Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 693 Today
» 5153 Yesterday
» 5846 Week
» 99080 Month
» 559021 Year
» 4998458 Total
|
Record: 12282 (30/03/2025)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
GNR/LNER Gresley "O3" Class 2-8-0
Class |
GNR |
LNER (1924) |
LNER (1946) |
LNER (1924 Tmp) |
BR |
BR (BR Tmp) |
Built |
Date Withdrawn |
Modification |
Modification Date |
O3 |
464
|
3464
|
3482
|
|
63482
|
|
05/1919 |
21/01/1952 |
Gresham Feed Water Heater removed |
07/04/1931 |
O3 |
473
|
3473
|
3491
|
|
63491
|
|
10/1919 |
18/12/1950 |
Gresham Feed Water Heater removed |
30/04/1932 |
O3 |
474
|
3474
|
3492
|
|
|
|
10/1919 |
10/05/1947 |
Gresham Feed Water Heater removed |
22/01/1931 |
O3 |
476
|
3476
|
3494
|
|
(63494)
|
|
10/1919 |
05/03/1948 |
Gresham Feed Water Heater removed |
25/06/1932 |