GCR/LNER Robinson "O5" Class 2-8-0
Pre Grouping | Big 4 | BR | Build Date | Rebuild | Rebuild Date | Notes |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
412 | 5412 3902 |
63902 | 01/1918 | Rebuilt from O5 to O4 | 01/07/1922 | |
413 | 5413 | 03/1918 | Rebuilt from O5 to O4 | 01/07/1922 | ||
414 | 5414 3904 |
3904 63904 |
04/1918 | Rebuilt from O5 to O4 | 14/11/1936 | |
415 | 5415 3905 |
63905 | 05/1918 | Rebuilt from O5 to O4 | 10/10/1936 | |
417 | 5417 3906 |
3906 63906 |
06/1918 | Rebuilt from O5 to O4 | 20/02/1937 | |
418 | 5418 3907 |
63907 | 08/1918 | Rebuilt from O5 to O4 | 30/01/1936 | |
419 | 5419 3908 |
63908 | 09/1918 | Rebuilt from O5 to O4 | 06/04/1935 | |
420 | 5420 | 04/1919 | Rebuilt from O5 to O4 | 13/09/1941 | ||
421 | 5421 | 07/1919 | Rebuilt from O5 to O4 | 11/10/1941 | ||
422 | 5422 3911 |
63911 | 06/1919 | Rebuilt from O5 to O4 | 23/01/1943 | |
10 | 5010 3912 |
63912 | 08/1919 | Rebuilt from O5 to O4 | 26/07/1941 | |
11 | 5011 3913 |
3913 63913 |
08/1919 | Rebuilt from O5 to O4 | 01/05/1936 | |
12 12 |
5012 5012 3914 3914 |
63914 63914 |
09/1919 | Rebuilt from O5 to O4 | 30/07/1955 | |
13 13 |
5013 5013 3915 3915 |
63915 63915 |
10/1919 | Rebuilt from O5 to O4 | 01/06/1940 | |
14 | 5014 | 11/1920 | Rebuilt from O5 to O4 | 21/01/1933 | ||
15 | 5015 3917 |
63917 | 12/1920 | Rebuilt from O5 to O4 | 29/06/1935 | |
17 | 5017 | 12/1920 | Rebuilt from O5 to O4 | 29/10/1932 | ||
19 | 5019 | 01/1921 | Rebuilt from O5 to O4 | 05/08/1933 | ||
22 | 5022 3920 |
63920 | 02/1921 | Rebuilt from O5 to O4 | 05/10/1935 |