Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 526 Today
» 1172 Yesterday
» 1698 Week
» 20599 Month
» 20599 Year
» 1685975 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

LNER Gresley "V1" Class 2-6-2T


Date Number (at time) Depot (at time) Code Details Ref Link
Sat 11/02/1961 67609 65A   Darlington Works visit.: Around the works. - Works yard.    
Sat 11/11/1961 67647 52B   Darlington Works visit: Around the Works - Works yard. SLS 1/1962  
Sun 25/03/1962 67609,
67661,
67665,
67681
Wdn,
Wdn,
Wdn,
Wdn
  Darlington Works visit: Around the works - Works yard.
Darlington Works visit: Around the works - Works yard.
Darlington Works visit: Around the works - Scrapyard, partially cut.
Darlington Works visit: Around the works - Scrapyard, partially cut.
SLS 5/1962  
Sun 03/06/1962 67611,
67614,
67619,
67622,
67625,
67626,
67632,
67650,
67655,
67676
65C,
65C,
65C,
Wdn,
65C,
65C,
65C,
Wdn,
Wdn,
65C
  At Bo'ness: In store SLS 7/1962