Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 431 Today
» 872 Yesterday
» 5418 Week
» 13533 Month
» 140976 Year
» 1806352 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

GNR/LNER Gresley "O2" Class 2-8-0


GNR LNER (1924 Tmp) LNER (1924) LNER (1946) BR (BR Tmp) BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
477 3477 3922 63922 04/1921 New England 05/11/1962 Grantham 41.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 11/1962 41.61
478 3478 3923 63923 04/1921 New England 29/12/1962 Grantham 41.67 Cut Central Wagon Co. (Wigan) 12/1963 42.70
480 480N 3480 3925 63925 06/1921 New England 08/09/1963 Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 42.25 Cut Rigleys (Bulwell Forest) 02/1964 42.70
481 481N 3481 3926 63926 06/1921 New England 22/09/1963 Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 42.25 Cut Rigleys (Bulwell Forest) 02/1964 42.70
482 3482 3927 63927 06/1921 New England 22/09/1963 Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 42.25 Cut Rigleys (Bulwell Forest) 02/1964 42.70
483 483N 3483 3928 63928 07/1921 New England 08/09/1963 Grantham 42.17 Cut Rigleys (Bulwell Forest) 02/1964 42.62
484 484N 3484 3929 63929 07/1921 New England 09/07/1962 Grantham 41 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 07/1962 41.03
485 485N 3485 3930 63930 07/1921 New England 29/12/1962 Grantham 41.42 Cut Central Wagon Co. (Wigan) 12/1963 42.45
486 486N 3486 3931 63931 07/1921 New England 22/09/1963 Doncaster 42.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 10/1963 42.28