HBR/LNER Stirling "Q10" Class 0-8-0
Date | Event | Number | From | Depot From | To | Depot To | Usage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
02/1907 | To Service | 117 | NEW | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||
03/1907 | To Service | 118 | NEW | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||
03/1907 | To Service | 119 | NEW | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||
03/1907 | To Service | 120 | NEW | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||
04/1907 | To Service | 122 | NEW | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||
05/1907 | To Service | 123 | NEW | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||
05/1907 | To Service | 124 | NEW | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||
06/1907 | To Service | 125 | NEW | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||
06/1907 | To Service | 126 | NEW | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||
08/1907 | To Service | 121 | NEW | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||
09/1907 | To Service | 127 | NEW | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||
10/1907 | To Service | 128 | NEW | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||
10/1907 | To Service | 129 | NEW | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||
10/1907 | To Service | 130 | NEW | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||
11/1907 | To Service | 131 | NEW | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||
01/07/1924 | Reallocation | 3119 | HLS | Hull Springhead | CUD | Cudworth | |
31/01/1925 | Reallocation | 2508 | HLS | Hull Springhead | CUD | Cudworth | |
27/05/1927 | Reallocation | 2501 | HLS | Hull Springhead | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | |
27/05/1927 | Reallocation | 2502 | HLS | Hull Springhead | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | |
22/10/1928 | Reallocation | 2501 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | HLS | Hull Springhead | |
22/10/1928 | Reallocation | 2502 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | HLS | Hull Springhead | |
06/07/1929 | Reallocation | 2501 | HLS | Hull Springhead | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | |
23/10/1929 | Reallocation | 2500 | CUD | Cudworth | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | |
23/10/1929 | Reallocation | 2510 | HLS | Hull Springhead | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | |
12/11/1929 | Reallocation | 2512 | HLS | Hull Springhead | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | |
18/11/1929 | Reallocation | 2499 | HLS | Hull Springhead | SEL | Selby | |
18/11/1929 | Reallocation | 2504 | HLS | Hull Springhead | SEL | Selby | |
18/11/1929 | Reallocation | 2505 | HLS | Hull Springhead | SEL | Selby | |
18/11/1929 | Reallocation | 2506 | HLS | Hull Springhead | SEL | Selby | |
18/11/1929 | Reallocation | 2507 | HLS | Hull Springhead | SEL | Selby | |
18/11/1929 | Reallocation | 2508 | CUD | Cudworth | SEL | Selby | |
18/11/1929 | Reallocation | 2509 | HLS | Hull Springhead | SEL | Selby | |
18/11/1929 | Reallocation | 2511 | HLS | Hull Springhead | SEL | Selby | |
07/04/1930 | Reallocation | 2503 | HLS | Hull Springhead | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | |
29/12/1930 | Reallocation | 2503 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | SEL | Selby | |
29/12/1930 | Reallocation | 2511 | SEL | Selby | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | |
01/01/1931 | Reallocation | 2500 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | MEX | Mexborough | |
01/01/1931 | Reallocation | 2501 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | MEX | Mexborough | |
01/01/1931 | Reallocation | 2504 | SEL | Selby | DON | Doncaster | |
01/01/1931 | Reallocation | 2505 | SEL | Selby | MEX | Mexborough | |
01/01/1931 | Reallocation | 2506 | SEL | Selby | MEX | Mexborough | |
01/01/1931 | Reallocation | 2507 | SEL | Selby | DON | Doncaster | |
02/01/1931 | Reallocation | 2499 | SEL | Selby | MEX | Mexborough | |
02/01/1931 | Reallocation | 2502 | HLS | Hull Springhead | MEX | Mexborough | |
02/01/1931 | Reallocation | 2508 | SEL | Selby | MEX | Mexborough | |
02/01/1931 | Reallocation | 2510 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | MEX | Mexborough | |
06/01/1931 | Reallocation | 2504 | DON | Doncaster | MEX | Mexborough | |
06/01/1931 | Reallocation | 2507 | DON | Doncaster | MEX | Mexborough | |
27/04/1931 | Reallocation | 2500 | MEX | Mexborough | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | |
02/05/1931 | Condemned | 2500 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | COND | ||
15/07/1931 | Reallocation | 2502 | MEX | Mexborough | MAR | March | |
15/07/1931 | Reallocation | 2504 | MEX | Mexborough | MAR | March | |
30/07/1931 | Reallocation | 2505 | MEX | Mexborough | SEL | Selby | |
30/07/1931 | Reallocation | 2510 | MEX | Mexborough | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | |
31/07/1931 | Reallocation | 2499 | MEX | Mexborough | SEL | Selby | |
06/08/1931 | Condemned | 2499 | SEL | Selby | COND | ||
06/08/1931 | Reallocation | 2501 | MEX | Mexborough | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | |
06/08/1931 | Condemned | 2505 | SEL | Selby | COND | ||
06/08/1931 | Reallocation | 2506 | MEX | Mexborough | SEL | Selby | |
06/08/1931 | Condemned | 2510 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | COND | ||
08/08/1931 | Reallocation | 2503 | SEL | Selby | MAR | March | |
08/08/1931 | Reallocation | 2511 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | MAR | March | |
10/08/1931 | Reallocation | 2507 | MEX | Mexborough | SEL | Selby | |
10/08/1931 | Reallocation | 2509 | SEL | Selby | MAR | March | |
13/08/1931 | Condemned | 2501 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | COND | ||
13/08/1931 | Condemned | 2506 | SEL | Selby | COND | ||
13/08/1931 | Condemned | 2507 | SEL | Selby | COND | ||
14/09/1931 | Reallocation | 2508 | MEX | Mexborough | MAR | March | |
18/09/1931 | Reallocation | 2511 | MAR | March | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | |
21/09/1931 | Reallocation | 2509 | MAR | March | SEL | Selby | |
01/10/1931 | Condemned | 2498 | HLS | Hull Springhead | COND | ||
01/10/1931 | Condemned | 2509 | SEL | Selby | COND | ||
01/10/1931 | Condemned | 2511 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | COND | ||
01/10/1931 | Condemned | 2512 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | COND | ||
22/10/1931 | Reallocation | 2503 | MAR | March | SEL | Selby | |
22/10/1931 | Reallocation | 2504 | MAR | March | SEL | Selby | |
23/10/1931 | Reallocation | 2508 | MAR | March | SEL | Selby | |
24/10/1931 | Reallocation | 2502 | MAR | March | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | |
30/10/1931 | Condemned | 2503 | SEL | Selby | COND | ||
30/10/1931 | Condemned | 2504 | SEL | Selby | COND | ||
30/10/1931 | Condemned | 2508 | SEL | Selby | COND | ||
04/11/1931 | Condemned | 2502 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | COND | ||
05/11/1949 | Reallocation | 2498 | 98W | PTH | Perth (LNER) |