Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 551 Today
» 1172 Yesterday
» 1723 Week
» 20624 Month
» 20624 Year
» 1686000 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

LNER Gresley "V1" Class 2-6-2T


Company Old Number Company New Number Subtype Date Information
LNER 2906 renumbered to LNER 7606 1946 on 10/03/1946  
LNER 2925 renumbered to LNER 7625 1946 on 16/03/1946  
LNER 2905 renumbered to LNER 7605 1946 m/e 04/1946  
LNER 2907 renumbered to LNER 7607 1946 m/e 04/1946  
LNER 2908 renumbered to LNER 7608 1946 m/e 04/1946  
LNER 2909 renumbered to LNER 7609 1946 m/e 04/1946  
LNER 417 renumbered to LNER 7634 1946 m/e 04/1946  
LNER 2900 renumbered to LNER 7600 1946 m/e 05/1946  
LNER 2901 renumbered to LNER 7601 1946 m/e 05/1946  
LNER 2902 renumbered to LNER 7602 1946 m/e 05/1946  
LNER 2914 renumbered to LNER 7614 1946 m/e 05/1946  
LNER 425 renumbered to LNER 7666 1946 m/e 05/1946  
LNER 485 renumbered to LNER 7676 1946 m/e 05/1946  
LNER 2898 renumbered to LNER 7655 1946 m/e 06/1946  
LNER 2904 renumbered to LNER 7604 1946 m/e 06/1946  
LNER 2911 renumbered to LNER 7611 1946 m/e 06/1946  
LNER 2912 renumbered to LNER 7612 1946 m/e 06/1946  
LNER 2915 renumbered to LNER 7615 1946 m/e 06/1946  
LNER 2916 renumbered to LNER 7616 1946 m/e 06/1946  
LNER 2917 renumbered to LNER 7617 1946 m/e 06/1946  
LNER 2920 renumbered to LNER 7620 1946 m/e 06/1946  
LNER 2924 renumbered to LNER 7624 1946 m/e 06/1946  
LNER 2927 renumbered to LNER 7627 1946 m/e 06/1946  
LNER 2929 renumbered to LNER 7629 1946 m/e 06/1946  
LNER 2930 renumbered to LNER 7630 1946 m/e 06/1946  
LNER 404 renumbered to LNER 7662 1946 m/e 06/1946  
LNER 407 renumbered to LNER 7663 1946 m/e 06/1946  
LNER 419 renumbered to LNER 7650 1946 m/e 06/1946  
LNER 422 renumbered to LNER 7651 1946 m/e 06/1946  
LNER 428 renumbered to LNER 7653 1946 m/e 06/1946  
LNER 440 renumbered to LNER 7654 1946 m/e 06/1946  
LNER 446 renumbered to LNER 7635 1946 m/e 06/1946  
LNER 465 renumbered to LNER 7659 1946 m/e 06/1946  
LNER 466 renumbered to LNER 7660 1946 m/e 06/1946  
LNER 467 renumbered to LNER 7670 1946 m/e 06/1946  
LNER 479 renumbered to LNER 7637 1946 m/e 06/1946  
LNER 480 renumbered to LNER 7674 1946 m/e 06/1946  
LNER 489 renumbered to LNER 7678 1946 m/e 06/1946  
LNER 2899 renumbered to LNER 7661 1946 m/e 07/1946  
LNER 2903 renumbered to LNER 7603 1946 m/e 07/1946  
LNER 2910 renumbered to LNER 7610 1946 m/e 07/1946  
LNER 2913 renumbered to LNER 7613 1946 m/e 07/1946  
LNER 2918 renumbered to LNER 7618 1946 m/e 07/1946  
LNER 2919 renumbered to LNER 7619 1946 m/e 07/1946  
LNER 2921 renumbered to LNER 7621 1946 m/e 07/1946  
LNER 2922 renumbered to LNER 7622 1946 m/e 07/1946  
LNER 2923 renumbered to LNER 7623 1946 m/e 07/1946  
LNER 2926 renumbered to LNER 7626 1946 m/e 07/1946  
LNER 2931 renumbered to LNER 7631 1946 m/e 07/1946  
LNER 2932 renumbered to LNER 7632 1946 m/e 07/1946  
LNER 2933 renumbered to LNER 7633 1946 m/e 07/1946  
LNER 420 renumbered to LNER 7664 1946 m/e 07/1946  
LNER 424 renumbered to LNER 7665 1946 m/e 07/1946  
LNER 447 renumbered to LNER 7667 1946 m/e 07/1946  
LNER 448 renumbered to LNER 7668 1946 m/e 07/1946  
LNER 451 renumbered to LNER 7669 1946 m/e 07/1946  
LNER 454 renumbered to LNER 7656 1946 m/e 07/1946  
LNER 455 renumbered to LNER 7657 1946 m/e 07/1946  
LNER 469 renumbered to LNER 7671 1946 m/e 07/1946  
LNER 472 renumbered to LNER 7672 1946 m/e 07/1946  
LNER 478 renumbered to LNER 7673 1946 m/e 07/1946  
LNER 483 renumbered to LNER 7675 1946 m/e 07/1946  
LNER 488 renumbered to LNER 7677 1946 m/e 07/1946  
LNER 490 renumbered to LNER 7679 1946 m/e 07/1946  
LNER 491 renumbered to LNER 7680 1946 m/e 07/1946  
LNER 496 renumbered to LNER 7681 1946 m/e 07/1946  
LNER 2928 renumbered to LNER 7628 1946 m/e 08/1946  
LNER 461 renumbered to LNER 7658 1946 m/e 08/1946  
LNER 477 renumbered to LNER 7636 1946 m/e 08/1946  
LNER 481 renumbered to LNER 7638 1946 m/e 08/1946  
LNER 484 renumbered to LNER 7639 1946 m/e 08/1946  
LNER 402 renumbered to LNER 7644 1946 m/e 09/1946  
LNER 423 renumbered to LNER 7652 1946 m/e 09/1946  
LNER 2897 renumbered to LNER 7649 1946 m/e 10/1946  
LNER 416 renumbered to LNER 7647 1946 m/e 10/1946  
LNER 418 renumbered to LNER 7648 1946 m/e 11/1946  
LNER 486 renumbered to LNER 7640 1946 m/e 11/1946  
LNER 498 renumbered to LNER 7643 1946 m/e 11/1946  
LNER 414 renumbered to LNER 7645 1946 m/e 12/1946  
LNER 415 renumbered to LNER 7646 1946 m/e 12/1946  
LNER 487 renumbered to LNER 7641 1946 m/e 12/1946  
LNER 497 renumbered to LNER 7642 1946 m/e 12/1946  
LNER 7608 renumbered to BR 67608   m/e 04/1948  
LNER 7632 renumbered to BR 67632   m/e 04/1948  
LNER 7672 renumbered to BR 67672   m/e 04/1948  
LNER 7614 renumbered to BR 67614   m/e 05/1948  
LNER 7631 renumbered to BR 67631   m/e 05/1948  
LNER 7649 renumbered to BR 67649   m/e 05/1948  
LNER 7615 renumbered to BR 67615   m/e 06/1948  
LNER 7622 renumbered to BR 67622   m/e 06/1948  
LNER 7637 renumbered to BR 67637   m/e 06/1948  
LNER 7665 renumbered to BR 67665   m/e 06/1948  
LNER 7677 renumbered to BR 67677   m/e 06/1948  
LNER 7605 renumbered to BR 67605   m/e 07/1948  
LNER 7613 renumbered to BR 67613   m/e 07/1948  
LNER 7616 renumbered to BR 67616   m/e 07/1948  
LNER 7629 renumbered to BR 67629   m/e 07/1948  
LNER 7630 renumbered to BR 67630   m/e 07/1948  
LNER 7678 renumbered to BR 67678   m/e 07/1948  
LNER 7603 renumbered to BR 67603   m/e 08/1948  
LNER 7624 renumbered to BR 67624   m/e 08/1948  
LNER 7635 renumbered to BR 67635   m/e 08/1948  
LNER 7638 renumbered to BR 67638   m/e 08/1948  
LNER 7661 renumbered to BR 67661   m/e 08/1948  
LNER 7610 renumbered to BR 67610   m/e 09/1948  
LNER 7628 renumbered to BR 67628   m/e 09/1948  
LNER 7650 renumbered to BR 67650   m/e 09/1948  
LNER 7659 renumbered to BR 67659   m/e 09/1948  
LNER 7602 renumbered to BR 67602   m/e 10/1948  
LNER 7618 renumbered to BR 67618   m/e 10/1948  
LNER 7633 renumbered to BR 67633   m/e 10/1948  
LNER 7640 renumbered to BR 67640   m/e 10/1948  
LNER 7634 renumbered to BR 67634   m/e 11/1948  
LNER 7642 renumbered to BR 67642   m/e 11/1948  
LNER 7662 renumbered to BR 67662   m/e 11/1948  
LNER 7676 renumbered to BR 67676   m/e 11/1948  
LNER 7626 renumbered to BR 67626   m/e 12/1948  
LNER 7636 renumbered to BR 67636   m/e 12/1948  
LNER 7639 renumbered to BR 67639   m/e 12/1948  
LNER 7643 renumbered to BR 67643   m/e 12/1948  
LNER 7663 renumbered to BR 67663   m/e 12/1948  
LNER 7668 renumbered to BR 67668   m/e 12/1948  
LNER 7627 renumbered to BR 67627   m/e 01/1949  
LNER 7647 renumbered to BR 67647   m/e 01/1949  
LNER 7651 renumbered to BR 67651   m/e 01/1949  
LNER 7655 renumbered to BR 67655   on 19/01/1949  
LNER 7623 renumbered to BR 67623   m/e 03/1949  
LNER 7654 renumbered to BR 67654   m/e 03/1949  
LNER 7679 renumbered to BR 67679   m/e 03/1949  
LNER 7681 renumbered to BR 67681   m/e 03/1949  
LNER 7648 renumbered to BR 67648   m/e 05/1949  
LNER 7660 renumbered to BR 67660   m/e 06/1949  
LNER 7671 renumbered to BR 67671   m/e 06/1949  
LNER 7675 renumbered to BR 67675   m/e 06/1949  
LNER 7609 renumbered to BR 67609   m/e 07/1949  
LNER 7619 renumbered to BR 67619   m/e 07/1949  
LNER 7620 renumbered to BR 67620   m/e 07/1949  
LNER 7612 renumbered to BR 67612   on 19/08/1949  
LNER 7669 renumbered to BR 67669   on 19/08/1949  
LNER 7601 renumbered to BR 67601   m/e 09/1949  
LNER 7645 renumbered to BR 67645   m/e 09/1949  
LNER 7658 renumbered to BR 67658   m/e 09/1949  
LNER 7667 renumbered to BR 67667   m/e 09/1949  
LNER 7670 renumbered to BR 67670   m/e 09/1949  
LNER 7674 renumbered to BR 67674   m/e 09/1949  
LNER 7621 renumbered to BR 67621   m/e 10/1949  
LNER 7641 renumbered to BR 67641   m/e 10/1949  
LNER 7617 renumbered to BR 67617   m/e 11/1949  
LNER 7625 renumbered to BR 67625   m/e 11/1949  
LNER 7646 renumbered to BR 67646   m/e 11/1949  
LNER 7644 renumbered to BR 67644   m/e 12/1949  
LNER 7611 renumbered to BR 67611   on 09/12/1949  
LNER 7652 renumbered to BR 67652   m/e 01/1950  
LNER 7673 renumbered to BR 67673   m/e 01/1950  
LNER 7666 renumbered to BR 67666   m/e 02/1950  
LNER 7657 renumbered to BR 67657   m/e 03/1950  
LNER 7664 renumbered to BR 67664   m/e 03/1950  
LNER 7680 renumbered to BR 67680   m/e 03/1950  
LNER 7653 renumbered to BR 67653   m/e 05/1950  
LNER 7656 renumbered to BR 67656   m/e 06/1950  
LNER 7607 renumbered to BR 67607   on 24/06/1950  
LNER 7600 renumbered to BR 67600   on 10/08/1950  
LNER 7606 renumbered to BR 67606   m/e 09/1950  
LNER 7604 renumbered to BR 67604   m/e 10/1950