D2/12 0-6-0
Date | Event | Number | From | Depot From | To | Depot To | Usage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
28/08/1961 | To Service | 2510 | NEW | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
28/08/1961 | To Service | 2511 | NEW | 12E | Barrow in Furness | ||
11/09/1961 | To Service | 2512 | NEW | 12E | Barrow in Furness | ||
05/10/1961 | To Service | 2513 | NEW | 12E | Barrow in Furness | ||
16/10/1961 | To Service | 2514 | NEW | 12E | Barrow in Furness | ||
18/10/1961 | To Service | 2515 | NEW | 12E | Barrow in Furness | ||
10/11/1961 | To Service | 2516 | NEW | 12E | Barrow in Furness | ||
10/11/1961 | To Service | 2517 | NEW | 12E | Barrow in Furness | ||
22/11/1961 | To Service | 2518 | NEW | 1C | Watford | ||
30/11/1961 | To Service | 2519 | NEW | 5B | Crewe South | ||
05/01/1963 | Reallocation | 2518 | 1C | Watford | 1A | Willesden | |
19/12/1964 | Reallocation | 2510 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | 1E | Bletchley | |
16/10/1965 | Reallocation | 2510 | 1E | Bletchley | 1A | Willesden | |
19/03/1966 | Reallocation | 2510 | 1A | Willesden | 1E | Bletchley | |
01/10/1966 | Reallocation | 2510 | 1E | Bletchley | 1F | Rugby | |
08/10/1966 | Reallocation | 2519 | 5B | Crewe South | 5A | Crewe Diesel | |
22/10/1966 | Reallocation | 2511 | 12E | Barrow in Furness | 12D | Workington | |
22/10/1966 | Reallocation | 2518 | 1A | Willesden | 5A | Crewe Diesel | |
21/01/1967 | Reallocation | 2513 | 12E | Barrow in Furness | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | |
21/01/1967 | Reallocation | 2514 | 12E | Barrow in Furness | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | |
21/01/1967 | Reallocation | 2517 | 12E | Barrow in Furness | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | |
25/02/1967 | Condemned | 2517 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | COND | ||
25/02/1967 | Condemned | 2518 | 5A | Crewe Diesel | COND | ||
22/04/1967 | Reallocation | 2513 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | 12C | Barrow in Furness | |
22/04/1967 | Reallocation | 2514 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | 12D | Workington | |
13/05/1967 | Condemned | 2512 | 12E | Barrow in Furness | COND | ||
24/06/1967 | Reallocation | 2511 | 12D | Workington | 12C | Barrow in Furness | |
24/06/1967 | Reallocation | 2514 | 12D | Workington | 12C | Barrow in Furness | |
29/07/1967 | Condemned | 2519 | 5A | Crewe Diesel | COND | ||
05/08/1967 | Condemned | 2514 | 12C | Barrow in Furness | COND | ||
05/08/1967 | Condemned | 2515 | 12E | Barrow in Furness | COND | ||
05/08/1967 | Condemned | 2516 | 12E | Barrow in Furness | COND | ||
19/08/1967 | Condemned | 2513 | 12C | Barrow in Furness | COND | ||
26/08/1967 | Condemned | 2510 | 1F | Rugby | COND | ||
30/12/1967 | Condemned | 2511 | 12C | Barrow in Furness | COND |