GCR/LNER Robinson "S1" Class 0-8-4T
Date | Event | Number | From | Depot From | To | Depot To | Usage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9900 | MEX | Mexborough | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9901 | MEX | Mexborough | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9902 | MAR | March | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9903 | MAR | March | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9904 | MEX | Mexborough | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 9905 | MEX | Mexborough | |||
24/12/1949 | Reallocation | 9902 | MAR | March | FRO | Frodingham | |
24/12/1949 | Reallocation | 9903 | MAR | March | FRO | Frodingham | |
23/12/1950 | Reallocation | 9903 | FRO | Frodingham | 36B | Mexborough | |
31/12/1950 | Reallocation | 9903 | 36B | Mexborough | 36B | Mexborough | |
20/01/1951 | Reallocation | 69902 | FRO | Frodingham | 36B | Mexborough | |
21/11/1953 | Reallocation | 69903 | 36B | Mexborough | 40B | Immingham | |
23/01/1954 | Reallocation | 69900 | MEX | Mexborough | 36A | Doncaster | |
23/01/1954 | Reallocation | 69901 | MEX | Mexborough | 36A | Doncaster | |
23/01/1954 | Reallocation | 69902 | 36B | Mexborough | 36A | Doncaster | |
23/01/1954 | Reallocation | 69904 | MEX | Mexborough | 40B | Immingham | |
23/01/1954 | Reallocation | 69905 | MEX | Mexborough | 36A | Doncaster | |
08/03/1954 | Condemned | 69903 | 40B | Immingham | COND | ||
20/03/1954 | Reallocation | 69904 | 40B | Immingham | 36A | Doncaster | |
23/04/1955 | Reallocation | 69901 | 36A | Doncaster | 36C | Frodingham | |
23/04/1955 | Reallocation | 69905 | 36A | Doncaster | 36C | Frodingham | |
06/01/1956 | Condemned | 69900 | 36A | Doncaster | COND | ||
06/01/1956 | Condemned | 69904 | 36A | Doncaster | COND | ||
13/01/1956 | Condemned | 69902 | 36A | Doncaster | COND | ||
01/01/1957 | Condemned | 69901 | 36C | Frodingham | COND | ||
01/01/1957 | Condemned | 69905 | 36C | Frodingham | COND |