GCR/LNER Robinson "O4" Class 2-8-0
Date | Number (at time) | Depot (at time) | Code | Details | Ref | Link |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sun 15/08/1954 | 63598, 63643, 63643, 63656, 63684, 63687, 63695, 63697, 63697, 63702, 63719, 63722, 63746, 63756, 63761, 63761, 63877, 63877, 63887 |
39A, 40E, 40E, 36D, 38A, 38B, 39B, 36D, 36D, 38D, 39A, 39A, 38B, 38A, 36C, 36C, 38A, 38A, 38B |
Gorton Works visit: Around the works. Gorton Works visit: Around the works. Gorton Works visit: Around the works. Gorton Works visit: Around the works. - Awaiting works. Gorton Works visit: Around the works. - Awaiting works. Gorton Works visit: Around the works. Gorton Works visit: Around the works. - Awaiting works. Gorton Works visit: Around the works. Gorton Works visit: Around the works. Gorton Works visit: Around the works. Gorton Works visit: Around the works. - Awaiting works. Gorton Works visit: Around the works. Gorton Works visit: Around the works. Gorton Works visit: Around the works. - Awaiting works. Gorton Works visit: Around the works. - Awaiting works. Gorton Works visit: Around the works. - Awaiting works. Gorton Works visit: Around the works. Gorton Works visit: Around the works. Gorton Works visit: Around the works. - Awaiting works. |
RO 9/1954 | ||
Sun 26/02/1961 | 63571, 63630, 63652, 63652, 63858, 63858, 63872 |
41H, 41H, 41H, 41H, 36A, 36A, 31B |
Doncaster Works visit.: Around the works. - Paint shop. Doncaster Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop. Doncaster Works visit.: Around the works. - Outside stripping shop. Doncaster Works visit.: Around the works. - Outside stripping shop. Doncaster Works visit.: Around the works. - Works shunter. Doncaster Works visit.: Around the works. - Works shunter. Doncaster Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop. |
|||
Sun 18/03/1962 | 63612, 63612, 63689, 63704, 63704, 63704, 63720, 63720, 63730, 63730, 63762, 63764, 63775, 63775, 63781, 63781 |
41H, 41H, 16D, 36E, 36E, 36E, 41J, 41J, 36E, 36E, Wdn, 36E, 9G, 9G, 36C, 36C |
Gorton Works visit.: Around the works. - Outside erecting shop. Gorton Works visit.: Around the works. - Outside erecting shop. Gorton Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop. Gorton Works visit.: Around the works. - Ex-Works on Gorton shed. Gorton Works visit.: Around the works. - Ex-Works on Gorton shed. Gorton Works visit.: Around the works. - Ex-Works on Gorton shed. Gorton Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop. Gorton Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop. Gorton Works visit.: Around the works. - Outside erecting shop. Gorton Works visit.: Around the works. - Outside erecting shop. Gorton Works visit.: Around the works. - Outside erecting shop. Gorton Works visit.: Around the works. - Ex-Works on Gorton shed. Gorton Works visit.: Around the works. - Outside erecting shop. Gorton Works visit.: Around the works. - Outside erecting shop. Gorton Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop. Gorton Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop. |
|||
Sat 26/09/1964 | 63788, 63788, 63788, 63863 |
36C, 36C, 36C, 41H |
Waleswood Junction - This log was recorded on the ex-M.S.&.L. line east of Sheffield.: Passing Waleswood Junction - This log was recorded on the ex-M.S.&.L. line east of Sheffield.: Passing Waleswood Junction - This log was recorded on the ex-M.S.&.L. line east of Sheffield.: Passing Waleswood Junction - This log was recorded on the ex-M.S.&.L. line east of Sheffield.: Passing |
John Thickitt | ||
Sat 26/09/1964 | 63612, 63612 |
41H, 41H |
Waleswood Junction - This log was recorded on the ex-M.S.&.L. line east of Sheffield.: Hauled a Class 8 Up goods. Around midday the engine returned 'light', running onto the branch (Waleswood Curve) for Killamarsh Junction and a destination to the south. During the previous three months I only occasionally saw O4/8s' on the Worksop to Sheffield line, members of the O1 class appeared more regularly here. Waleswood Junction - This log was recorded on the ex-M.S.&.L. line east of Sheffield.: Hauled a Class 8 Up goods. Around midday the engine returned 'light', running onto the branch (Waleswood Curve) for Killamarsh Junction and a destination to the south. During the previous three months I only occasionally saw O4/8s' on the Worksop to Sheffield line, members of the O1 class appeared more regularly here. |
John Thickitt | ||
Sat 26/09/1964 | 63725 | 41H | Waleswood Junction - This log was recorded on the ex-M.S.&.L. line east of Sheffield.: Hauled a class 8 Up goods, a Class 8 | John Thickitt | ||
Sat 24/10/1964 | 63692 | 36E | A visit to Retford (G.N.) shed: On shed - Dead | John Thickitt | ||
Sun 08/11/1964 | 63586, 63628, 63628, 63628, 63653, 63653, 63653, 63671, 63688, 63688, 63728, 63728, 63741, 63741, 63781, 63781, 63788, 63788, 63788, 63793, 63793, 63802, 63802, 63807, 63807, 63813, 63884, 63884, 63884, 63906 |
36C, 36C, 36C, 36C, 36C, 36C, 36C, 36C, 36E, 36E, 36C, 36C, 36C, 36C, 36C, 36C, 36C, 36C, 36C, 36C, 36C, Wdn, Wdn, Wdn, Wdn, 36E, Wdn, Wdn, Wdn, 36C |
A visit to Frodingham shed: On shed A visit to Frodingham shed: On shed A visit to Frodingham shed: On shed A visit to Frodingham shed: On shed A visit to Frodingham shed: On shed A visit to Frodingham shed: On shed A visit to Frodingham shed: On shed A visit to Frodingham shed: On shed A visit to Frodingham shed: On shed A visit to Frodingham shed: On shed A visit to Frodingham shed: On shed A visit to Frodingham shed: On shed A visit to Frodingham shed: On shed A visit to Frodingham shed: On shed A visit to Frodingham shed: On shed A visit to Frodingham shed: On shed A visit to Frodingham shed: On shed A visit to Frodingham shed: On shed A visit to Frodingham shed: On shed A visit to Frodingham shed: On shed A visit to Frodingham shed: On shed A visit to Frodingham shed: On shed A visit to Frodingham shed: On shed A visit to Frodingham shed: On shed A visit to Frodingham shed: On shed A visit to Frodingham shed: On shed A visit to Frodingham shed: On shed A visit to Frodingham shed: On shed A visit to Frodingham shed: On shed A visit to Frodingham shed: On shed |
John Thickitt | ||
Sun 08/11/1964 | 63692, 63702, 63734, 63734, 63738, 63738, 63878, 63878 |
36E, Wdn, 36E, 36E, 36E, 36E, 36E, 36E |
A visit to Retford (G.C.) shed (Thrumpton): Dead on shed | John Thickitt |