Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 1077 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18880 Week
» 71896 Month
» 191423 Year
» 3218276 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
GCR/LNER Robinson "Q4" Class 0-8-0
Company |
Old Number |
|
Company |
New Number |
Subtype |
|
Date |
Information |
GCR |
962 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5962 |
1924 |
m/e |
02/1924 |
|
GCR |
401 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5401 |
1924 |
|
02/02/1924 |
|
GCR |
1178 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
6178 |
1924 |
|
16/02/1924 |
|
GCR |
62 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5062 |
1924 |
|
16/02/1924 |
|
GCR |
86 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5086 |
1924 |
|
16/02/1924 |
|
GCR |
1180 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
6180 |
1924 |
|
23/02/1924 |
|
GCR |
91 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5091 |
1924 |
|
23/02/1924 |
|
GCR |
1177 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
6177 |
1924 |
|
08/03/1924 |
|
GCR |
1175 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
6175 |
1924 |
|
15/03/1924 |
|
GCR |
1141 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
6141 |
1924 |
|
22/03/1924 |
|
GCR |
152 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5152 |
1924 |
|
22/03/1924 |
|
GCR |
959 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5959 |
1924 |
|
22/03/1924 |
|
GCR |
1074 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
6074 |
1924 |
|
29/03/1924 |
|
GCR |
145 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5145 |
1924 |
|
05/04/1924 |
|
GCR |
161 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5161 |
1924 |
|
05/04/1924 |
|
GCR |
85 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5085 |
1924 |
|
05/04/1924 |
|
GCR |
1053 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
6053 |
1924 |
|
12/04/1924 |
|
GCR |
70 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5070 |
1924 |
|
12/04/1924 |
|
GCR |
1140 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
6140 |
1924 |
|
19/04/1924 |
|
GCR |
1133 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
6133 |
1924 |
|
03/05/1924 |
|
GCR |
1139 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
6139 |
1924 |
|
03/05/1924 |
|
GCR |
1144 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
6144 |
1924 |
|
03/05/1924 |
|
GCR |
1138 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
6138 |
1924 |
|
10/05/1924 |
|
GCR |
162 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5162 |
1924 |
|
10/05/1924 |
|
GCR |
57 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5057 |
1924 |
|
10/05/1924 |
|
GCR |
1137 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
6137 |
1924 |
|
17/05/1924 |
|
GCR |
146 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5146 |
1924 |
|
17/05/1924 |
|
GCR |
1176 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
6176 |
1924 |
|
31/05/1924 |
|
GCR |
1181 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
6181 |
1924 |
|
31/05/1924 |
|
GCR |
67 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5067 |
1924 |
|
07/06/1924 |
|
GCR |
1054 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
6054 |
1924 |
|
14/06/1924 |
|
GCR |
164 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5164 |
1924 |
|
28/06/1924 |
|
GCR |
964 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5964 |
1924 |
|
28/06/1924 |
|
GCR |
1132 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
6132 |
1924 |
|
05/07/1924 |
|
GCR |
163 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5163 |
1924 |
|
12/07/1924 |
|
GCR |
44 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5044 |
1924 |
|
26/07/1924 |
|
GCR |
63 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5063 |
1924 |
|
26/07/1924 |
|
GCR |
39 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5039 |
1924 |
|
23/08/1924 |
|
GCR |
149 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5149 |
1924 |
|
06/09/1924 |
|
GCR |
1134 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
6134 |
1924 |
|
04/10/1924 |
|
GCR |
48 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5048 |
1924 |
|
11/10/1924 |
|
GCR |
356 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5356 |
1924 |
|
18/10/1924 |
|
GCR |
958 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5958 |
1924 |
|
18/10/1924 |
|
GCR |
147 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5147 |
1924 |
|
25/10/1924 |
|
GCR |
1052 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
6052 |
1924 |
|
01/11/1924 |
|
GCR |
160 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5160 |
1924 |
|
01/11/1924 |
|
GCR |
49 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5049 |
1924 |
|
08/11/1924 |
|
GCR |
64 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5064 |
1924 |
|
15/11/1924 |
|
GCR |
65 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5065 |
1924 |
|
22/11/1924 |
|
GCR |
1179 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
6179 |
1924 |
|
03/01/1925 |
|
GCR |
1135 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
6135 |
1924 |
|
31/01/1925 |
|
GCR |
1143 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
6143 |
1924 |
|
14/02/1925 |
|
GCR |
960 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5960 |
1924 |
|
28/02/1925 |
|
GCR |
1142 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
6142 |
1924 |
|
07/03/1925 |
|
GCR |
56 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5056 |
1924 |
|
14/03/1925 |
|
GCR |
1174 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
6174 |
1924 |
|
21/03/1925 |
|
GCR |
87 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5087 |
1924 |
|
28/03/1925 |
|
GCR |
1077 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
6077 |
1924 |
|
18/04/1925 |
|
GCR |
956 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5956 |
1924 |
|
18/04/1925 |
|
GCR |
1136 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
6136 |
1924 |
|
25/04/1925 |
|
GCR |
153 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5153 |
1924 |
|
25/04/1925 |
|
GCR |
957 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5957 |
1924 |
|
02/05/1925 |
|
GCR |
150 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5150 |
1924 |
|
16/05/1925 |
|
GCR |
59 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5059 |
1924 |
|
23/05/1925 |
|
GCR |
142 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5142 |
1924 |
|
27/06/1925 |
|
GCR |
1076 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
6076 |
1924 |
|
04/07/1925 |
|
GCR |
159 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5159 |
1924 |
|
15/08/1925 |
|
GCR |
137 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5137 |
1924 |
|
26/09/1925 |
|
GCR |
140 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5140 |
1924 |
|
10/10/1925 |
|
GCR |
139 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5139 |
1924 |
|
24/10/1925 |
|
GCR |
961 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5961 |
1924 |
|
24/10/1925 |
|
GCR |
1182 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
6182 |
1924 |
|
31/10/1925 |
|
GCR |
92 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5092 |
1924 |
|
21/11/1925 |
|
GCR |
144 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5144 |
1924 |
|
12/12/1925 |
|
GCR |
151 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5151 |
1924 |
|
12/12/1925 |
|
GCR |
148 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5148 |
1924 |
|
19/12/1925 |
|
GCR |
136 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5136 |
1924 |
|
26/12/1925 |
|
GCR |
68 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5068 |
1924 |
|
31/12/1925 |
|
GCR |
963 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5963 |
1924 |
|
30/01/1926 |
|
GCR |
58 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5058 |
1924 |
|
27/02/1926 |
|
GCR |
135 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5135 |
1924 |
|
27/03/1926 |
|
GCR |
143 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5143 |
1924 |
|
17/04/1926 |
|
GCR |
1075 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
6075 |
1924 |
|
24/04/1926 |
|
GCR |
965 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5965 |
1924 |
|
05/06/1926 |
|
GCR |
71 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5071 |
1924 |
|
14/08/1926 |
|
GCR |
213 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5213 |
1924 |
|
15/01/1927 |
|
GCR |
1073 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
6073 |
1924 |
|
16/07/1927 |
|
GCR |
138 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
5138 |
1924 |
|
23/07/1927 |
|
LNER |
5160 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
3232 |
1946 |
on |
20/01/1946 |
|
LNER |
5159 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
3231 |
1946 |
on |
23/01/1946 |
|
LNER |
5142 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
3216 |
1946 |
on |
26/01/1946 |
|
LNER |
5147 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9935 |
1946 |
on |
27/01/1946 |
|
LNER |
5161 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
3233 |
1946 |
on |
27/01/1946 |
|
LNER |
5162 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
3234 |
1946 |
on |
27/01/1946 |
|
LNER |
5146 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
3217 |
1946 |
on |
02/02/1946 |
|
LNER |
5163 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
3235 |
1946 |
on |
03/02/1946 |
|
LNER |
5153 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
3220 |
1946 |
on |
09/02/1946 |
|
LNER |
5136 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
3213 |
1946 |
on |
10/02/1946 |
|
LNER |
5152 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
3219 |
1946 |
on |
10/02/1946 |
|
LNER |
5164 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
3236 |
1946 |
on |
24/02/1946 |
|
LNER |
6139 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9927 |
1946 |
on |
23/03/1946 |
|
LNER |
5137 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
3214 |
1946 |
on |
24/03/1946 |
|
LNER |
5048 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9928 |
1946 |
|
07/04/1946 |
|
LNER |
5068 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9934 |
1946 |
|
07/04/1946 |
|
LNER |
5138 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9937 |
1946 |
|
07/04/1946 |
|
LNER |
5959 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9932 |
1946 |
|
07/04/1946 |
|
LNER |
5056 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
3202 |
1946 |
|
18/04/1946 |
|
LNER |
5070 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9929 |
1946 |
|
04/05/1946 |
|
LNER |
6077 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9930 |
1946 |
|
26/05/1946 |
|
LNER |
6179 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9936 |
1946 |
|
26/05/1946 |
|
LNER |
5044 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9931 |
1946 |
|
30/06/1946 |
|
LNER |
5087 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9933 |
1946 |
|
30/06/1946 |
|
LNER |
5039 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
3229 |
1946 |
|
14/07/1946 |
|
LNER |
5961 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9926 |
1946 |
|
11/08/1946 |
|
LNER |
6054 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
3201 |
1946 |
|
17/08/1946 |
|
LNER |
5057 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
3203 |
1946 |
|
18/08/1946 |
|
LNER |
5059 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
3204 |
1946 |
|
18/08/1946 |
|
LNER |
5092 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
3212 |
1946 |
|
26/08/1946 |
|
LNER |
6133 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
3224 |
1946 |
|
29/08/1946 |
|
LNER |
6180 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
3243 |
1946 |
|
01/09/1946 |
|
LNER |
6052 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
3200 |
1946 |
|
07/09/1946 |
|
LNER |
5064 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
3205 |
1946 |
|
15/09/1946 |
|
LNER |
6076 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
3221 |
1946 |
|
16/09/1946 |
|
LNER |
6132 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
3223 |
1946 |
|
06/10/1946 |
|
LNER |
6135 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
3226 |
1946 |
|
06/10/1946 |
|
LNER |
6134 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
3225 |
1946 |
|
08/10/1946 |
|
LNER |
5067 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
3207 |
1946 |
|
17/10/1946 |
|
LNER |
6177 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
3241 |
1946 |
|
20/10/1946 |
|
LNER |
5065 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
3206 |
1946 |
|
03/11/1946 |
|
LNER |
5085 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
3210 |
1946 |
|
03/11/1946 |
|
LNER |
6136 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
3227 |
1946 |
|
03/11/1946 |
|
LNER |
6176 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
3240 |
1946 |
|
03/11/1946 |
|
LNER |
5962 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
3238 |
1946 |
|
10/11/1946 |
|
LNER |
5058 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
9925 |
1946 |
|
24/11/1946 |
|
LNER |
6140 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
3228 |
1946 |
|
30/11/1946 |
|
LNER |
3221 |
renumbered to |
BR |
E3221 |
BR Tmp |
|
24/01/1948 |
|
LNER |
3235 |
renumbered to |
BR |
E3235 |
BR Tmp |
|
13/03/1948 |
|
LNER |
3243 |
renumbered to |
BR |
E3243 |
BR Tmp |
|
13/03/1948 |
|
LNER |
3223 |
renumbered to |
BR |
63223 |
|
w/e |
10/04/1948 |
|
LNER |
3217 |
renumbered to |
BR |
63217 |
|
w/e |
01/05/1948 |
|
LNER |
3236 |
renumbered to |
BR |
63236 |
|
w/e |
15/05/1948 |
|
LNER |
9933 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69933 |
|
|
11/06/1948 |
|
LNER |
9934 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69934 |
|
|
12/06/1948 |
|
LNER |
9927 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69927 |
|
|
15/07/1948 |
|
LNER |
3216 |
renumbered to |
BR |
63216 |
|
w/e |
24/07/1948 |
|
LNER |
3232 |
renumbered to |
BR |
63232 |
|
w/e |
07/08/1948 |
|
LNER |
9937 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69937 |
|
|
21/08/1948 |
|
LNER |
9936 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69936 |
|
|
28/08/1948 |
|
LNER |
9926 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69926 |
|
|
11/09/1948 |
|
LNER |
9935 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69935 |
|
|
18/09/1948 |
|
LNER |
9929 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69929 |
|
|
02/10/1948 |
|
LNER |
3200 |
renumbered to |
BR |
63200 |
|
w/e |
09/10/1948 |
|
LNER |
3204 |
renumbered to |
BR |
63204 |
|
w/e |
06/11/1948 |
|
LNER |
3225 |
renumbered to |
BR |
63225 |
|
w/e |
06/11/1948 |
|
LNER |
3227 |
renumbered to |
BR |
63227 |
|
w/e |
13/11/1948 |
|
LNER |
3220 |
renumbered to |
BR |
63220 |
|
w/e |
20/11/1948 |
|
LNER |
3202 |
renumbered to |
BR |
63202 |
|
w/e |
18/12/1948 |
|
LNER |
9931 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69931 |
|
|
27/01/1949 |
|
LNER |
3233 |
renumbered to |
BR |
63233 |
|
w/e |
19/02/1949 |
|
LNER |
3240 |
renumbered to |
BR |
63240 |
|
w/e |
26/02/1949 |
|
LNER |
3207 |
renumbered to |
BR |
63207 |
|
w/e |
26/03/1949 |
|
LNER |
3201 |
renumbered to |
BR |
63201 |
|
w/e |
16/04/1949 |
|
LNER |
3234 |
renumbered to |
BR |
63234 |
|
w/e |
16/04/1949 |
|
BR |
E3243 |
renumbered to |
BR |
63243 |
|
w/e |
23/04/1949 |
|
LNER |
9928 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69928 |
|
|
20/08/1949 |
|
LNER |
9930 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69930 |
|
|
19/11/1949 |
|
LNER |
9932 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69932 |
|
|
03/12/1949 |
|
LNER |
9925 |
renumbered to |
BR |
69925 |
|
on |
03/03/1951 |
|