LNER Gresley "V1" Class 2-6-2T
Class | LNER (Orig) | LNER (1946) | BR | Built | Depot Name | From | Date Withdrawn | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
V1 | 2900 | 7600 | 67600 | 09/1930 | EFD W |
Eastfield Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 29/12/1962 |
29/12/1962 |
V1 | 2901 | 7601 | 67601 | 10/1930 | EFD W |
Eastfield Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 22/01/1962 |
22/01/1962 |
V1 | 2902 | 7602 | 67602 | 10/1930 | EFD W |
Eastfield Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/05/1962 |
07/05/1962 |
V1 | 2903 | 7603 | 67603 | 10/1930 | PKD EFD 65E 65A W |
Parkhead Eastfield Kipps Eastfield Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/04/1948 21/01/1956 17/03/1956 02/04/1962 |
02/04/1962 |
V1 | 2904 | 7604 | 67604 | 11/1930 | PKD 65D 65C 65A W |
Parkhead Dawsholm Parkhead Eastfield Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 30/07/1960 19/11/1960 18/11/1961 29/12/1962 |
29/12/1962 |
V1 | 2905 | 7605 | 67605 | 11/1930 | STM 65E 65A 65E 64A W |
St Margarets Kipps Eastfield Kipps St Margarets Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 02/08/1958 19/11/1960 11/03/1961 21/10/1961 29/12/1962 |
29/12/1962 |
V1 | 2906 | 7606 | 67606 | 12/1930 | STM 64G 64A W |
St Margarets Hawick St Margarets Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/05/1956 04/07/1959 29/12/1962 |
29/12/1962 |
V1 | 2907 | 7607 | 67607 | 12/1930 | STM 65C 67B 65C 67B W |
St Margarets Parkhead Hurlford Parkhead Hurlford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 02/08/1958 17/12/1960 11/03/1961 24/02/1962 29/12/1962 |
29/12/1962 |
V1 | 2908 | 7608 | 67608 | 12/1930 | STM 65C 65A W |
St Margarets Parkhead Eastfield Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 02/08/1958 21/10/1961 29/12/1962 |
29/12/1962 |
V1 | 2909 | 7609 | 67609 | 02/1931 | STM 65E 65A 65E W |
St Margarets Kipps Eastfield Kipps Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 02/08/1958 19/11/1960 11/03/1961 05/02/1962 |
05/02/1962 |
V1 | 2910 | 7610 | 67610 | 04/1931 | HAY W |
Haymarket Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 21/06/1961 |
21/06/1961 |
V1 | 2911 | 7611 | 67611 | 04/1931 | PKD W |
Parkhead Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 29/12/1962 |
29/12/1962 |
V1 | 2912 | 7612 | 67612 | 04/1931 | PKD W |
Parkhead Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 21/01/1961 |
21/01/1961 |
V1 | 2913 | 7613 | 67613 | 05/1931 | PKD 65C 67D 67B W |
Parkhead Parkhead Ardrossan Hurlford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/01/1961 21/10/1961 30/12/1961 25/01/1962 |
25/01/1962 |
V1 | 2914 | 7614 | 67614 | 06/1931 | PKD 67B 65C W |
Parkhead Hurlford Parkhead Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 30/12/1961 21/04/1962 30/07/1962 |
30/07/1962 |
V1 | 2915 | 7615 | 67615 | 06/1931 | HAY W |
Haymarket Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 29/12/1962 |
29/12/1962 |
V1 | 2916 | 7616 | 67616 | 07/1931 | PKD 67B W |
Parkhead Hurlford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/12/1960 29/12/1962 |
29/12/1962 |
V1 | 2917 | 7617 | 67617 | 08/1931 | STM 65C 64A W |
St Margarets Parkhead St Margarets Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/01/1961 11/02/1961 27/08/1962 |
27/08/1962 |
V1 | 2918 | 7618 | 67618 | 08/1931 | STG EFD 65E 65E 65A 65E W |
Stirling Eastfield Kipps Kipps Eastfield Kipps Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/02/1949 25/11/1950 30/11/1950 19/11/1960 11/03/1961 29/12/1962 |
29/12/1962 |
V1 | 2919 | 7619 | 67619 | 08/1931 | PKD W |
Parkhead Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 29/12/1962 |
29/12/1962 |
V1 | 2920 | 7620 | 67620 | 10/1931 | HAY 52B 52A W |
Haymarket Heaton Gateshead Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 08/12/1962 22/06/1963 24/11/1964 |
24/11/1964 |
V1 | 2921 | 7621 | 67621 | 10/1931 | PKD W |
Parkhead Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 29/12/1962 |
29/12/1962 |
V1 | 2922 | 7622 | 67622 | 10/1931 | PKD W |
Parkhead Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/03/1962 |
05/03/1962 |
V1 | 2923 | 7623 | 67623 | 11/1931 | PKD 65D 65C 65E 67B W |
Parkhead Dawsholm Parkhead Kipps Hurlford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 19/11/1960 11/02/1961 06/05/1961 21/10/1961 25/01/1962 |
25/01/1962 |
V1 | 2924 | 7624 | 67624 | 11/1931 | STM W |
St Margarets Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 21/09/1960 |
21/09/1960 |
V1 | 2925 | 7625 | 67625 | 12/1931 | PKD W |
Parkhead Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 29/12/1962 |
29/12/1962 |
V1 | 2926 | 7626 | 67626 | 12/1931 | PKD W |
Parkhead Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 29/12/1962 |
29/12/1962 |
V1 | 2927 | 7627 | 67627 | 12/1931 | KPS 65A 65E W |
Kipps Eastfield Kipps Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 19/11/1960 11/03/1961 22/08/1961 |
22/08/1961 |
V1 | 2928 | 7628 | 67628 | 12/1934 | PKD 65A 52B 52A W |
Parkhead Eastfield Heaton Gateshead Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 18/11/1961 08/12/1962 29/12/1962 24/11/1964 |
24/11/1964 |
V1 | 2929 | 7629 | 67629 | 02/1935 | STM 65C W |
St Margarets Parkhead Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/02/1959 07/05/1962 |
07/05/1962 |
V1 | 2930 | 7630 | 67630 | 03/1935 | STM 64G 64A 65C 65A 65C W |
St Margarets Hawick St Margarets Parkhead Eastfield Parkhead Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 18/02/1956 12/05/1956 14/02/1959 19/11/1960 11/03/1961 29/12/1962 |
29/12/1962 |
V1 | 2931 | 7631 | 67631 | 03/1935 | PKD W |
Parkhead Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/03/1962 |
05/03/1962 |
V1 | 2932 | 7632 | 67632 | 03/1935 | PKD W |
Parkhead Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 29/12/1962 |
29/12/1962 |
V1 | 2933 | 7633 | 67633 | 04/1935 | PKD 65D 65C 67B W |
Parkhead Dawsholm Parkhead Hurlford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/12/1960 11/02/1961 21/04/1962 29/12/1962 |
29/12/1962 |
V1 | 417 | 7634 | 67634 | 04/1935 | GHD 52C W |
Gateshead Blaydon Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/12/1955 16/04/1962 |
16/04/1962 |
V1 | 446 | 7635 | 67635 | 04/1935 | HTN W 53B 53A 51L |
Heaton Withdrawn Hull Botanic Gardens Hull Dairycoates Thornaby |
01/01/1948 09/1953 31/01/1959 20/06/1959 25/11/1961 |
09/1953 |
V1 | 477 | 7636 | 67636 | 05/1935 | BLA 52A W |
Blaydon Gateshead Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 22/06/1963 02/11/1964 |
02/11/1964 |
V1 | 479 | 7637 | 67637 | 05/1935 | HTN 54A 52A 52B W |
Heaton Sunderland Gateshead Heaton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 11/10/1958 31/01/1959 17/06/1961 24/05/1962 |
24/05/1962 |
V1 | 481 | 7638 | 67638 | 05/1935 | MID 53B 53A 52A W |
Middlesbrough Hull Botanic Gardens Hull Dairycoates Gateshead Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 16/06/1956 20/06/1959 21/12/1963 02/11/1964 |
02/11/1964 |
V1 | 484 | 7639 | 67639 | 06/1935 | MID 52B 52B 51D 52C 52A W |
Middlesbrough Heaton Heaton Middlesbrough Blaydon Gateshead Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 20/09/1952 04/10/1952 20/06/1953 23/10/1954 20/04/1957 22/10/1962 |
22/10/1962 |
V1 | 486 | 7640 | 67640 | 06/1935 | HTN HTN 53B 53A 51L 52A W |
Heaton Heaton Hull Botanic Gardens Hull Dairycoates Thornaby Gateshead Withdrawn |
12/1935 01/01/1948 11/10/1958 20/06/1959 25/11/1961 28/09/1963 02/11/1964 |
02/11/1964 |
V1 | 487 | 7641 | 67641 | 06/1935 | HTN 52D 52B W |
Heaton Tweedmouth Heaton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/12/1957 14/06/1958 22/10/1962 |
22/10/1962 |
V1 | 497 | 7642 | 67642 | 07/1935 | HTN GHD 52B 52B 52D 52B 52A W |
Heaton Gateshead Heaton Heaton Tweedmouth Heaton Gateshead Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 09/04/1949 31/05/1950 30/06/1950 14/12/1957 14/06/1958 22/06/1963 04/06/1964 |
04/06/1964 |
V1 | 498 | 7643 | 67643 | 07/1935 | PKD 52B 52A W |
Parkhead Heaton Gateshead Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 08/12/1962 29/12/1962 02/11/1964 |
02/11/1964 |
V1 | 402 | 7644 | 67644 | 08/1935 | DFU EFD W |
Dunfermline Upper Eastfield Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 18/12/1948 07/05/1962 |
07/05/1962 |
V1 | 414 | 7645 | 67645 | 08/1935 | NEV HTN 52A 54A 52B 52G 52B W 52A |
Neville Hill Heaton Gateshead Sunderland Heaton Sunderland Heaton Withdrawn Gateshead |
01/01/1948 05/06/1948 09/11/1957 11/10/1958 20/06/1959 03/10/1959 05/08/1961 29/12/1962 26/01/1963 |
29/12/1962 |
V1 | 415 | 7646 | 67646 | 10/1935 | NEV HTN 52A W |
Neville Hill Heaton Gateshead Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/06/1948 22/06/1963 24/11/1964 |
24/11/1964 |
V1 | 416 | 7647 | 67647 | 11/1935 | NEV HTN 51D 51D 52A 52A 51D 51E 51E 52A 52A 52B 52B 52D 52B W |
Neville Hill Heaton Middlesbrough Middlesbrough Gateshead Gateshead Middlesbrough Stockton Stockton Gateshead Gateshead Heaton Heaton Tweedmouth Heaton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/06/1948 31/05/1950 30/06/1950 01/10/1950 21/10/1950 07/07/1951 14/07/1951 21/07/1951 29/09/1951 20/10/1951 12/07/1952 19/07/1952 14/12/1957 14/06/1958 21/01/1963 |
21/01/1963 |
V1 | 418 | 7648 | 67648 | 12/1935 | PKD 65C 65E 67D 67B W |
Parkhead Parkhead Kipps Ardrossan Hurlford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/01/1961 06/05/1961 21/10/1961 30/12/1961 25/01/1962 |
25/01/1962 |
V1 | 2897 | 7649 | 67649 | 12/1935 | STM W |
St Margarets Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 09/07/1962 |
09/07/1962 |
V1 | 419 | 7650 | 67650 | 01/1936 | STG 65C W |
Stirling Parkhead Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/03/1959 10/08/1961 |
10/08/1961 |
V1 | 422 | 7651 | 67651 | 01/1936 | HTN 52A W |
Heaton Gateshead Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 22/06/1963 19/05/1964 |
19/05/1964 |
V1 | 423 | 7652 | 67652 | 01/1936 | HTN 52A W |
Heaton Gateshead Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 22/06/1963 23/12/1963 |
23/12/1963 |
V1 | 428 | 7653 | 67653 | 02/1936 | HTN 52C 52C W |
Heaton Blaydon Blaydon Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 31/05/1950 30/06/1950 23/09/1963 |
23/09/1963 |
V1 | 440 | 7654 | 67654 | 03/1936 | HTN 52A W |
Heaton Gateshead Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 26/01/1963 23/09/1963 |
23/09/1963 |
V1 | 2898 | 7655 | 67655 | 03/1936 | PKD W |
Parkhead Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/03/1962 |
05/03/1962 |
V1 | 454 | 7656 | 67656 | 03/1936 | NEV GHD BLA 52D 52B 52A W |
Neville Hill Gateshead Blaydon Tweedmouth Heaton Gateshead Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/06/1948 13/11/1948 18/05/1957 20/07/1957 22/06/1963 23/12/1963 |
23/12/1963 |
V1 | 455 | 7657 | 67657 | 04/1936 | NEV 52A 64B 64B W |
Neville Hill Gateshead Haymarket Haymarket Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 20/04/1957 08/12/1962 22/12/1962 29/12/1962 |
29/12/1962 |
V1 | 461 | 7658 | 67658 | 04/1936 | BLA 52B 52A W |
Blaydon Heaton Gateshead Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 20/07/1957 22/06/1963 23/09/1963 |
23/09/1963 |
V1 | 465 | 7659 | 67659 | 05/1936 | STM W |
St Margarets Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/02/1962 |
12/02/1962 |
V1 | 466 | 7660 | 67660 | 07/1936 | KPS 64A 65C 65E 64A W |
Kipps St Margarets Parkhead Kipps St Margarets Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/12/1960 14/01/1961 11/03/1961 21/10/1961 05/02/1962 |
05/02/1962 |
V1 | 2899 | 7661 | 67661 | 10/1936 | DFU EFD 67B 65C 67B W |
Dunfermline Upper Eastfield Hurlford Parkhead Hurlford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 15/01/1949 17/12/1960 11/03/1961 21/10/1961 05/02/1962 |
05/02/1962 |
V1 | 404 | 7662 | 67662 | 07/1938 | PKD 52B 52A W |
Parkhead Heaton Gateshead Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 08/12/1962 29/12/1962 14/01/1963 |
14/01/1963 |
V1 | 407 | 7663 | 67663 | 07/1938 | NOR 51D 51D 53B 51D 53B 53A W |
Norwich Thorpe Middlesbrough Middlesbrough Hull Botanic Gardens Middlesbrough Hull Botanic Gardens Hull Dairycoates Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 18/02/1951 24/03/1951 16/06/1956 20/07/1957 21/09/1957 20/06/1959 23/09/1963 |
23/09/1963 |
V1 | 420 | 7664 | 67664 | 07/1938 | NOR 65A 67B W |
Norwich Thorpe Eastfield Hurlford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/06/1952 24/03/1962 29/12/1962 |
29/12/1962 |
V1 | 424 | 7665 | 67665 | 08/1938 | NOR PKD KPS 64A 65C 64A W |
Norwich Thorpe Parkhead Kipps St Margarets Parkhead St Margarets Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 21/08/1948 11/09/1948 17/12/1960 14/01/1961 06/05/1961 23/06/1961 |
23/06/1961 |
V1 | 425 | 7666 | 67666 | 08/1938 | STM W |
St Margarets Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/02/1962 |
05/02/1962 |
V1 | 447 | 7667 | 67667 | 09/1938 | STR NOR STR KL 65A 67B W |
Stratford Norwich Thorpe Stratford Kings Lynn Eastfield Hurlford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 22/01/1949 26/03/1949 12/11/1949 23/04/1950 24/03/1962 02/08/1962 |
02/08/1962 |
V1 | 448 | 7668 | 67668 | 10/1938 | STR STM 64C 64A W |
Stratford St Margarets Dalry Road St Margarets Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/03/1949 01/08/1959 06/05/1961 29/12/1962 |
29/12/1962 |
V1 | 451 | 7669 | 67669 | 10/1938 | STR 65E 64A 65C 65E 64A W |
Stratford Kipps St Margarets Parkhead Kipps St Margarets Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/05/1960 17/12/1960 14/01/1961 11/03/1961 06/05/1961 28/09/1961 |
28/09/1961 |
V1 | 467 | 7670 | 67670 | 10/1938 | STM W |
St Margarets Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/08/1961 |
10/08/1961 |
V1 | 469 | 7671 | 67671 | 10/1938 | STR STR NOR STR KL 65A W |
Stratford Stratford Norwich Thorpe Stratford Kings Lynn Eastfield Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 25/12/1948 22/01/1949 26/03/1949 12/11/1949 23/04/1950 07/07/1960 |
07/07/1960 |
V1 | 472 | 7672 | 67672 | 11/1938 | STR W |
Stratford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 29/12/1962 |
29/12/1962 |
V1 | 478 | 7673 | 67673 | 11/1938 | STR NOR STR MID 52B 52B 51D 51D 52B 52B 52C 52A 54A 52B 52G 52B W |
Stratford Norwich Thorpe Stratford Middlesbrough Heaton Heaton Middlesbrough Middlesbrough Heaton Heaton Blaydon Gateshead Sunderland Heaton Sunderland Heaton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 23/10/1948 02/04/1949 29/01/1950 25/11/1950 30/11/1950 07/07/1951 21/07/1951 29/09/1951 20/10/1951 17/11/1956 20/04/1957 11/10/1958 20/06/1959 03/10/1959 05/08/1961 01/10/1962 |
01/10/1962 |
V1 | 480 | 7674 | 67674 | 11/1938 | PKD 64A 65E 64A W |
Parkhead St Margarets Kipps St Margarets Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/12/1960 11/02/1961 21/10/1961 29/12/1962 |
29/12/1962 |
V1 | 483 | 7675 | 67675 | 12/1938 | STR 65C 65A W |
Stratford Parkhead Eastfield Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/03/1959 21/10/1961 29/12/1962 |
29/12/1962 |
V1 | 485 | 7676 | 67676 | 29/12/1938 | STR PKD 65A 65C 67B 65C W |
Stratford Parkhead Eastfield Parkhead Hurlford Parkhead Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 22/01/1949 19/11/1960 11/03/1961 30/12/1961 21/04/1962 30/07/1962 |
30/07/1962 |
V1 | 488 | 7677 | 67677 | 07/01/1939 | STR PKS STR NOR 51D 51D 52B 52B 51D 53B 51D 53B 53A W |
Stratford Parkeston Quay Stratford Norwich Thorpe Middlesbrough Middlesbrough Heaton Heaton Middlesbrough Hull Botanic Gardens Middlesbrough Hull Botanic Gardens Hull Dairycoates Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 31/07/1948 14/08/1948 28/08/1948 18/02/1951 24/03/1951 20/09/1952 04/10/1952 20/06/1953 16/06/1956 20/07/1957 21/09/1957 20/06/1959 01/10/1962 |
01/10/1962 |
V1 | 489 | 7678 | 67678 | 02/1939 | PKD 52B 52A W |
Parkhead Heaton Gateshead Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 08/12/1962 29/12/1962 02/11/1964 |
02/11/1964 |
V1 | 490 | 7679 | 67679 | 02/1939 | STR 65C 67B 65C 67B W |
Stratford Parkhead Hurlford Parkhead Hurlford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/06/1952 17/12/1960 11/03/1961 21/10/1961 25/01/1962 |
25/01/1962 |
V1 | 491 | 7680 | 67680 | 02/1939 | STR W |
Stratford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 29/12/1962 |
29/12/1962 |
V1 | 496 | 7681 | 67681 | 02/1939 | STR 67B 65C 67B W |
Stratford Hurlford Parkhead Hurlford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/12/1960 11/03/1961 21/10/1961 16/11/1961 |
16/11/1961 |