Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1488 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19291 Week
» 72307 Month
» 191834 Year
» 3218687 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
LNER Gresley "V3" Class 2-6-2T
Company |
Old Number |
|
Company |
New Number |
Subtype |
|
Date |
Information |
LNER |
2906 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7606 |
1946 |
on |
10/03/1946 |
|
LNER |
2925 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7625 |
1946 |
on |
16/03/1946 |
|
LNER |
2905 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7605 |
1946 |
m/e |
04/1946 |
|
LNER |
2907 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7607 |
1946 |
m/e |
04/1946 |
|
LNER |
2908 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7608 |
1946 |
m/e |
04/1946 |
|
LNER |
2909 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7609 |
1946 |
m/e |
04/1946 |
|
LNER |
417 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7634 |
1946 |
m/e |
04/1946 |
|
LNER |
2900 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7600 |
1946 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
|
LNER |
2914 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7614 |
1946 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
|
LNER |
396 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7687 |
1946 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
|
LNER |
398 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7689 |
1946 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
|
LNER |
425 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7666 |
1946 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
|
LNER |
485 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7676 |
1946 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
|
LNER |
2904 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7604 |
1946 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
|
LNER |
2911 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7611 |
1946 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
|
LNER |
2912 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7612 |
1946 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
|
LNER |
2915 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7615 |
1946 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
|
LNER |
2916 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7616 |
1946 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
|
LNER |
2917 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7617 |
1946 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
|
LNER |
2920 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7620 |
1946 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
|
LNER |
2924 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7624 |
1946 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
|
LNER |
2927 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7627 |
1946 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
|
LNER |
390 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7682 |
1946 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
|
LNER |
391 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7683 |
1946 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
|
LNER |
397 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7688 |
1946 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
|
LNER |
404 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7662 |
1946 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
|
LNER |
407 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7663 |
1946 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
|
LNER |
419 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7650 |
1946 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
|
LNER |
422 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7651 |
1946 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
|
LNER |
428 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7653 |
1946 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
|
LNER |
440 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7654 |
1946 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
|
LNER |
446 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7635 |
1946 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
|
LNER |
466 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7660 |
1946 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
|
LNER |
467 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7670 |
1946 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
|
LNER |
480 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7674 |
1946 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
|
LNER |
489 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7678 |
1946 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
|
LNER |
2899 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7661 |
1946 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
|
LNER |
2913 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7613 |
1946 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
|
LNER |
2918 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7618 |
1946 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
|
LNER |
2919 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7619 |
1946 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
|
LNER |
2921 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7621 |
1946 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
|
LNER |
2923 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7623 |
1946 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
|
LNER |
2926 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7626 |
1946 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
|
LNER |
2932 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7632 |
1946 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
|
LNER |
2933 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7633 |
1946 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
|
LNER |
393 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7685 |
1946 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
|
LNER |
395 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7686 |
1946 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
|
LNER |
401 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7691 |
1946 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
|
LNER |
447 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7667 |
1946 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
|
LNER |
448 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7668 |
1946 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
|
LNER |
451 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7669 |
1946 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
|
LNER |
454 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7656 |
1946 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
|
LNER |
455 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7657 |
1946 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
|
LNER |
472 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7672 |
1946 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
|
LNER |
483 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7675 |
1946 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
|
LNER |
488 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7677 |
1946 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
|
LNER |
490 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7679 |
1946 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
|
LNER |
496 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7681 |
1946 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
|
LNER |
2928 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7628 |
1946 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
|
LNER |
392 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7684 |
1946 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
|
LNER |
399 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7690 |
1946 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
|
LNER |
461 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7658 |
1946 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
|
LNER |
477 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7636 |
1946 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
|
LNER |
481 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7638 |
1946 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
|
LNER |
402 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7644 |
1946 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
|
LNER |
423 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7652 |
1946 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
|
LNER |
416 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7647 |
1946 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
|
LNER |
418 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7648 |
1946 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
|
LNER |
486 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7640 |
1946 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
|
LNER |
498 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7643 |
1946 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
|
LNER |
414 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7645 |
1946 |
m/e |
12/1946 |
|
LNER |
415 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7646 |
1946 |
m/e |
12/1946 |
|
LNER |
497 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7642 |
1946 |
m/e |
12/1946 |
|
LNER |
7608 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67608 |
|
m/e |
04/1948 |
|
LNER |
7632 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67632 |
|
m/e |
04/1948 |
|
LNER |
7672 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67672 |
|
m/e |
04/1948 |
|
LNER |
7684 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67684 |
|
m/e |
04/1948 |
|
LNER |
7614 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67614 |
|
m/e |
05/1948 |
|
LNER |
7688 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67688 |
|
m/e |
05/1948 |
|
LNER |
7615 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67615 |
|
m/e |
06/1948 |
|
LNER |
7677 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67677 |
|
m/e |
06/1948 |
|
LNER |
7691 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67691 |
|
m/e |
06/1948 |
|
LNER |
7605 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67605 |
|
m/e |
07/1948 |
|
LNER |
7613 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67613 |
|
m/e |
07/1948 |
|
LNER |
7616 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67616 |
|
m/e |
07/1948 |
|
LNER |
7678 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67678 |
|
m/e |
07/1948 |
|
LNER |
7690 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67690 |
|
m/e |
07/1948 |
|
LNER |
7624 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67624 |
|
m/e |
08/1948 |
|
LNER |
7635 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67635 |
|
m/e |
08/1948 |
|
LNER |
7638 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67638 |
|
m/e |
08/1948 |
|
LNER |
7661 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67661 |
|
m/e |
08/1948 |
|
LNER |
7628 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67628 |
|
m/e |
09/1948 |
|
LNER |
7650 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67650 |
|
m/e |
09/1948 |
|
LNER |
7618 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67618 |
|
m/e |
10/1948 |
|
LNER |
7633 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67633 |
|
m/e |
10/1948 |
|
LNER |
7640 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67640 |
|
m/e |
10/1948 |
|
LNER |
7634 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67634 |
|
m/e |
11/1948 |
|
LNER |
7642 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67642 |
|
m/e |
11/1948 |
|
LNER |
7662 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67662 |
|
m/e |
11/1948 |
|
LNER |
7676 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67676 |
|
m/e |
11/1948 |
|
LNER |
7626 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67626 |
|
m/e |
12/1948 |
|
LNER |
7636 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67636 |
|
m/e |
12/1948 |
|
LNER |
7643 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67643 |
|
m/e |
12/1948 |
|
LNER |
7663 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67663 |
|
m/e |
12/1948 |
|
LNER |
7668 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67668 |
|
m/e |
12/1948 |
|
LNER |
7687 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67687 |
|
m/e |
12/1948 |
|
LNER |
7627 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67627 |
|
m/e |
01/1949 |
|
LNER |
7647 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67647 |
|
m/e |
01/1949 |
|
LNER |
7651 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67651 |
|
m/e |
01/1949 |
|
LNER |
7686 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67686 |
|
m/e |
02/1949 |
|
LNER |
7623 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67623 |
|
m/e |
03/1949 |
|
LNER |
7654 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67654 |
|
m/e |
03/1949 |
|
LNER |
7679 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67679 |
|
m/e |
03/1949 |
|
LNER |
7681 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67681 |
|
m/e |
03/1949 |
|
LNER |
7689 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67689 |
|
m/e |
03/1949 |
|
LNER |
7648 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67648 |
|
m/e |
05/1949 |
|
LNER |
7660 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67660 |
|
m/e |
06/1949 |
|
LNER |
7675 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67675 |
|
m/e |
06/1949 |
|
LNER |
7609 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67609 |
|
m/e |
07/1949 |
|
LNER |
7619 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67619 |
|
m/e |
07/1949 |
|
LNER |
7620 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67620 |
|
m/e |
07/1949 |
|
LNER |
7685 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67685 |
|
m/e |
07/1949 |
|
LNER |
7612 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67612 |
|
on |
19/08/1949 |
|
LNER |
7669 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67669 |
|
on |
19/08/1949 |
|
LNER |
7645 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67645 |
|
m/e |
09/1949 |
|
LNER |
7658 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67658 |
|
m/e |
09/1949 |
|
LNER |
7667 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67667 |
|
m/e |
09/1949 |
|
LNER |
7670 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67670 |
|
m/e |
09/1949 |
|
LNER |
7674 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67674 |
|
m/e |
09/1949 |
|
LNER |
7682 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67682 |
|
m/e |
09/1949 |
|
LNER |
7621 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67621 |
|
m/e |
10/1949 |
|
LNER |
7617 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67617 |
|
m/e |
11/1949 |
|
LNER |
7625 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67625 |
|
m/e |
11/1949 |
|
LNER |
7646 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67646 |
|
m/e |
11/1949 |
|
LNER |
7644 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67644 |
|
m/e |
12/1949 |
|
LNER |
7611 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67611 |
|
on |
09/12/1949 |
|
LNER |
7652 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67652 |
|
m/e |
01/1950 |
|
LNER |
7666 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67666 |
|
m/e |
02/1950 |
|
LNER |
7657 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67657 |
|
m/e |
03/1950 |
|
LNER |
7683 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67683 |
|
m/e |
04/1950 |
|
LNER |
7653 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67653 |
|
m/e |
05/1950 |
|
LNER |
7656 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67656 |
|
m/e |
06/1950 |
|
LNER |
7607 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67607 |
|
on |
24/06/1950 |
|
LNER |
7600 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67600 |
|
on |
10/08/1950 |
|
LNER |
7606 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67606 |
|
m/e |
09/1950 |
|
LNER |
7604 |
renumbered to |
BR |
67604 |
|
m/e |
10/1950 |
|