Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 410 Today
» 872 Yesterday
» 5397 Week
» 13512 Month
» 140955 Year
» 1806331 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

GNR/LNER Gresley "O2" Class 2-8-0


GNR LNER (1924 Tmp) LNER (1924) LNER (1946) BR (BR Tmp) BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
479 3479 3924 63924 06/1921 New England 03/11/1963 Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 42.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/1964 42.61
480 480N 3480 3925 63925 06/1921 New England 08/09/1963 Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 42.25 Cut Rigleys (Bulwell Forest) 02/1964 42.70
481 481N 3481 3926 63926 06/1921 New England 22/09/1963 Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 42.25 Cut Rigleys (Bulwell Forest) 02/1964 42.70
483 483N 3483 3928 63928 07/1921 New England 08/09/1963 Grantham 42.17 Cut Rigleys (Bulwell Forest) 02/1964 42.62
484 484N 3484 3929 63929 07/1921 New England 09/07/1962 Grantham 41 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 07/1962 41.03
485 485N 3485 3930 63930 07/1921 New England 29/12/1962 Grantham 41.42 Cut Central Wagon Co. (Wigan) 12/1963 42.45
486 486N 3486 3931 63931 07/1921 New England 22/09/1963 Doncaster 42.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 10/1963 42.28
487N 3487 3932 63932 01/11/1923 New England 22/09/1963 Doncaster 39.83 Cut Rigleys (Bulwell Forest) 02/1964 40.32
488N 3488 3933 63933 03/11/1923 New England 29/12/1962 Grantham 39.08 Cut Central Wagon Co. (Wigan) 12/1963 40.14
490N 3490 3935 63935 30/11/1923 New England 08/09/1963 Grantham 39.83 Cut Rigleys (Bulwell Forest) 02/1964 40.24
493N 3493 3938 63938 22/12/1923 New England 08/09/1963 Grantham 39.75 Cut Rigleys (Bulwell Forest) 02/1964 40.18
500 3945 63945 22/05/1924 New England 22/09/1963 Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 39.33 Cut Rigleys (Bulwell Forest) 01/1964 39.68
2954 3947 63947 23/04/1932 March 28/04/1961 Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 29 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 05/1961 29.08
2955 3948 63948 19/05/1932 March 16/10/1962 Grantham 30.42 Cut Central Wagon Co. (Wigan) 12/1963 31.59
2956 3949 63949 28/05/1932 March 08/09/1963 Grantham 31.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 10/1963 31.40
2957 3950 63950 23/06/1932 March 08/11/1960 Grantham 28.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 12/1960 28.50
2958 3951 63951 07/07/1932 March 25/06/1962 Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 29.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 07/1962 30.04
2959 3952 63952 11/07/1932 March 27/04/1961 Doncaster 28.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 05/1961 28.86
2960 3953 63953 29/07/1932 March 08/11/1960 Doncaster 28.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 12/1960 28.40
2961 3954 63954 17/08/1932 March 14/03/1961 Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 28.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 04/1961 28.68
2430 3955 63955 29/11/1933 March 07/05/1962 Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 28.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 05/1962 28.48
2431 3956 63956 08/12/1933 March 08/09/1963 Grantham 29.75 Cut Rigleys (Bulwell Forest) 09/1964 30.79
2432 3957 63957 15/12/1933 March 04/07/1961 Grantham 27.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 07/1961 27.60
2433 3958 63958 28/12/1933 March 04/05/1961 Doncaster 27.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 06/1961 27.48
2434 3959 63959 20/01/1934 March 19/10/1960 Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 26.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 12/1960 26.92
2435 3960 63960 27/01/1934 March 08/09/1963 Grantham 29.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 10/1963 29.73
2436 3961 63961 20/02/1934 March 29/12/1962 Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 28.83 Cut Central Wagon Co. (Wigan) 09/1963 29.59
2437 3962 63962 15/03/1934 March 22/09/1963 Doncaster 29.5 Cut Rigleys (Bulwell Forest) 03/1964 30.02
3833 3963 63963 22/05/1942 Doncaster 08/09/1963 Grantham 21.33 Cut 10/1963 21.41
3834 3964 63964 10/06/1942 Doncaster 22/09/1963 Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 21.25 Cut Rigleys (Bulwell Forest) 03/1964 21.78
3835 3965 63965 26/06/1942 Doncaster 10/10/1962 Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 20.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 11/1962 20.40
3836 3966 63966 31/07/1942 Doncaster 29/12/1962 Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 20.42 Cut Central Wagon Co. (Wigan) 03/1964 21.64
3837 3967 63967 21/08/1942 Doncaster 26/11/1962 Doncaster 20.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 12/1962 20.33
3838 3968 63968 02/09/1942 Doncaster 22/09/1963 Doncaster 21 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 10/1963 21.13
3839 3969 63969 12/09/1942 Doncaster 03/11/1963 Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 21.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/1964 21.36
3840 3970 E3970 63970 21/09/1942 Doncaster 09/05/1960 Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 17.67 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 06/1960 17.75
3841 3971 63971 05/10/1942 Doncaster 29/12/1962 Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 20.17 Cut Central Wagon Co. (Wigan) 09/1963 20.96
3842 3972 63972 10/10/1942 Doncaster 04/05/1963 Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 20.58 Cut Rigleys (Bulwell Forest) 01/1964 21.28
3843 3973 63973 23/10/1942 Doncaster 22/09/1963 Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 20.92 Cut Rigleys (Bulwell Forest) 02/1964 21.33
3844 3974 63974 03/11/1942 Doncaster 22/09/1963 Doncaster 20.83 Cut Rigleys (Bulwell Forest) 03/1964 21.38
3845 3975 63975 06/11/1942 Doncaster 03/11/1963 Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 21 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/1964 21.21
3846 3976 63976 18/11/1942 Doncaster 22/09/1963 Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 20.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 10/1963 20.92
3847 3977 63977 21/11/1942 Doncaster 22/09/1963 Doncaster 20.83 Cut Rigleys (Bulwell Forest) 02/1964 21.25
3848 3978 63978 28/11/1942 Doncaster 07/05/1963 Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 20.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 09/1963 20.81
3849 3979 E3979 63979 04/12/1942 Doncaster 10/09/1962 Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 19.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 11/1962 19.96
3850 3980 63980 11/12/1942 Doncaster 22/09/1963 Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 20.75 Cut Rigleys (Bulwell Forest) 02/1964 21.19
3851 3981 63981 17/12/1942 Doncaster 03/11/1963 Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 20.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/1964 21.09
3852 3982 63982 21/12/1942 Doncaster 09/12/1962 Grantham 20 Cut Larkinson F C (Grantham) 04/1963 20.33
3853 3983 63983 26/12/1942 Doncaster 02/07/1963 Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 20.58 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 08/1963 20.65
3854 3984 63984 31/12/1942 Doncaster 03/11/1963 Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 20.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 01/1964 21.05
3855 3985 63985 02/01/1943 Doncaster 22/09/1963 Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 20.67 Cut Rigleys (Bulwell Forest) 02/1964 21.13
3856 3986 63986 07/01/1943 Doncaster 07/06/1963 Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 20.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Doncaster) 08/1963 20.62
3857 3987 63987 21/01/1943 Doncaster 22/09/1963 Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 20.67 Cut Rigleys (Bulwell Forest) 03/1964 21.16