Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 5194 Today
» 4689 Yesterday
» 20806 Week
» 119451 Month
» 322115 Year
» 3348968 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
GNR/LNER Gresley "O2" Class 2-8-0
Class |
GNR |
LNER (1924 Tmp) |
LNER (1924) |
LNER (1946) |
BR |
BR (BR Tmp) |
Built |
Date Withdrawn |
Modification |
Modification Date |
O2 |
|
|
3499
|
3944
|
63944
|
|
26/04/1924 |
03/04/1961 |
Gresham Feed Water Heater removed |
16/10/1937 |
O2 |
|
|
500
|
3945
|
63945
|
|
22/05/1924 |
22/09/1963 |
Dabeg Feed Water Heater removed |
05/12/1942 |