/07/1950 Reallocation 63983 LNG Langwith Junction 36B Mexborough  
02/07/1950 Reallocation 63984 LNG Langwith Junction 36B Mexborough  
02/07/1950 Reallocation 63985 LNG Langwith Junction 36B Mexborough  
02/07/1950 Reallocation 63986 LNG Langwith Junction 36B Mexborough  
02/07/1950 Reallocation 63987 36B Mexborough 36B Mexborough  
09/07/1950 Reallocation 63933 GRA Grantham 35A New England  
09/07/1950 Reallocation 63948 35B Grantham 35A New England  
16/07/1950 Reallocation 63976 LNG Langwith Junction 36B Mexborough  
20/08/1950 Reallocation 63923 35B Grantham 35A New England  
20/08/1950 Reallocation 63935 GRA Grantham 35A New England  
27/08/1950 Reallocation 63973 36B Mexborough 36A Doncaster  
27/08/1950 Reallocation 63974 36B Mexborough 36A Doncaster  
27/08/1950 Reallocation 63986 36B Mexborough 36A Doncaster  
27/08/1950 Reallocation 63987 36B Mexborough 36A Doncaster  
29/10/1950 Reallocation 63933 35A New England 35B Grantham  
29/10/1950 Reallocation 63935 35A New England 35B Grantham  
14/01/1951 Reallocation 63948 35A New England 35B Grantham  
31/01/1951 Reallocation 63948 35B Grantham 35B Grantham  
25/02/1951 Reallocation 63927 36B Mexborough 36A Doncaster  
25/02/1951 Reallocation 63980 36B Mexborough 36A Doncaster  
11/03/1951 Reallocation 63923 35A New England 35B Grantham  
18/03/1951 Reallocation 63969 36B Mexborough 36A Doncaster  
18/03/1951 Reallocation 63971 36B Mexborough 36A Doncaster  
18/03/1951 Reallocation 63975 36B Mexborough 36A Doncaster  
18/03/1951 Reallocation 63978 36B Mexborough 36A Doncaster  
18/03/1951 Reallocation 63979 36B Mexborough 36A Doncaster  
31/03/1951 Reallocation 63923 35B Grantham 35B Grantham  
31/03/1951 Reallocation 63969 36A Doncaster 36A Doncaster  
31/03/1951 Reallocation 63971 36A Doncaster 36A Doncaster  
31/03/1951 Reallocation 63975 36A Doncaster 36A Doncaster  
31/03/1951 Reallocation 63977 36B Mexborough 36A Doncaster  
31/03/1951 Reallocation 63978 36A Doncaster 36A Doncaster  
31/03/1951 Reallocation 63979 36A Doncaster 36A Doncaster  
05/08/1951 Reallocation 63970 36B Mexborough 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)  
05/08/1951 Reallocation 63972 36B Mexborough 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)  
05/08/1951 Reallocation 63982 36B Mexborough 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)  
11/08/1951 Reallocation 63970 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)  
11/08/1951 Reallocation 63972 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)  
11/08/1951 Reallocation 63976 36B Mexborough 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)  
11/08/1951 Reallocation 63982 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)  
16/09/1951 Reallocation 63933 35B Grantham 35A New England  
16/09/1951 Reallocation 63949 35B Grantham 35A New England  
16/09/1951 Reallocation 63950 35B Grantham 35A New England  
22/09/1951 Reallocation 63933 35A New England 35A New England  
22/09/1951 Reallocation 63949 35A New England 35A New England  
22/09/1951 Reallocation 63950 35A New England 35A New England  
28/10/1951 Reallocation 63933 35A New England 35B Grantham  
28/10/1951 Reallocation 63935 35B Grantham 36B Mexborough  
28/10/1951 Reallocation 63949 35A New England 36B Mexborough  
28/10/1951 Reallocation 63950 35A New England 35B Grantham  
28/10/1951 Reallocation 63965 35B Grantham 36B Mexborough  
03/11/1951 Reallocation 63933 35B Grantham 35B Grantham  
03/11/1951 Reallocation 63935 36B Mexborough 36B Mexborough  
03/11/1951 Reallocation 63949 36B Mexborough 36B Mexborough  
03/11/1951 Reallocation 63950 35B Grantham 35B Grantham  
03/11/1951 Reallocation 63965 36B Mexborough 36B Mexborough  
03/02/1952 Reallocation 63925 36A Doncaster 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)  
03/02/1952 Reallocation 63926 36A Doncaster 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)  
17/02/1952 Reallocation 63927 36A Doncaster 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)  
17/02/1952 Reallocation 63965 36B Mexborough 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)  
23/02/1952 Reallocation 63925 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)  
23/02/1952 Reallocation 63926 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)  
23/02/1952 Reallocation 63927 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)  
23/02/1952 Reallocation 63965 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)  
17/08/1952 Reallocation 63949 36B Mexborough 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)  
17/08/1952 Reallocation 63979 36A Doncaster 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)  
17/08/1952 Reallocation 63980 36A Doncaster 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)  
17/08/1952 Reallocation 63983 36B Mexborough 36C Frodingham  
17/08/1952 Reallocation 63984 36B Mexborough 36C Frodingham  
17/08/1952 Reallocation 63985 36B Mexborough 36C Frodingham  
17/08/1952 Reallocation 63986 36A Doncaster 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)  
17/08/1952 Reallocation 63987 36A Doncaster 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)  
06/09/1952 Reallocation 63949 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)  
06/09/1952 Reallocation 63979 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)  
06/09/1952 Reallocation 63980 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)  
06/09/1952 Reallocation 63983 36C Frodingham 36C Frodingham  
06/09/1952 Reallocation 63984 36C Frodingham 36C Frodingham  
06/09/1952 Reallocation 63985 36C Frodingham 36C Frodingham  
06/09/1952 Reallocation 63986 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)  
06/09/1952 Reallocation 63987 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)  
14/09/1952 Reallocation 63924 36B Mexborough 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)  
14/09/1952 Reallocation 63981 36B Mexborough 36A Doncaster  
04/10/1952 Reallocation 63924 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)  
04/10/1952 Reallocation 63981 36A Doncaster 36A Doncaster  
16/11/1952 Reallocation 63935 36B Mexborough 36A Doncaster  
29/11/1952 Reallocation 63935 36A Doncaster 36A Doncaster  
05/04/1953 Reallocation 63946 36A Doncaster 35B Grantham  
12/04/1953 Reallocation 63945 36A Doncaster 36C Frodingham  
12/04/1953 Reallocation 63961 36A Doncaster 36C Frodingham  
18/10/1953 Reallocation 63937 FRO Frodingham 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)  
03/01/1954 Reallocation 63945 36C Frodingham 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)  
03/01/1954 Reallocation 63961 36C Frodingham 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)  
13/06/1954 Reallocation 63922 FRO Frodingham 36A Doncaster  
13/06/1954 Reallocation 63934 FRO Frodingham 36A Doncaster  
13/06/1954 Reallocation 63944 FRO Frodingham 36A Doncaster  
13/06/1954 Reallocation 63963 FRO Frodingham 36A Doncaster  
13/06/1954 Reallocation 63983 36C Frodingham 36A Doncaster  
13/06/1954 Reallocation 63985 36C Frodingham 36A Doncaster  
29/08/1954 Reallocation 63939 FRO Frodingham 36A Doncaster  
29/08/1954 Reallocation 63984 36C Frodingham 36A Doncaster  
10/02/1957 Reallocation 63944 36A Doncaster 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)  
05/08/1957 Reallocation 63976 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)  
23/02/1958 Reallocation 63947 36A Doncaster 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)  
23/02/1958 Reallocation 63959 36A Doncaster 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)  
27/04/1958 Reallocation 63971 36A Doncaster 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)  
14/06/1959 Reallocation 63957 36A Doncaster 34F Grantham  
14/06/1959 Reallocation 63963 36A Doncaster 34F Grantham  
31/01/1960 Reallocation 63939 36A Doncaster 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)  
31/01/1960 Reallocation 63942 36A Doncaster 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)  
31/01/1960 Reallocation 63954 36A Doncaster 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)  
31/01/1960 Reallocation 63964 36A Doncaster 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)  
31/01/1960 Reallocation 63969 36A Doncaster 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)  
09/05/1960 Condemned 63970 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)   COND  
16/10/1960 Reallocation 63934 36A Doncaster 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)  
16/10/1960 Reallocation 63951 36A Doncaster 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)  
16/10/1960 Reallocation 63955 36A Doncaster 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)  
16/10/1960 Reallocation 63973 36A Doncaster 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)  
16/10/1960 Reallocation 63975 36A Doncaster 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)  
16/10/1960 Reallocation 63983 36A Doncaster 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)  
19/10/1960 Condemned 63959 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)   COND  
08/11/1960 Condemned 63950 35B Grantham   COND  
08/11/1960 Condemned 63953 36A Doncaster   COND  
20/11/1960 Reallocation 63982 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 34F Grantham  
27/11/1960 Reallocation 63943 36A Doncaster 34F Grantham  
27/11/1960 Reallocation 63956 36A Doncaster 34F Grantham  
14/03/1961 Condemned 63954 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)   COND  
03/04/1961 Condemned 63944 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)   COND  
27/04/1961 Condemned 63952 36A Doncaster   COND  
28/04/1961 Condemned 63947 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)   COND  
04/05/1961 Condemned 63958 36A Doncaster   COND  
11/06/1961 Reallocation 63936 GRA Grantham 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)  
11/06/1961 Reallocation 63943 34F Grantham 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)  
11/06/1961 Reallocation 63966 35B Grantham 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)  
04/07/1961 Condemned 63957 34F Grantham   COND  
16/07/1961 Reallocation 63943 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 34F Grantham  
16/07/1961 Reallocation 63946 35B Grantham 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)  
26/11/1961 Reallocation 63928 36A Doncaster 34F Grantham  
26/11/1961 Reallocation 63941 36A Doncaster 34F Grantham  
26/11/1961 Reallocation 63942 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 34F Grantham  
26/11/1961 Reallocation 63949 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 34F Grantham  
07/05/1962 Condemned 63955 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)   COND  
25/06/1962 Condemned 63951 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)   COND  
09/07/1962 Condemned 63929 GRA Grantham   COND  
16/07/1962 Condemned 63934 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)   COND  
29/07/1962 Reallocation 63922 36A Doncaster 34F Grantham  
10/09/1962 Condemned 63979 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)   COND  
16/09/1962 Reallocation 63962 36A Doncaster 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)  
16/09/1962 Reallocation 63978 36A Doncaster 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)  
16/09/1962 Reallocation 63984 36A Doncaster 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)  
16/09/1962 Reallocation 63985 36A Doncaster 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)  
10/10/1962 Condemned 63965 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)   COND  
16/10/1962 Condemned 63948 35B Grantham   COND  
28/10/1962 Reallocation 63974 36A Doncaster 34F Grantham  
28/10/1962 Reallocation 63981 36A Doncaster 34F Grantham  
05/11/1962 Condemned 63922 34F Grantham   COND  
26/11/1962 Condemned 63967 36A Doncaster   COND  
09/12/1962 Reallocation 63968 36A Doncaster 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)  
09/12/1962 Condemned 63982 34F Grantham   COND  
29/12/1962 Condemned 63923 35B Grantham   COND  
29/12/1962 Condemned 63930 GRA Grantham   COND  
29/12/1962 Condemned 63933 35B Grantham   COND  
29/12/1962 Condemned 63961 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)   COND  
29/12/1962 Condemned 63966 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)   COND  
29/12/1962 Condemned 63971 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)   COND  
30/12/1962 Reallocation 63935 36A Doncaster 34F Grantham  
30/12/1962 Reallocation 63962 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 34F Grantham  
30/12/1962 Reallocation 63968 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 34F Grantham  
30/12/1962 Reallocation 63984 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 34F Grantham  
30/12/1962 Reallocation 63985 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 34F Grantham  
30/12/1962 Reallocation 63987 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 34F Grantham  
07/04/1963 Condemned 63946 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)   COND  
04/05/1963 Condemned 63972 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)   COND  
07/05/1963 Condemned 63978 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)   COND  
07/06/1963 Condemned 63986 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)   COND  
02/07/1963 Condemned 63983 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)   COND  
03/09/1963 Condemned 63941 34F Grantham   COND  
08/09/1963 Condemned 63925 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)   COND  
08/09/1963 Condemned 63928 34F Grantham   COND  
08/09/1963 Reallocation 63931 GRA Grantham 36A Doncaster  
08/09/1963 Reallocation 63932 GRA Grantham 36A Doncaster  
08/09/1963 Condemned 63935 34F Grantham   COND  
08/09/1963 Condemned 63937 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)   COND  
08/09/1963 Condemned 63938 GRA Grantham   COND  
08/09/1963 Reallocation 63940 GRA Grantham 36A Doncaster  
08/09/1963 Condemned 63942 34F Grantham   COND  
08/09/1963 Reallocation 63943 34F Grantham 36A Doncaster  
08/09/1963 Condemned 63949 34F Grantham   COND  
08/09/1963 Condemned 63956 34F Grantham   COND  
08/09/1963 Condemned 63960 GRA Grantham   COND  
08/09/1963 Reallocation 63962 34F Grantham 36A Doncaster  
08/09/1963 Condemned 63963 34F Grantham   COND  
08/09/1963 Reallocation 63968 34F Grantham 36A Doncaster  
08/09/1963 Reallocation 63974 34F Grantham 36A Doncaster  
08/09/1963 Reallocation 63981 34F Grantham 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)  
08/09/1963 Reallocation 63984 34F Grantham 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)  
08/09/1963 Reallocation 63985 34F Grantham 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)  
08/09/1963 Reallocation 63987 34F Grantham 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)  
22/09/1963 Condemned 63926 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)   COND  
22/09/1963 Condemned 63927 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)   COND  
22/09/1963 Condemned 63931 36A Doncaster   COND  
22/09/1963 Condemned 63932 36A Doncaster   COND  
22/09/1963 Condemned 63936 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)   COND  
22/09/1963 Condemned 63939 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)   COND  
22/09/1963 Condemned 63940 36A Doncaster   COND  
22/09/1963 Condemned 63943 36A Doncaster   COND  
22/09/1963 Condemned 63945 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)   COND  
22/09/1963 Condemned 63962 36A Doncaster   COND  
22/09/1963 Condemned 63964 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)   COND  
22/09/1963 Condemned 63968 36A Doncaster   COND  
22/09/1963 Condemned 63973 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)   COND  
22/09/1963 Condemned 63974 36A Doncaster   COND  
22/09/1963 Condemned 63976 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)   COND  
22/09/1963 Condemned 63977 36A Doncaster   COND  
22/09/1963 Condemned 63980 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)   COND  
22/09/1963 Condemned 63985 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)   COND  
22/09/1963 Condemned 63987 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)   COND  
03/11/1963 Condemned 63924 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)   COND  
03/11/1963 Condemned 63969 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)   COND  
03/11/1963 Condemned 63975 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)   COND  
03/11/1963 Condemned 63981 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)   COND  
03/11/1963 Condemned 63984 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)   COND