Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 67 Today
» 1129 Yesterday
» 5542 Week
» 5542 Month
» 72404 Year
» 1737780 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

178


BR Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
59413      
59414 RG Reading (W.R.) 31/05/1981
59415
59416
59417
59418 RG Reading (W.R.) 31/05/1981 09/09/1988
59419
59420 W Withdrawn 16/12/1986 16/12/1986
59421
59422
59423
59424
59425
59426
59427 W Withdrawn 10/09/1986 10/09/1986
59428
59429
59430
59431
59432
59433 NH Newton Heath 11/10/1987
59434      
59435      
59436      
59437