GNR/LNER Ivatt "Q1" Class 0-8-0
Pre Grouping | Big 4 | BR | Build Date | Rebuild | Rebuild Date | Notes |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
402 | 3402 | 03/1902 | Rebuilt from Q1 to Q2 | 22/04/1912 | ||
405 | 405 3405 |
04/1902 | Rebuilt from Q1 to Q2 | 28/09/1911 | ||
406 | 406 3406 |
04/1902 | Rebuilt from Q1 to Q2 | 26/07/1912 | ||
407 | 407 3407 |
04/1902 | Rebuilt from Q1 to Q2 | 23/07/1912 | ||
410 | 3410 | 07/1902 | Rebuilt from Q1 to Q2 | 12/06/1912 | ||
416 | 3416 | 12/1902 | Rebuilt from Q1 to Q2 | 19/08/1911 | ||
417 | 3417 | 01/1903 | Rebuilt from Q1 to Q2 | 02/12/1908 | ||
420 420 420 420 |
3420 3420 3420 3420 |
01/1903 | Rebuilt from Q1 to Q3 | 14/02/1914 | ||
421 | 421 3421 |
01/1903 | Rebuilt from Q1 to Q2 | 23/12/1915 | ||
450 450 |
3450 3450 |
08/1909 | Rebuilt from Q1 to Q2 | 23/10/1920 |