GNR/LNER Gresley "O2" Class 2-8-0
GNR | LNER (1924 Tmp) | LNER (1924) | LNER (1946) | BR (BR Tmp) | BR | Date To Service | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
479 | 3479 | 3924 | 63924 | 06/1921 | New England | 03/11/1963 | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | 42.42 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 01/1964 | 42.61 | ||
487N | 3487 | 3932 | 63932 | 01/11/1923 | New England | 22/09/1963 | Doncaster | 39.83 | Cut | Rigleys (Bulwell Forest) | 02/1964 | 40.32 | ||
2954 | 3947 | 63947 | 23/04/1932 | March | 28/04/1961 | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | 29 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 05/1961 | 29.08 | |||
2957 | 3950 | 63950 | 23/06/1932 | March | 08/11/1960 | Grantham | 28.42 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Doncaster) | 12/1960 | 28.50 | |||
2437 | 3962 | 63962 | 15/03/1934 | March | 22/09/1963 | Doncaster | 29.5 | Cut | Rigleys (Bulwell Forest) | 03/1964 | 30.02 |