LNER Gresley "V3" Class 2-6-2T
Date | Event | Number | From | Depot From | To | Depot To | Usage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7634 | GHD | Gateshead | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7669 | STR | Stratford | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7672 | STR | Stratford | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7675 | STR | Stratford | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7682 | GHD | Gateshead | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7683 | GHD | Gateshead | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7684 | MID | Middlesbrough | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7685 | MID | Middlesbrough | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7686 | MID | Middlesbrough | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7687 | GHD | Gateshead | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7688 | GHD | Gateshead | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7689 | GHD | Gateshead | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7690 | GHD | Gateshead | |||
01/01/1948 | Reallocation | 7691 | MID | Middlesbrough | |||
31/05/1950 | Reallocation | 67682 | GHD | Gateshead | 51E | Stockton | |
30/06/1950 | Reallocation | 67682 | 51E | Stockton | 51E | Stockton | |
01/10/1950 | Reallocation | 67682 | 51E | Stockton | 52A | Gateshead | |
21/10/1950 | Reallocation | 67682 | 52A | Gateshead | 52A | Gateshead | |
18/12/1954 | Reallocation | 67687 | GHD | Gateshead | 52C | Blaydon | |
22/01/1955 | Reallocation | 67682 | 52A | Gateshead | 52C | Blaydon | |
17/12/1955 | Reallocation | 67634 | GHD | Gateshead | 52C | Blaydon | |
17/12/1955 | Reallocation | 67683 | GHD | Gateshead | 52C | Blaydon | |
12/05/1956 | Reallocation | 67606 | STM | St Margarets | 64G | Hawick | |
16/06/1956 | Reallocation | 67638 | MID | Middlesbrough | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | |
16/06/1956 | Reallocation | 67663 | 51D | Middlesbrough | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | |
16/06/1956 | Reallocation | 67684 | MID | Middlesbrough | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | |
16/06/1956 | Reallocation | 67685 | MID | Middlesbrough | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | |
16/06/1956 | Reallocation | 67686 | MID | Middlesbrough | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | |
16/06/1956 | Reallocation | 67691 | MID | Middlesbrough | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | |
20/04/1957 | Reallocation | 67657 | NEV | Neville Hill | 52A | Gateshead | |
20/04/1957 | Reallocation | 67687 | 52C | Blaydon | 52A | Gateshead | |
18/05/1957 | Reallocation | 67656 | BLA | Blaydon | 52D | Tweedmouth | |
18/05/1957 | Reallocation | 67683 | 52C | Blaydon | 52D | Tweedmouth | |
20/07/1957 | Reallocation | 67656 | 52D | Tweedmouth | 52B | Heaton | |
20/07/1957 | Reallocation | 67663 | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | 51D | Middlesbrough | |
20/07/1957 | Reallocation | 67683 | 52D | Tweedmouth | 52B | Heaton | |
20/07/1957 | Reallocation | 67684 | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | 51D | Middlesbrough | |
20/07/1957 | Reallocation | 67685 | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | 52B | Heaton | |
20/07/1957 | Reallocation | 67691 | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | 52B | Heaton | |
21/09/1957 | Reallocation | 67663 | 51D | Middlesbrough | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | |
21/09/1957 | Reallocation | 67684 | 51D | Middlesbrough | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | |
02/08/1958 | Reallocation | 67605 | STM | St Margarets | 65E | Kipps | |
02/08/1958 | Reallocation | 67607 | STM | St Margarets | 65C | Parkhead | |
02/08/1958 | Reallocation | 67609 | STM | St Margarets | 65E | Kipps | |
31/01/1959 | Reallocation | 67682 | 52C | Blaydon | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | |
14/03/1959 | Reallocation | 67650 | STG | Stirling | 65C | Parkhead | |
14/03/1959 | Reallocation | 67675 | STR | Stratford | 65C | Parkhead | |
20/06/1959 | Reallocation | 67638 | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | |
20/06/1959 | Reallocation | 67663 | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | |
20/06/1959 | Reallocation | 67677 | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | |
20/06/1959 | Reallocation | 67682 | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | |
20/06/1959 | Reallocation | 67684 | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | |
20/06/1959 | Reallocation | 67686 | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | |
04/07/1959 | Reallocation | 67606 | 64G | Hawick | 64A | St Margarets | |
01/08/1959 | Reallocation | 67668 | STM | St Margarets | 64C | Dalry Road | |
07/05/1960 | Reallocation | 67669 | STR | Stratford | 65E | Kipps | |
30/07/1960 | Reallocation | 67604 | PKD | Parkhead | 65D | Dawsholm | |
21/09/1960 | Condemned | 67624 | STM | St Margarets | COND | ||
19/11/1960 | Reallocation | 67604 | 65D | Dawsholm | 65C | Parkhead | |
19/11/1960 | Reallocation | 67605 | 65E | Kipps | 65A | Eastfield | |
19/11/1960 | Reallocation | 67609 | 65E | Kipps | 65A | Eastfield | |
19/11/1960 | Reallocation | 67618 | 65E | Kipps | 65A | Eastfield | |
19/11/1960 | Reallocation | 67623 | PKD | Parkhead | 65D | Dawsholm | |
19/11/1960 | Reallocation | 67627 | KPS | Kipps | 65A | Eastfield | |
19/11/1960 | Reallocation | 67676 | PKD | Parkhead | 65A | Eastfield | |
17/12/1960 | Reallocation | 67607 | 65C | Parkhead | 67B | Hurlford | |
17/12/1960 | Reallocation | 67616 | PKD | Parkhead | 67B | Hurlford | |
17/12/1960 | Reallocation | 67633 | PKD | Parkhead | 65D | Dawsholm | |
17/12/1960 | Reallocation | 67660 | KPS | Kipps | 64A | St Margarets | |
17/12/1960 | Reallocation | 67661 | EFD | Eastfield | 67B | Hurlford | |
17/12/1960 | Reallocation | 67669 | 65E | Kipps | 64A | St Margarets | |
17/12/1960 | Reallocation | 67674 | PKD | Parkhead | 64A | St Margarets | |
17/12/1960 | Reallocation | 67679 | 65C | Parkhead | 67B | Hurlford | |
17/12/1960 | Reallocation | 67681 | STR | Stratford | 67B | Hurlford | |
14/01/1961 | Reallocation | 67613 | PKD | Parkhead | 65C | Parkhead | |
14/01/1961 | Reallocation | 67617 | STM | St Margarets | 65C | Parkhead | |
14/01/1961 | Reallocation | 67648 | PKD | Parkhead | 65C | Parkhead | |
14/01/1961 | Reallocation | 67660 | 64A | St Margarets | 65C | Parkhead | |
14/01/1961 | Reallocation | 67669 | 64A | St Margarets | 65C | Parkhead | |
21/01/1961 | Condemned | 67612 | PKD | Parkhead | COND | ||
11/02/1961 | Reallocation | 67617 | 65C | Parkhead | 64A | St Margarets | |
11/02/1961 | Reallocation | 67623 | 65D | Dawsholm | 65C | Parkhead | |
11/02/1961 | Reallocation | 67633 | 65D | Dawsholm | 65C | Parkhead | |
11/02/1961 | Reallocation | 67674 | 64A | St Margarets | 65E | Kipps | |
11/03/1961 | Reallocation | 67605 | 65A | Eastfield | 65E | Kipps | |
11/03/1961 | Reallocation | 67607 | 67B | Hurlford | 65C | Parkhead | |
11/03/1961 | Reallocation | 67609 | 65A | Eastfield | 65E | Kipps | |
11/03/1961 | Reallocation | 67618 | 65A | Eastfield | 65E | Kipps | |
11/03/1961 | Reallocation | 67627 | 65A | Eastfield | 65E | Kipps | |
11/03/1961 | Reallocation | 67660 | 65C | Parkhead | 65E | Kipps | |
11/03/1961 | Reallocation | 67661 | 67B | Hurlford | 65C | Parkhead | |
11/03/1961 | Reallocation | 67669 | 65C | Parkhead | 65E | Kipps | |
11/03/1961 | Reallocation | 67676 | 65A | Eastfield | 65C | Parkhead | |
11/03/1961 | Reallocation | 67679 | 67B | Hurlford | 65C | Parkhead | |
11/03/1961 | Reallocation | 67681 | 67B | Hurlford | 65C | Parkhead | |
06/05/1961 | Reallocation | 67623 | 65C | Parkhead | 65E | Kipps | |
06/05/1961 | Reallocation | 67648 | 65C | Parkhead | 65E | Kipps | |
06/05/1961 | Reallocation | 67668 | 64C | Dalry Road | 64A | St Margarets | |
06/05/1961 | Reallocation | 67669 | 65E | Kipps | 64A | St Margarets | |
17/06/1961 | Reallocation | 67690 | GHD | Gateshead | 52B | Heaton | |
05/08/1961 | Reallocation | 67645 | 52G | Sunderland | 52B | Heaton | |
10/08/1961 | Condemned | 67650 | 65C | Parkhead | COND | ||
10/08/1961 | Condemned | 67670 | STM | St Margarets | COND | ||
22/08/1961 | Condemned | 67627 | 65E | Kipps | COND | ||
28/09/1961 | Condemned | 67669 | 64A | St Margarets | COND | ||
21/10/1961 | Reallocation | 67605 | 65E | Kipps | 64A | St Margarets | |
21/10/1961 | Reallocation | 67608 | 65C | Parkhead | 65A | Eastfield | |
21/10/1961 | Reallocation | 67613 | 65C | Parkhead | 67D | Ardrossan | |
21/10/1961 | Reallocation | 67623 | 65E | Kipps | 67B | Hurlford | |
21/10/1961 | Reallocation | 67648 | 65E | Kipps | 67D | Ardrossan | |
21/10/1961 | Reallocation | 67660 | 65E | Kipps | 64A | St Margarets | |
21/10/1961 | Reallocation | 67661 | 65C | Parkhead | 67B | Hurlford | |
21/10/1961 | Reallocation | 67674 | 65E | Kipps | 64A | St Margarets | |
21/10/1961 | Reallocation | 67675 | 65C | Parkhead | 65A | Eastfield | |
21/10/1961 | Reallocation | 67679 | 65C | Parkhead | 67B | Hurlford | |
21/10/1961 | Reallocation | 67681 | 65C | Parkhead | 67B | Hurlford | |
16/11/1961 | Condemned | 67681 | 67B | Hurlford | COND | ||
18/11/1961 | Reallocation | 67604 | 65C | Parkhead | 65A | Eastfield | |
18/11/1961 | Reallocation | 67628 | PKD | Parkhead | 65A | Eastfield | |
25/11/1961 | Reallocation | 67640 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | 51L | Thornaby | |
25/11/1961 | Reallocation | 67682 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | 51A | Darlington | |
30/12/1961 | Reallocation | 67613 | 67D | Ardrossan | 67B | Hurlford | |
30/12/1961 | Reallocation | 67614 | PKD | Parkhead | 67B | Hurlford | |
30/12/1961 | Reallocation | 67648 | 67D | Ardrossan | 67B | Hurlford | |
30/12/1961 | Reallocation | 67676 | 65C | Parkhead | 67B | Hurlford | |
25/01/1962 | Condemned | 67613 | 67B | Hurlford | COND | ||
25/01/1962 | Condemned | 67623 | 67B | Hurlford | COND | ||
25/01/1962 | Condemned | 67648 | 67B | Hurlford | COND | ||
25/01/1962 | Condemned | 67679 | 67B | Hurlford | COND | ||
05/02/1962 | Condemned | 67609 | 65E | Kipps | COND | ||
05/02/1962 | Condemned | 67660 | 64A | St Margarets | COND | ||
05/02/1962 | Condemned | 67661 | 67B | Hurlford | COND | ||
05/02/1962 | Condemned | 67666 | STM | St Margarets | COND | ||
24/02/1962 | Reallocation | 67607 | 65C | Parkhead | 67B | Hurlford | |
24/03/1962 | Reallocation | 67667 | 65A | Eastfield | 67B | Hurlford | |
16/04/1962 | Condemned | 67634 | 52C | Blaydon | COND | ||
21/04/1962 | Reallocation | 67614 | 67B | Hurlford | 65C | Parkhead | |
21/04/1962 | Reallocation | 67633 | 65C | Parkhead | 67B | Hurlford | |
21/04/1962 | Reallocation | 67676 | 67B | Hurlford | 65C | Parkhead | |
07/05/1962 | Condemned | 67644 | EFD | Eastfield | COND | ||
30/07/1962 | Condemned | 67614 | 65C | Parkhead | COND | ||
30/07/1962 | Condemned | 67676 | 65C | Parkhead | COND | ||
02/08/1962 | Condemned | 67667 | 67B | Hurlford | COND | ||
27/08/1962 | Condemned | 67617 | 64A | St Margarets | COND | ||
01/10/1962 | Condemned | 67677 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | COND | ||
08/12/1962 | Reallocation | 67620 | HAY | Haymarket | 52B | Heaton | |
08/12/1962 | Reallocation | 67628 | 65A | Eastfield | 52B | Heaton | |
08/12/1962 | Reallocation | 67643 | PKD | Parkhead | 52B | Heaton | |
08/12/1962 | Reallocation | 67657 | 52A | Gateshead | 64B | Haymarket | |
08/12/1962 | Reallocation | 67662 | PKD | Parkhead | 52B | Heaton | |
08/12/1962 | Reallocation | 67678 | PKD | Parkhead | 52B | Heaton | |
08/12/1962 | Reallocation | 67685 | 52B | Heaton | 64B | Haymarket | |
08/12/1962 | Reallocation | 67687 | 52A | Gateshead | 64B | Haymarket | |
08/12/1962 | Reallocation | 67688 | GHD | Gateshead | 64B | Haymarket | |
08/12/1962 | Reallocation | 67689 | GHD | Gateshead | 64B | Haymarket | |
10/12/1962 | Condemned | 67685 | 64B | Haymarket | COND | ||
22/12/1962 | Reallocation | 67657 | 64B | Haymarket | 64B | Haymarket | |
22/12/1962 | Reallocation | 67685 | 98W | 64B | Haymarket | ||
22/12/1962 | Reallocation | 67687 | 64B | Haymarket | 64B | Haymarket | |
22/12/1962 | Reallocation | 67688 | 64B | Haymarket | 64B | Haymarket | |
22/12/1962 | Reallocation | 67689 | 64B | Haymarket | 64B | Haymarket | |
29/12/1962 | Condemned | 67600 | EFD | Eastfield | COND | ||
29/12/1962 | Condemned | 67604 | 65A | Eastfield | COND | ||
29/12/1962 | Condemned | 67605 | 64A | St Margarets | COND | ||
29/12/1962 | Condemned | 67606 | 64A | St Margarets | COND | ||
29/12/1962 | Condemned | 67607 | 67B | Hurlford | COND | ||
29/12/1962 | Condemned | 67608 | 65A | Eastfield | COND | ||
29/12/1962 | Condemned | 67611 | PKD | Parkhead | COND | ||
29/12/1962 | Condemned | 67615 | HAY | Haymarket | COND | ||
29/12/1962 | Condemned | 67616 | 67B | Hurlford | COND | ||
29/12/1962 | Condemned | 67618 | 65E | Kipps | COND | ||
29/12/1962 | Condemned | 67619 | PKD | Parkhead | COND | ||
29/12/1962 | Condemned | 67621 | PKD | Parkhead | COND | ||
29/12/1962 | Condemned | 67625 | PKD | Parkhead | COND | ||
29/12/1962 | Condemned | 67626 | PKD | Parkhead | COND | ||
29/12/1962 | Reallocation | 67628 | 52B | Heaton | 52A | Gateshead | |
29/12/1962 | Condemned | 67632 | PKD | Parkhead | COND | ||
29/12/1962 | Condemned | 67633 | 67B | Hurlford | COND | ||
29/12/1962 | Reallocation | 67643 | 52B | Heaton | 52A | Gateshead | |
29/12/1962 | Condemned | 67645 | 52B | Heaton | COND | ||
29/12/1962 | Condemned | 67657 | 64B | Haymarket | COND | ||
29/12/1962 | Reallocation | 67662 | 52B | Heaton | 52A | Gateshead | |
29/12/1962 | Condemned | 67668 | 64A | St Margarets | COND | ||
29/12/1962 | Condemned | 67672 | STR | Stratford | COND | ||
29/12/1962 | Condemned | 67674 | 64A | St Margarets | COND | ||
29/12/1962 | Condemned | 67675 | 65A | Eastfield | COND | ||
29/12/1962 | Reallocation | 67678 | 52B | Heaton | 52A | Gateshead | |
29/12/1962 | Condemned | 67687 | 64B | Haymarket | COND | ||
29/12/1962 | Condemned | 67688 | 64B | Haymarket | COND | ||
29/12/1962 | Condemned | 67689 | 64B | Haymarket | COND | ||
14/01/1963 | Condemned | 67662 | 52A | Gateshead | COND | ||
21/01/1963 | Condemned | 67647 | 52B | Heaton | COND | ||
26/01/1963 | Reallocation | 67645 | 98W | 52A | Gateshead | ||
26/01/1963 | Reallocation | 67654 | HTN | Heaton | 52A | Gateshead | |
22/06/1963 | Reallocation | 67620 | 52B | Heaton | 52A | Gateshead | |
22/06/1963 | Reallocation | 67636 | BLA | Blaydon | 52A | Gateshead | |
22/06/1963 | Reallocation | 67642 | 52B | Heaton | 52A | Gateshead | |
22/06/1963 | Reallocation | 67646 | HTN | Heaton | 52A | Gateshead | |
22/06/1963 | Reallocation | 67651 | HTN | Heaton | 52A | Gateshead | |
22/06/1963 | Reallocation | 67652 | HTN | Heaton | 52A | Gateshead | |
22/06/1963 | Reallocation | 67656 | 52B | Heaton | 52A | Gateshead | |
22/06/1963 | Reallocation | 67658 | 52B | Heaton | 52A | Gateshead | |
22/06/1963 | Reallocation | 67683 | 52B | Heaton | 52A | Gateshead | |
22/06/1963 | Reallocation | 67690 | 52B | Heaton | 52A | Gateshead | |
22/06/1963 | Reallocation | 67691 | 52B | Heaton | 52A | Gateshead | |
23/09/1963 | Condemned | 67653 | 52C | Blaydon | COND | ||
23/09/1963 | Condemned | 67654 | 52A | Gateshead | COND | ||
23/09/1963 | Condemned | 67658 | 52A | Gateshead | COND | ||
23/09/1963 | Condemned | 67663 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | COND | ||
23/09/1963 | Condemned | 67682 | 51A | Darlington | COND | ||
23/09/1963 | Condemned | 67683 | 52A | Gateshead | COND | ||
23/09/1963 | Condemned | 67686 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | COND | ||
28/09/1963 | Reallocation | 67640 | 51L | Thornaby | 52A | Gateshead | |
21/12/1963 | Reallocation | 67638 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | 52A | Gateshead | |
21/12/1963 | Reallocation | 67684 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | 52A | Gateshead | |
23/12/1963 | Condemned | 67652 | 52A | Gateshead | COND | ||
23/12/1963 | Condemned | 67656 | 52A | Gateshead | COND | ||
19/05/1964 | Condemned | 67651 | 52A | Gateshead | COND | ||
04/06/1964 | Condemned | 67642 | 52A | Gateshead | COND | ||
24/10/1964 | Reallocation | 67690 | 52A | Gateshead | 51A | Darlington | |
02/11/1964 | Condemned | 67636 | 52A | Gateshead | COND | ||
02/11/1964 | Condemned | 67638 | 52A | Gateshead | COND | ||
02/11/1964 | Condemned | 67640 | 52A | Gateshead | COND | ||
02/11/1964 | Condemned | 67643 | 52A | Gateshead | COND | ||
02/11/1964 | Condemned | 67678 | 52A | Gateshead | COND | ||
02/11/1964 | Condemned | 67684 | 52A | Gateshead | COND | ||
24/11/1964 | Condemned | 67620 | 52A | Gateshead | COND | ||
24/11/1964 | Condemned | 67628 | 52A | Gateshead | COND | ||
24/11/1964 | Condemned | 67646 | 52A | Gateshead | COND | ||
24/11/1964 | Condemned | 67690 | 51A | Darlington | COND | ||
24/11/1964 | Condemned | 67691 | 52A | Gateshead | COND |