GNR/LNER Ivatt "Q1" Class 0-8-0
GNR | LNER (Tmp) | LNER (1924) | Date To Service | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Rebuilt To | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
401 | 3401 | 02/1901 | Colwick | 20/06/1929 | Colwick | 28.33 | ||||||
402 | 3402 | 03/1902 | Colwick | 13/09/1927 | 22/04/1912 to Q2 |
Colwick | 25.5 | |||||
403 | 3403 | 04/1902 | Doncaster | 10/06/1929 | Ardsley | 27.17 | ||||||
404 | 404N | 3404 | 05/1902 | New England | 26/04/1929 | New England | 26.92 | |||||
405 | 405N | 3405 | 04/1902 | Ardsley | 26/06/1935 | 28/09/1911 to Q2 |
Ardsley | 33.17 | ||||
406 | 406N | 3406 | 04/1902 | Ardsley | 03/02/1934 | 26/07/1912 to Q2 |
Ardsley | 31.83 | ||||
407 | 407N | 3407 | 04/1902 | Ardsley | 16/06/1934 | 23/07/1912 to Q2 |
Ardsley | 32.17 | ||||
408 | 3408 | 07/1902 | Colwick | 02/09/1927 | Colwick | 25.17 | ||||||
409 | 409N | 3409 | 06/1902 | Colwick | 05/08/1931 | Colwick | 29.17 | |||||
410 | 3410 | 07/1902 | Colwick | 18/10/1935 | 12/06/1912 to Q2 |
Ardsley | 33.25 | |||||
411 | 3411 | 07/1902 | Colwick | 08/12/1930 | Colwick | 28.42 | ||||||
412 | 3412 | 08/1902 | Colwick | 23/07/1928 | Colwick | 25.92 | ||||||
413 | 413N | 3413 | 09/1902 | Ardsley | 16/05/1927 | Ardsley | 24.67 | |||||
414 | 3414 | 09/1902 | Colwick | 31/12/1929 | Colwick | 27.25 | ||||||
415 | 3415 | 10/1902 | Colwick | 18/05/1929 | Colwick | 26.58 | ||||||
416 | 3416 | 12/1902 | Colwick | 17/12/1935 | 19/08/1911 to Q2 |
Colwick | 33 | |||||
417 | 3417 | 01/1903 | Colwick | 17/12/1935 | 02/12/1908 to Q2 |
Colwick | 32.92 | |||||
418 | 3418 | 01/1903 | Colwick | 30/11/1929 | Colwick | 26.83 | ||||||
419 | 3419 | 01/1903 | Ardsley | 13/09/1928 | Ardsley | 25.67 | ||||||
420 | 3420 | 01/1903 | New England | 10/02/1937 | 05/09/1911 to Q2 |
Ardsley | 34.08 | |||||
421 | 421N | 3421 | 01/1903 | Colwick | 19/05/1934 | 23/12/1915 to Q2 |
Colwick | 31.33 | ||||
422 | 3422 | 08/1903 | New England | 01/08/1928 | New England | 25 | ||||||
423 | 3423 | 07/1903 | New England | 27/06/1928 | Colwick | 24.92 | ||||||
424 | 3424 | 06/1903 | New England | 10/10/1927 | New England | 24.33 | ||||||
425 | 3425 | 09/1903 | Colwick | 27/06/1928 | Colwick | 24.75 | ||||||
426 | 3426 | 09/1903 | New England | 09/09/1931 | Colwick | 28 | ||||||
427 | 3427 | 09/1903 | New England | 11/04/1929 | New England | 25.58 | ||||||
428 | 3428 | 09/1903 | Ardsley | 10/04/1926 | Ardsley | 22.58 | ||||||
429 | 3429 | 09/1903 | New England | 06/12/1930 | Hitchin (GNR) | 27.25 | ||||||
430 | 3430 | 09/1903 | New England | 03/10/1931 | 28.08 | |||||||
431 | 3431 | 10/1903 | New England | 28/11/1931 | Ardsley | 28.08 | ||||||
432 | 3432 | 01/1904 | New England | 27/10/1931 | Colwick | 27.75 | ||||||
433 | 3433 | 03/1904 | Colwick | 08/02/1930 | Ardsley | 25.92 | ||||||
434 | 3434 | 03/1904 | New England | 27/06/1928 | Hitchin (GNR) | 24.25 | ||||||
435 | 3435 | 03/1904 | New England | 17/05/1929 | Hornsey | 25.17 | ||||||
436 | 3436 | 03/1904 | Colwick | 08/02/1930 | Colwick | 25.92 | ||||||
437 | 3437 | 04/1904 | Colwick | 01/03/1928 | Ardsley | 23.92 | ||||||
438 | 3438 | 08/1904 | Doncaster | 17/05/1929 | Ardsley | 24.75 | ||||||
439 | 3439 | 08/1904 | Colwick | 09/02/1927 | Ardsley | 22.5 | ||||||
440 | 3440 | 09/1904 | New England | 28/11/1931 | Colwick | 27.17 | ||||||
441 | 3441 | 12/1906 | New England | 11/06/1930 | Ardsley | 23.5 | ||||||
442 | 3442 | 01/1907 | New England | 27/09/1930 | Ardsley | 23.67 | ||||||
443 | 3443 | 12/1906 | Colwick | 02/01/1929 | Colwick | 22.08 | ||||||
444 | 3444 | 12/1906 | Ardsley | 12/07/1932 | Ardsley | 25.58 | ||||||
445 | 3445 | 12/1906 | Ardsley | 27/06/1928 | Ardsley | 21.5 | ||||||
446 | 3446 | 07/1909 | New England | 27/02/1932 | Ardsley | 22.58 | ||||||
447 | 3447 | 07/1909 | New England | 18/10/1935 | Ardsley | 26.25 | ||||||
448 | 448N | 3448 | 07/1909 | Colwick | 12/02/1932 | Colwick | 22.58 | |||||
449 | 3449 | 08/1909 | Colwick | 27/08/1930 | Colwick | 21 | ||||||
450 | 3450 | 08/1909 | Colwick | 15/06/1933 | 23/10/1920 to Q2 |
Colwick | 23.83 |